Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 549 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 5123 Week
» 24856 Month
» 321870 Year
» 398457 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

D20/2 A1A-A1A


BR (Pre Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D600 24/01/1958 NB Swindon 31/12/1967 9.92 Cut Woodham Brothers (Barry, South Glamorgan) 01/03/1970 12.11 ACTIVE
D601 28/03/1958 NB Swindon 31/12/1967 Laira 9.75 Cut Woodham Brothers (Barry, South Glamorgan) 01/06/1980 22.19 ARK ROYAL
D602 03/11/1958 NB Laira 31/12/1967 Laira 9.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/08/1968 9.75 BULLDOG
D603 21/11/1958 NB Laira 31/12/1967 9.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/08/1968 9.70 CONQUEST
D604 20/01/1959 NB Laira 31/12/1967 Laira 8.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/08/1968 9.54 COSSACK