Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 113 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 1399 Week
» 28873 Month
» 325887 Year
» 402474 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

08 0-6-0


BR (1955 Num) BR (Pre Tops) BR (Class 13) BR (Tops) Date To Service Bld Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Rebuilt To Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
13000 D3000 01/11/1952 DE Tyseley 19/11/1972 20 Prs Preserved 64.45
13001 D3001 01/11/1952 DE Tyseley 19/11/1972 20 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/11/1975 23.01
13002 D3002 01/11/1952 DE Tyseley 17/07/1972 19.67 Prs Preserved 64.45
13003 D3003 14/11/1952 DE Tyseley 17/07/1972 19.67 Prs Preserved 35.74
13004 D3004 08001 14/11/1952 DE Tyseley 30/06/1978 Gateshead 25.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/03/1979 26.39
13005 D3005 08002 14/11/1952 DE Ayr 04/09/1977 Doncaster 24.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/01/1978 25.23
13006 D3006 27/12/1952 DE Ayr 26/11/1972 19.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/08/1979 26.61
13007 D3007 08003 27/12/1952 DE Hurlford 12/12/1977 Darlington 25 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 31/07/1979 26.61
13008 D3008 08004 27/12/1952 DE Hurlford 21/08/1983 Thornaby 30.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/09/1986 33.78
13009 D3009 08005 27/12/1952 DE Hurlford 15/10/1978 Bescot 25.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 31/12/1979 27.03
13010 D3010 08006 31/12/1952 DE Hither Green 24/02/1980 Darlington 27.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/04/1980 27.35
13011 D3011 31/12/1952 DE Hither Green 01/10/1972 19.83 Cut Marples and Gillot (Sheffield) 01/12/1985 32.94
13012 D3012 08007 31/12/1952 DE Hither Green 01/01/1973 20.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/10/1973 20.76
13013 D3013 31/12/1952 DE Hither Green 01/10/1972 19.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/10/1973 20.76
13014 D3014 31/12/1952 DE Hither Green 01/10/1972 19.83 Prs Preserved 64.29
13015 D3015 08008 24/01/1953 DE Willesden 27/11/1983 Gateshead 30.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/09/1986 33.70
13016 D3016 08009 24/01/1953 DE Willesden 30/11/1975 Ashford Chart Leacon 22.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/06/1976 23.45
13017 D3017 08010 21/03/1953 DE Willesden 18/12/1977 Willesden 24.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Eastleigh) 28/02/1978 24.96
13018 D3018 08011 21/03/1953 DE Willesden 13/12/1991 Reading (W.R.) 38.75 Prs Preserved 39.16
13019 D3019 08012 21/03/1953 DE Willesden 01/06/1973 20.25 Prs Preserved 64.07
13020 D3020 08013 18/04/1953 DE Aston 01/12/1973 20.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/04/1975 21.97
13021 D3021 08014 16/05/1953 DE Ryecroft (Walsall) 18/05/1980 Bury 27 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 30/11/1981 28.56
13022 D3022 08015 16/05/1953 DE Cricklewood East 21/09/1980 Tinsley 27.33 Prs Preserved 63.92
13023 D3023 08016 13/06/1953 DE Cricklewood East 18/05/1980 Newton Heath 26.92 Prs Preserved 63.84
13024 D3024 08017 13/06/1953 DE Cricklewood East 01/08/1973 20.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/10/1974 21.32
13025 D3025 08018 05/09/1953 DE Tyseley 17/07/1983 Allerton 29.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 14/09/1985 32.05
13026 D3026 03/10/1953 DE Tyseley 12/11/1972 19.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/04/1973 19.51
13027 D3027 08019 03/10/1953 DE Tyseley 25/09/1983 Bletchley 29.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/05/1986 32.68
13028 D3028 08020 03/10/1953 DE Tyseley 01/08/1973 19.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/11/1975 22.09
13029 D3029 08021 03/10/1953 DE Tyseley 07/12/1986 Toton 33.17 Prs Preserved 63.53
13030 D3030 08022 03/10/1953 DE Old Oak Common 17/03/1985 Tinsley 31.42 Prs Preserved 31.76
13031 D3031 08023 31/10/1953 DE Old Oak Common 25/09/1983 Chester West 29.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/03/1987 33.44
13032 D3032 08024 31/10/1953 DE Old Oak Common 26/12/1982 Tinsley 29.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/08/1983 29.77
13033 D3033 08025 31/10/1953 DE Old Oak Common 18/12/1977 Bescot 24.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/02/1978 24.27
13034 D3034 28/11/1953 DE Oxley 19/11/1972 19 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/11/1973 19.94
13035 D3035 28/11/1953 DE Oxley 17/12/1972 19.08 Prs Preserved 25.44
13036 D3036 08026 28/11/1953 DE Oxley 04/07/1982 Cambridge 28.67 Prs Preserved 32.36
13037 D3037 28/11/1953 DE Oxley 17/12/1972 19.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/03/1979 25.27
13038 D3038 28/11/1953 DE Oxley 30/12/1972 19.08 Cut National Coal Board (Bates Colliery) 01/05/1980 26.44
13039 D3039 08027 28/11/1953 DE Oxley 02/11/1980 Toton 27 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/04/1982 28.36
13040 D3040 08028 30/01/1954 DE Feltham 05/04/1981 Bury 27.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/04/1982 28.19
13041 D3041 08029 30/01/1954 DE Feltham 05/03/1978 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 24.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1978 24.27
13042 D3042 08030 08/02/1954 DE Feltham 10/07/1982 Eastleigh 28.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 13/10/1984 30.70
13043 D3043 08031 22/02/1954 DE Hither Green 04/07/1982 Immingham 28.42 Cut British Rail (at Immingham MPD) 30/03/1988 34.12
13044 D3044 08032 27/03/1954 DE Norwood Junction 25/08/1974 Toton 20.42 Prs Preserved 63.05
13045 D3045 27/03/1954 DE Hither Green 05/11/1972 18.67 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/04/1976 22.03
13046 D3046 08033 13/05/1954 DE Norwood Junction 06/01/1985 Tinsley 30.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 28/02/1986 31.82
13047 D3047 08034 13/05/1954 DE Hither Green 01/07/1973 19.17 62.92
13048 D3048 08035 13/05/1954 DE Norwood Junction 30/09/1979 Landore 25.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/01/1980 25.65
13049 D3049 08036 13/05/1954 DE Norwood Junction 07/09/1981 Willesden 27.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 26/03/1983 28.89
13050 D3050 08037 22/05/1954 DE Crewe South 03/02/1980 Bury 25.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/10/1980 26.38
13051 D3051 08038 19/06/1954 DE Crewe South 01/06/1973 19 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/08/1973 19.13
13052 D3052 08039 19/06/1954 DE Crewe South 01/12/1973 19.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/08/1974 20.13
13053 D3053 08040 19/06/1954 DE Crewe South 01/06/1973 19 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/10/1975 21.30
13054 D3054 08041 17/07/1954 DE Crewe South 08/08/1978 Bescot 24.08 Prs Preserved 24.72
13055 D3055 08042 17/07/1954 DE Crewe South 11/03/1979 York (North) 24.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/05/1979 24.81
13056 D3056 08043 14/08/1954 DE Toton 18/12/1977 Bury 23.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/04/1978 23.65
13057 D3057 08044 14/08/1954 DE Wellingborough 04/01/1978 Gateshead 23.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/01/1979 24.40
13058 D3058 08045 11/09/1954 DE Wellingborough 04/07/1982 Toton 27.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 15/12/1984 30.28
13059 D3059 08046 11/09/1954 DE Wellingborough 18/05/1980 Bury 25.67 Prs Preserved 62.59
13060 D3060 08047 22/08/1953 DA Mexborough 28/10/1979 Wath 26.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/06/1980 26.79
13061 D3061 08048 22/08/1953 DA Mexborough 12/12/1977 Wath 24.33 Prs Preserved 24.62
13062 D3062 08049 10/09/1953 DA Mexborough 17/05/1981 Wath 27.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1985 31.66
13063 D3063 08050 24/10/1953 DA Mexborough 25/10/1981 Wath 28 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/01/1983 29.21
13064 D3064 08051 09/09/1953 DA Mexborough 11/07/1982 Wath 28.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/03/1986 32.58
13065 D3065 08052 24/10/1953 DA Woodford Halse 25/01/1981 Cambridge 27.25 Cut C F Booth (at March MPD) 31/01/1982 28.29
13066 D3066 08053 24/10/1953 DA Woodford Halse 01/03/1981 Thornaby 27.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/06/1981 27.62
13067 D3067 08054 21/11/1953 DA Woodford Halse 16/02/1980 Gateshead 26.25 Prs Preserved 63.40
13068 D3068 08055 21/11/1953 DA Woodford Halse 02/11/1980 Crewe Diesel 27 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1983 29.46
13069 D3069 21/11/1953 DA Woodford Halse 07/01/1973 19.17 Cut British Rail (at Thornaby MPD) 01/03/1980 26.29
13070 D3070 08056 21/11/1953 DA Hull Springhead 03/08/1986 Knottingley 32.75 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 09/05/1989 35.49
13071 D3071 08057 21/11/1953 DA Hull Dairycoates 28/07/1976 Healey Mills 22.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/05/1977 23.46
13072 D3072 08058 19/12/1953 DA Hull Dairycoates 04/04/1982 Thornaby 28.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 21/05/1983 29.44
13073 D3073 08059 19/12/1953 DA Hull Dairycoates 21/09/1980 Thornaby 26.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 06/04/1985 31.32
13074 D3074 08060 19/12/1953 DA Hull Dairycoates 24/06/1984 Lincoln 30.5 Prs Preserved 31.55
13075 D3075 08061 23/01/1954 DA Hull Dairycoates 06/05/1984 Hull Botanic Gardens 30.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 20/04/1985 31.26
13076 D3076 08062 23/01/1954 DA Hull Dairycoates 30/09/1984 30.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 23/03/1985 31.18
13077 D3077 08063 23/01/1954 DA Hull Dairycoates 08/07/1984 Thornaby 30.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 06/04/1985 31.22
13078 D3078 23/01/1958 DA Hull Dairycoates 30/11/1972 14.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/02/1979 21.04
13079 D3079 08064 23/01/1958 DA Hull Dairycoates 23/12/1984 26.92 Prs Preserved 27.12
13080 D3080 08065 20/02/1954 DA Hull Dairycoates 04/09/1977 Immingham 23.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/11/1978 24.71
13081 D3081 08066 20/02/1954 DA Hull Dairycoates 04/09/1977 Immingham 23.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/11/1978 24.71
13082 D3082 08067 09/10/1954 DE Saltley 17/07/1983 Tyseley 28.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/10/1986 32.08
13083 D3083 08068 09/10/1954 DE Nottingham 17/07/1983 Tyseley 28.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/10/1986 32.00
13084 D3084 08069 09/10/1954 DE Nottingham 27/02/1983 Carlisle Kingmoor 28.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 03/03/1984 29.42
13085 D3085 08070 06/11/1954 DE Nottingham 18/12/1977 Chester West 23.08 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/04/1980 25.42
13086 D3086 08071 06/11/1954 DE Nottingham 14/02/1978 Darlington 23.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/07/1978 23.67
13087 D3087 08072 06/11/1954 DE Speke Junction 01/06/1973 18.58 Cut T W Ward (at Birchills PS) 01/05/1983 28.50
13088 D3088 08073 06/11/1954 DE Speke Junction 01/12/1973 19.08 Cut National Coal Board (Bates Colliery) 01/10/1985 30.92
13089 D3089 08074 04/12/1954 DE Speke Junction 09/12/1973 19 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/06/1977 22.51
13090 D3090 08075 04/12/1954 DE Bushbury 13/12/1981 Shirebrook 27 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/04/1982 27.34
13091 D3091 08076 04/12/1954 DE Ryecroft (Walsall) 21/09/1980 Immingham 25.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/04/1982 27.34
13092 D3092 27/11/1954 DE Norwood Junction 01/10/1972 17.92 62.38
13093 D3093 27/11/1954 DE Norwood Junction 31/05/1972 17.5 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/01/1974 19.11
13094 D3094 11/01/1955 DE Norwood Junction 01/10/1972 17.75 62.26
13095 D3095 11/01/1955 DE Norwood Junction 31/05/1972 17.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1973 18.90
13096 D3096 11/01/1955 DE Norwood Junction 31/05/1972 17.33 Cut British Rail (at Selhurst MPD) 01/09/1972 17.65
13097 D3097 15/01/1955 DE Norwood Junction 31/05/1972 17.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1973 18.89
13098 D3098 22/01/1955 DE Norwood Junction 01/10/1972 17.75 62.23
13099 D3099 22/01/1955 DE Norwood Junction 08/10/1972 17.75 Cut P Woods (Shipbreaking) (Queenborough) 01/08/1973 18.54
13100 D3100 29/01/1955 DE Norwood Junction 01/10/1972 17.75 62.21
13101 D3101 05/02/1955 DE Norwood Junction 31/05/1972 17.25 Prs Preserved 62.19
13102 D3102 08077 11/02/1955 DE Severn Tunnel Junction 62.17
13103 D3103 08078 16/02/1955 DE Severn Tunnel Junction 14/08/1983 Carlisle Kingmoor 28.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/11/1986 31.81
13104 D3104 08079 23/02/1955 DE Severn Tunnel Junction 04/12/1983 Chester West 28.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/05/1986 31.29
13105 D3105 08080 23/02/1955 DE Banbury 02/11/1980 Crewe Diesel 25.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1981 26.20
13106 D3106 08081 04/03/1955 DE Banbury 06/04/1980 Gateshead 25.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/07/1980 25.35
13107 D3107 08082 11/03/1955 DE Banbury 02/11/1980 Bletchley 25.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/02/1982 26.92
13108 D3108 08083 11/03/1955 DE Banbury 08/07/1984 Cambridge 29.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 10/02/1985 29.94
13109 D3109 08084 16/03/1955 DE Banbury 02/11/1980 Newton Heath 25.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/02/1982 26.90
13110 D3110 08085 22/03/1955 DE Banbury 23/03/1986 Gateshead 31 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 16/04/1993 38.10
13111 D3111 08086 25/03/1955 DE Shrewsbury 03/08/1980 Healey Mills 25.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/01/1981 25.79
13112 D3112 08087 01/04/1955 DE Stourbridge Junction 16/11/1979 Gateshead 24.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1980 25.10
13113 D3113 08088 13/04/1955 DE Stourbridge Junction 25/09/1983 Crewe Diesel 28.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/11/1986 31.65
13114 D3114 08089 19/04/1955 DE Shrewsbury 21/09/1980 Cambridge 25.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1980 25.64
13115 D3115 08090 25/04/1955 DE Shrewsbury 27/11/1977 Cambridge 22.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/11/1978 23.54
13116 D3116 08091 29/04/1955 DE Shrewsbury 14/11/1982 Healey Mills 27.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 21/01/1984 28.75
13127 D3127 08092 24/07/1954 DA New England 30/11/1978 March 24.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/02/1979 24.54
13128 D3128 08093 31/08/1954 DA New England 26/07/1981 York (North) 26.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1982 27.52
13129 D3129 08094 31/08/1954 DA New England 19/06/1983 Cambridge 28.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 26/01/1985 30.43
13130 D3130 08095 31/08/1954 DA New England 27/02/1983 March 28.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/09/1986 32.02
13131 D3131 08096 31/08/1954 DA New England 09/09/1984 30.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 20/04/1985 30.66
13132 D3132 08097 30/10/1954 DA Grangemouth 11/03/1981 Healey Mills 26.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/06/1981 26.61
13133 D3133 08098 30/10/1954 DA Grangemouth 30/11/1980 Healey Mills 26.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/01/1981 26.19
13134 D3134 08099 30/10/1954 DA Grangemouth 12/09/1982 Hull Botanic Gardens 27.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 15/10/1983 28.98
13135 D3135 08100 27/11/1954 DA Grangemouth 19/12/1982 Cambridge 28.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 09/03/1985 30.30
13136 D3136 08101 25/12/1954 DA Grangemouth 17/07/1983 Lincoln 28.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 03/11/1984 29.88
13167 D3167 08102 24/08/1955 DE Saltley 14/03/1988 Doncaster 32.58 Prs Preserved 61.64
13168 D3168 08103 26/08/1955 DE Saltley 25/09/1983 Derby 28.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/12/1985 30.37
13169 D3169 08104 02/09/1955 DE Rugby 04/07/1982 Carlisle Kingmoor 26.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 17/03/1984 28.56
13170 D3170 08105 02/09/1955 DE Carlisle Upperby 17/07/1983 Carlisle Kingmoor 27.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 11/08/1984 28.96
13171 D3171 08106 07/09/1955 DE Carlisle Upperby 24/01/1982 Carlisle Kingmoor 26.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/01/1983 27.34
13172 D3172 07/09/1955 DE Crewe South 07/05/1972 16.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/07/1972 16.83
13173 D3173 08107 20/09/1955 DE Crewe South 19/12/1982 Carlisle Kingmoor 27.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 03/03/1984 28.47
13174 D3174 08108 23/09/1955 DE Crewe South 08/07/1984 Cambridge 28.83 Prs Preserved 61.56
13175 D3175 08109 29/09/1955 DE Crewe South 05/04/1981 Darlington 25.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/10/1981 26.02
13176 D3176 08110 30/09/1955 DE Crewe South 21/10/1979 Landore 24.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/04/1980 24.52
13177 D3177 08111 30/09/1955 DE Chester (MR) 01/04/1979 Frodingham 23.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/04/1979 23.52
13178 D3178 08112 06/10/1955 DE Chester (MR) 04/07/1982 Crewe Diesel 26.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 07/04/1984 28.52
13179 D3179 08113 07/10/1955 DE Derby 18/03/1984 Cardiff Canton 28.42 Cut Morley Waste Traders (Leeds) 30/04/2007 51.60
13180 D3180 08114 18/10/1955 DE Derby 06/11/1983 Doncaster 28.08 Prs Preserved 28.85
13181 D3181 08115 18/10/1955 DE Derby 08/07/1984 Doncaster 28.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 14/12/1985 30.18
13182 D3182 08116 18/10/1955 DE St Philips Marsh 15/08/1982 Gateshead 26.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 06/08/1983 27.82
13183 D3183 24/10/1955 DE St Philips Marsh 30/12/1972 17.17 Cut National Coal Board (Merthyr Vale Colliery) 01/12/1987 32.13
13184 D3184 08117 27/10/1955 DE St Philips Marsh 01/01/1979 Tinsley 23.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/03/1979 23.36
13185 D3185 08118 04/11/1955 DE St Philips Marsh 23/03/1980 Landore 24.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/08/1980 24.76
13186 D3186 08119 04/11/1955 DE St Philips Marsh 01/06/1979 Wath 23.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/02/1980 24.26
13187 D3187 08120 04/11/1955 DE St Philips Marsh 25/10/1981 Darlington 25.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/08/1982 26.76
13188 D3188 08121 09/11/1955 DE Tondu 10/06/1984 Allerton 28.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 16/11/1985 30.04
13189 D3189 08122 10/11/1955 DE Tondu 02/06/1977 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 21.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/11/1977 21.99
13190 D3190 08123 15/11/1955 DE Tondu 20/03/1984 Crewe Diesel 28.33 Prs Preserved 29.64
13191 D3191 08124 15/11/1955 DE Oxley 01/03/1981 Norwich Thorpe 25.33 Prs Preserved 26.23
13192 D3192 08125 18/11/1955 DE Shrewsbury 31/12/1981 Crewe Diesel 26.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 25/02/1984 28.29
13193 D3193 22/11/1955 DE Shrewsbury 16/09/1967 11.83 Prs Preserved 11.78
13194 D3194 08126 24/11/1955 DE Shrewsbury 02/11/1980 Springs Branch (Wigan) 25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1981 26.04
13195 D3195 08127 25/11/1955 DE Reading (W.R.) 03/08/1980 Gateshead 24.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1980 25.04
13196 D3196 08128 02/12/1955 DE Reading (W.R.) 06/08/1980 Doncaster 24.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 18/02/1984 28.23
13197 D3197 08129 30/12/1955 DE Polmadie 17/07/1983 Springs Branch (Wigan) 27.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 21/04/1984 28.33
13198 D3198 08130 08/12/1955 DE Polmadie 19/12/1982 Allerton 27 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 25/05/1985 29.48
13199 D3199 08131 08/12/1955 DE Polmadie 15/03/1981 Doncaster 25.25 Prs Preserved 25.67
13200 D3200 08132 13/12/1955 DE Polmadie 29/01/1986 Springs Branch (Wigan) 30.08 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 01/07/1988 32.57
13201 D3201 08133 16/12/1955 DE Polmadie 21/09/1980 Lincoln 24.75 Prs Preserved 61.33
13202 D3202 08134 16/12/1955 DE Motherwell 20/08/1981 Saltley 25.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1986 30.98
13203 D3203 08135 21/12/1955 DE Motherwell 12/02/1977 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 21.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1977 21.21
13204 D3204 08136 21/12/1955 DE Motherwell 07/08/1983 York (North) 27.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/12/1984 28.97
13205 D3205 08137 23/12/1955 DE Motherwell 28/11/1982 Lincoln 26.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 14/09/1985 29.75
13206 D3206 08138 30/12/1955 DE Hamilton (West) 14/01/1978 Norwich Thorpe 22.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1978 22.35
13207 D3207 08139 26/01/1956 DE Eastfield 21/09/1980 March 24.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/04/1982 26.20
13208 D3208 08140 03/02/1956 DE Eastfield 02/06/1977 Bristol Bath Road 21.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/06/1977 21.34
13209 D3209 08141 09/02/1956 DE Eastfield 25/01/1988 Tinsley 31.92 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 16/09/1994 38.63
13210 D3210 08142 16/02/1956 DE Thornton Junction 13/11/1983 York (North) 27.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/03/1987 31.14
13211 D3211 08143 24/02/1956 DE Thornton Junction 16/03/1976 Eastfield 20.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/02/1977 20.95
13212 D3212 08144 29/02/1956 DE Parkhead 12/12/1977 Ayr 21.83 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/10/1979 23.60
13213 D3213 08145 05/03/1956 DE Parkhead 12/12/1977 Dunfermline Townhill 21.75 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/08/1978 22.42
13214 D3214 08146 13/03/1956 DE Parkhead 01/12/1980 Doncaster 24.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1981 25.15
13215 D3215 08147 16/03/1956 DE St Rollox (Balornock) 17/07/1983 Gateshead 27.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 08/12/1984 28.75
13216 D3216 08148 23/03/1956 DE St Rollox (Balornock) 31/03/1984 Gateshead 28 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 22/09/1984 28.52
13217 D3217 08149 02/04/1955 DA Norwood Junction 05/04/1981 Darlington 26 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 18/02/1984 28.90
13218 D3218 08150 09/04/1955 DA Norwood Junction 14/10/1984 Thornaby 29.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/09/1986 31.42
13219 D3219 08151 16/04/1955 DA Norwood Junction 02/01/1979 Eastleigh 23.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Eastleigh) 01/04/1980 24.98
13220 D3220 08152 22/04/1955 DA Norwood Junction 18/07/1980 Selhurst 25.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/11/1980 25.55
13221 D3221 08153 22/04/1955 DA Norwood Junction 19/12/1982 Chester West 27.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1986 31.63
13222 D3222 08154 08/06/1955 DA Norwood Junction 13/10/1979 Selhurst 24.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1980 24.75
13223 D3223 08155 02/07/1955 DA Norwood Junction 02/01/1979 Ashford Chart Leacon 23.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1980 24.68
13224 D3224 08156 25/06/1955 DA Norwood Junction 02/01/1979 Ashford Chart Leacon 23.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/02/1980 24.62
13225 D3225 08157 02/07/1955 DA Norwood Junction 09/04/1977 Ashford Chart Leacon 21.75 Cut EMR (Attercliffe) 17/06/1996 40.99
13226 D3226 08158 02/07/1955 DA Norwood Junction 02/01/1979 Selhurst 23.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/10/1979 24.27
13227 D3227 08159 13/12/1955 DA Newport (Teeside) 24/11/1985 Gateshead 29.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/06/1986 30.49
13228 D3228 08160 15/12/1955 DA Middlesbrough 24/12/1985 Bletchley 30 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/09/1986 30.73
13229 D3229 08161 21/12/1955 DA Darlington 24/11/1985 Thornaby 29.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 31/03/1986 30.30
13230 D3230 08162 29/12/1955 DA Hull Dairycoates 20/07/1980 Healey Mills 24.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/01/1981 25.03
13231 D3231 08163 30/12/1955 DA Hull Dairycoates 19/12/1982 Healey Mills 27 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 25/02/1984 28.18
13232 D3232 08164 12/01/1956 DA Hull Dairycoates 23/03/1986 Gateshead 30.17 Prs Preserved 33.33
13233 D3233 08165 18/01/1956 DA Hull Dairycoates 27/07/1980 Hull Botanic Gardens 24.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1980 24.89
13234 D3234 08166 25/01/1956 DA Hull Dairycoates 04/07/1982 Hull Botanic Gardens 26.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 17/09/1983 27.66
13235 D3235 08167 02/02/1956 DA Hull Dairycoates 15/09/1977 Darlington 21.58 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/07/1979 23.42
13236 D3236 08168 07/02/1956 DA Hull Dairycoates 14/03/1988 York (North) 32.08 Prs Preserved 61.18
13237 D3237 08169 09/02/1956 DA York (North) 15/03/1981 York (North) 25.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/10/1981 25.66
13238 D3238 08170 15/02/1956 DA York (North) 23/03/1986 Gateshead 30.08 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 04/05/1989 33.24
13239 D3239 08171 17/02/1956 DA York (North) 24/04/1983 York (North) 27.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 10/09/1983 27.58
13240 D3240 08172 24/02/1956 DA York (North) 04/08/1985 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 29.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 09/11/1985 29.73
13241 D3241 08173 02/03/1956 DA York (North) 11/12/1978 Eastfield 22.75 Cut Vic Berry (at Thornton Yard) 31/03/1987 31.10
13242 D3242 08174 06/03/1956 DA York (North) 29/08/1981 Thornaby 25.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1982 26.00
13243 D3243 08175 09/03/1956 DA York (North) 11/12/1978 Grangemouth 22.75 Cut J R Adams (Glasgow) 31/12/1985 29.83
13244 D3244 08176 15/03/1956 DA York (North) 24/11/1985 Gateshead 29.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 31/05/1986 30.23
13245 D3245 08177 14/05/1956 DE Crewe South 30/10/1988 York (North) 32.42 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 01/08/1996 40.24
13246 D3246 08178 14/05/1956 DE Nottingham 01/05/1982 Derby 26 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 10/03/1984 27.84
13247 D3247 08179 14/05/1956 DE Nottingham 22/06/1975 Crewe Diesel 19.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/08/1976 20.23
13248 D3248 08180 18/05/1956 DE Derby 03/05/1981 Shirebrook 25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/08/1981 25.22
13249 D3249 08181 18/05/1956 DE Derby 04/07/1982 Derby 26.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 24/11/1984 28.54
13250 D3250 08182 25/05/1955 DE Derby 15/03/1981 Saltley 25.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1982 26.79
13251 D3251 08183 25/05/1955 DE Sheffield Grimesthorpe 31/03/1984 Lincoln 28.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 10/11/1984 29.48
13252 D3252 08184 01/06/1955 DE Sheffield Grimesthorpe 21/06/1981 Doncaster 26 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/04/1982 26.85
13253 D3253 08185 01/06/1955 DE Sheffield Grimesthorpe 14/02/1982 Thornaby 26.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/10/1982 27.35
13254 D3254 08186 01/06/1955 DE Sheffield Grimesthorpe 17/03/1985 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 29.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/09/1986 31.35
13255 D3255 08/06/1955 DE St Philips Marsh 30/12/1972 17.5 Prs Preserved 61.85
13256 D3256 08187 08/06/1955 DE St Philips Marsh 24/07/1983 Cardiff Canton 28.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/09/1986 31.33
13257 D3257 08188 13/06/1955 DE St Philips Marsh 24/04/1983 Cardiff Canton 27.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/09/1986 31.32
13258 D3258 08189 20/06/1956 DE Llanelly 06/12/1981 Gloucester Horton Road 25.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 17/03/1984 27.76
13259 D3259 08190 22/06/1956 DE Llanelly 12/10/1980 Cardiff Canton 24.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1980 24.46
13260 D3260 08191 29/06/1956 DE Llanelly 20/01/1988 Landore 31.58 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 06/11/1990 34.38
13261 D3261 05/07/1956 DE Llanelly 30/12/1972 16.42 Prs Preserved 60.78
13262 D3262 08192 12/07/1956 DE Llanelly 09/07/1982 Haymarket 26 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 10/02/1985 28.60
13263 D3263 08193 10/08/1956 DE Llanelly 10/07/1983 Cardiff Canton 26.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/05/1986 29.82
13264 D3264 08194 20/08/1956 DE Duffryn Yard 09/11/1980 Cardiff Canton 24.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 29/10/1983 27.21
13265 D3265 08195 23/08/1956 DE Duffryn Yard 25/09/1983 Cardiff Canton 27.08 Prs Preserved 60.64
13266 D3266 08196 24/08/1956 DE Duffryn Yard 01/11/1983 Grangemouth 27.25 Cut J R Adams (Glasgow) 31/12/1985 29.37
13267 D3267 08197 31/08/1956 DE Duffryn Yard 25/04/1982 York (North) 25.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 11/02/1984 27.47
13268 D3268 08198 07/09/1956 DE Reading (W.R.) 01/12/1980 Swindon 24.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/11/1981 25.17
13269 D3269 08199 14/09/1956 DE Reading (W.R.) 25/01/1983 Derby 26.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 14/07/1984 27.85
13270 D3270 08200 29/09/1956 DE Hither Green 13/04/1986 Thornaby 29.58 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 14/09/1992 35.98
13271 D3271 08201 29/09/1956 DE Hither Green 19/12/1982 Willesden 26.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 19/05/1984 27.65
13272 D3272 08202 06/10/1956 DE Hither Green 23/05/1989 Cardiff Canton 32.58 Prs Preserved 33.45
13273 D3273 08203 11/10/1956 DE Hither Green 01/07/1987 30.75 Cut Vic Berry (at Swansea Maliphant) 01/09/1989 32.91
13274 D3274 08204 17/10/1956 DE Hither Green 21/08/1983 Eastleigh 26.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 15/09/1984 27.93
13275 D3275 08205 22/10/1956 DE Eastfield 13/11/1983 Norwich Thorpe 27.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 22/08/1984 27.85
13276 D3276 08206 26/10/1956 DE Eastfield 19/02/1988 Holbeck (MR) 31.33 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 09/05/1989 32.56
13277 D3277 08207 26/10/1956 DE Parkhead 28/09/1980 Cambridge 23.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 21/05/1983 26.58
13278 D3278 08208 02/11/1956 DE St Rollox (Balornock) 07/10/1984 Tinsley 27.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 16/11/1985 29.06
13279 D3279 08209 02/11/1956 DE St Rollox (Balornock) 27/02/1983 Tinsley 26.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/08/1983 26.76
13280 D3280 08210 09/11/1956 DE St Rollox (Balornock) 26/09/1988 Tinsley 31.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 03/11/1989 33.01
13281 D3281 08211 10/11/1956 DE Grangemouth 03/03/1985 Thornaby 28.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 31/03/1986 29.41
13282 D3282 08212 16/11/1956 DE Motherwell 06/09/1981 Thornaby 24.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/02/1982 25.23
13283 D3283 08213 16/11/1956 DE Motherwell 02/11/1980 Allerton 24 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/08/1981 24.72
13284 D3284 08214 23/11/1956 DE Motherwell 19/02/1984 Gateshead 27.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 21/12/1985 29.10
13285 D3285 08215 23/11/1956 DE Motherwell 26/09/1982 Thornaby 25.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/05/1983 26.45
13286 D3286 08216 30/11/1956 DE Motherwell 02/11/1980 Derby 24 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Barrow Hill) 30/04/2001 44.44
13287 D3287 08217 30/11/1956 DE Motherwell 25/04/1982 Gateshead 25.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 14/05/1983 26.47
13288 D3288 08218 10/12/1956 DE Sheffield Grimesthorpe 20/07/1980 Bristol Bath Road 23.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/08/1981 24.66
13289 D3289 08219 10/12/1956 DE Sheffield Grimesthorpe 20/03/1983 Tinsley 26.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/08/1983 26.66
13290 D3290 08220 14/12/1956 DE Nottingham 30/03/1986 Crewe Diesel 29.25 Prs Preserved 33.88
13291 D3291 08221 21/12/1956 DE Sheffield Grimesthorpe 01/03/1981 Bletchley 24.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/11/1981 24.96
13292 D3292 08222 27/12/1956 DE Sheffield Grimesthorpe 23/12/1984 Bounds Green 28 Cut MRJ Philips (at Old Oak Common TMD) 29/08/1997 40.70
13293 D3293 08223 28/12/1956 DE Sheffield Grimesthorpe 24/06/1979 Tinsley 22.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/02/1980 23.11
13294 D3294 08224 28/12/1956 DE 27/07/1988 Doncaster 31.58 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 03/12/1993 36.96
13295 D3295 08225 14/01/1957 DE 06/10/1985 Thornaby 28.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 31/03/1986 29.23
13296 D3296 08226 17/01/1957 DE 24/11/1985 Doncaster 28.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 31/05/1986 29.39
13297 D3297 08227 04/02/1957 DE Stourton 01/11/1983 Dunfermline Townhill 26.75 Cut J R Adams (Glasgow) 31/12/1985 28.92
13298 D3298 08228 28/03/1956 DA Stratford 07/04/1985 Norwich Thorpe 29.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 28/02/1986 29.94
13299 D3299 08229 05/04/1956 DA Stratford 04/12/1977 Frodingham 21.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/12/1978 22.67
13300 D3300 08230 12/04/1956 DA Stratford 28/09/1980 March 24.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1983 27.07
13301 D3301 08231 13/04/1956 DA Stratford 21/06/1981 Thornaby 25.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/10/1981 25.48
13302 D3302 08232 20/04/1956 DA Stratford 26/09/1982 Thornaby 26.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/07/1983 27.21
13303 D3303 08233 25/05/1956 DA Stratford 10/05/1981 Stratford 25 Cut G Morris (at Stratford MPD) 01/03/1982 25.78
13304 D3304 08234 02/05/1956 DA Neasden 19/09/1982 Cricklewood East 26.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/01/1983 26.68
13305 D3305 08235 08/05/1956 DA Neasden 10/07/1983 Bletchley 27.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 08/09/1984 28.36
13306 D3306 08236 11/05/1956 DA Neasden 07/09/1975 Willesden 19.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/09/1976 20.32
13307 D3307 08237 16/05/1956 DA Kings Cross 07/10/1984 Bounds Green 28.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/10/1986 30.40
13308 D3308 08238 20/05/1956 DA Kings Cross 18/03/1984 Gloucester Horton Road 27.83 Prs Preserved 60.90
13309 D3309 08239 30/06/1956 DA Kings Cross 08/07/1984 Neville Hill 28.08 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 01/03/1996 39.70
13310 D3310 08240 06/06/1956 DA Kings Cross 04/07/1982 Cambridge 26.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 10/02/1985 28.70
13311 D3311 08241 12/06/1956 DA Kings Cross 25/10/1981 Stratford 25.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1982 25.90
13312 D3312 08242 15/06/1956 DA Kings Cross 14/12/1986 Lincoln 30.5 Cut Vic Berry (at Lincoln MPD) 01/04/1990 33.82
13313 D3313 08243 25/06/1956 DA York (North) 18/02/1986 Willesden 29.67 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 01/01/1988 31.54
13314 D3314 08244 03/07/1956 DA York (North) 04/05/1986 Tinsley 29.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 19/11/1989 33.40
13315 D3315 08245 05/07/1956 DA York (North) 20/05/1984 Neville Hill 27.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 31/03/1986 29.76
13316 D3316 08246 20/09/1956 DA Percy Main 08/08/1982 Grangemouth 25.92 Cut D Christie (Camlackie) 01/04/1987 30.55
13317 D3317 08247 27/10/1956 DA Percy Main 15/03/1981 Doncaster 24.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/11/1981 25.03
13318 D3318 08248 09/10/1956 DA York (North) 23/09/1984 Hull Botanic Gardens 27.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 13/07/1985 28.78
13319 D3319 08249 11/10/1956 DA York (North) 19/05/1985 Lincoln 28.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/03/1987 30.49
13320 D3320 08250 16/10/1956 DA York (North) 30/11/1988 Norwich Thorpe 32.08 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 07/08/1991 34.83
13321 D3321 08251 23/10/1956 DA Percy Main 14/09/1980 Thornaby 23.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/01/1981 24.21
13322 D3322 08252 08/11/1956 DA Percy Main 02/08/1981 York (North) 24.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/04/1982 25.41
13323 D3323 08253 13/11/1956 DA Hull Dairycoates 25/02/1987 York (North) 30.25 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/07/1988 31.73
13324 D3324 08254 19/11/1956 DA Percy Main 02/11/1986 Gateshead 30 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 13/05/1994 37.50
13325 D3325 08255 23/11/1956 DA Kings Cross 07/10/1984 Gateshead 27.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 31/03/1986 29.37
13326 D3326 08256 28/11/1956 DA New England 19/02/1984 Colchester 27.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 05/01/1985 28.12
13327 D3327 08257 03/12/1956 DA March 20/10/1985 Norwich Thorpe 28.83 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/03/1989 32.26
13328 D3328 08258 06/12/1956 DA Mexborough 30/11/1988 Cambridge 31.92 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/09/1989 32.76
13329 D3329 08259 14/12/1956 DA Mexborough 01/07/1987 30.58 Cut Vic Berry (at Swansea Maliphant) 01/10/1989 32.82
13330 D3330 08260 21/12/1956 DA Mexborough 21/08/1983 Shirebrook 26.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 22/10/1983 26.85
13331 D3331 08261 28/11/1956 DA Sheffield Darnall 04/12/1983 Colchester 27.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 29/12/1984 28.10
13332 D3332 08262 04/01/1957 DA Sheffield Darnall 29/01/1984 Old Oak Common 27 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 24/11/1984 27.91
13333 D3333 08263 16/01/1957 DA Sheffield Darnall 31/03/1984 Gateshead 27.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 18/08/1984 27.61
13334 D3334 08264 21/01/1957 DA Sheffield Darnall 08/07/1984 Healey Mills 27.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 24/11/1984 27.86
13335 D3335 08265 30/01/1957 DA Sheffield Darnall 31/12/1981 Springs Branch (Wigan) 24.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/04/1987 30.27
13336 D3336 08266 20/02/1957 DA Sheffield Darnall 17/03/1985 Shirebrook 28.08 Prs Preserved 28.88
13337 D3337 08267 20/03/1957 DE Thornton Junction 17/12/1977 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 20.75 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/08/1985 28.39
13338 D3338 08268 23/03/1957 DE Thornton Junction 14/07/1985 Gateshead 28.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 31/08/1986 29.46
13339 D3339 08269 29/03/1957 DE Thornton Junction 08/07/1984 Healey Mills 27.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/06/1985 28.19
13340 D3340 08270 30/03/1957 DE Thornton Junction 19/12/1982 Allerton 25.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 07/01/1984 26.79
13341 D3341 08271 05/04/1957 DE Thornton Junction 22/09/1981 Dunfermline Townhill 24.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/04/1983 26.01
13342 D3342 08272 12/04/1957 DE Dunfermline Upper 06/07/1987 Tinsley 30.25 Cut RFS Engineering Ltd (Doncaster Works) 31/01/1991 33.83
13343 D3343 08273 12/04/1957 DE Dunfermline Upper 19/12/1982 Allerton 25.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 24/03/1984 26.97
13344 D3344 08274 18/04/1957 DE Dunfermline Upper 23/12/1984 Gateshead 27.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 20/07/1985 28.27
13345 D3345 08275 26/04/1957 DE Dunfermline Upper 22/02/1983 Toton 25.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 14/07/1984 27.24
13346 D3346 08276 26/04/1957 DE Dunfermline Upper 21/06/1977 Dundee West 20.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/11/1977 20.53
13347 D3347 08277 03/05/1957 DE Dundee Tay Bridge 22/11/1981 Lincoln 24.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 30/07/1983 26.26
13348 D3348 08278 03/05/1957 DE Motherwell 21/06/1977 Hamilton (West) 20.08 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/12/1977 20.59
13349 D3349 08279 10/05/1957 DE Motherwell 12/04/1981 Dunfermline Townhill 23.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/04/1983 25.91
13350 D3350 08280 10/05/1957 DE Motherwell 27/10/1980 Motherwell 23.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/02/1982 24.75
13351 D3351 08281 17/05/1957 DE Motherwell 01/12/1980 Newton Abbot 23.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 26/01/1985 27.72
13352 D3352 08282 07/06/1957 DE Llanelly 02/11/1980 Allerton 23.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/08/1981 24.17
13353 D3353 08283 11/06/1957 DE Llanelly 24/02/1986 Longsight 28.67 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 16/11/1987 30.45
13354 D3354 08284 14/06/1957 DE Llanelly 01/05/1985 Springs Branch (Wigan) 27.92 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 31/12/1987 30.57
13355 D3355 08285 19/06/1957 DE Llanelly 12/09/1988 Doncaster 31.25 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 12/11/1993 36.42
13356 D3356 08286 21/06/1957 DE Llanelly 25/04/1982 Motherwell 24.83 Cut H Ralston (at Polmadie MPD) 31/01/1986 28.63
13357 D3357 08287 27/06/1957 DE Llanelly 27/02/1983 Tinsley 25.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 03/09/1983 26.20
D3358 08288 28/06/1957 DE Llanelly 21/01/1983 Swindon 25.58 Prs Preserved 59.79
D3359 08289 28/06/1957 DE Llanelly 22/12/1985 Derby 28.5 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 01/11/1987 30.36
D3360 08290 05/07/1957 DE Llanelly 25/04/1982 Allerton 24.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 10/03/1984 26.70
D3361 08291 05/07/1957 DE Llanelly 04/01/1983 Allerton 25.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 24/12/1983 26.49
13362 D3362 08292 17/05/1957 DE Swindon 01/05/1984 Eastfield 27 Cut Deanside Transit Ltd (Glasgow) 01/11/1994 37.48
13363 D3363 08293 24/05/1957 DE Cardiff East Dock 24/12/1985 Springs Branch (Wigan) 28.58 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 31/10/1987 30.46
13364 D3364 08294 24/05/1957 DE Cardiff East Dock 02/11/1980 Bescot 23.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1981 24.54
13365 D3365 08295 31/05/1957 DE Cardiff East Dock 23/05/1988 Thornaby 31 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 03/12/1993 36.53
13366 D3366 08296 31/05/1957 DE Cardiff East Dock 30/10/1988 York (North) 31.42 Prs Preserved 59.87
D3367 08297 11/07/1957 DE Springs Branch (Wigan) 16/08/1988 Doncaster 31.08 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 27/02/1990 32.65
D3368 08298 11/07/1957 DE Springs Branch (Wigan) 08/03/1981 Longsight 23.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/07/1981 23.99
D3369 08299 26/07/1957 DE Springs Branch (Wigan) 19/07/1981 Springs Branch (Wigan) 24 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/10/1982 25.20
D3370 08300 02/08/1957 DE Springs Branch (Wigan) 17/07/1983 Allerton 25.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 07/04/1984 26.70
D3371 08301 07/08/1957 DE Springs Branch (Wigan) 31/12/1981 Springs Branch (Wigan) 24.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 22/06/1985 27.89
D3372 08302 10/08/1957 DE Newton Heath 29/06/1981 Springs Branch (Wigan) 23.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/02/1982 24.50
D3373 08303 15/08/1957 DE Newton Heath 31/12/1981 Derby 24.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/03/1987 29.64
D3374 08304 16/08/1957 DE Newton Heath 19/05/1985 Lincoln 27.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1986 29.31
D3375 08305 22/08/1957 DE Royston 30/10/1988 Holbeck (MR) 31.17 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 16/02/1995 37.51
D3376 08306 23/08/1957 DE Royston 21/12/1977 Healey Mills 20.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/10/1978 21.12
D3377 08307 30/08/1957 DE Royston 21/12/1977 Healey Mills 20.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/06/1978 20.77
D3378 08308 30/08/1957 DE Royston 21/02/1992 Hull Botanic Gardens 34.5 59.62
D3379 08309 05/09/1957 DE Royston 17/07/1992 Knottingley 34.83 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 03/03/1995 37.52
D3380 08310 06/09/1957 DE Royston 04/09/1977 Thornaby 20 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/10/1978 21.08
D3381 08311 12/09/1957 DE Normanton 19/12/1982 Healey Mills 25.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 18/02/1984 26.45
D3382 08312 13/09/1957 DE Motherwell 09/05/1983 Motherwell 25.67 Cut J R Adams (Glasgow) 31/12/1985 28.32
D3383 08313 27/09/1957 DE Motherwell 23/05/1982 Gateshead 24.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 14/05/1983 25.64
D3384 08314 20/09/1957 DE Motherwell 22/02/1981 Motherwell 23.42 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/09/1981 23.96
D3385 08315 27/09/1957 DE Motherwell 12/02/1979 March 21.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/01/1980 22.28
D3386 08316 27/09/1957 DE Eastfield 09/03/1976 Hamilton (West) 18.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/02/1977 19.36
D3387 08317 27/09/1957 DE Eastfield 31/10/1982 Hull Botanic Gardens 25.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 08/10/1983 26.05
D3388 08318 04/10/1957 DE Eastfield 03/10/1976 Hamilton (West) 19 Cut Locomotive Works (Eastleigh) 01/12/1977 20.17
D3389 08319 11/10/1957 DE Eastfield 25/04/1983 Motherwell 25.5 Cut J R Adams (Glasgow) 31/12/1985 28.24
D3390 08320 16/10/1957 DE Eastfield 19/12/1982 Toton 25.17 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 59.49
D3391 08321 18/10/1957 DE Eastfield 01/06/1984 Motherwell 26.67 Cut J R Adams (Glasgow) 31/12/1985 28.22
D3392 08322 18/10/1957 DE Eastfield 18/09/1983 Cardiff Canton 25.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/09/1986 28.97
D3393 08323 25/10/1957 DE Eastfield 11/07/1981 Selhurst 23.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/02/1982 24.29
D3394 08324 29/10/1957 DE Eastfield 23/12/1984 March 27.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 30/11/1985 28.11
D3395 08325 01/11/1957 DE Eastfield 08/07/1984 Gateshead 26.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 02/11/1985 28.02
D3396 08326 08/11/1957 DE Eastfield 01/11/1983 Motherwell 26 Cut J R Adams (Glasgow) 31/12/1985 28.16
D3397 08327 08/11/1957 DE Cardiff East Dock 28/02/1983 Bescot 25.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 28/02/1987 29.33
D3398 08328 15/11/1957 DE Cardiff East Dock 31/12/1981 Allerton 24.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/01/1987 29.15
D3399 08329 15/11/1957 DE Cardiff East Dock 24/06/1984 Leicester Midland 26.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/03/1986 28.39
D3400 08330 23/11/1957 DE Cardiff East Dock 02/12/1984 Healey Mills 27.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 21/09/1985 27.85
D3401 08331 23/11/1957 DE Cardiff East Dock 14/03/1988 30.33 31.47
D3402 08332 29/11/1957 DE Cardiff East Dock 16/09/1984 Healey Mills 26.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 11/05/1985 27.47
D3403 08333 29/11/1957 DE Cardiff East Dock 19/12/1982 Derby 25.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1986 28.44
D3404 08334 06/12/1957 DE Cardiff East Dock 03/09/1987 Thornaby 29.75 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 16/09/1994 36.80
D3405 08335 13/12/1957 DE Cardiff East Dock 16/01/1987 Tinsley 29.08 Cut Thomas Hill Ltd (Kilnhurst) 31/07/1989 31.65
D3406 08336 19/12/1957 DE Cardiff East Dock 05/04/1981 York (North) 23.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1982 24.21
D3407 08337 27/12/1957 DE Cardiff East Dock 06/02/1987 Doncaster 29.17 Cut RFS Engineering Ltd (Doncaster Works) 04/05/1989 31.37
D3408 08338 01/01/1958 DE Kipps 15/07/1985 Margam 27.5 Cut Vic Berry (at Swansea Maliphant) 06/11/1990 32.87
D3409 08339 08/01/1958 DE Kipps 07/10/1984 26.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 20/04/1985 27.30
D3410 08340 16/01/1958 DE Parkhead 16/08/1981 Springs Branch (Wigan) 23.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1982 24.14
D3411 08341 22/01/1958 DE Parkhead 01/11/1983 Dunfermline Townhill 25.83 Cut J R Adams (Glasgow) 31/12/1985 27.96
D3412 08342 24/01/1958 DE Yoker 04/07/1982 Springs Branch (Wigan) 24.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 05/11/1983 25.80
D3413 08343 31/01/1958 DE Yoker 01/11/1983 Eastfield 25.83 Cut H Ralston (at Eastfield MPD) 31/01/1986 28.02
D3414 08344 07/02/1958 DE Yoker 01/05/1984 Ayr 26.25 Cut J R Adams (Glasgow) 31/12/1985 27.92
D3415 08345 14/02/1958 DE Yoker 01/11/1983 Ayr 25.75 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 30/06/1985 27.39
D3416 08346 21/02/1958 DE St Rollox (Balornock) 01/03/1984 Dunfermline Townhill 26.08 Cut J R Adams (Glasgow) 31/12/1985 27.88
D3417 08347 28/02/1958 DE St Rollox (Balornock) 01/11/1983 Grangemouth 25.75 Cut J R Adams (Glasgow) 31/12/1985 27.86
D3418 08348 12/03/1958 DE St Rollox (Balornock) 09/07/1982 Eastfield 24.33 Cut H Ralston (at Eastfield MPD) 31/01/1986 27.91
D3419 08349 16/11/1957 CW Cardiff East Dock 31/07/1983 Cardiff Canton 25.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/06/1986 28.56
D3420 08350 07/12/1957 CW Cardiff East Dock 17/01/1984 Cardiff Canton 26.08 Prs Preserved 59.35
D3421 08351 20/12/1957 CW Cardiff East Dock 17/01/1984 Cardiff Canton 26.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/04/1986 28.30
D3422 08352 31/12/1957 CW Cardiff East Dock 10/07/1983 Cardiff Canton 25.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/09/1986 28.77
D3423 08353 18/01/1958 CW Cardiff East Dock 05/07/1981 Cardiff Canton 23.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1982 24.13
D3424 08354 05/02/1958 CW Cardiff East Dock 10/07/1986 Cardiff Canton 28.42 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 17/04/1991 33.22
D3425 08355 20/02/1958 CW Cardiff East Dock 09/05/1983 Springs Branch (Wigan) 25.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 10/03/1984 26.07
D3426 08356 26/03/1958 CW Cardiff East Dock 01/11/1982 Springs Branch (Wigan) 24.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 24/12/1983 25.76
D3427 08357 10/03/1958 CW Cardiff East Dock 04/09/1977 Immingham 19.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/04/1979 21.07
D3428 08358 21/03/1958 CW Cardiff East Dock 06/10/1977 Immingham 19.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/11/1977 19.63
D3429 08359 28/03/1958 CW St Philips Marsh 22/01/1984 Cardiff Canton 25.83 Prs Preserved 59.05
D3430 08360 08/04/1958 CW St Philips Marsh 24/01/1983 Margam 24.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/03/1987 29.00
D3431 08361 17/04/1958 CW Oxley 23/02/1988 Ashford Chart Leacon 29.83 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 22/04/1991 33.04
D3432 08362 22/04/1958 CW Duffryn Yard 28/03/1982 Margam 23.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/04/1983 24.96
D3433 08363 30/04/1958 CW Duffryn Yard 01/08/1982 Reading (W.R.) 24.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1983 24.85
D3434 08364 08/05/1958 CW Duffryn Yard 21/01/1983 Cardiff Canton 24.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 29/10/1983 25.49
D3435 08365 24/05/1958 CW Duffryn Yard 07/09/1980 Margam 22.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/04/1981 22.95
D3436 08366 24/05/1958 CW Duffryn Yard 08/12/1980 Margam 22.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1982 23.79
D3437 08367 16/06/1958 CW Duffryn Yard 12/09/1988 Doncaster 30.25 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 29/03/1994 35.81
D3438 08368 18/06/1958 CW Duffryn Yard 08/12/1980 Margam 22.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 06/10/1984 26.32
D3454 08369 27/05/1957 DA Bradford Hammerton Street 31/03/1985 27.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 15/06/1985 28.07
D3455 08370 23/05/1957 DA Bradford Hammerton Street 04/03/1984 Gateshead 26.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 31/01/1986 28.71
D3456 08371 31/05/1957 DA Bradford Hammerton Street 16/10/1983 Healey Mills 26.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 18/05/1985 27.98
D3457 08372 06/06/1957 DA Stourton 02/12/1984 Healey Mills 27.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 04/05/1985 27.93
D3458 08373 12/06/1957 DA Royston 26/05/1985 Gateshead 27.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 31/03/1986 28.82
D3459 08374 17/06/1957 DA Hither Green 06/12/1982 Bletchley 25.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/09/1984 27.23
D3460 08375 21/06/1957 DA Hither Green 08/11/1991 Cardiff Canton 34.42 59.81
D3461 08376 24/06/1957 DA Hither Green 17/07/1983 Springs Branch (Wigan) 26.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 14/04/1984 26.82
D3462 08377 27/06/1957 DA Hither Green 26/06/1983 Laira 26 Prs Preserved 59.80
D3463 08378 01/07/1957 DA Hither Green 11/07/1981 Selhurst 24 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1982 24.68
D3464 08379 05/07/1957 DA Hither Green 27/12/1980 Selhurst 23.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1981 23.67
D3465 08380 09/07/1957 DA Hither Green 01/08/1982 Eastfield 25.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 21/05/1983 25.88
D3466 08381 10/07/1957 DA Hither Green 19/12/1982 Willesden 25.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 28/07/1984 27.07
D3467 08382 07/08/1957 DA Hither Green 08/03/1985 Leicester Midland 27.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/08/1986 29.00
D3468 08383 12/08/1957 DA Hither Green 17/03/1985 Thornaby 27.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/10/1986 29.16
D3469 08384 19/08/1957 DA Ashford 19/01/1986 Gateshead 28.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 31/03/1986 28.63
D3470 08385 26/08/1957 DA Ashford 12/09/1988 Doncaster 31.08 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 12/11/1993 36.24
D3471 08386 28/08/1957 DA Hither Green 06/01/1987 Lincoln 29.42 Cut Vic Berry (at Lincoln MPD) 01/04/1990 32.61
D3472 08387 30/08/1957 DA Hither Green 28/05/1982 Selhurst 24.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/03/1986 28.60
D3503 08388 14/04/1958 DE St Philips Marsh 20/07/2001 43.25 Prs Preserved 59.00
D3504 08389 17/04/1958 DE St Philips Marsh 58.99
D3505 08390 18/04/1958 DE St Philips Marsh 19/03/1993 Cardiff Canton 34.92 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Barrow Hill) 01/03/2004 45.90
D3506 08391 18/04/1958 DE St Philips Marsh 04/08/1985 Hull Botanic Gardens 27.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 31/03/1986 27.97
D3507 08392 25/04/1958 DE St Philips Marsh 01/12/1984 Hull Botanic Gardens 26.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 07/09/1985 27.39
D3508 08393 25/04/1958 DE St Philips Marsh 58.97
D3509 08394 02/05/1958 DE Laira 20/11/1987 Landore 29.5 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 06/11/1990 32.54
D3510 08395 02/05/1958 DE Laira 27/07/1988 Doncaster 30.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 30/04/1989 31.02
D3511 08396 09/05/1958 DE Laira 13/03/1986 Springs Branch (Wigan) 27.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 30/11/1987 29.58
D3512 08397 09/05/1958 DE Laira Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 58.93
D3513 08398 16/05/1958 DE Laira 15/07/1985 Bristol Bath Road 27.17 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 30/11/1985 27.56
D3514 08399 16/05/1958 DE Laira 13/11/1992 Crewe Diesel 34.5 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 30/04/1993 34.98
D3515 08400 23/05/1958 DE Laira 21/12/1987 Landore 29.58 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 06/11/1990 32.48
D3516 08401 23/05/1958 DE Laira Prs Preserved 58.89
D3517 08402 23/05/1958 DE Laira 30/09/2008 50.33 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 58.89
D3518 08403 30/05/1958 DE Laira 18/10/1981 Bletchley 23.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/04/1986 27.94
D3519 08404 30/05/1958 DE Newton Abbot 27/07/1978 Frodingham 20.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 31/01/1979 20.69
D3520 08405 06/06/1958 DE Newton Abbot 58.85
D3521 08406 06/06/1958 DE Newton Abbot 20/04/1988 Cambridge 29.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/10/1992 34.35
D3522 08407 06/06/1958 DE Newton Abbot 01/02/1993 Stratford 34.67 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 03/12/1993 35.52
D3523 08408 13/06/1958 DE Newton Abbot 29/04/1988 Stratford 29.83 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 06/10/1991 33.34
D3524 08409 13/06/1958 DE Newton Abbot 15/06/1986 Stratford 28 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/10/1986 28.32
D3525 08410 20/06/1958 DE Newton Abbot 58.82
D3526 08411 20/06/1958 DE Truro 28/02/2007 48.67 58.82
D3527 08412 20/06/1958 DE Truro 24/11/1985 March 27.42 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 30/10/1992 34.39
D3528 08413 27/06/1958 DE Motherwell 30/06/2004 46 Cut Morley Waste Traders (Leeds) 30/04/2007 48.87
D3529 08414 27/06/1958 DE Hamilton (West) 28/02/2007 48.67 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 31/08/2007 49.21
D3530 08415 04/07/1958 DE Yoker 30/09/1996 38.17 Cut EMR (Sheffield) 31/10/1995 37.35
D3531 08416 04/07/1958 DE Yoker 14/02/1992 Toton 33.58 Cut C F Booth (at RFS Kilnhurst) 31/08/1993 35.18
D3532 08417 04/07/1958 DE Beattock 58.78
D3533 08418 10/07/1958 DE Balloch Prs Preserved 58.76
D3534 08419 11/07/1958 DE Balloch 23/04/1993 34.75 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 27/11/2004 46.41
D3535 08420 11/07/1958 DE Stirling 12/09/1988 Doncaster 30.17 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 03/03/1995 36.67
D3536 08421 08/08/1958 DE Stirling 58.68
D3537 08422 08/08/1958 DE Stirling 09/12/1985 Bletchley 27.33 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 01/07/1988 29.92
D3538 08423 15/08/1958 DE Stirling 24/11/1988 Springs Branch (Wigan) 30.25 Prs Preserved 58.66
D3539 08424 15/08/1958 DE Stirling 10/06/1985 Thornton Junction 26.83 Cut J R Adams (Glasgow) 31/12/1985 27.40
D3540 08425 22/08/1958 DE Stirling 09/09/1985 Thornton Junction 27.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/07/1986 27.96
D3541 08426 22/08/1958 DE Perth South 02/07/1976 Dundee West 17.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 31/05/1977 18.79
D3542 08427 29/08/1958 DE Perth South 14/11/1986 March 28.25 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 25/03/1994 35.59
D3543 08428 29/08/1958 DE Perth South 58.62
D3544 08429 05/09/1958 DE Perth South 01/10/1983 Shirebrook 25.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 29/10/1983 25.16
D3545 08430 05/09/1958 DE Perth South 18/12/1985 Eastfield 27.25 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 05/1986 27.71
D3546 08431 12/09/1958 DE Aberdeen Ferryhill 04/07/1985 Allerton 26.83 Cut Texas Metals (at Allerton MPD) 01/09/1987 28.99
D3547 08432 19/09/1958 DE Aberdeen Ferryhill 16/10/1983 Bradford Hammerton Street 25.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 28/01/1984 25.38
D3548 08433 26/09/1958 DE Aberdeen Ferryhill 17/03/1986 Thornton Junction 27.5 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 05/1986 27.65
D3549 08434 26/09/1958 DE Aberdeen Ferryhill 10/02/1992 Derby 33.42 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 30/03/1994 35.53
D3550 08435 03/10/1958 DE Aberdeen Ferryhill 30/11/1980 Hull Botanic Gardens 22.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 21/05/1983 24.65
D3551 08436 03/10/1958 DE Aberdeen Ferryhill 10/01/1992 Doncaster 33.25 Prs Preserved 58.53
D3552 08437 10/10/1958 DE Kittybrewster 01/12/1984 Motherwell 26.17 Cut J R Adams (Glasgow) 31/12/1985 27.24
D3553 08438 17/10/1958 DE Kittybrewster 23/03/1986 March 27.42 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 30/10/1992 34.06
D3554 08439 24/10/1958 DE Bathgate 17/10/1988 Immingham 30 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 30/09/1994 35.96
D3555 08440 24/10/1958 DE Bathgate 03/05/1990 Stratford 31.58 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 28/06/1991 32.70
D3556 08441 30/10/1958 DE Bathgate 58.45
D3557 08442 03/11/1958 DE Bathgate Prs Preserved 58.44
D3558 08443 07/11/1958 DE Polmont 07/07/1985 Thornton Junction 26.67 Prs Preserved 58.43
D3559 08444 07/11/1958 DE Polmont 02/11/1986 Cardiff Canton 28 Prs Preserved 58.43
D3560 08445 14/11/1958 DE Haymarket 20/07/2001 42.67 Prs Preserved 58.41
D3561 08446 21/11/1958 DE Haymarket 02/12/1985 Thornton Junction 27.08 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 05/1986 27.50
D3562 08447 28/11/1958 DE Parkhead 11/11/1994 36 Prs Preserved 36.05
D3563 08448 28/11/1958 DE Ayr Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 28/02/2007 48.28
D3564 08449 28/11/1958 DE Ayr 31/01/2003 44.17 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 31/01/2007 48.21
D3565 08450 05/12/1958 DE Carlisle Kingmoor 02/05/1986 Crewe Diesel 27.42 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 01/01/1988 29.09
D3566 08451 05/12/1958 DE Carlisle Kingmoor 58.36
D3567 08452 12/12/1958 DE Carlisle Kingmoor 10/06/1985 Thornton Junction 26.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/04/1987 28.40
D3568 08453 12/12/1958 DE Burton 05/10/1980 York (North) 21.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/08/1982 23.65
D3569 08454 19/12/1958 DE Burton 58.32
D3570 08455 24/12/1958 DE Burton 01/09/1985 Swindon Works 26.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/03/1987 28.28
D3571 08456 03/01/1959 DE Burton 29/04/1988 Doncaster 29.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 30/06/1989 30.51
D3572 08457 03/01/1959 DE Burton 01/09/1985 Swindon Works 26.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/05/1986 27.42
D3573 08458 12/07/1958 CW Neasden 16/08/1988 Stratford 30.08 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 16/08/1991 33.12
D3574 08459 01/08/1958 CW Toton 30/10/1988 Doncaster 30.17 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/09/1989 31.11
D3575 08460 13/08/1958 CW Toton 58.67
D3576 08461 20/08/1958 CW Edge Hill 23/02/1988 Stratford 29.5 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 09/08/1991 32.99
D3577 08462 28/08/1958 CW Crewe South 58.63
D3578 08463 22/09/1958 CW Edge Hill 16/03/1989 Derby 30.5 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 12/05/1992 33.66
D3579 08464 25/09/1958 CW Preston 01/09/1985 Swindon Works 27 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/03/1987 28.53
D3580 08465 01/10/1958 CW Preston 09/08/1985 Derby 26.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 31/08/1986 27.93
D3581 08466 07/10/1958 CW Preston Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 58.52
D3582 08467 16/10/1958 CW Saltley 29/11/1981 Saltley 23.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/01/1983 24.23
D3583 08468 03/11/1958 CW Saltley 23/11/1988 Springs Branch (Wigan) 30 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 01/06/1995 36.60
D3584 08469 07/11/1958 CW Saltley 01/09/1985 Swindon Works 26.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/07/1986 27.75
D3585 08470 07/11/1958 CW Burton 23/03/1986 Crewe Diesel 27.33 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 01/08/1996 37.76
D3586 08471 13/11/1958 CW Burton 09/09/1985 Leicester Midland 26.83 Prs Preserved 58.42
D3587 08472 20/11/1958 CW Burton 58.40
D3588 08473 28/11/1958 CW Newton Heath 17/03/1986 Crewe Diesel 27.33 Prs Preserved 35.04
D3589 08474 02/12/1958 CW Newton Heath 07/09/1986 Leicester Midland 27.75 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/07/1988 29.68
D3590 08475 10/12/1958 CW Newton Heath 09/03/1987 Springs Branch (Wigan) 28.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 30/11/1987 28.99
D3591 08476 17/12/1958 CW Newton Heath 09/09/1985 Thornton Junction 26.75 Prs Preserved 58.32
D3592 08477 03/01/1959 CW Newton Heath 07/12/1986 Springs Branch (Wigan) 27.92 Cut Vic Berry (at Allerton MPD) 01/03/1990 31.18
D3593 08478 20/08/1958 HO St Blazey 27/04/1988 Immingham 29.67 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 18/11/1994 36.27
D3594 08479 01/09/1958 HO St Blazey 08/11/1991 Cardiff Canton 33.17 Prs Preserved 58.62
D3595 08480 12/09/1958 HO St Blazey 58.59
D3596 08481 19/09/1958 HO Penzance 31/08/2005 46.92 Prs Preserved 58.57
D3597 08482 26/09/1958 HO Penzance Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 58.55
D3598 08483 03/10/1958 HO Exeter 58.53
D3599 08484 10/10/1958 HO Old Oak Common 58.51
D3600 08485 20/10/1958 HO Old Oak Common Prs Preserved 58.48
D3601 08486 24/10/1958 HO Old Oak Common 27/11/1986 Cardiff Canton 28.08 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 18/04/1991 32.50
D3602 08487 29/10/1958 HO Old Oak Common 23/02/1988 Stratford 29.33 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 25/06/1991 32.68
D3603 08488 31/10/1958 HO Old Oak Common 16/02/1986 Cardiff Canton 27.33 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 21/04/1991 32.49
D3604 08489 07/11/1958 HO Old Oak Common 30/09/2008 49.83 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/05/2009 50.52
D3605 08490 14/11/1958 HO Old Oak Common 18/12/1985 Thornton Junction 27.08 Prs Preserved 58.41
D3606 08491 19/11/1958 HO Old Oak Common 29/09/1985 Cardiff Canton 26.83 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 10/04/1991 32.41
D3607 08492 26/11/1958 HO Old Oak Common 58.38
D3608 08493 28/02/1958 DO Stratford 30/06/2008 50.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 31/08/2008 50.54
D3609 08494 01/03/1958 DO Stratford 16/08/1988 Stratford 30.42 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 28/08/1991 33.52
D3610 08495 08/03/1958 DO Stratford 59.10
D3611 08496 12/03/1958 DO Cambridge 14/06/1990 Cambridge 32.25 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 01/11/1994 36.67
D3652 08497 19/03/1958 DO Stourton 06/10/1985 Neville Hill 27.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 28/02/1986 27.97
D3653 08498 22/03/1958 DO Stourton 07/01/1994 Stratford 35.83 Cut Birds (at Stratford MPD) 31/03/1994 36.05
D3654 08499 29/03/1958 DO Stourton 01/06/2004 46.25 Prs Preserved 59.04
D3655 08500 18/04/1958 DO Stourton 58.99
D3656 08501 29/04/1958 DO Stourton 15/07/1985 Cardiff Canton 27.25 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 11/08/1991 33.31
D3657 08502 06/05/1958 DO Stourton 30/10/1988 Thornaby 30.42 58.94
D3658 08503 15/05/1958 DO Stourton 20/09/1988 Holbeck (MR) 30.33 58.92
D3659 08504 24/05/1958 DO Sheffield Darnall 30/10/1988 Thornaby 30.42 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 23/09/1992 34.36
D3660 08505 31/05/1958 DO Sheffield Darnall 22/02/1981 Grangemouth 22.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 26/03/1983 24.84
D3661 08506 06/06/1958 DO Sheffield Darnall 28/02/2007 48.67 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 31/07/2007 49.18
D3662 08507 20/06/1958 DO Sheffield Darnall 13/08/1993 Reading (W.R.) 35.17 58.82
D3663 08508 20/06/1958 DO Sheffield Darnall 01/10/1991 Immingham 33.33 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 31/01/1994 35.64
D3664 08509 11/07/1958 DO Sheffield Darnall 30/09/2008 50.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/04/2009 50.76
D3672 08510 20/05/1958 DA Darlington 30/09/2008 50.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/07/2009 51.15
D3673 08511 21/05/1958 DA Percy Main 58.90
D3674 08512 28/05/1958 DA Percy Main Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 58.88
D3675 08513 05/06/1958 DA Hull Springhead 22/03/1978 Hull Botanic Gardens 19.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 31/10/1978 20.42
D3676 08514 12/06/1958 DA Hull Springhead 58.84
D3677 08515 18/06/1958 DA Darlington 20/01/1992 33.58 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (at Gateshead MPD) 13/02/2001 42.69
D3678 08516 11/08/1958 DA Percy Main Prs Preserved 58.67
D3679 08517 15/08/1958 DA Percy Main 20/07/2001 42.92 58.66
D3680 08518 19/07/1958 DO Stratford 22/06/1986 Stratford 27.92 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 25/03/1994 35.71
D3681 08519 31/07/1958 DO Stratford Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/09/2000 42.12
D3682 08520 13/08/1958 DO Stratford 12/01/1986 Stratford 27.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 28/02/1986 27.56
D3683 08521 27/08/1958 DO Stratford 22/06/1993 Allerton 34.83 Cut Coopers Metals (at Allerton MPD) 31/03/1994 35.62
D3684 08522 02/09/1958 DO Stratford 04/08/1985 Cambridge 26.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 26/10/1985 27.17
D3685 08523 06/09/1958 DO Sheffield Darnall 58.60
D3686 08524 18/09/1958 DO Sheffield Darnall 06/01/1986 Longsight 27.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 31/12/1987 29.30
D3687 08525 24/02/1959 DA Hornsey 58.13
D3688 08526 27/02/1959 DA Hornsey 28/02/2007 48 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/03/2008 49.04
D3689 08527 04/03/1959 DA Kings Cross 58.11
D3690 08528 09/03/1959 DA Hornsey Prs Preserved 58.10
D3691 08529 12/03/1959 DA Hornsey 30/06/2005 46.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 31/08/2008 49.51
D3692 08530 19/03/1959 DA Hornsey 58.07
D3693 08531 01/04/1959 DA Hornsey 58.04
D3694 08532 09/04/1959 DA Sheffield Darnall 23/04/1993 Allerton 34 Cut Coopers Metals (at Allerton MPD) 31/03/1994 35.00
D3695 08533 28/04/1959 DA Sheffield Darnall 16/10/1992 Stratford 33.5 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 31/01/1994 34.79
D3696 08534 28/04/1959 DA Sheffield Darnall 31/08/2005 46.33 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 31/05/2007 48.12
01/05/1959 DA Sheffield Darnall 08/1965
to 13
57.95
07/05/1959 DA Sheffield Darnall 06/1965
to 13
57.94
D3699 08535 07/05/1959 DA Sheffield Darnall 01/10/2000 41.42 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/09/2009 50.36
D3700 08536 13/05/1959 DA Sheffield Darnall 57.92
D3701 08537 22/05/1959 DA Sheffield Darnall 25/05/1990 Immingham 31 Cut Coopers Metals (at Bescot MPD) 04/11/1994 35.48
D3702 08538 27/05/1959 DA Sheffield Darnall 57.88
D3703 08539 03/06/1959 DA Sheffield Darnall 31/03/1992 Ipswich 32.75 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 05/10/1993 34.36
D3704 08540 03/06/1959 DA Hornsey Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 57.86
D3705 08541 08/06/1959 DA Hornsey 31/08/2005 46.17 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 31/05/2008 49.01
D3706 08542 15/06/1959 DA Hornsey 31/08/2005 46.17 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 30/04/2006 46.91
D3707 08543 23/06/1959 DA Immingham Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 57.81
D3708 08544 30/06/1959 DA Immingham 17/07/1992 33.08 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 30/09/1994 35.28
D3709 08545 10/07/1959 DA Immingham 28/09/1980 Finsbury Park 21.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 05/11/1983 24.34
D3710 08546 06/08/1959 DA New England 28/07/1985 Stratford 25.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 28/02/1986 26.58
D3711 08547 14/08/1959 DA New England 20/12/1981 Stratford 22.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/05/1982 22.73
D3712 08548 21/08/1959 DA Hornsey 19/12/1982 Bradford Hammerton Street 23.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 10/12/1983 24.32
D3713 08549 03/09/1959 DA Hornsey 24/11/1985 March 26.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 16/10/1992 33.14
D3714 08550 17/09/1959 DA Mexborough 06/03/1983 Stratford 23.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/05/1986 26.72
D3715 08551 17/09/1959 DA Mexborough 31/10/1982 Finsbury Park 23.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 26/11/1983 24.21
D3716 08552 28/09/1959 DA Doncaster 15/08/1982 Stratford 22.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/01/1983 23.28
D3717 08553 13/10/1959 DA Doncaster 31/05/1981 Cambridge 21.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1983 23.40
D3718 08554 20/10/1959 DA Doncaster 15/08/1982 Stratford 22.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/03/1983 23.38
D3722 08555 23/10/1959 DA Kings Cross 15/08/1982 Finsbury Park 22.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 12/11/1983 24.07
D3723 08556 30/10/1959 DA Kings Cross 03/07/1990 Willesden 30.75 Prs Preserved 34.01
D3724 08557 13/11/1959 DA Kings Cross 19/12/1982 Finsbury Park 23.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 03/12/1983 24.07
D3725 08558 26/11/1959 DA Kings Cross 26/01/1986 March 26.17 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/05/1989 29.45
D3726 08559 18/12/1959 DA Sheffield Darnall 20/12/1981 York (North) 22 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 29/10/1983 23.88
D3727 08560 22/12/1959 DA Sheffield Darnall 31/05/1981 Shirebrook 21.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1982 22.21
D3728 08561 24/01/1959 CW St Margarets Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 58.22
D3729 08562 24/01/1959 CW St Margarets 31/01/1994 Doncaster 35 Cut MRJ Philips (at Old Oak Common TMD) 29/08/1997 38.62
D3730 08563 27/01/1959 CW St Margarets 25/04/1982 Motherwell 23.25 Cut D Christie (Camlackie) 01/04/1987 28.19
D3731 08564 04/02/1959 CW St Margarets 02/12/1985 Thornton Junction 26.83 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 05/1986 27.29
D3732 08565 26/02/1959 CW St Margarets 23/07/1993 Motherwell 34.42 Cut MC Metals (at Motherwell MPD) 01/05/1997 38.20
D3733 08566 02/04/1959 CW St Margarets 19/10/1975 Eastfield 16.5 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 30/11/1977 18.68
D3734 08567 17/04/1959 CW St Margarets 57.99
D3735 08568 24/04/1959 CW St Margarets 57.97
D3736 08569 01/05/1959 CW Haymarket Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 57.95
D3737 08570 08/05/1959 CW Dalry Road 18/01/1992 Eastfield 32.67 Cut MC Metals (at Motherwell MPD) 09/09/1993 34.36
D3738 08571 05/06/1959 CW Dalry Road 57.86
D3739 08572 27/05/1959 CW Dalry Road 22/02/1981 Haymarket 21.75 Cut J W Ransome (Frome) 15/10/1983 24.40
D3740 08573 05/06/1959 CW Dalry Road 57.86
D3741 08574 05/06/1959 CW Dalry Road 01/03/1981 Healey Mills 21.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/08/1986 27.26
D3742 08575 13/06/1959 CW Dalry Road 57.84
D3743 08576 20/06/1959 CW Newport Pill 30/04/2006 46.83 Prs Preserved 47.98
D3744 08577 20/06/1959 CW Newport Pill Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 57.82
D3745 08578 26/06/1959 CW Newport Pill 57.80
D3746 08579 02/07/1959 CW Newport Pill 07/11/1988 Holbeck (MR) 29.33 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 16/02/1995 35.65
D3747 08580 04/07/1959 CW Newport Pill 57.78
D3748 08581 29/07/1959 CW Newport Pill Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/09/2000 41.12
D3749 08582 04/08/1959 CW Newport Pill 30/09/2008 49.08 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/07/2009 49.94
D3750 08583 10/08/1959 CW Danygraig 23/07/1993 Knottingley 33.92 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 18/10/1995 36.21
D3751 08584 18/08/1959 CW Danygraig 23/08/1991 Laira 32 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 29/10/1993 34.22
D3752 08585 22/08/1959 CW Danygraig 57.64
D3753 08586 07/09/1959 CW Danygraig 01/03/1996 36.5 Cut EMR (at Ayr MPD) 01/05/2000 40.68
D3754 08587 14/09/1959 CW Danygraig 30/09/2008 49 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/12/2009 50.25
D3755 08588 22/09/1959 CW Danygraig 57.56
D3756 08589 05/10/1959 CW Danygraig 24/11/1992 Cardiff Canton 33.08 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 02/02/1994 34.35
D3757 08590 05/10/1959 CW Danygraig 27/09/1993 33.92 Prs Preserved 57.52
D3758 08591 21/10/1959 CW Danygraig 26/02/1993 Ayr 33.33 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 02/11/1993 34.06
D3759 08592 27/10/1959 CW Danygraig 57.46
D3760 08593 12/11/1959 CW Danygraig 57.42
D3761 08594 13/11/1959 CW Danygraig 20/07/2001 41.67 Prs Preserved 57.42
D3762 08595 25/11/1959 CW Danygraig 23/07/1993 Doncaster 33.67 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 18/10/1995 35.92
D3763 08596 18/04/1959 DE Preston 12/03/1977 Old Oak Common 17.92 57.99
D3764 08597 25/04/1959 DE Chester (MR) Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 57.97
D3765 08598 02/05/1959 DE Longsight 10/11/1986 Crewe Diesel 27.5 Prs Preserved 57.95
D3766 08599 09/05/1959 DE Longsight 31/12/2007 48.58 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/03/2008 48.85
D3767 08600 16/05/1959 DE Longsight 30/07/1999 40.17 Prs Preserved 57.91
D3768 08601 16/05/1959 DE Longsight 31/05/2004 45 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Bryn Engineering, Wigan) 31/12/2005 46.66
D3769 08602 30/05/1959 DE Longsight 30/03/1986 Carlisle Kingmoor 26.83 Prs Preserved 57.87
D3770 08603 30/05/1959 DE Longsight 31/01/1994 Bescot 34.67 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 01/08/1994 35.20
D3771 08604 13/06/1959 DE Longsight 16/07/1993 Derby 34.08 Prs Preserved 57.84
D3772 08605 13/06/1959 DE Stockport Edgeley 57.84
D3773 08606 27/06/1959 DE Stockport Edgeley 29/02/1988 Stratford 28.67 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/09/1989 30.20
D3774 08607 04/07/1959 DE Burton 31/01/2003 43.5 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 28/02/2007 47.69
D3775 08608 11/07/1959 DE Rowsley 07/11/1988 Gateshead 29.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 13/05/1994 34.86
D3776 08609 11/07/1959 DE Rowsley 08/11/1993 Willesden 34.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/09/2000 41.17
D3777 08610 25/07/1959 DE Kettering 26/06/1998 38.92 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 30/10/2004 45.30
D3778 08611 08/08/1959 DE Kettering 57.68
D3779 08612 15/08/1959 DE Kettering 21/09/1990 Old Oak Common 31.08 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 28/03/1991 31.64
D3780 08613 22/08/1959 DE Lower Darwen 01/12/1993 34.33 Prs Preserved 57.64
D3781 08614 29/08/1959 DE Lower Darwen 05/02/1993 Willesden 33.5 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 14/01/1994 34.40
D3782 08615 05/09/1959 DE Rose Grove 01/12/1993 Allerton 34.25 57.61
D3783 08616 05/09/1959 DE Rose Grove 57.61
D3784 08617 12/09/1959 DE Newton Heath 57.59
D3785 08618 19/09/1959 DE Newton Heath 14/09/1990 31 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (at Gateshead MPD) 13/02/2001 41.43
D3786 08619 26/09/1959 DE Leicester Midland 22/06/1998 38.75 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 31/05/2001 41.71
D3787 08620 26/09/1959 DE Leicester Midland 57.55
D3788 08621 10/10/1959 DE Leicester Midland 20/06/1988 Landore 28.67 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 06/11/1990 31.10
D3789 08622 17/10/1959 DE Leicester Midland Prs Preserved 57.49
D3790 08623 24/10/1959 DE Leicester Midland 57.47
D3791 08624 24/10/1959 DE Leicester Midland 57.47
D3792 08625 31/10/1959 DE Hasland 31/01/2004 44.25 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 26/02/2004 44.35
D3793 08626 31/10/1959 DE Widnes 27/04/1988 Doncaster 28.5 Cut Coopers Metals (at Allerton MPD) 31/03/1994 34.44
D3794 08627 07/11/1959 DE Widnes 31/01/1994 Stratford 34.17 Cut Birds (at Ipswich MPD) 10/02/1997 37.29
D3795 08628 21/11/1959 DE Warrington Dallam 31/08/2005 45.75 Prs Preserved 57.39
D3796 08629 21/11/1959 DE Warrington Dallam 57.39
D3797 08630 28/11/1959 DE Warrington Dallam 57.38
D3798 08631 05/12/1959 DE Stoke 11/12/1992 March 33 Prs Preserved 57.36
D3799 08632 05/12/1959 DE Stoke 57.36
D3800 08633 12/12/1959 DE Stoke 57.34
D3801 08634 19/12/1959 DE Stoke 01/02/1993 Stratford 33.17 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Carnforth) 20/08/2005 45.70
D3802 08635 26/12/1959 DE Stoke 28/02/2007 47.17 Prs Preserved 57.30
D3803 08636 05/12/1958 HO St Philips Marsh 27/07/1980 Landore 21.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 04/06/1983 24.51
D3804 08637 11/12/1958 HO St Philips Marsh 09/08/1991 Ashford Chart Leacon 32.67 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 04/04/1993 34.34
D3805 08638 18/12/1958 HO St Philips Marsh 11/12/1992 Reading (W.R.) 34 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 24/03/1994 35.29
D3806 08639 23/12/1958 HO St Philips Marsh 30/10/1988 Doncaster 29.83 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/09/1989 30.71
D3807 08640 29/12/1958 HO St Philips Marsh 14/11/1988 Reading (W.R.) 29.92 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 29/03/1991 32.27
D3808 08641 16/01/1959 HO St Philips Marsh 58.24
D3809 08642 23/01/1959 HO St Philips Marsh 31/05/2006 47.33 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 28/06/2006 47.46
D3810 08643 30/01/1959 HO Newport Pill 2001 41.92 Prs Preserved 58.20
D3811 08644 04/02/1959 HO Newport Pill 58.19
D3812 08645 13/02/1959 HO Newport Pill 58.16
D3813 08646 20/02/1959 HO Newport Pill 58.15
D3814 08647 26/02/1959 HO Newport Pill 02/04/1997 38.17 Cut South Yorkshire Preservation Society (Meadowhall) 01/08/1997 38.45
D3815 08648 04/03/1959 HO Newport Pill 58.11
D3816 08649 10/03/1959 HO Newport Pill 58.10
D3817 08650 18/03/1959 HO Newport Pill 01/08/1989 Eastleigh 30.42 Prs Preserved 58.07
D3818 08651 20/03/1959 HO Newport Pill Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 58.07
D3819 08652 26/03/1959 HO Newport Pill 20/06/1992 Cardiff Canton 33.25 Prs Preserved 58.05
D3820 08653 02/04/1959 HO Newport Pill 58.03
D3821 08654 08/04/1959 HO Newport Pill 25/10/1991 Cardiff Canton 32.5 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 13/05/1994 35.12
D3822 08655 15/04/1959 HO Newport Pill 31/08/2005 46.33 Cut Donald Ward (at LHGS, Barton under Needwood) 30/04/2007 48.07
D3823 08656 24/04/1959 HO Newport Pill 05/02/1993 Bletchley 33.83 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 03/09/1994 35.39
D3824 08657 30/04/1959 HO Newport Pill 22/11/1991 Knottingley 32.58 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 07/01/1994 34.72
D3825 08658 05/05/1959 HO Danygraig 05/02/1993 Norwich Thorpe 33.75 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 14/01/1994 34.72
D3826 08659 13/05/1959 HO Danygraig 24/06/1991 Knottingley 32.08 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 03/03/1995 35.83
D3827 08660 19/05/1959 HO Danygraig 08/11/1991 Cardiff Canton 32.5 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 07/01/1994 34.66
D3828 08661 22/05/1959 HO Danygraig 31/01/2003 43.67 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 26/02/2003 43.80
D3829 08662 29/05/1959 HO Danygraig 57.88
D3830 08663 05/06/1959 HO Danygraig 57.86
D3831 08664 12/06/1959 HO Danygraig 57.84
D3832 08665 01/01/1960 CW Mold Junction 30/09/2008 48.67 57.28
D3833 08666 01/01/1960 CW Mold Junction 16/01/1995 Allerton 35 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 30/06/2006 46.53
D3834 08667 02/01/1960 CW Warrington Dallam 11/11/1992 Neville Hill 32.83 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 03/03/1995 35.19
D3835 08668 02/01/1960 CW Warrington Dallam 02/04/1997 37.25 57.28
D3836 08669 02/01/1960 CW Springs Branch (Wigan) 23/05/1989 Longsight 29.33 Prs Preserved 57.28
D3837 08670 02/01/1960 CW Springs Branch (Wigan) 30/09/2008 48.67 57.28
D3838 08671 02/01/1960 CW Carnforth 07/11/1988 Gateshead 28.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 13/05/1994 34.38
D3839 08672 02/01/1960 CW Carnforth 21/09/1992 32.67 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 15/01/1994 34.06
D3840 08673 16/01/1960 CW Carnforth 16/01/1995 Allerton 35 Cut S Norton (Liverpool) 01/04/2003 43.24
D3841 08674 06/02/1960 CW Carnforth 05/07/1981 Bescot 21.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 23/07/1983 23.47
D3842 08675 27/06/1959 HO Patricroft 31/08/2005 46.17 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 30/06/2007 48.04
D3843 08676 04/07/1959 HO Patricroft 57.78
D3844 08677 11/07/1959 HO Patricroft 10/06/1993 Willesden 33.92 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/06/2000 40.92
D3845 08678 01/08/1959 HO Patricroft 30/10/1988 Tinsley 29.17 Prs Preserved 57.70
D3846 08679 08/08/1959 HO Patricroft 19/06/1976 Allerton 16.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/04/1986 26.67
D3847 08680 15/08/1959 HO Trafford Park (LMS) 06/07/1992 Eastfield 32.92 Cut MC Metals (at Motherwell MPD) 10/09/1993 34.10
D3848 08681 22/08/1959 HO Trafford Park (LMS) 29/10/1985 Swindon Works 26.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/09/1986 27.05
D3849 08682 29/08/1959 HO Trafford Park (LMS) 57.62
D3850 08683 05/09/1959 HO Trafford Park (LMS) 57.61
D3851 08684 12/09/1959 HO Trafford Park (LMS) 07/12/1986 Bletchley 27.25 Cut MRJ Philips (at Bicester) 01/06/1995 35.74
D3852 08685 19/09/1959 HO Heaton Mersey 57.57
D3853 08686 26/09/1959 HO Heaton Mersey 22/11/1991 Allerton 32.17 Cut Coopers Metals (at Allerton MPD) 31/03/1994 34.53
D3854 08687 03/10/1959 HO Heaton Mersey 57.53
D3855 08688 10/10/1959 HO Brunswick 01/03/1991 Allerton 31.42 Cut Coopers Metals (at Allerton MPD) 31/03/1994 34.50
D3856 08689 17/10/1959 HO Brunswick Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 57.49
D3857 08690 24/10/1959 HO Brunswick 57.47
D3858 08691 31/10/1959 HO Walton on the Hill 57.45
D3859 08692 07/11/1959 HO Annesley 31/01/1994 Crewe Diesel 34.17 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Carnforth) 01/03/2005 45.35
D3860 08693 14/11/1959 HO Annesley 16/06/2000 40.58 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 25/05/2000 40.56
D3861 08694 21/11/1959 HO Derby 30/09/2008 48.83 Prs Preserved 57.39
D3862 08695 28/11/1959 HO Derby 28/02/2007 47.25 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/12/2009 50.04
D3863 08696 05/12/1959 HO Derby 57.36
D3864 08697 19/12/1959 HO Derby 57.32
D3865 08698 19/12/1959 HO Derby Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 57.32
D3866 08699 14/01/1960 HO Stoke 22/10/1993 Crewe Diesel 33.75 57.25
D3867 08700 20/01/1960 HO Lancaster Green Ayre 29/06/2001 41.42 Prs Preserved 44.56
D3868 08701 05/02/1960 HO Newton Heath 57.19
D3869 08702 12/02/1960 HO Cricklewood East 28/02/2004 44 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/02/2004 44.00
D3870 08703 17/02/1960 HO Stoke 57.15
D3871 08704 29/02/1960 HO Lancaster Green Ayre 05/11/1990 Bletchley 30.75 Prs Preserved 30.71
D3872 08705 12/03/1960 CW York (North) 07/01/1994 March 33.83 Cut Birds (at Stratford MPD) 31/03/1994 34.07
D3873 08706 19/03/1960 CW Thornaby 57.07
D3874 08707 19/03/1960 CW York (North) 23/07/1993 Knottingley 33.33 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Carnforth) 28/02/2005 44.98
D3875 08708 26/03/1960 CW Thornaby 09/10/1992 Stratford 32.58 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 01/02/1994 33.88
D3876 08709 01/04/1960 CW Thornaby 57.03
D3877 08710 21/04/1960 CW St Margarets 25/01/1993 32.75 Cut MC Metals (at Motherwell MPD) 14/09/1993 33.42
D3878 08711 28/04/1960 CW St Margarets 56.96
D3879 08712 28/04/1960 CW St Margarets 11/12/1992 Motherwell 32.67 Cut MC Metals (at Motherwell MPD) 15/09/1993 33.41
D3880 08713 29/04/1960 CW St Margarets 26/06/1998 38.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 14/06/2000 40.15
D3881 08714 04/05/1960 CW St Margarets 56.94
D3882 08715 04/05/1960 CW St Margarets 30/09/2008 48.33 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/02/2009 48.78
D3883 08716 18/05/1960 CW St Margarets 30/11/1988 Cambridge 28.5 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 01/04/1990 29.89
D3884 08717 19/05/1960 CW St Margarets Prs Preserved 56.90
D3885 23/05/1960 CW St Margarets 04/02/1972 11.75 Cut Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) 01/03/1972 11.78
D3886 08718 25/05/1960 CW St Margarets Cut EMR (at Ayr MPD) 01/05/2000 39.96
D3887 08719 31/05/1960 CW St Margarets 22/11/1991 Bletchley 31.5 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 03/09/1994 34.28
D3888 08720 10/06/1960 CW St Margarets 28/02/2007 46.67 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 30/11/2007 47.50
D3889 08721 15/06/1960 CW St Margarets 56.83
D3890 08722 22/06/1960 CW St Margarets 12/03/1987 Gateshead 26.75 Cut Vic Berry (Leicester) 31/07/1988 28.13
D3891 08723 27/06/1960 CW St Margarets Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury) 01/07/2002 42.04
D3892 08724 01/07/1960 CW St Margarets 56.78
D3893 08725 22/07/1960 CW Hawick 14/08/1992 Eastfield 32.08 Cut MC Metals (at Motherwell MPD) 25/09/1993 33.20
D3894 08726 27/07/1960 CW Parkhead 26/01/1987 Haymarket 26.5 Cut Vic Berry (at Thornton Yard) 01/05/1987 26.78
D3895 08727 03/08/1960 CW Parkhead 03/03/1993 Ayr 32.58 Cut MC Metals (at Motherwell MPD) 03/10/1993 33.19
D3896 08728 12/08/1960 CW Parkhead 12/10/1987 Motherwell 27.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/11/2009 49.25
D3897 08729 17/08/1960 CW Ayr 22/02/1990 Doncaster 29.5 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 28/03/1994 33.63
D3898 08730 23/08/1960 CW Parkhead 56.64
D3899 08731 01/09/1960 CW Parkhead Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 21/06/2002 41.83
D3900 08732 08/09/1960 CW Parkhead 56.59
D3901 08733 15/09/1960 CW Parkhead 23/07/1993 Motherwell 32.83 Cut English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan) 01/09/2000 39.99
D3902 08734 20/09/1960 CW Kipps Prs Preserved 56.56
D3903 08735 24/09/1960 CW Kipps 56.55
D3904 08736 24/09/1960 CW Kipps 12/10/1987 Motherwell 27.08 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/11/2009 49.14
D3905 08737 08/10/1960 CW Polmadie 56.51
D3906 08738 14/10/1960 CW Polmadie 56.50
D3907 08739 18/10/1960 CW Polmadie 30/09/2005 44.92 Cut S Norton (Liverpool) 29/10/2005 45.06
D3908 08740 20/10/1960 CW Polmadie 31/08/2005 44.83 Cut Donald Ward (at LHGS, Barton under Needwood) 30/04/2007 46.56
D3909 08741 27/10/1960 CW Polmadie 16/04/1991 Derby 30.5 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 13/05/1994 33.56
D3910 08742 01/11/1960 CW Polmadie 56.45
D3911 08743 09/11/1960 CW Polmadie 03/03/1993 Neville Hill 32.33 56.42
D3912 08744 18/11/1960 CW Polmadie 31/03/1992 Longsight 31.33 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 04/10/1993 32.90
D3913 08745 22/11/1960 CW Polmadie Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 14/11/2012 52.01
D3914 08746 26/11/1960 CW Polmadie 31/08/2003 42.75 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/01/2004 43.13
D3915 08747 02/12/1960 CW Polmadie 11/07/1990 Gateshead 29.58 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 05/11/1993 32.95
D3916 08748 10/12/1960 CW Polmadie 21/01/1994 33.08 Cut Birds (at Ipswich MPD) 10/02/1997 36.19
D3917 08749 12/12/1960 CW Polmadie 56.33
D3918 08750 20/12/1960 CW Greenock Ladyburn 56.31
D3919 08751 28/12/1960 CW Greenock Ladyburn 28/02/2004 43.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 04/09/2004 43.72
D3920 08752 30/12/1960 CW Greenock Ladyburn 56.28
D3921 08753 31/12/1960 CW Greenock Ladyburn 26/03/1993 Motherwell 32.25 Cut MC Metals (at Motherwell MPD) 03/10/1993 32.78
D3922 08754 12/01/1961 HO Corkerhill 56.25
D3923 08755 20/01/1961 HO Corkerhill 10/09/1993 Motherwell 32.67 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 09/06/2000 39.41
D3924 08756 27/01/1961 HO Corkerhill 56.21
D3925 08757 01/02/1961 HO Corkerhill 56.19
D3926 08758 08/02/1961 HO Corkerhill 30/06/2005 44.33 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 31/08/2005 44.59
D3927 08759 16/02/1961 HO Ardrossan 56.15
D3928 08760 22/02/1961 HO Ardrossan 14/02/1992 Eastleigh 31 Cut MRJ Philips (at Eastleigh Works) 05/05/1997 36.22
D3929 08761 01/03/1961 HO Ardrossan 20/03/1992 Eastfield 31 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 03/10/1993 32.61
D3930 08762 06/03/1961 HO Kittybrewster 56.10
D3931 08763 10/03/1961 HO Kittybrewster 06/10/1989 Haymarket 28.58 Cut MC Metals (at Eastfield MPD) 01/10/1990 29.58
D3932 08764 17/03/1961 HO Kittybrewster 06/05/1988 Haymarket 27.17 Prs Preserved 27.39
D3933 08765 23/03/1961 HO Kittybrewster 56.06
D3934 08766 28/03/1961 HO Kittybrewster 56.04
D3935 08767 06/04/1961 HO Kittybrewster 31/01/1994 Stratford 32.75 Prs Preserved 56.02
D3936 08768 13/04/1961 HO Kittybrewster 31/08/2005 44.33 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 30/06/2007 46.24
D3937 08769 04/03/1960 DE Royston 23/05/1989 Landore 29.17 Prs Preserved 40.10
D3938 08770 04/03/1960 DE Percy Main Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 57.11
D3939 08771 10/03/1960 DE Percy Main 20/03/1992 32 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 30/09/1994 34.58
D3940 08772 16/03/1960 DE York (North) 14/01/1994 33.83 Prs Preserved 57.08
D3941 08773 19/03/1960 DE Royston 20/07/2001 41.33 Prs Preserved 57.07
D3942 08774 26/03/1960 DE Percy Main 20/09/1988 Thornaby 28.5 Prs Preserved 57.05
D3943 08775 26/03/1960 DE Percy Main 30/09/2008 48.5 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/06/2009 49.22
D3944 08776 31/03/1960 DE Hull Dairycoates Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 57.04
D3945 08777 31/03/1960 DE Hull Dairycoates 22/11/1991 Knottingley 31.67 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 15/03/1997 36.98
D3946 08778 02/04/1960 DE York (North) 25/09/1992 Cardiff Canton 32.42 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 07/01/1994 33.79
D3947 08779 02/04/1960 DE Old Oak Common 23/02/1988 Ashford Chart Leacon 27.83 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 04/10/1991 31.53
D3948 08780 18/04/1960 DE Old Oak Common 01/03/2005 44.92 Prs Preserved 56.99
D3949 08781 09/04/1960 DE Old Oak Common 57.01
D3950 08782 08/04/1960 DE Old Oak Common 57.01
D3951 08783 09/04/1960 DE Old Oak Common 57.01
D3952 08784 23/04/1960 DE Old Oak Common 56.97
D3953 08785 23/04/1960 DE Old Oak Common 56.97
D3954 08786 29/04/1960 DE Old Oak Common 56.96
D3955 08787 23/04/1960 DE Old Oak Common 14/02/1991 Cardiff Canton 30.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 13/05/1994 34.08
D3956 08788 07/05/1960 DE Old Oak Common 14/01/1994 33.67 56.93
D3957 08789 30/04/1960 DE Old Oak Common 23/04/1993 33 Cut MRJ Philips (at Bicester) 01/06/1995 35.11
D3958 08790 14/05/1960 DE Old Oak Common 56.92
D3959 08791 07/05/1960 DE Old Oak Common 01/10/1994 Motherwell 34.42 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 15/11/1993 33.55
D3960 08792 07/05/1960 DE Old Oak Common 28/02/2007 46.75 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 30/09/2007 47.43
D3961 08793 21/05/1960 DE Old Oak Common 23/07/1993 Aberdeen Ferryhill 33.17 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/11/2000 40.48
D3962 08794 21/05/1960 DE Old Oak Common 13/11/1992 Neville Hill 32.5 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 03/03/1995 34.81
D3963 08795 21/05/1960 DE Old Oak Common 56.90
D3964 08796 21/05/1960 DE Old Oak Common 04/05/1990 Immingham 30 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 27/04/1993 32.96
D3965 08797 28/05/1960 DE Old Oak Common 12/11/1990 Gateshead 30.5 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 10/01/1994 33.64
D3966 08798 28/05/1960 DE Tyseley 56.88
D3967 08799 04/06/1960 DE St Blazey 56.86
D3968 08800 04/06/1960 DE St Blazey 25/01/1993 32.58 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 07/01/1994 33.62
D3969 08801 11/06/1960 DE St Blazey 31/01/2004 43.58 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 31/03/2004 43.83
D3970 08802 11/06/1960 DE St Blazey 56.84
D3971 08803 18/06/1960 DE St Blazey 11/12/1992 Reading (W.R.) 32.5 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 31/01/1994 33.64
D3972 08804 18/06/1960 DE St Blazey 56.82
D3973 08805 25/06/1960 DE Tyseley 56.80
D3974 08806 25/06/1960 DE Ebbw Junction (Newport) 31/08/2005 45.17 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 30/06/2007 47.04
D3975 08807 25/06/1960 DE Ebbw Junction (Newport) 28/02/2007 46.67 56.80
D3976 08808 02/07/1960 DE Ebbw Junction (Newport) 15/05/1990 29.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 27/03/1992 31.76
D3977 08809 09/07/1960 DE Ebbw Junction (Newport) 01/12/1993 Allerton 33.42 Prs Preserved 56.76
D3978 08810 09/07/1960 DE Ebbw Junction (Newport) 56.76
D3979 08811 16/07/1960 DE Ebbw Junction (Newport) 29/08/1997 Stratford 37.08 Cut MRJ Philips (at Old Oak Common TMD) 29/08/1997 37.15
D3980 08812 09/07/1960 DE Ebbw Junction (Newport) 06/02/1978 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 17.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/03/1978 17.74
D3981 08813 25/07/1960 DE Tyseley 30/06/2005 44.92 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 56.72
D3982 08814 25/07/1960 DE Tyseley 20/11/1992 Derby 32.33 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 01/02/1994 33.55
D3983 08815 13/08/1960 DE Tyseley 01/04/1996 35.67 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/09/2005 45.08
D3984 08816 05/08/1960 DE Tyseley 01/02/1986 Thornaby 25.5 Cut Wabtec (Doncaster Works) 01/08/1999 39.01
D3985 08817 13/08/1960 DE Tyseley 31/05/2004 43.75 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Bryn Engineering, Wigan) 31/12/2005 45.41
D3986 08818 13/08/1960 DE Tyseley 02/04/1997 36.67 56.67
D3987 08819 20/08/1960 DE Tyseley 30/06/2008 47.83 Cut C F Booth (Rotherham) 01/08/2008 47.98
D3988 08820 27/08/1960 DE Tyseley 22/02/1990 Longsight 29.5 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 07/10/1991 31.13
D3989 08821 03/09/1960 DE Tyseley 11/12/1992 Laira 32.25 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 19/11/1993 33.23
D3990 08822 09/09/1960 DE Tyseley 56.59
D3991 08823 09/09/1960 DE Tyseley Prs Preserved 56.59
D3992 08824 22/09/1960 DE Tyseley 56.56
D3993 08825 22/09/1960 DE Tyseley 30/06/2005 44.75 56.56
D3994 08826 01/10/1960 DE Tyseley Cut Raxstar (at Eastleigh Works) 13/07/2002 41.81
D3995 08827 08/10/1960 DE Tyseley 56.51
D3996 08828 01/10/1960 DE Tyseley Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 56.53
D3997 08829 08/10/1960 DE Tyseley 16/06/1993 Toton 32.67 Cut Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Carnforth) 28/02/2005 44.42
D3998 08830 15/10/1960 DE Tyseley 56.49
D3999 08831 22/10/1960 DE Tyseley 07/04/1993 Eastleigh 32.5 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 29/03/1994 33.45
D4000 08832 29/10/1960 DE Tyseley 56.45
D4001 08833 05/11/1960 DE Tyseley 56.44
D4002 08834 12/11/1960 DE Ebbw Junction (Newport) 56.42
D4003 08835 12/11/1960 DE Old Oak Common 56.42
D4004 08836 12/11/1960 DE Old Oak Common 56.42
D4005 08837 26/11/1960 DE Old Oak Common 30/11/2005 45 Cut S Norton (Liverpool) 31/12/2005 45.13
D4006 08838 03/12/1960 DE Old Oak Common 09/05/1990 Derby 29.42 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 02/02/1994 33.19
D4007 08839 10/12/1960 DE Old Oak Common 10/01/1992 Laira 31.08 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 19/11/1993 32.96
D4008 08840 17/12/1960 DE Old Oak Common 24/06/1991 Allerton 30.5 Cut Coopers Metals (at Allerton MPD) 31/03/1994 33.31
D4009 08841 23/12/1960 DE Southall 14/06/1990 Bescot 29.5 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 29/10/1993 32.87
D4010 08842 31/12/1960 DE Slough 56.28
D4011 08843 20/04/1961 HO Danygraig 22/02/1990 Longsight 28.83 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 17/09/1991 30.43
D4012 08844 26/04/1961 HO Danygraig 55.96
D4013 08845 02/05/1961 HO Laira 55.95
D4014 08846 16/05/1961 HO Newton Abbot 13/10/1989 Allerton 28.42 Prs Preserved 55.91
D4015 08847 17/05/1961 HO St Philips Marsh 55.91
D4016 08848 18/05/1961 HO St Philips Marsh 15/05/1992 Cardiff Canton 31 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 24/03/1994 32.87
D4017 08849 14/05/1961 HO St Philips Marsh 01/10/1993 Laira 32.42 Cut MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works) 02/09/1997 36.33
D4018 08850 01/06/1961 HO St Philips Marsh 11/12/1992 Reading (W.R.) 31.5 Prs Preserved 55.87
D4019 08851 05/06/1961 HO St Philips Marsh 07/02/1990 Motherwell 28.67 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 14/08/1991 30.21
D4020 08852 12/06/1961 HO St Philips Marsh 03/08/1988 Motherwell 27.17 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 16/11/1989 28.45
D4021 08853 19/06/1960 HO St Philips Marsh 56.82
D4022 08854 21/06/1960 HO St Philips Marsh 56.81
D4023 08855 26/06/1960 HO St Philips Marsh 23/07/1993 Aberdeen Ferryhill 33.08 Cut Wabtec (Doncaster Works) 0000
D4024 08856 04/07/1960 HO St Philips Marsh 56.78
D4025 08857 10/07/1961 HO St Philips Marsh 21/10/1991 Bescot 30.25 Cut MC Metals (Springburn) 02/11/1993 32.34
D4026 08858 09/08/1961 HO St Philips Marsh 01/10/1994 Allerton 33.17 Cut Coopers Metals (at Allerton MPD) 01/04/1994 32.67
D4027 08859 15/08/1961 HO St Philips Marsh 11/12/1992 March 31.33 Cut Gwent Demolition (Margam) 30/03/1994 32.64
D4028 08860 27/05/1960 DA Sheffield Darnall 01/03/1981 Thornaby 20.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/06/1981 21.03
D4029 08861 03/06/1960 DA Sheffield Grimesthorpe 11/10/1981 Tinsley 21.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1982 21.76
D4030 08862 08/07/1960 DA Sheffield Grimesthorpe 28/09/1980 Cambridge 20.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/10/1981 21.33
D4031 08863 06/08/1960 DA Sheffield Darnall 28/09/1980 Cambridge 20.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/10/1981 21.25
D4032 08864 15/08/1960 DA Sheffield Darnall 23/08/1981 Thornaby 21 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/03/1982 21.56
D4033 08865 09/09/1960 DA Sheffield Darnall 56.59
D4034 08866 23/09/1960 DA Sheffield Darnall 56.55
D4035 08867 17/10/1960 DA Sheffield Grimesthorpe 31/08/2005 44.83 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 30/06/2007 46.73
D4036 08868 26/10/1960 DA Sheffield Grimesthorpe 11/12/1992 March 32.17 56.46
D4037 08869 29/10/1960 DA Sheffield Grimesthorpe 1997 36.17 Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 14/01/2011 50.24
D4038 08870 05/11/1960 DA Sheffield Grimesthorpe 07/05/1993 Knottingley 32.5 56.44
D4039 08871 17/11/1960 DA Sheffield Grimesthorpe 27/10/1990 Tinsley 29.92 Prs Preserved 56.40
D4040 08872 19/11/1960 DA Sheffield Grimesthorpe 56.40
D4041 08873 25/11/1960 DA Sheffield Grimesthorpe 01/12/2006 46.08 Prs Preserved 56.38
D4042 08874 26/11/1960 DA Sheffield Grimesthorpe 14/02/1992 Doncaster 31.25 56.38
D4043 08875 03/12/1960 DA Sheffield Grimesthorpe 03/05/1991 Thornaby 30.42 Cut C F Booth (at RFS Kilnhurst) 31/08/1993 32.76
D4044 08876 09/12/1960 DA Sheffield Grimesthorpe 27/09/1991 Doncaster 30.75 Cut Hudsons of Telford (at RFS Doncaster) 31/07/1992 31.66
D4045 08877 15/12/1960 DA Sheffield Darnall 56.33
D4046 08878 17/12/1960 DA Sheffield Grimesthorpe 29/08/1997 Stratford 36.67 Cut MRJ Philips (at Old Oak Common TMD) 29/08/1997 36.72
D4047 08879 22/12/1960 DA Sheffield Grimesthorpe 56.31
D4048 08880 30/12/1960 DA Sheffield Grimesthorpe 23/07/1996 35.58 Cut S Norton (Liverpool) 01/11/2005 44.87
D4095 08881 23/08/1961 HO Fort William 01/02/2004 42.5 Prs Preserved 55.64
D4096 08882 30/08/1961 HO Eastfield 30/06/2005 43.83 Cut Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham) 31/08/2005 44.03
D4097 08883 08/09/1961 HO Perth South 28/02/2007 45.42 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 31/12/2007 46.34
D4098 08884 11/09/1961 HO Perth South Cut EMR (Kingsbury) 55.59
D4115 08885 18/01/1962 HO Lostock Hall 07/05/1993 Doncaster 31.33 Prs