Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 408 Today
» 1018 Yesterday
» 408 Week
» 9150 Month
» 353329 Year
» 864431 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Fowler "4P" Class 2-6-4T


LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
2300 42300 09/12/1927 26/11/1960 Trafford Park (LMS) 32.92 33.37
2301 42301 20/12/1927 19/10/1963 Carlisle Kingmoor 35.83 36.26
2302 42302 22/12/1927 20/09/1961 Kentish Town 33.75 35.40
2303 42303 30/12/1927 27/10/1962 Springs Branch (Wigan) 34.83 35.90
2304 42304 06/01/1928 08/09/1962 Carlisle Kingmoor 34.67 35.20
2305 42305 13/01/1928 01/09/1962 Swansea East Dock 34.67 34.69
2306 42306 19/01/1928 29/12/1962 Buxton (LNWR) 34.92 35.13
2307 42307 26/01/1928 27/09/1961 Swansea East Dock 33.67 33.74
2308 42308 28/01/1928 29/08/1959 Chester Northgate 31.58 31.99
2309 42309 03/02/1928 26/09/1964 Barrow in Furness 36.58 36.98
2310 42310 10/02/1928 08/03/1963 Huddersfield Hillhouse 35.08 35.95
2311 42311 22/02/1928 13/04/1964 Low Moor 36.17 36.42
2312 42312 23/02/1928 14/11/1959 Huddersfield Hillhouse 31.75 32.08
2313 42313 01/03/1928 23/11/1963 Stockport Edgeley 35.67 35.98
2314 42314 03/03/1928 29/12/1962 Buxton (LNWR) 34.75 35.01
2315 42315 10/03/1928 29/12/1962 Barrow in Furness 34.75 35.37
2316 42316 14/03/1928 16/02/1963 Stockport Edgeley 34.92 35.44
2317 42317 22/03/1928 23/08/1965 Royston 37.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1965 37.68
2318 42318 30/03/1928 08/09/1962 Workington 34.5 34.97
2319 42319 13/04/1928 19/10/1963 Barrow in Furness 35.5 35.61
2320 42320 27/04/1928 17/11/1962 Carlisle Kingmoor 34.58 35.19
2321 42321 04/05/1928 07/11/1959 Willesden 31.5 32.30
2322 42322 19/05/1928 07/1965 Barrow in Furness 37.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1965 37.60
2323 42323 04/06/1928 23/06/1962 Stoke 34 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/03/1963 34.79
2324 42324 22/06/1928 14/11/1962 Low Moor 34.42 35.25
2325 42325 01/01/1929 10/1961 Kentish Town 32.75 33.31
2326 42326 29/01/1929 02/07/1960 Gorton 31.5 31.56
2327 42327 02/02/1929 28/08/1965 Trafford Park (LMS) 36.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1965 36.81
2328 42328 09/02/1929 09/09/1961 Trafford Park (LMS) 32.58 33.04
2329 42329 15/02/1929 10/1961 Kentish Town 32.67 34.21
2330 42330 20/02/1929 09/12/1961 Leicester Midland 32.83 33.01
2331 42331 25/02/1929 01/09/1962 Leicester Midland 33.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1963 34.24
2332 42332 03/1929 10/1961 Workington 32.58 33.44
2333 42333 06/03/1929 04/05/1963 Leicester Midland 34.17 34.24
2334 42334 12/03/1929 25/12/1965 Trafford Park (LMS) 36.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1966 37.12
2335 42335 20/03/1929 25/04/1964 Workington 35.08 35.26
2336 42336 06/04/1929 20/10/1962 Kentish Town 33.5 34.23
2337 42337 23/03/1929 21/12/1963 Stockport Edgeley 34.75 34.92
2338 42338 02/04/1929 11/01/1964 Gorton 34.75 34.98
2339 42339 06/04/1929 28/09/1963 Bolton 34.42 34.72
2340 42340 11/04/1929 09/06/1962 Workington 33.17 33.94
2341 42341 16/04/1929 17/10/1959 Kentish Town 30.5 31.52
2342 42342 23/04/1929 02/06/1962 Kentish Town 33.17 33.25
2343 42343 26/04/1929 30/10/1965 Trafford Park (LMS) 36.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1966 36.75
2344 42344 02/05/1929 27/05/1961 Stoke 32 32.39
2345 42345 08/05/1929 21/05/1960 Oxenholme 31 31.65
2346 42346 14/05/1929 10/09/1960 Stoke 31.33 31.36
2347 42347 17/05/1929 15/09/1962 Workington 33.33 33.84
2348 42348 23/05/1929 10/1961 Stockport Edgeley 32.42 32.59
2349 42349 30/05/1929 22/07/1961 Kentish Town 32.17 32.57
2350 42350 04/06/1929 13/02/1965 Stafford 35.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1965 35.97
2351 42351 06/06/1929 25/08/1962 Birkenhead Mollington Street 33.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/03/1963 33.78
2352 42352 11/06/1929 28/04/1962 Leicester Midland 32.83 33.20
2353 42353 14/06/1929 13/06/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 35 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 09/1964 35.28
2354 42354 20/06/1929 14/11/1959 Stockport Edgeley 30.42
2355 42355 27/06/1929 11/1963 Kettering 34.42 34.49
2356 42356 02/07/1929 10/1961 Northwich 32.25 32.72
2357 42357 07/07/1929 16/03/1963 Stockport Edgeley 33.67 34.13
2358 42358 08/07/1929 27/10/1962 Stoke 33.25 33.50
2359 42359 12/07/1929 24/10/1964 Barrow in Furness 35.25 35.70
2360 42360 18/07/1929 19/08/1961 Willesden 32.08 32.27
2361 42361 23/07/1929 08/02/1964 Gorton 34.58 34.67
2362 42362 26/07/1929 02/06/1962 Stoke 32.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/03/1963 33.65
2363 42363 01/08/1929 23/12/1961 Longsight 32.33 32.73
2364 42364 09/08/1929 10/1961 Workington 32.17 33.62
2365 42365 14/08/1929 08/10/1960 Northwich 31.17 31.28
2366 42366 27/08/1929 11/04/1964 Chester (MR) 34.67 34.82
2367 42367 02/09/1929 25/08/1962 Willesden 32.92 33.03
2368 42368 06/09/1929 19/06/1965 Bolton 35.75 36.22
2369 42369 11/09/1929 15/05/1965 Carnforth 35.67 35.95
2370 42370 16/09/1929 30/06/1962 Buxton (LNWR) 32.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/03/1963 33.50
2371 42371 19/09/1929 28/04/1962 Buxton (LNWR) 32.58 32.84
2372 42372 24/09/1929 29/12/1962 Stockport Edgeley 33.25 34.00
2373 42373 27/09/1929 19/11/1960 Gorton 31.17 31.22
2374 42374 03/10/1929 02/10/1965 Stockport Edgeley 36 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1966 36.31
2375 42375 13/05/1932 24/02/1962 Uttoxeter 29.75 29.94
2376 42376 18/05/1932 17/11/1962 Workington 30.5 30.69
2377 42377 25/05/1932 16/05/1961 Holbeck (MR) 29 29.24
2378 42378 01/06/1932 18/04/1964 Barrow in Furness 31.83 32.23
2379 42379 08/06/1932 01/08/1964 Newton Heath 32.17 32.54
2380 42380 15/06/1932 10/12/1960 Low Moor 28.5 28.52
2381 42381 22/06/1932 08/05/1965 Stafford 32.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1965 33.34
2382 42382 29/06/1932 10/1961 Stockport Edgeley 29.33 29.48
2383 42383 07/07/1932 10/1961 Toton 29.25 30.11
2384 42384 15/07/1932 10/08/1963 Huddersfield Hillhouse 31.08 31.44
2385 42385 04/05/1933 08/09/1962 Swansea East Dock 29.33 29.38
2386 42386 11/05/1933 10/1961 Northwich 28.42 29.53
2387 42387 22/05/1933 04/1962 Swansea East Dock 28.92 28.92
2388 42388 25/05/1933 02/11/1962 Swansea East Dock 29.5 29.48
2389 42389 06/1933 23/03/1963 Speke Junction 29.75 30.10
2390 42390 06/1933 10/09/1960 Landore 27.25 27.44
2391 42391 05/06/1933 02/03/1963 Buxton (LNWR) 29.75 29.93
2392 42392 13/06/1933 09/02/1963 Stoke 29.67 29.73
2393 42393 20/06/1933 26/05/1962 Carlisle Kingmoor 28.92 29.01
2394 42394 22/06/1933 05/06/1966 Holbeck (MR) 33 33.34
2395 42395 28/08/1933 18/11/1961 Workington 28.25 28.65
2396 42396 29/08/1933 07/07/1962 Tebay 28.92 29.06
2397 42397 09/1933 21/01/1961 Workington 27.33 27.41
2398 42398 04/09/1933 03/12/1960 Saltley 27.25 27.44
2399 42399 06/09/1933 03/09/1960 Longsight 27 27.21
2400 42400 13/09/1933 23/01/1965 Stafford 31.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1965 31.61
2401 42401 13/09/1933 29/06/1963 Stockport Edgeley 29.75 30.61
2402 42402 20/09/1933 13/10/1962 Workington 29.08 29.49
2403 42403 26/09/1933 29/12/1962 Tebay 29.25 29.82
2404 42404 29/09/1933 21/10/1961 Tebay 28.08 28.40
2405 42405 05/10/1933 17/10/1964 Darlington 31 31.30
2406 42406 10/10/1933 28/08/1965 Wakefield 31.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1965 32.12
2407 42407 12/10/1933 12/11/1962 Mirfield 29.08 30.44
2408 42408 18/10/1933 04/1964 Huddersfield Hillhouse 30.5 30.76
2409 42409 19/10/1933 01/1964 Holbeck (MR) 30.25 30.35
2410 42410 25/10/1933 09/1966 Huddersfield Hillhouse 32.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1966 33.16
2411 42411 28/10/1933 08/1964 Low Moor 30.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1964 31.07
2412 42412 01/11/1933 03/01/1962 Huddersfield Hillhouse 28.17 28.22
2413 42413 04/11/1933 06/1964 Huddersfield Hillhouse 30.58 30.97
2414 42414 08/11/1933 10/10/1964 Tebay 30.92 31.45
2415 42415 13/11/1933 29/12/1962 Tebay 29.08 29.69
2416 42416 15/11/1933 27/06/1964 Saltley 30.58 30.85
2417 42417 20/11/1933 11/04/1964 Saltley 30.42 30.50
2418 42418 22/11/1933 09/04/1960 Stoke 26.42 26.41
2419 42419 28/11/1933 11/1963 Saltley 30 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1964 30.73
2420 42420 01/12/1933 19/05/1962 Workington 28.42 28.47
2421 42421 06/12/1933 22/08/1964 Stafford 30.67 30.88
2422 42422 11/12/1933 22/12/1962 Saltley 29 29.31
2423 42423 19/12/1933 10/1961 Northwich 27.83 28.76
2424 42424 15/01/1934 26/09/1964 Stockport Edgeley 30.67 31.27