Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 66 Today
» 1139 Yesterday
» 2339 Week
» 22072 Month
» 319086 Year
» 395673 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

MR/LMS Fowler "4F" Class 0-6-0


LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
4027 44027 11/1924 11/1964 Workington 40 Prs Preserved
4028 44028 11/1924 11/1965 Stourton 41 41.19
4029 44029 12/1924 07/1960 Cricklewood East 35.58 35.69
4030 44030 12/1924 04/1964 Kettering 39.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1964 39.69
4031 44031 12/1924 05/1960 Derby 35.42 35.44
4032 44032 12/1924 11/1959 Stoke 34.92 35.19
4033 44033 12/1924 10/1961 Nottingham 36.83 37.02
4034 44034 12/1924 07/1963 Leicester Midland 38.58 38.86
4035 44035 01/1925 02/1965 Bescot 40.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1965 40.36
4036 44036 01/1925 21/06/1962 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 37.42 37.61
4037 44037 01/1925 09/1961 Canklow 36.67 36.69
4038 44038 01/1925 04/1964 Toton 39.25 39.27
4039 44039 01/1925 06/1964 Wakefield 39.42 39.52
4040 44040 01/1925 11/1964 Derby 39.83 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 03/1965 40.19
4041 44041 02/1925 06/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 39.33 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 09/1964 39.61
4042 44042 02/1925 10/1964 Derby 39.67 39.94
4043 44043 02/1925 07/1965 Derby 40.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1965 40.69
4044 44044 02/1925 07/1965 Stourton 40.42 40.69
4045 44045 03/1925 11/1964 Gloucester Horton Road 39.67 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1965 40.03
4046 44046 03/1925 09/1963 Rowsley 38.5 38.61
4047 44047 03/1925 10/1963 Toton 38.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1964 39.11
4048 44048 03/1925 08/1964 Uttoxeter 39.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1965 39.87
4049 44049 03/1925 12/1964 Westhouses 39.75 40.11
4050 44050 03/1925 11/1959 Rowsley 34.67 35.19
4051 44051 04/1925 12/1964 Rowsley 39.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1965 40.28
4052 44052 04/1925 06/1960 Kentish Town 35.17 35.19
4053 44053 04/1925 23/03/1963 Hasland 37.92 38.02
4054 44054 05/1925 12/1964 Westhouses 39.58 39.95
4055 44055 05/1925 11/1963 Sowerby Bridge 38.5 38.78
4056 44056 05/1925 11/1965 Royston 40.5 40.70
4057 44057 08/1925 13/11/1965 Saltley 40.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1965 40.36
4058 44058 08/1925 11/1959 Willesden 34.25 34.86
4059 44059 09/1925 08/1964 Newton Heath 38.92 39.36
4060 44060 09/1925 03/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 38.5 38.61
4061 44061 09/1925 06/1965 Workington 39.75 Cut Arnott Young (Dinsdale) 10/1965 40.11
4062 44062 09/1925 09/1962 Wakefield 37 38.52
4063 44063 09/1925 06/1965 Newton Heath 39.75 40.11
4064 44064 10/1925 11/1959 Stoke 34.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1961 35.77
4065 44065 10/1925 01/1965 Workington 39.25 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 04/1965 39.53
4066 44066 10/1925 10/1963 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 38 38.19
4067 44067 10/1925 04/1961 Alsager 35.5 35.61
4068 44068 10/1925 10/1963 Stoke 38 38.36
4069 44069 10/1925 10/1963 Carnforth 38 38.78
4070 44070 11/1925 26/06/1962 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 36.58 36.77
4071 44071 11/1925 22/04/1963 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 37.42 37.61
4072 44072 11/1925 11/1959 Bletchley 34 35.52
4073 44073 11/1925 11/1959 Mold Junction 34 34.94
4074 44074 11/1925 09/1963 Stoke 37.83 38.28
4075 44075 11/1925 27/11/1965 Accrington 40 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1966 40.19
4076 44076 11/1925 07/1965 Newton Heath 39.67 40.36
4077 44077 11/1925 03/1960 Stoke 34.33 34.61
4078 44078 11/1925 04/1964 Gorton 38.42 38.52
4079 44079 11/1925 11/1964 Stoke 39 39.36
4080 44080 11/1925 07/1964 Rowsley 38.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1965 39.19
4081 44081 11/1925 09/1965 Carlisle Kingmoor 39.83 40.19
4082 44082 09/1925 09/1961 Canklow 36 36.02
4083 44083 09/1925 12/1963 Newton Heath 38.25 38.36
4084 44084 10/1925 12/1959 Saltley 34.17 34.61
4085 44085 10/1925 10/1963 Leicester (G.C.) 38 38.28
4086 44086 11/1925 13/11/1965 Workington 40 40.44
4087 44087 11/1925 27/02/1962 Royston 36.25 36.35
4088 44088 11/1925 10/11/1961 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 36 36.19
4089 44089 11/1925 12/1963 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 38.08 38.44
4090 44090 11/1925 10/1961 Heaton Mersey 35.92 37.02
4091 44091 11/1925 02/1964 Derby 38.25 38.36
4092 44092 11/1925 09/1964 Agecroft 38.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1964 39.11
4093 44093 11/1925 03/1960 Stoke 34.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1961 35.69
4094 44094 11/1925 03/05/1963 Sowerby Bridge 37.5 37.86
4095 44095 11/1925 12/1959 Nottingham 34.08 34.94
4096 44096 11/1925 10/1964 Gorton 38.92 Cut Cohens (Ickles) 02/1965 39.28
4097 44097 11/1925 06/1963 Manningham 37.58 38.28
4098 44098 11/1925 12/1963 Royston 38.08 38.28
4099 44099 12/1925 02/1965 Royston 39.17 39.44
4100 44100 12/1925 30/03/1963 Burton 37.25 37.36
4101 44101 12/1925 05/1963 Rowsley 37.42 37.78
4102 44102 12/1925 09/1964 Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 38.75 39.36
4103 44103 12/1925 12/1959 Rowsley 34 34.11
4104 44104 12/1925 24/05/1962 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 36.42 36.69
4105 44105 12/1925 10/1961 Skipton 35.83 36.94
4106 44106 01/1926 02/1964 Toton 38.08 38.69
4107 44107 12/1924 09/1961 Stourton 36.75 36.86
4108 44108 01/1925 12/1959 Saltley 34.92 35.69
4109 44109 02/1925 05/1964 Rowsley 39.25 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 08/1964 39.52
4110 44110 03/1925 04/1964 Newton Heath 39.08 39.53
4111 44111 03/1925 09/1961 Canklow 36.5 36.70
4112 44112 03/1925 19/01/1963 Saltley 37.83 38.02
4113 44113 05/1925 01/1966 Westhouses 40.67 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 05/1966 41.03
4114 44114 05/1925 05/1963 Gorton 38 38.44
4115 44115 05/1925 07/1965 Warrington Dallam 40.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1965 40.45
4116 44116 05/1925 11/1959 Willesden 34.5 35.11
4117 44117 06/1925 09/1964 Accrington 39.25 39.61
4118 44118 06/1925 05/1965 Westhouses 39.92 40.36
4119 44119 06/1925 12/1963 Lower Darwen 38.5 40.03
4120 44120 07/1925 11/1959 Aston 34.33 35.61
4121 44121 07/1925 01/1965 Carnforth 39.5 39.86
4122 44122 07/1925 09/1962 Hasland 37.17 37.19
4123 44123 07/1925 06/1965 Gloucester Horton Road 39.92 Prs Preserved
4124 44124 07/1925 05/1964 Gorton 38.83 39.45
4125 44125 08/1925 03/1965 Skipton 39.58 40.19
4126 44126 08/1925 09/1963 Stoke 38.08 38.36
4127 44127 08/1925 01/1965 Accrington 39.42 39.61
4128 44128 08/1925 29/12/1962 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 37.33 37.86
4129 44129 08/1925 27/09/1962 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 37.08 37.86
4130 44130 09/1925 12/1964 Westhouses 39.25 39.61
4131 44131 09/1925 11/1964 Bury 39.17 39.52
4132 44132 09/1925 08/1963 Nottingham 37.92 38.11
4133 44133 09/1925 11/1963 Toton 38.17 38.44
4134 44134 09/1925 11/1964 Rowsley 39.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1965 39.86
4135 44135 09/1925 04/1965 Bristol Barrow Road 39.58 39.78
4136 44136 10/1925 12/1959 Hasland 34.17 35.02
4137 44137 10/1925 02/1965 39.33 40.11
4138 44138 10/1925 14/07/1962 Derby 36.75 36.77
4139 44139 10/1925 08/1965 Bescot 39.83 40.11
4140 44140 10/1925 12/1959 Toton 34.17 34.27
4141 44141 11/1925 07/1961 Royston 35.67 35.94
4142 44142 11/1925 12/1959 Derby 34.08 34.61
4143 44143 11/1925 13/10/1962 Saltley 36.92 36.94
4144 44144 11/1925 08/1959 Heaton Mersey 33.75 33.85
4145 44145 11/1925 02/1959 Toton 33.25 33.35
4146 44146 11/1925 11/1964 Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 39 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1965 39.44
4147 44147 11/1925 09/1961 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 35.83 35.86
4146 44148 11/1925 05/1961 Rowsley 35.5 35.77
4149 44149 11/1925 11/1964 Skipton 39 39.44
4150 44150 11/1925 26/01/1963 Rowsley 37.17 37.35
4151 44151 12/1925 12/1963 Gorton 38 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1964 38.19
4152 44152 12/1925 09/1961 March 35.75 36.27
4153 44153 12/1925 29/04/1963 Sowerby Bridge 37.33 37.78
4154 44154 12/1925 07/04/1962 Westhouses 36.33 36.36
4155 44155 12/1925 10/1965 Bescot 39.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1965 39.95
4156 44156 12/1925 02/1964 Wellingborough 38.17 38.95
4157 44157 12/1925 07/1965 Workington 39.58 39.95
4158 44158 12/1925 14/07/1962 Leicester Midland 36.58 36.69
4159 44159 02/1926 01/10/1962 Hurlford 36.67 37.77
4160 44160 02/1926 12/1965 Workington 39.83 40.10
4161 44161 02/1926 12/1959 Toton 33.83 34.77
4162 44162 02/1926 12/1963 Toton 37.83 38.94
4163 44163 02/1926 07/1960 Rowsley 34.42 34.52
4164 44164 02/1926 07/1963 Gorton 37.42 37.77
4165 44165 02/1926 08/1964 Newton Heath 38.5 38.94
4166 44166 02/1926 27/01/1962 Rowsley 35.92 36.10
4167 44167 03/1926 01/1964 Yeovil Pen Mill 37.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1964 38.36
4168 44168 03/1926 10/1963 Derby 37.58 37.70
4169 44169 03/1926 08/1965 Newton Heath 39.42 39.78
4170 44170 03/1926 11/1965 Normanton 39.67 39.87
4171 44171 03/1926 05/1964 Rowsley 38.17 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 08/1964 38.45
4172 44172 03/1926 05/1964 Derby 38.17 38.78
4173 44173 04/1926 12/1959 Westhouses 33.67 35.53
4174 44174 04/1926 12/1963 Canklow 37.67 38.11
4175 44175 04/1926 12/1959 Wellingborough 33.67 35.36
4176 44176 04/1926 07/1963 Derby 37.25 37.61
4177 44177 12/1924 11/1964 Trafford Park (LMS) 39.92 40.20
4178 44178 12/1924 11/1964 Westhouses 39.92 40.27
4179 44179 01/1925 12/1964 Saltley 39.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1965 40.03
4180 44180 02/1925 04/1964 Saltley 39.17 39.36
4181 44181 02/1925 08/1965 Warrington Dallam 40.5 40.94
4182 44182 02/1925 09/1964 Kettering 39.58 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 03/1965 40.10
4183 44183 03/1925 10/1963 Carlisle Kingmoor 38.58 39.03
4184 44184 03/1925 10/1963 Rowsley 38.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1964 39.03
4185 44185 03/1925 11/1964 Gorton 39.67 39.95
4186 44186 03/1925 10/1963 Workington 38.58 40.11
4187 44187 04/1925 21/07/1962 Saltley 37.25 37.36
4188 44188 04/1925 13/11/1965 Bescot 40.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1966 40.87
4189 44189 04/1925 29/12/1962 Hurlford 37.67 38.61
4190 44190 05/1925 09/1963 Gorton 38.33 38.61
4191 44191 05/1925 08/1964 Westhouses 39.25 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 10/1964 39.45
4192 44192 06/1925 04/1965 Workington 39.83 40.19
4193 44193 06/1925 01/10/1962 Motherwell 37.33 38.28
4194 44194 06/1925 29/12/1962 St Rollox (Balornock) 37.5 37.94
4195 44195 07/1925 03/1965 Warrington Dallam 39.67 39.86
4196 44196 07/1925 08/01/1962 Motherwell 36.5 36.94
4197 44197 10/1925 09/1964 Skipton 38.92 Cut Cohens (Cargo Fleet) 01/1965 39.28
4198 44198 10/1925 29/12/1962 Hurlford 37.17 38.36
4199 44199 10/1925 29/12/1962 St Rollox (Balornock) 37.17 38.11
4200 44200 10/1925 07/1965 Workington 39.75 40.28
4201 44201 10/1925 09/1959 Saltley 33.92 34.02
4202 44202 10/1925 09/1963 Mansfield 37.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1963 38.11
4203 44203 11/1925 03/1966 Westhouses 40.33 40.61
4204 44204 11/1925 12/1959 Nottingham 34.08 34.94
4205 44205 11/1925 03/03/1963 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 37.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1963 37.52
4206 44206 11/1925 06/1961 Canklow 35.58 35.61
4207 44207 11/1925 11/1963 Stourton 38 38.19
4208 44208 11/1925 10/1963 Stoke 37.92 38.11
4209 44209 11/1925 06/1963 Yeovil Pen Mill 37.58 37.77
4210 44210 11/1925 10/1965 Bescot 39.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1965 40.11
4211 44211 12/1925 03/1965 Skipton 39.25 39.86
4212 44212 12/1925 12/1963 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 38 38.44
4213 44213 12/1925 06/1964 Derby 38.5 39.03
4214 44214 12/1925 12/1964 Westhouses 39 39.36
4215 44215 12/1925 02/1965 Derby 39.17 39.44
4216 44216 12/1925 09/1962 Manningham 36.75 38.19
4217 44217 01/1926 12/1959 Hasland 33.92 34.77
4218 44218 01/1926 03/1966 Westhouses 40.17 40.44
4219 44219 01/1926 11/1963 Warrington Dallam 37.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1964 38.11
4220 44220 01/1926 09/1964 Gorton 38.67 Cut Cohens (Ickles) 02/1965 39.11
4221 44221 01/1926 05/1964 Newton Heath 38.33 38.86
4222 44222 01/1926 11/1964 Skipton 38.83 39.27
4223 44223 01/1926 11/1963 Toton 37.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1964 38.19
4224 44224 01/1926 03/02/1962 Toton 36.08 36.19
4225 44225 02/1926 11/1959 Wigan Central (L&Y) 33.75 35.35
4226 44226 02/1926 09/1964 Saltley 38.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1965 38.94
4227 44227 02/1926 12/1959 Saltley 33.83 34.35
4228 44228 02/1926 29/12/1962 Coalville 36.83 37.10
4229 44229 02/1926 11/1964 Westhouses 38.75 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 03/1965 39.10
4230 44230 02/1926 12/1959 Saltley 33.83 35.02
4231 44231 02/1926 06/1963 Leicester Midland 37.33 37.85
4232 44232 03/1926 11/1963 Warrington Dallam 37.67 37.86
4233 44233 03/1926 11/1964 Westhouses 38.67 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 03/1965 39.03
4234 44234 03/1926 01/10/1962 Grangemouth 36.58 37.61
4235 44235 03/1926 12/1964 Westhouses 38.75 39.11
4236 44236 03/1926 10/1964 Gorton 38.58 39.19
4237 44237 03/1926 10/1963 Warrington Dallam 37.58 38.11
4238 44238 03/1926 12/1963 Stourton 37.75 37.95
4239 44239 04/1926 10/1963 Warrington Dallam 37.5 38.28
4240 44240 04/1926 09/1964 Skipton 38.42 38.70
4241 44241 04/1926 07/1963 Annesley 37.25 37.61
4242 44242 04/1926 05/1964 Gorton 38.08 39.03
4243 44243 04/1926 09/1965 Westhouses 39.42 39.70
4244 44244 04/1926 10/1964 Rowsley 38.5 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 12/1964 38.70
4245 44245 04/1926 17/05/1962 Canklow 36.08 36.11
4246 44246 05/1926 12/1964 Carnforth 38.58 40.19
4247 44247 05/1926 04/12/1965 Newton Heath 39.58 39.78
4248 44248 05/1926 09/1964 Derby 38.33 Cut Cohens (Ickles) 03/1965 38.86
4249 44249 06/1926 08/11/1961 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 35.42 35.61
4250 44250 06/1926 05/1965 Derby 38.92 39.19
4251 44251 06/1926 01/10/1962 Polmadie 36.33 36.53
4252 44252 07/1926 04/05/1963 Mansfield 36.83 36.86
4253 44253 07/1926 01/10/1962 Perth South 36.25 36.28
4254 44254 07/1926 01/10/1962 Perth South 36.25 36.36
4255 44255 07/1926 29/12/1962 Oban 36.42 37.36
4256 44256 07/1926 30/04/1962 Polmadie 35.75 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 05/1963 36.86
4257 44257 07/1926 01/10/1962 Perth South 36.25 37.02
4258 44258 08/1926 21/05/1962 Inverness 35.75 35.86
4259 44259 08/1926 08/1964 Rowsley 38 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1964 38.19
4260 44260 08/1926 10/1964 Rowsley 38.17 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 12/1964 38.36
4261 44261 09/1926 10/1963 Hasland 37.08 37.11
4262 44262 09/1926 09/1963 Rowsley 37 37.11
4263 44263 10/1926 03/1965 Skipton 38.42 39.03
4264 44264 10/1926 11/1965 Gloucester Horton Road 39.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 02/1966 39.36
4265 44265 10/1926 12/1963 Canklow 37.17 37.61
4266 44266 10/1926 03/1965 Accrington 38.42 39.03
4267 44267 10/1926 24/05/1962 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 35.58 35.86
4268 44268 10/1926 02/03/1963 Mansfield 36.42 36.52
4269 44269 10/1926 03/12/1965 Gloucester Horton Road 39.17 39.44
4270 44270 11/1926 11/1963 Toton 37 37.28
4271 44271 11/1926 12/1965 Newton Heath 39.08 39.44
4272 44272 11/1926 06/1963 Yeovil Pen Mill 36.58 36.86
4273 44273 11/1926 16/09/1962 March 35.83 36.86
4274 44274 11/1926 12/1963 Royston 37.08 37.19
4275 44275 11/1926 10/1964 Trafford Park (LMS) 37.92 38.28
4276 44276 12/1926 05/1965 Skipton 38.42 38.78
4277 44277 12/1926 05/1965 Skipton 38.42 38.78
4278 44278 12/1926 01/1966 Westhouses 39.08 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 05/1966 39.44
4279 44279 12/1926 01/1964 Rowsley 37.08 38.11
4280 44280 12/1926 12/1963 Carnforth 37 37.19
4281 44281 12/1926 29/12/1962 Hurlford 36 36.94
4282 44282 12/1926 07/1963 Carlisle Kingmoor 36.58 37.44
4283 44283 12/1926 29/12/1962 Hurlford 36 37.19
4284 44284 12/1926 08/1964 Derby 37.67 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 12/1964 38.03
4285 44285 12/1926 12/1959 Westhouses 33 34.02
4286 44286 12/1926 05/1964 Toton 37.42 38.03
4287 44287 12/1926 12/1963 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 37 37.44
4288 44288 01/1927 04/1964 Hasland 37.25 37.52
4289 44289 01/1927 06/1964 Rowsley 37.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1964 37.69
4290 44290 01/1927 06/1964 Royston 37.42 37.61
4291 44291 01/1927 11/1959 Walton on the Hill 32.83 34.52
4292 44292 01/1927 08/1963 Kirkby Stephen 36.58 37.52
4293 44293 01/1927 12/1959 Upminster 32.92 34.52
4294 44294 02/1927 11/1965 Warrington Dallam 38.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1966 39.44
4295 44295 02/1927 02/1964 Toton 37 37.02
4296 44296 02/1927 01/1964 Bristol Barrow Road 36.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1964 37.44
4297 44297 02/1927 09/1963 Nottingham 36.58 36.77
4298 44298 02/1927 12/1959 Kentish Town 32.83 33.27
4299 44299 02/1927 05/1963 Stoke 36.25 36.35
4300 44300 02/1927 04/12/1965 Barrow in Furness 38.83 39.03
4301 44301 03/1927 04/1964 Carnforth 37.08 37.19
4302 44302 10/1926 03/1964 Carnforth 37.42 37.53
4303 44303 10/1926 09/1963 Springs Branch (Wigan) 36.92 37.02
4304 44304 10/1926 05/1964 Toton 37.58 38.19
4305 44305 10/1926 04/1965 Carlisle Kingmoor 38.5 38.78
4306 44306 10/1926 11/1959 Barrow in Furness 33.08 33.36
4307 44307 10/1926 06/10/1962 Stoke 36 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1963 36.61
4308 44308 09/1926 10/1963 Stoke 37.08 37.27
4309 44309 10/1926 07/1963 Stoke 36.75 37.11
4310 44310 10/1926 02/1966 Workington 39.33 39.61
4311 44311 10/1926 07/1966 Workington 39.75 40.03
4312 44312 11/1927 01/10/1962 Hurlford 34.92 35.94
4313 44313 11/1927 12/1959 Nottingham 32.08 32.94
4314 44314 12/1927 16/07/1962 Perth South 34.58 35.02
4315 44315 12/1927 05/1964 Newton Heath 36.42 36.86
4316 44316 12/1927 12/1959 Burton 32 33.02
4317 44317 12/1927 12/1959 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 32 33.11
4318 44318 01/1928 01/10/1962 Polmadie 34.75 34.94
4319 44319 01/1928 27/11/1961 Ayr 33.83 34.02
4320 44320 01/1928 01/10/1962 Grangemouth 34.75 35.69
4321 44321 01/1928 04/1964 Westhouses 36.25 36.86
4322 44322 01/1928 29/12/1962 Hurlford 34.92 36.19
4323 44323 01/1928 01/10/1962 Corkerhill 34.75 35.77
4324 44324 01/1928 11/11/1961 Carlisle Kingmoor 33.83 Cut Halbeath Wagon Works (Dunfermline) 03/1962 34.19
4325 44325 02/1928 01/10/1962 Hurlford 34.67 35.77
4326 44326 02/1928 12/1959 Stoke 31.83 31.85
4327 44327 02/1928 05/1964 Burton 36.25 36.86
4328 44328 02/1928 29/12/1962 Perth South 34.83 35.69
4329 44329 03/1928 16/07/1962 Ayr 34.33 35.19
4330 44330 03/1928 01/10/1962 Corkerhill 34.58 35.61
4331 44331 03/1928 29/12/1962 Hurlford 34.75 35.95
4332 44332 10/1926 09/1964 Burton 37.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1965 38.28
4333 44333 10/1926 05/1964 Derby 37.58 38.19
4334 44334 10/1926 06/1965 Derby 38.67 39.03
4335 44335 10/1926 25/02/1963 Stourton 36.33 36.94
4336 44336 10/1926 12/1963 Normanton 37.17 37.36
4337 44337 10/1926 05/1964 Normanton 37.58 37.78
4338 44338 10/1926 09/1962 Normanton 35.92 37.28
4339 44339 10/1926 12/1965 Newton Heath 39.17 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 04/1966 39.53
4340 44340 10/1926 03/12/1962 Bescot 36.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1965 38.36
4341 44341 12/1926 16/02/1963 Carlisle Kingmoor 36.17 36.44
4342 44342 12/1926 10/1963 Stoke 36.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1964 37.36
4343 44343 01/1927 03/1960 Kirkby Stephen 33.17 33.52
4344 44344 01/1927 12/1964 Kettering 37.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1965 38.27
4345 44345 01/1927 12/1963 Heaton Mersey 36.92 37.86
4346 44346 01/1927 06/11/1965 Workington 38.83 39.03
4347 44347 03/1927 03/1965 Lower Darwen 38 38.61
4348 44348 04/1927 08/1964 Workington 37.33 37.78
4349 44349 04/1927 07/1965 Warrington Dallam 38.25 38.53
4350 44350 04/1927 12/1965 Workington 38.67 39.03
4351 44351 05/1927 06/04/1963 Workington 35.92 37.11
4352 44352 05/1927 10/1963 Stoke 36.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1964 36.95
4353 44353 05/1927 02/1965 Newton Heath 37.75 38.03
4354 44354 05/1927 10/1963 Stoke 36.42 36.78
4355 44355 06/1927 09/1965 Westhouses 38.25 38.53
4356 44356 06/1927 11/1965 Workington 38.42 38.61
4357 44357 01/1927 11/1959 Uttoxeter 32.83 34.35
4358 44358 01/1927 01/1965 Carlisle Kingmoor 38 38.52
4359 44359 01/1927 07/1963 Mold Junction 36.5 36.94
4360 44360 02/1927 03/1960 Kirkby Stephen 33.08 33.94
4361 44361 02/1927 11/1959 Heaton Mersey 32.75 34.94
4362 44362 04/1927 09/1964 Westhouses 37.42 Cut Cohens (Ickles) 04/1965 38.03
4363 44363 04/1927 10/1963 36.5 36.78
4364 44364 04/1927 01/1964 Newton Heath 36.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1965 38.70
4365 44365 05/1927 11/1959 Kirkby Stephen 32.5 33.70
4366 44366 05/1927 03/1960 Workington 32.83 33.53
4367 44367 06/1927 09/1964 Workington 37.25 37.70
4368 44368 07/1927 09/1962 Stourton 35.17 36.19
4369 44369 07/1927 12/1959 Derby 32.42 33.19
4370 44370 07/1927 09/1963 Stoke 36.17 36.69
4371 44371 08/1927 06/1961 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 33.83 33.86
4372 44372 09/1927 11/1959 Willesden 32.17 32.77
4373 44373 10/1927 12/1964 37.17 37.61
4374 44374 10/1927 02/03/1963 35.42 35.61
4375 44375 11/1927 10/1960 Stoke 32.92 32.94
4376 44376 11/1927 12/1964 Derby 37.08 37.36
4377 44377 12/1927 10/1966 38.83 39.20
4378 44378 12/1927 04/05/1963 Trafford Park (LMS) 35.42 35.44
4379 44379 12/1927 26/09/1964 Derby 36.75 Cut Cohens (Ickles) 03/1965 37.27
4380 44380 01/1928 08/1964 Burton 36.58 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 10/1964 36.78
4381 44381 01/1928 09/1964 Hasland 36.67 Cut Cohens (Ickles) 02/1965 37.11
4382 44382 09/1926 11/1959 Stockport Edgeley 33.17 33.52
4383 44383 09/1926 11/1959 Stoke 33.17 33.36
4384 44384 09/1926 10/1964 Warrington Dallam 38.08 38.52
4385 44385 10/1926 08/1959 Crewe South 32.83 32.85
4386 44386 10/1926 05/1965 Barrow in Furness 38.58 39.03
4387 44387 10/1926 10/1963 Westhouses 37 37.53
4388 44388 10/1926 29/12/1962 Toton 36.17 36.36
4389 44389 10/1926 07/1965 Skipton 38.75 39.11
4390 44390 10/1926 11/1965 Workington 39.08 39.28
4391 44391 10/1926 03/1960 Northampton 33.42 33.61
4392 44392 10/1926 06/1964 Trafford Park (LMS) 37.67 38.28
4393 44393 10/1926 05/11/1962 Holbeck (MR) 36.08 36.44
4394 44394 10/1926 07/1966 Workington 39.75 40.03
4395 44395 10/1926 12/1963 Stoke 37.17 38.19
4396 44396 10/1926 06/1964 Trafford Park (LMS) 37.67 38.28
4397 44397 12/1926 31/03/1962 Bletchley 35.25 35.36
4398 44398 12/1926 07/1963 Lower Darwen 36.58 36.69
4399 44399 12/1926 02/1964 Trafford Park (LMS) 37.17 38.36
4400 44400 01/1927 11/1965 Normanton 38.83 39.03
4401 44401 01/1927 06/1965 Derby 38.42 38.78
4402 44402 01/1927 01/1965 Trafford Park (LMS) 38 38.27
4403 44403 01/1927 06/1964 Rowsley 37.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1964 37.78
4404 44404 01/1927 02/12/1962 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 35.92 36.35
4405 44405 01/1927 06/1966 39.42 39.78
4406 44406 01/1927 03/1960 Saltley 33.17 33.44
4407 44407 08/1927 09/1962 Heaton Mersey 35.08 35.11
4408 44408 08/1927 11/1965 Normanton 38.25 38.45
4409 44409 08/1927 09/12/1961 Toton 34.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1962 34.61
4410 44410 08/1927 03/1960 Hasland 32.58 33.19
4411 44411 09/1927 10/1963 Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 36.08 36.61
4412 44412 09/1927 03/1960 Nottingham 32.5 33.11
4413 44413 09/1927 02/03/1963 Saltley 35.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1963 35.85
4414 44414 09/1927 05/1965 Derby 37.67 37.94
4415 44415 09/1927 03/1960 Annesley 32.5 32.94
4416 44416 09/1927 07/1963 Mansfield 35.83 36.11
4417 44417 09/1927 27/11/1962 Yeovil Pen Mill 35.17 35.69
4418 44418 09/1927 10/1963 Derby 36.08 37.03
4419 44419 09/1927 09/1963 Saltley 36 37.11
4420 44420 10/1927 09/1965 Westhouses 37.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1966 38.28
4421 44421 10/1927 12/1964 Stoke 37.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1965 37.53
4422 44422 10/1927 06/1965 Gloucester Horton Road 37.67 Prs Preserved
4423 44423 10/1927 11/1959 Leicester Midland 32.08
4424 44424 10/1927 10/1963 Stoke 36 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1964 36.53
4425 44425 10/1927 02/1965 Newton Heath 37.33 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 05/1965 37.61
4426 44426 10/1927 12/1963 Canklow 36.17 36.53
4427 44427 10/1927 03/1960 Toton 32.42 33.11
4428 44428 10/1927 02/1964 Rowsley 36.33 36.86
4429 44429 10/1927 05/1965 Derby 37.58 37.86
4430 44430 11/1927 03/1960 Westhouses 32.33 33.11
4431 44431 11/1927 09/1964 Newton Heath 36.83 Cut Cohens (Ickles) 02/1965 37.28
4432 44432 11/1927 10/1963 Stoke 35.92 37.19
4433 44433 11/1927 12/1964 Rowsley 37.08 37.44
4434 44434 11/1927 09/1963 Burton 35.83 35.94
4435 44435 12/1927 13/10/1962 Burton 34.83 34.94
4436 44436 12/1927 04/1964 Burton 36.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1964 36.78
4437 44437 11/1927 12/1963 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 36.08 36.52
4438 44438 12/1927 03/1960 Springs Branch (Wigan) 32.25 33.78
4439 44439 12/1927 04/1964 Accrington 36.33 37.03
4440 44440 12/1927 04/1964 Bescot 36.33 36.36
4441 44441 12/1927 09/1964 Derby 36.75 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 11/1964 36.95
4442 44442 12/1927 07/1963 Bescot 35.58 35.86
4443 44443 12/1927 08/1965 Workington 37.67 38.03
4444 44444 12/1927 09/1963 Springs Branch (Wigan) 35.75 35.86
4445 44445 12/1927 06/1963 Stockport Edgeley 35.5 36.69
4446 44446 12/1927 11/1965 Royston 37.92 38.03
4447 44447 01/1928 07/1963 Workington 35.5 35.94
4448 44448 01/1928 11/1963 Bescot 35.83 Cut Arnott Young (Dudley Hill) 12/1963 35.94
4449 44449 01/1928 08/1965 Workington 37.58 37.94
4450 44450 02/1928 05/1965 37.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1965 37.61
4451 44451 02/1928 12/1965 Workington 37.83 38.10
4452 44452 02/1928 06/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 36.33 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 12/1964 36.86
4453 44453 02/1928 03/1960 Alsager 32.08 32.61
4454 44454 02/1928 10/1963 Derby 35.67 35.77
4455 44455 02/1928 23/03/1963 Stoke 35.08 35.52
4456 44456 02/1928 03/1965 Skipton 37.08 37.52
4457 44457 03/1928 12/1963 Normanton 35.75 35.95
4458 44458 03/1928 11/1965 Normanton 37.67 37.86
4459 44459 04/1928 03/1960 Stoke 31.92 32.61
4460 44460 05/1928 10/1964 Newton Heath 36.42 36.78
4461 44461 05/1928 09/1964 Workington 36.33 36.70
4462 44462 05/1928 13/11/1965 Workington 37.5 37.78
4463 44463 05/1928 09/1964 Hasland 36.33 Cut Cohens (Ickles) 02/1965 36.78
4464 44464 05/1928 05/1964 Barrow in Furness 36 36.28
4465 44465 06/1928 07/1963 Toton 35.08 35.27
4466 44466 07/1928 05/1965 Bristol Barrow Road 36.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 08/1965 37.11
4467 44467 05/1928 04/1964 Stourton 35.92 36.53
4468 44468 05/1928 09/1964 Skipton 36.33 Cut Cohens (South Bank, Middlesbrough) 12/1964 36.61
4469 44469 05/1928 30/03/1963 Carlisle Kingmoor 34.83 35.19
4470 44470 05/1928 06/1963 Mansfield 35.08 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 10/1963 35.44
4471 44471 06/1928 03/1960 Walton on the Hill 31.75 33.10
4472 44472 06/1928 05/1963 Nottingham 34.92 35.10
4473 44473 07/1928 03/1960 Stoke 31.67 32.85
4474 44474 07/1928 21/12/1961 Mirfield 33.42 34.69
4475 44475 08/1928 10/02/1963 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 34.5 34.85
4476 44476 08/1928 04/05/1963 Toton 34.75 34.94
4477 44477 12/1927 07/1961 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 33.58 33.69
4478 44478 12/1927 11/1964 Bangor 36.92 37.27
4479 44479 12/1927 05/1964 Lower Darwen 36.42 36.86
4480 44480 11/1927 03/1960 Nottingham 32.33 33.52
4481 44481 12/1927 11/1964 Newton Heath 36.92 37.20
4482 44482 12/1927 02/05/1962 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 34.42 34.44
4483 44483 12/1927 03/1960 Lower Darwen 32.25 34.61
4484 44484 12/1927 11/1964 Workington 36.92 Cut Arnott Young (Dudley Hill) 03/1965 37.27
4485 44485 12/1927 19/04/1963 Stourton 35.33 35.78
4486 44486 12/1927 01/1965 Gorton 37.08 37.36
4487 44487 12/1927 07/04/1962 Workington 34.33 34.69
4488 44488 12/1927 03/1960 Bescot 32.25 32.94
4489 44489 12/1927 08/1965 Workington 37.67 37.95
4490 44490 12/1927 08/1965 Carnforth 37.67 38.03
4491 44491 12/1927 08/10/1962 Holbeck (MR) 34.83 35.02
4492 44492 10/1927 05/1964 Rowsley 36.58 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 08/1964 36.86
4493 44493 11/1927 10/1963 Accrington 35.92 36.69
4494 44494 11/1927 07/1963 Warrington Dallam 35.67 35.86
4495 44495 11/1927 03/1960 Kirkby Stephen 32.33 32.69
4496 44496 11/1927 03/1960 Stoke 32.33 32.77
4497 44497 11/1927 11/1964 Newton Heath 37 37.44
4498 44498 11/1927 03/1960 Stoke 32.33 32.86
4499 44499 11/1927 09/1964 Stoke 36.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1965 37.19
4500 44500 11/1927 07/1966 Workington 38.67 39.03
4501 44501 11/1927 12/1964 Rowsley 37.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1965 37.69
4502 44502 11/1927 03/1960 Stoke 32.33 33.02
4503 44503 11/1927 03/1960 Alsager 32.33 32.86
4504 44504 11/1927 10/1963 Bangor 35.92 36.11
4505 44505 11/1927 09/1965 Workington 37.83 38.11
4506 44506 12/1927 03/1960 Monument Lane 32.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1961 33.52
4507 44507 06/1928 03/1960 Stoke 31.75 32.36
4508 44508 06/1928 09/1962 Buxton (LNWR) 34.25 34.27
4509 44509 08/1928 16/09/1962 March 34.08 34.69
4510 44510 06/1928 02/1960 Barrow in Furness 31.67 31.77
4511 44511 06/1928 03/1960 Workington 31.75 32.44
4512 44512 06/1928 02/1964 Gorton 35.67 36.44
4513 44513 06/1928 03/1960 Stoke 31.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1961 33.10
4514 44514 06/1928 09/1964 Derby 36.25 Cut Cohens (Ickles) 03/1965 36.77
4515 44515 06/1928 03/1960 Saltley 31.75 32.10
4516 44516 06/1928 09/1964 Saltley 36.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1965 36.61
4517 44517 07/1928 10/1963 Rowsley 35.25 35.53
4518 44518 07/1928 09/1962 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 34.17 34.19
4519 44519 07/1928 26/01/1963 Leicester Midland 34.5 34.69
4520 44520 07/1928 01/1964 Willesden 35.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1964 36.11
4521 44521 07/1928 16/09/1962 March 34.17 34.77
4522 44522 07/1928 10/1965 Warrington Dallam 37.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1966 37.94
4523 44523 08/1928 08/1963 Yeovil Pen Mill 35 35.11
4524 44524 08/1928 19/01/1963 Buxton (LNWR) 34.42 34.85
4525 44525 08/1928 10/1966 38.17 38.61
4526 44526 08/1928 11/1963 Burton 35.25 35.36
4527 44527 08/1928 03/1965 Skipton 36.58 37.02
4528 44528 08/1928 05/1965 Westhouses 36.75 37.19
4529 44529 08/1928 09/1964 Wellingborough 36.08 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 11/1964 36.28
4530 44530 09/1928 10/1963 Kettering 35.08 35.27
4531 44531 09/1928 04/1964 Toton 35.58 36.27
4532 44532 09/1928 27/04/1963 Toton 34.58 34.85
4533 44533 09/1928 02/1964 Trafford Park (LMS) 35.42 35.69
4534 44534 09/1928 11/1964 Bristol Barrow Road 36.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1965 36.61
4535 44535 09/1928 10/1963 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 35.08 35.27
4536 44536 09/1928 08/1965 Workington 36.92 37.27
4537 44537 09/1928 08/10/1962 Holbeck (MR) 34.08 34.10
4538 44538 10/1928 01/1964 Burton 35.25 35.36
4539 44539 10/1928 09/1963 Leicester (G.C.) 34.92 35.02
4540 44540 10/1928 05/1964 Kettering 35.58 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 08/1964 35.86
4541 44541 10/1928 11/1963 Toton 35.08 35.36
4542 44542 11/1928 07/1963 Burton 34.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1963 34.94
4543 44543 11/1928 05/1964 Newton Heath 35.5 36.11
4544 44544 11/1928 04/1965 Newton Heath 36.42 36.94
4545 44545 11/1928 23/03/1963 Derby 34.33 34.68
4546 44546 11/1928 03/1960 Nottingham 31.33 31.94
4547 44547 11/1928 09/1961 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 32.83 32.85
4548 44548 11/1928 01/1965 Skipton 36.17 Cut Arnott Young (Dudley Hill) 05/1965 36.52
4549 44549 12/1928 05/1964 Workington 35.42 36.36
4550 44550 12/1928 02/03/1962 Royston 33.25 33.27
4551 44551 12/1928 05/1963 Burton 34.42 34.60
4552 44552 12/1928 09/1964 Burton 35.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1965 36.11
4553 44553 12/1928 27/10/1962 Warrington Dallam 33.83 33.94
4554 44554 12/1928 03/1964 Rowsley 35.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1965 36.11
4555 44555 12/1928 03/1960 Nottingham 31.25 31.85
4556 44556 12/1928 12/1963 Rowsley 35 35.69
4557 44557 04/1922 15/09/1962 Carlisle Kingmoor 40.42 40.45
4558 44558 04/1922 12/1964 Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 42.67 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1965 43.03
4559 44559 04/1922 09/02/1963 Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 40.83 41.11
4560 44560 04/1922 09/1965 Gloucester Horton Road 43.42 43.70
4561 44561 04/1922 04/1962 Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 40 40.11
4562 44562 05/1937 11/1963 Burton 26.5 26.52
4563 44563 07/1937 03/1960 Kentish Town 22.67 22.85
4564 44564 07/1937 09/1964 Trafford Park (LMS) 27.17 Cut Cohens (Ickles) 02/1965 27.61
4565 44565 07/1937 09/1964 Trafford Park (LMS) 27.17 Cut Cohens (Ickles) 02/1965 27.61
4566 44566 07/1937 09/1964 Trafford Park (LMS) 27.17 Cut Cohens (Ickles) 02/1965 27.61
4567 44567 07/1937 06/1964 Bury 26.92 27.36
4568 44568 08/1937 11/1963 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 26.25 26.44
4569 44569 08/1937 07/1964 Bristol Barrow Road 26.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1964 27.35
4570 44570 08/1937 11/1965 Stourton 28.25 28.52
4571 44571 08/1937 12/1964 Crewe South 27.33 28.02
4572 44572 09/1937 09/1964 Derby 27 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 11/1964 27.19
4573 44573 09/1937 24/05/1962 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 24.67 24.93
4574 44574 09/1937 10/1963 Derby 26.08 26.35
4575 44575 09/1937 11/1964 Rowsley 27.17 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 02/1965 27.44
4576 44576 10/1937 17/05/1962 Canklow 24.58 24.68
4577 44577 04/1939 Nottingham 09/1964 Toton 25.42 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 11/1964 25.61
4578 44578 04/1939 02/1964 Derby 24.83 25.44
4579 44579 04/1939 03/11/1962 Skipton 23.58 23.60
4580 44580 05/1939 11/1964 Saltley 25.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1965 25.85
4581 44581 05/1939 09/1964 Rowsley 25.33 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 03/1965 25.85
4582 44582 05/1939 11/1963 Royston 24.5 24.60
4583 44583 06/1939 08/1964 Crewe South 25.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1964 25.35
4584 44584 07/1939 11/1963 Stourton 24.33 24.52
4585 44585 07/1939 09/1960 Nottingham 21.17 21.19
4586 44586 09/1939 09/1964 Stourton 25 25.44
4587 44587 09/1939 05/1965 Newton Heath 25.67 26.10
4588 44588 09/1939 09/1964 Derby 25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1965 25.35
4589 44589 09/1939 11/1964 Warrington Dallam 25.17 25.60
4590 44590 09/1939 09/1961 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 22 22.02
4591 44591 10/1939 11/1964 Derby 25.08 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 03/1965 25.43
4592 44592 10/1939 10/1963 Crewe South 24 24.27
4593 44593 10/1939 12/1964 25.17 25.60
4594 44594 10/1939 08/10/1962 Holbeck (MR) 23 23.27
4595 44595 10/1939 10/1963 Mold Junction 24 24.52
4596 44596 11/1939 09/1963 Accrington 23.83 24.68
4597 44597 03/1940 09/1965 Workington 25.5 25.85
4598 44598 03/1940 10/1963 Westhouses 23.58 23.94
4599 44599 04/1940 11/1965 Newton Heath 25.58 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 01/1966 25.77
4600 44600 07/1940 03/1960 Burton 19.67 20.27
4601 44601 08/1940 13/11/1965 Workington 25.25 25.68
4602 44602 08/1940 09/1964 Gorton 24.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1964 24.35
4603 44603 09/1940 10/1964 Hasland 24.08 24.35
4604 44604 09/1940 01/1964 Normanton 23.33 23.43
4605 44605 02/1941 09/1964 Saltley 23.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1965 23.93
4606 44606 03/1941 23/03/1962 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 21 21.68