09 0-6-0
BR (Pre Tops) | BR (Tops) | BR (09/0) | BR (Dept) | BR (09/1) | BR (09/2) | Date To Service | Bld | Rebuilt From | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D3536 | 08421 | 09201 | 08/08/1958 | DE | 22/09/1992 from 08 |
Stirling | 65.43 | ||||||||||
D3665 | 09001 | 02/02/1959 | DA | Eastleigh | Prs | Preserved | 64.94 | ||||||||||
D3666 | 09002 | 03/02/1959 | DA | Eastleigh | 25/09/1992 | 33.58 | Prs | Preserved | 64.94 | ||||||||
D3667 | 09003 | 19/02/1959 | DA | Eastleigh | 64.89 | ||||||||||||
D3668 | 09004 | 17/02/1959 | DA | Eastleigh | 31/07/2007 | 48.42 | Prs | Preserved | 64.90 | ||||||||
D3669 | 09005 | 19/02/1959 | DA | Norwood Junction | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 64.89 | ||||||||||
D3670 | 09006 | 25/03/1959 | DA | Ashford | 64.80 | ||||||||||||
D3671 | 09007 | 26/03/1959 | DA | Hither Green | Prs | Preserved | 64.80 | ||||||||||
D3719 | 09008 | 13/04/1959 | DA | Hither Green | 64.75 | ||||||||||||
D3720 | 09009 | 15/04/1959 | DA | Hither Green | 64.74 | ||||||||||||
D3721 | 09010 | 13/04/1959 | DA | Hither Green | Prs | Preserved | 64.75 | ||||||||||
D3787 | 08620 | 09205 | 26/09/1959 | DE | 10/12/1992 from 08 |
Leicester Midland | 64.29 | ||||||||||
D3884 | 08717 | 09204 | 19/05/1960 | CW | 23/10/1992 from 08 |
St Margarets | Prs | Preserved | 63.65 | ||||||||
D3900 | 08732 | 09202 | 08/09/1960 | CW | 24/11/1992 from 08 |
Parkhead | 63.34 | ||||||||||
D3917 | 08749 | 09104 | 12/12/1960 | CW | 05/01/1993 from 08 |
Polmadie | 63.08 | ||||||||||
D3927 | 08759 | 09106 | 16/02/1961 | HO | 09/06/1993 from 08 |
Ardrossan | 62.90 | ||||||||||
D3934 | 08766 | 09103 | 28/03/1961 | HO | 05/01/1993 from 08 |
Kittybrewster | 62.79 | ||||||||||
D3949 | 08781 | 09203 | 09/04/1960 | DE | 02/10/1992 from 08 |
Old Oak Common | 63.76 | ||||||||||
D4000 | 08832 | 09102 | 29/10/1960 | DE | 22/09/1992 from 08 |
Tyseley | 63.20 | ||||||||||
D4001 | 08833 | 09101 | 05/11/1960 | DE | 17/08/1992 from 08 |
Tyseley | 63.18 | ||||||||||
D4003 | 08835 | 09105 | 12/11/1960 | DE | 15/03/1993 from 08 |
Old Oak Common | 63.16 | ||||||||||
D4013 | 08845 | 09107 | 02/05/1961 | HO | 23/07/1993 from 08 |
Laira | 62.69 | ||||||||||
D4099 | 09011 | 19/09/1961 | HO | Hither Green | 62.31 | ||||||||||||
D4100 | 09012 | 26/09/1961 | HO | Ashford | 62.29 | ||||||||||||
D4101 | 09013 | 03/10/1961 | HO | Ashford | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 62.27 | ||||||||||
D4102 | 09014 | 12/10/1961 | HO | Norwood Junction | 62.25 | ||||||||||||
D4103 | 09015 | 26/10/1961 | HO | Norwood Junction | Prs | Preserved | 62.21 | ||||||||||
D4104 | 09016 | 26/10/1961 | HO | Norwood Junction | Cut | EMR (Kingsbury) | 62.21 | ||||||||||
D4105 | 09017 | 97806 | 07/11/1961 | HO | Chester (MR) | 62.18 | |||||||||||
D4106 | 09018 | 13/11/1961 | HO | Carlisle Kingmoor | 62.16 | ||||||||||||
D4107 | 09019 | 16/11/1961 | HO | Carlisle Upperby | 62.15 | ||||||||||||
D4108 | 09020 | 23/11/1961 | HO | Stoke | 62.13 | ||||||||||||
D4109 | 09021 | 29/11/1961 | HO | Stoke | 31/12/2007 | 46.08 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 07/2008 | 46.66 | |||||||
D4110 | 09022 | 08/12/1961 | HO | Stoke | 62.09 | ||||||||||||
D4111 | 09023 | 15/12/1961 | HO | Nuneaton | 62.07 | ||||||||||||
D4112 | 09024 | 22/12/1961 | HO | Nuneaton | 62.05 | ||||||||||||
D4113 | 09025 | 04/01/1962 | HO | Longsight | 31/08/2005 | 43.58 | Prs | Preserved | 62.02 | ||||||||
D4114 | 09026 | 21/01/1962 | HO | 21/01/1962 from |
Lostock Hall | 01/10/2005 | 43.75 | Prs | Preserved | 61.97 |