GWR Collett "5800" Class 0-4-2T
GWR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5800 | 05/01/1933 | 22/07/1958 | 25.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 29/11/1958 | 25.92 | ||
5801 | 04/01/1933 | 09/09/1958 | 25.67 | Cut | Morkot Ltd (Caerphilly) | ||||
5802 | 07/01/1933 | 29/12/1958 | 25.92 | 26.20 | |||||
5803 | 10/01/1933 | 02/07/1957 | 24.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 07/09/1957 | 24.67 | ||
5804 | 12/01/1933 | 01/06/1959 | 26.42 | 26.61 | |||||
5805 | 18/01/1933 | 24/03/1958 | 25.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 17/05/1958 | 25.34 | ||
5806 | 18/01/1933 | 14/06/1957 | 24.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/08/1957 | 24.58 | ||
5807 | 23/01/1933 | 14/06/1957 | 24.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 07/09/1957 | 24.64 | ||
5808 | 25/01/1933 | 04/02/1957 | 24.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 23/03/1957 | 24.17 | ||
5809 | 01/02/1933 | 10/08/1959 | 26.5 | 26.72 | |||||
5810 | 07/08/1933 | 05/01/1959 | 25.42 | 26.04 | |||||
5811 | 09/08/1933 | 27/05/1957 | 23.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 15/06/1957 | 23.87 | ||
5812 | 10/08/1933 | 18/06/1957 | 23.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/08/1957 | 24.02 | ||
5813 | 14/08/1933 | 30/11/1957 | 24.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 25/01/1958 | 24.47 | ||
5814 | 16/08/1933 | 18/06/1957 | 23.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 13/07/1957 | 23.92 | ||
5815 | 18/08/1933 | 27/04/1961 | 27.67 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 09/1964 | 31.10 | ||
5816 | 22/08/1933 | 02/07/1957 | 23.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 07/09/1957 | 24.06 | ||
5817 | 23/08/1933 | 18/06/1957 | 23.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/08/1957 | 23.98 | ||
5818 | 24/08/1933 | 14/09/1959 | 26.08 | 26.58 | |||||
5819 | 29/08/1933 | 26/06/1957 | 23.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/08/1957 | 23.96 |