Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 139 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 139 Week
» 17475 Month
» 295271 Year
» 1179652 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

77 Co-Co


BR (Pre Tops) NS (Dutch) Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
27000 1502 28/12/1953 Wath 05/10/1968 Reddish 14.83 Prs Preserved 65.52 ELECTRA
27001 1505 22/03/1954 Wath 05/10/1968 Reddish 14.58 Prs Preserved 65.28 ARIADNE
27002 1506 18/05/1954 Wath 05/10/1968 Reddish 14.42 Cut Tilburg Works (Netherlands) 02/1985 30.77 AURORA
27003 1501 05/08/1954 Reddish 05/10/1968 Reddish 14.17 Prs Preserved 64.91 DIANA
27004 1503 18/09/1954 Reddish 05/10/1968 Reddish 14.08 Cut Tilburg Works (Netherlands) 10/1986 32.10 JUNO
27005 11/12/1954 Reddish 05/10/1968 Reddish 13.83 Cut Tilburg Works (Netherlands) 06/1971 16.52 MINERVA
27006 1504 31/12/1954 Reddish 05/10/1968 Reddish 13.83 Cut Tilburg Works (Netherlands) 10/1986 31.81 PANDORA