Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 1090 Today
» 943 Yesterday
» 7611 Week
» 27344 Month
» 324358 Year
» 400945 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

D3/12 0-6-0


SR BR (1955 Num) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
1 15201 30/09/1937 AS 29/11/1964 27.17 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 01/09/1969 31.94
2 15202 30/09/1937 AS 13/12/1964 27.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/05/1966 28.60
3 15203 31/10/1937 AS 29/11/1964 27.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/04/1966 28.44