Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 102 Today
» 922 Yesterday
» 1024 Week
» 17222 Month
» 182122 Year
» 693224 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Fowler "4F" Class 0-6-0


LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
3835 43835 10/1911 01/10/1955 Coalville 44 44.05
3836 43836 11/1911 11/07/1959 Buxton (LNWR) 47.67 47.70
3837 43837 05/1917 11/10/1957 Bournville 40.42 40.45
3838 43838 1917 14/07/1956 Derby 39.58
3839 43839 1917 05/03/1960 Burton 43.25
3840 43840 1917 27/08/1960 Derby 43.67
3841 43841 1917 28/11/1959 Bletchley 42.92
3842 43842 1917 28/11/1959 Buxton (LNWR) 42.92
3843 43843 1917 21/05/1960 Burton 43.42
3844 43844 1917 24/05/1962 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 45.42
3845 43845 1917 20/07/1963 Toton 46.58
3846 43846 1917 24/06/1961 Leicester Midland 44.5
3847 43847 1917 25/05/1957 Derby 40.42
3848 43848 1917 11/06/1962 Motherwell 45.5
3849 43849 1917 12/03/1962 Motherwell 45.25
3850 43850 1917 02/01/1965 Westhouses 48.08
3851 43851 1917 17/08/1957 Stourton 40.67
3852 43852 1918 04/05/1957 Normanton 39.42
3853 43853 1918 15/06/1963 Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 45.5
3854 43854 1918 06/06/1964 Rowsley 46.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1964
3855 43855 1918 09/02/1963 Nottingham 45.17
3856 43856 1918 26/09/1964 Gorton 46.75 Cut Cohens (Ickles) 04/1965
3857 43857 1918 30/03/1957 Canklow 39.25
3858 43858 1918 05/12/1959 Burton 42
3859 43859 1918 03/03/1962 Kentish Town 44.25
3860 43860 1918 26/09/1959 Toton 41.75
3861 43861 1918 18/05/1963 Toton 45.42
3862 43862 1918 08/05/1954 Saltley 36.42
3863 43863 1918 02/09/1961 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 43.75
3864 43864 1918 28/11/1959 Stoke 41.92
3865 43865 1918 15/05/1965 Westhouses 47.42
3866 43866 1918 05/12/1959 Westhouses 42
3867 43867 1918 08/10/1955 Westhouses 37.83
3868 43868 1918 26/11/1960 Kirkby Stephen 42.92
3869 43869 1918 21/06/1962 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 44.5
3870 43870 1918 02/11/1963 Derby 45.92
3871 43871 1918 12/1964 Stourton 47
3872 43872 1918 26/08/1961 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 43.67
3873 43873 1918 13/06/1959 St Albans 41.5
3874 43874 1918 17/03/1956 Mansfield 38.25
3875 43875 1918 05/05/1956 Saltley 38.42
3876 43876 1918 08/12/1962 Coalville 45
3877 43877 1918 03/10/1959 Uttoxeter 41.83
3878 43878 1918 05/12/1959 Saltley 42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1960
3879 43879 12/1918 12/04/1958 Derby 39.33 39.44
3880 43880 1919 02/05/1964 Bury 45.42
3881 43881 1919 05/12/1959 Derby 41
3882 43882 1919 29/06/1963 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 44.5
3883 43883 1919 09/1961 Motherwell 42.75
3884 43884 1919 21/12/1961 Motherwell 43
3885 43885 1919 15/02/1964 Derby 45.17
3886 43886 1919 10/10/1959 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 40.83
3887 43887 1919 02/1965 Gloucester Horton Road 46.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1965
3888 43888 1919 26/09/1964 Derby 45.75 Cut Cohens (Ickles) 03/1965
3889 43889 1919 23/03/1957 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 38.25
3890 43890 1919 21/02/1959 Lancaster Green Ayre 40.17
3891 43891 1919 05/01/1957 Hasland 38.08
3892 43892 1919 08/02/1959 Burton 40.17
3893 43893 1919 22/05/1965 Skipton 46.42
3894 43894 1919 03/09/1955 Coalville 36.75
3895 43895 1919 23/06/1956 Mansfield 37.5
3896 43896 1919 28/11/1959 Carlisle Kingmoor 40.92
3897 43897 1919 09/01/1960 Lower Darwen 41.08
3898 43898 1919 13/07/1957 Bedford 38.58
3899 43899 1919 01/10/1962 Hurlford 43.83
3900 43900 1919 01/07/1961 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 42.58
3901 43901 1919 07/09/1957 Cricklewood East 38.75
3902 43902 1920 02/06/1962 Carlisle Kingmoor 42.5
3903 43903 1920 09/05/1964 Derby 44.42
3904 43904 1920 27/06/1959 Workington 39.5
3905 43905 1920 22/07/1961 Cricklewood East 41.58
3906 43906 1920 11/1965 Royston 45.92
3907 43907 1920 19/12/1959 Mansfield 40
3908 43908 1920 14/11/1964 Workington 44.92
3909 43909 1920 06/08/1955 Saltley 35.67
3910 43910 1920 05/12/1959 Upminster 40
3911 43911 1920 27/05/1961 Burton 41.42
3912 43912 1920 16/02/1957 Saltley 37.17
3913 43913 1920 03/04/1965 Skipton 45.33
3914 43914 1920 08/09/1962 Royston 42.75
3915 43915 1920 16/02/1963 Gorton 43.17
3916 43916 1920 23/11/1957 Skipton 37.92
3917 43917 1920 25/07/1964 Westhouses 44.58
3918 43918 1920 27/02/1965 Derby 45.17
3919 43919 1920 05/11/1959 Leicester Midland 39.92
3920 43920 1920 22/07/1961 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 41.58
3921 43921 1920 03/06/1961 Toton 41.5
3922 43922 1920 15/07/1961 Carlisle Kingmoor 41.58
3923 43923 1920 08/02/1964 Derby 44.17
3924 43924 10/1920 06/1965 Bristol Barrow Road 44.67 Prs Preserved
3925 43925 1920 13/06/1964 Gorton 44.5
3926 43926 1920 11/07/1959 Bristol Barrow Road 39.58
3927 43927 1920 26/10/1957 Gorton 37.83
3928 43928 1920 19/09/1964 Toton 44.75 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 11/1964
3929 43929 1920 14/11/1964 Gorton 44.92
3930 43930 1920 05/12/1959 Derby 40
3931 43931 1920 08/1964 Stourton 44.67
3932 43932 1920 01/09/1962 Gorton 42.75
3933 43933 1920 17/11/1962 Mansfield 42.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1963
3934 43934 12/1920 21/11/1959 Cricklewood East 38.92 39.11
3935 43935 01/1921 02/11/1963 Leicester Midland 42.83 43.78
3936 43936 01/1921 04/02/1956 Nottingham 35.08 35.12
3937 43937 1921 20/07/1963 Gorton 42.58
3938 43938 1921 07/04/1962 Saltley 41.33
3939 43939 1921 13/06/1959 Saltley 38.5
3940 43940 1921 24/10/1964 Saltley 43.83
3941 43941 1921 07/09/1957 Toton 36.75
3942 43942 1921 28/12/1963 Royston 43
3943 43943 1921 29/09/1956 Toton 35.75
3944 43944 1921 15/04/1961 Manningham 40.33
3945 43945 1921 06/04/1963 Heaton Mersey 42.33
3946 43946 1921 07/02/1959 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 38.17
3947 43947 1921 24/10/1964 Trafford Park (LMS) 43.83
3948 43948 1921 08/04/1961 Saltley 40.33
3949 43949 1921 26/12/1964 Saltley 44 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1965
3950 43950 1921 16/01/1965 Workington 44.08 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 05/1965
3951 43951 1921 19/09/1964 Toton 43.75 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 10/1964
3952 43952 1921 20/03/1965 Skipton 44.25
3953 43953 1921 06/11/1965 Workington 44.92
3954 43954 1921 21/11/1964 Warrington Dallam 43.92
3955 43955 1921 04/01/1964 Derby 43.08
3956 43956 1921 12/05/1956 Nottingham 35.42
3957 43957 1921 02/05/1964 43.42
3958 43958 1921 05/09/1964 Saltley 43.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1965
3959 43959 1921 05/01/1957 Hasland 36.08
3960 43960 1921 14/11/1964 Skipton 43.92
3961 43961 1921 05/12/1959 Heaton Mersey 39
3962 43962 1921 20/05/1961 Nottingham 40.42
3963 43963 1921 21/11/1964 Workington 43.92 Cut Arnott Young (Dudley Hill) 03/1965
3964 43964 1921 11/09/1965 Workington 44.75
3965 43965 1921 05/12/1959 Saltley 39 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1960
3966 43966 12/1921 05/12/1959 Westhouses 38 39.03
3967 43967 01/1922 28/08/1965 Newton Heath 43.58 43.95
3968 43968 1922 11/1965 Royston 43.92
3969 43969 1922 14/09/1963 Toton 41.75
3970 43970 1922 14/02/1959 Burton 37.17
3971 43971 1922 28/03/1964 Toton 42.25
3972 43972 1922 14/03/1964 Gorton 42.25
3973 43973 1922 09/07/1960 Springs Branch (Wigan) 38.58
3974 43974 1922 14/07/1956 Wellingborough 34.58
3975 43975 1922 16/01/1965 Skipton 43.08
3976 43976 1922 11/04/1964 Lower Darwen 42.33
3977 43977 1922 09/11/1963 Derby 41.92
3978 43978 1922 18/01/1958 Canklow 36.08
3979 43979 1922 14/11/1964 Newton Heath 42.92
3980 43980 1922 06/07/1957 Tebay 35.58
3981 43981 1922 07/08/1965 Carlisle Kingmoor 43.67
3982 43982 1922 26/06/1965 Derby 43.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1965
3983 43983 1922 08/1965 Royston 43.67 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1965
3984 43984 1922 17/01/1959 Lancaster Green Ayre 37.08
3985 43985 1922 31/03/1962 Saltley 40.25
3986 43986 1922 22/02/1964 Hasland 42.17
3987 43987 1921 13/07/1963 Stourton 42.58
3988 43988 1921 10/10/1964 Rowsley 43.83 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 12/1964
3989 43989 1921 23/04/1960 Burton 39.33
3990 43990 1921 05/12/1959 Toton 39
3991 43991 1921 15/05/1965 Westhouses 44.42
3992 43992 1921 09/02/1957 Skipton 36.17
3993 43993 1921 13/07/1957 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 36.58
3994 43994 1921 27/03/1965 Accrington 44.25
3995 43995 1921 15/06/1963 Rowsley 42.5
3996 43996 1921 12/03/1962 Ardrossan 41.25
3997 43997 1921 05/11/1959 Hasland 38.92
3998 43998 1921 14/11/1959 Burton 38.92
3999 43999 1921 22/05/1965 Skipton 44.42
4000 44000 1921 12/1959 Skipton 39
4001 44001 1921 26/03/1962 Corkerhill 41.25
4002 44002 1921 09/1961 Canklow 40.75
4003 44003 1921 05/1965 Stourton 44.42
4004 44004 1921 22/12/1962 Saltley 42
4005 44005 1921 12/1959 Mansfield 39
4006 44006 1921 10/1955 Westhouses 34.83
4007 44007 1921 07/1964 Skipton 43.58
4008 44008 1921 09/1962 Carlisle Kingmoor 41.75
4009 44009 1921 06/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 43.5 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 12/1964
4010 44010 1921 10/1963 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 42.83
4011 44011 1921 01/10/1962 Polmadie 41.83
4012 44012 1921 11/1963 Toton 42.92
4013 44013 12/1921 10/1963 Kettering 41.83 41.86
4014 44014 01/1922 12/1959 Walton on the Hill 37.92 39.52
4015 44015 1922 09/1963 Gorton 41.75
4016 44016 1922 21/07/1962 Carlisle Kingmoor 40.58
4017 44017 1922 08/1957 Derby 35.67
4018 44018 1922 12/1959 Nottingham 38
4019 44019 1922 06/1960 Wakefield 38.5
4020 44020 1922 09/1962 Wellingborough 40.75
4021 44021 1922 12/1959 Nottingham 38
4022 44022 1922 11/1963 Newton Heath 41.92
4023 44023 1922 12/1964 Derby 43
4024 44024 1922 01/1957 Uttoxeter 35.08
4025 44025 1922 11/1964 Newton Heath 42.92
4026 44026 1922 07/1963 Hasland 41.58