Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 722 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 2008 Week
» 29482 Month
» 326496 Year
» 403083 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

DN DES1 0-6-0


LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
8000 15000 12/08/1944 DO Stratford 05/08/1967 Crewe South 23 Cut R A Kings (Norwich) 08/1968 24.02
8001 15001 12/08/1944 DO Stratford 15/04/1967 Crewe South 22.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1967 23.02
8002 15002 22/03/1945 DO Stratford 05/08/1967 Crewe South 22.42 Cut R A Kings (Norwich) 10/1968 23.58
8003 15003 22/03/1945 DO Stratford 06/05/1967 Crewe South 22.17 Cut Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) 06/1968 23.25