Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 718 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 2004 Week
» 29478 Month
» 326492 Year
» 403079 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

D3/11 0-6-0


BR (1955 Num) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
15101 30/04/1948 SW 05/08/1967 19.33 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/10/1969 21.44
15102 31/05/1948 SW 22/07/1967 19.17 Cut Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield) 01/09/1968 20.27
15103 31/05/1948 SW 26/08/1967 19.25 Cut Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield) 01/09/1968 20.27
15104 31/05/1948 SW 22/07/1967 19.17 Cut Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield) 01/09/1968 20.27
15105 31/07/1948 SW 26/08/1967 19.08 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/10/1969 21.18
15106 31/07/1948 SW 26/08/1967 19.08 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/09/1969 21.10