Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 29 Today
» 1044 Yesterday
» 3295 Week
» 19946 Month
» 213790 Year
» 724892 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Stanier "4P" Class 2-6-4T


LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
2425 42425 14/02/1936 07/09/1963 Lostock Hall 27.58 28.44
2426 42426 17/02/1936 11/12/1965 Bolton 29.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1966 30.09
2427 42427 20/02/1936 07/10/1961 Workington 25.67 26.59
2428 42428 26/02/1936 07/10/1961 Trafford Park (LMS) 25.67 26.48
2429 42429 02/1936 29/09/1962 Gorton 26.58 27.32
2430 42430 04/03/1936 27/03/1965 Willesden 29 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1965 29.30
2431 42431 10/03/1936 07/05/1966 Lostock Hall 30.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1966 30.45
2432 42432 14/03/1936 21/08/1965 Workington 29.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 02/1966 29.95
2433 42433 19/03/1936 12/05/1962 Lostock Hall 26.17 26.42
2434 42434 24/03/1936 28/03/1964 Trafford Park (LMS) 28 28.16
2435 42435 28/03/1936 03/04/1965 Fleetwood 29.08 29.40
2436 42436 14/04/1936 28/05/1966 Lostock Hall 30.08 31.27
2437 42437 14/04/1936 23/05/1964 Stockport Edgeley 28.08 28.69
2438 42438 16/04/1936 25/02/1961 Rose Grove 24.83 24.93
2439 42439 24/04/1936 14/08/1965 Workington 29.33 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 06/1968 32.16
2440 42440 28/04/1936 28/09/1963 Wigan Central (L&Y) 27.42 28.07
2441 42441 02/05/1936 11/01/1964 Croes Newydd 27.67 27.72
2442 42442 07/05/1936 07/08/1965 Lostock Hall 29.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1965 29.55
2443 42443 13/05/1936 17/11/1962 Stoke 26.5 26.66
2444 42444 06/05/1936 16/05/1964 Bolton 28 28.13
2445 42445 29/05/1936 17/10/1964 Lostock Hall 28.42 28.81
2446 42446 06/06/1936 25/04/1964 Bangor 27.83 28.55
2447 42447 13/06/1936 13/03/1965 Fleetwood 28.75 28.94
2448 42448 18/06/1936 06/01/1962 Trafford Park (LMS) 25.58 25.84
2449 42449 24/06/1936 14/11/1964 Barrow in Furness 28.42 28.50
2450 42450 01/07/1936 04/06/1960 New England 23.92 23.97
2451 42451 08/07/1936 10/10/1964 Gorton 28.25 28.63
2452 42452 20/07/1936 10/03/1962 Nottingham 25.67 25.67
2453 42453 30/07/1936 16/05/1964 Leicester (G.C.) 27.83 28.15
2454 42454 06/08/1936 08/12/1962 Stoke 26.33 26.44
2455 42455 22/08/1936 02/04/1966 Trafford Park (LMS) 29.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1966 29.92
2456 42456 20/08/1936 24/04/1965 Carnforth 28.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1965 29.17
2457 42457 27/08/1936 17/11/1962 Barrow in Furness 26.25 26.90
2458 42458 03/09/1936 26/10/1963 Fleetwood 27.08 27.72
2459 42459 09/09/1936 23/01/1965 Croes Newydd 28.33 28.78
2460 42460 17/09/1936 28/08/1965 Fleetwood 28.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1965 29.18
2481 42461 23/09/1936 28/03/1964 Blackpool Central 27.5 28.58
2462 42462 01/10/1936 14/05/1966 Carnforth 29.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1966 29.89
2463 42463 08/10/1936 25/01/1964 Chester (MR) 27.25 27.37
2464 42464 14/10/1936 14/08/1965 Newton Heath 28.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1965 29.11
2465 42465 21/10/1936 13/02/1965 Carnforth 28.33 28.67
2466 42466 21/10/1936 12/01/1963 Trafford Park (LMS) 26.25 26.65
2487 42467 05/11/1936 07/10/1961 Rugby 24.92 26.96
2468 42468 13/11/1936 25/09/1965 Lostock Hall 28.83 29.28
2469 42469 18/11/1936 04/05/1963 Heaton Mersey 26.5 26.62
2470 42470 25/11/1936 29/09/1962 Willesden 25.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/01/1963 26.14
2471 42471 04/12/1936 07/10/1961 Springs Branch (Wigan) 24.83 25.13
2472 42472 09/12/1936 03/11/1962 Gorton 25.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1963 26.87
2473 42473 16/12/1936 03/11/1962 Wigan Central (L&Y) 25.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/03/1963 26.25
2474 42474 22/12/1936 24/10/1964 Fleetwood 27.83 28.17
2475 42475 30/12/1936 07/10/1961 Wigan Central (L&Y) 24.83 25.64
2476 42476 06/01/1937 29/09/1962 Lostock Hall 25.67 26.19
2477 42477 14/01/1937 26/06/1965 Chester (MR) 28.42 28.69
2478 42478 20/01/1937 06/02/1965 Bangor 28.08 28.42
2479 42479 28/01/1937 07/10/1961 Willesden 24.75 25.73
2480 42480 04/02/1937 19/01/1963 Lostock Hall 25.92 25.96
2481 42481 10/02/1937 26/09/1964 Lostock Hall 27.58 28.19
2482 42482 18/02/1937 24/04/1965 Chester (MR) 28.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1965 28.59
2483 42483 25/02/1937 29/09/1962 Lower Darwen 25.58 26.05
2484 42484 04/03/1937 29/01/1966 Bolton 28.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1966 29.22
2485 42485 11/03/1937 08/06/1963 Southport 26.25 26.28
2486 42486 18/03/1937 09/1963 Rowsley 26.5 26.59
2487 42487 25/03/1937 07/09/1963 Bangor 26.5 26.58
2488 42488 02/04/1937 13/02/1965 Bangor 27.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1965 28.14
2489 42489 08/04/1937 14/11/1964 Bangor 27.58 27.71
2490 42490 15/04/1937 14/05/1960 Upminster 23.08 23.18
2491 42491 22/04/1937 28/09/1963 Speke Junction 26.42 26.92
2492 42492 05/1937 12/06/1965 Newton Heath 28.08 28.44
2493 42493 06/05/1937 02/05/1964 Croes Newydd 27 27.13
2494 42494 15/05/1937 08/05/1965 Fleetwood 28 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1965 28.27
2537 42537 17/12/1935 22/09/1962 Southport 26.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/03/1963 27.25
2538 42538 11/12/1935 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 26.5 26.92
2539 42539 09/12/1935 11/02/1961 Longsight 25.17 25.70
2540 42540 12/12/1935 03/11/1962 Walton on the Hill 26.92 27.33
2541 42541 13/12/1935 15/12/1962 Rugby 27 27.50
2542 42542 16/12/1935 17/07/1965 Newton Heath 29.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1965 29.85
2543 42543 20/12/1935 11/05/1963 Stoke 27.42 27.48
2544 42544 23/12/1935 01/12/1962 Stafford 27 27.41
2545 42545 27/06/1936 14/10/1961 Bolton 25.33 25.40
2546 42546 27/06/1936 01/04/1967 Lostock Hall 30.83 31.49
2547 42547 07/1936 04/05/1963 Rose Grove 26.83 27.10
2548 42548 01/07/1936 04/02/1967 Croes Newydd 30.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1967 30.89
2549 42549 07/07/1936 18/11/1961 Newton Heath 25.33 25.46
2550 42550 09/07/1936 04/04/1964 Bolton 27.75 28.29
2551 42551 09/07/1936 12/12/1964 Southport 28.42 29.04
2552 42552 14/07/1936 07/10/1961 Aston 25.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1961 25.44
2553 42553 15/07/1936 12/11/1962 Darlington 26.33 26.44
2554 42554 16/07/1936 03/04/1965 Bolton 28.75 29.02
2555 42555 21/07/1936 08/05/1965 Bolton 28.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1965 29.09
2556 42556 21/07/1936 27/07/1963 Leicester (G.C.) 27 27.25
2557 42557 11/08/1936 19/10/1963 Wigan Central (L&Y) 27.17 27.95
2558 42558 12/08/1936 17/04/1965 Carnforth 28.67 29.11
2559 42559 12/08/1936 19/09/1964 Lostock Hall 28.08 28.28
2560 42560 07/08/1936 18/04/1964 Carnforth 27.67 28.04
2561 42561 11/08/1936 09/11/1963 Fleetwood 27.25 28.20
2562 42562 13/08/1936 04/01/1964 Willesden 27.42 27.61
2563 42563 15/08/1936 16/11/1963 Bolton 27.25 27.35
2564 42564 18/08/1936 08/05/1965 Stoke 28.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1965 29.18
2565 42565 21/08/1936 28/11/1964 Carnforth 28.25 29.17
2566 42566 26/08/1936 22/05/1965 Croes Newydd 28.75 29.16
2567 42567 26/08/1936 13/03/1965 Fleetwood 28.58 28.99
2568 42568 02/09/1936 15/12/1962 Rowsley 26.25 26.48
2569 42569 02/09/1936 25/01/1964 Carnforth 27.33 28.47
2570 42570 02/09/1936 07/10/1961 Stockport Edgeley 25.08 26.22
2571 42571 11/09/1936 09/11/1963 Barrow in Furness 27.17 27.28
2572 42572 11/09/1936 11/01/1964 Carnforth 27.33 27.95
2573 42573 11/09/1936 21/11/1964 Willesden 28.17 28.36
2574 42574 17/09/1936 10/1967 Normanton 31.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1968 31.68
2575 42575 17/09/1936 13/10/1962 Crewe North 26.08 26.38
2576 42576 17/09/1936 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 25.75 26.01
2577 42577 24/09/1936 14/01/1967 Carnforth 30.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 06/1967 30.74
2578 42578 24/09/1936 13/10/1962 Longsight 26.08 26.51
2579 42579 24/09/1936 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 25.75 26.22
2580 42580 28/09/1936 17/11/1962 Speke Junction 26.17 26.81
2581 42581 28/09/1936 19/03/1966 Croes Newydd 29.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1966 29.73
2582 42582 28/09/1936 25/05/1963 Bushbury 26.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1963 26.90
2583 42583 08/10/1936 29/10/1966 Trafford Park (LMS) 30 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1967 30.38
2584 42584 08/10/1936 18/07/1964 Lostock Hall 27.75 28.12
2585 42585 08/10/1936 01/12/1962 Willesden 26.17 26.53
2586 42586 14/10/1936 14/11/1964 Croes Newydd 28.08 28.27
2587 42587 14/10/1936 06/1967 Low Moor 30.67 31.27
2588 42588 20/10/1936 24/10/1964 Toton 28 28.17
2589 42589 19/10/1936 12/09/1964 Carnforth 27.92 28.26
2590 42590 19/10/1936 27/02/1965 Stoke 28.33 28.76
2591 42591 26/10/1936 29/09/1962 Workington 25.92 26.39
2592 42592 26/10/1936 04/05/1963 Wigan Central (L&Y) 26.58 26.59
2593 42593 26/10/1936 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 25.67 26.17
2594 42594 02/11/1936 25/04/1964 Barrow in Furness 27.42 27.55
2595 42595 02/11/1936 21/09/1963 Rowsley 26.83 27.22
2596 42596 09/11/1936 11/08/1962 Trafford Park (LMS) 25.75 26.35
2597 42597 09/11/1936 23/10/1965 Croes Newydd 28.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1966 29.20
2598 42598 09/11/1936 11/1963 Speke Junction 27 27.62
2599 42599 17/11/1936 29/09/1962 Edge Hill 25.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/03/1963 26.33
2600 42600 17/11/1936 17/11/1962 Stoke 26 26.15
2601 42601 24/11/1936 03/04/1965 Carnforth 28.42 28.83
2602 42602 24/11/1936 26/12/1964 Croes Newydd 28.08 28.58
2603 42603 07/12/1936 25/05/1963 Stoke 26.42 26.53
2604 42604 07/12/1936 08/05/1965 Aston 28.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1965 28.79
2605 42605 07/12/1936 19/12/1964 Stoke 28 28.62
2606 42606 16/12/1936 15/10/1966 Croes Newydd 29.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1967 30.35
2607 42607 16/12/1936 01/02/1964 Carnforth 27.17 27.52
2608 42608 22/12/1936 22/08/1964 Croes Newydd 27.67 27.75
2609 42609 22/12/1936 13/02/1965 Stoke 28.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1965 28.41
2610 42610 01/01/1937 23/04/1966 Workington 29.25 29.55
2611 42611 01/01/1937 15/03/1967 Lostock Hall 30.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1967 30.72
2612 42612 11/01/1937 25/01/1964 Speke Junction 27 27.53
2613 42613 08/01/1937 22/04/1967 Croes Newydd 30.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1967 30.79
2614 42614 08/01/1937 16/05/1964 Newton Heath 27.33 27.62
2615 42615 01/02/1937 29/09/1962 Willesden 25.58 25.80
2616 42616 01/02/1937 10/1967 Low Moor 30.67 31.14
2617 42617 01/02/1937 09/11/1963 Walton on the Hill 26.75 27.22
2618 42618 21/06/1938 07/1965 Huddersfield Hillhouse 27.08 27.42
2619 42619 24/06/1938 30/05/1964 Newton Heath 25.92 26.25
2620 42620 07/1938 19/09/1964 Newton Heath 26.17 26.44
2621 42621 06/07/1938 03/11/1962 Wigan Central (L&Y) 24.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/03/1963 24.70
2622 42622 13/07/1938 02/1967 Holbeck (MR) 28.58 29.02
2623 42623 14/07/1938 22/02/1964 Newton Heath 25.58 25.77
2624 42624 18/07/1938 17/11/1962 Wigan Central (L&Y) 24.33 24.73
2625 42625 01/08/1938 07/05/1966 Lostock Hall 27.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1966 28.06
2626 42626 05/08/1938 23/10/1965 Bolton 27.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1966 27.96
2627 42627 10/08/1938 07/10/1961 Willesden 23.17 24.24
2628 42628 09/1938 25/01/1964 Toton 25.33 25.52
2629 42629 03/09/1938 24/10/1964 Derby 26.08 26.47
2630 42630 08/09/1938 19/09/1964 Bolton 26 26.37
2631 42631 13/09/1938 12/09/1964 Carnforth 26 26.36
2632 42632 17/09/1938 15/06/1963 Newton Heath 24.75 24.84
2633 42633 22/09/1938 25/01/1964 Bolton 25.33 25.83
2634 42634 27/09/1938 09/01/1965 Carnforth 26.33 26.65
2635 42635 09/1938 07/10/1961 Bolton 23.08 23.44
2636 42636 06/10/1938 04/05/1963 Nottingham 24.58 24.64
2637 42637 14/10/1938 07/10/1961 Southport 23 23.36
2638 42638 28/10/1938 08/12/1962 Blackpool Central 24.17 24.32
2639 42639 02/11/1938 09/1964 Wakefield 25.83 Cut Cohens (Ickles) 01/1965 26.22
2640 42640 05/11/1938 26/09/1964 Newton Heath 25.83 26.54
2641 42641 11/11/1938 29/09/1962 Wigan Central (L&Y) 23.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/03/1963 24.35
2642 42642 18/11/1938 29/09/1962 Wigan Central (L&Y) 23.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/03/1963 24.33
2643 42643 25/11/1938 14/12/1963 Blackpool Central 25.08 25.41
2644 42644 11/1938 11/03/1967 Trafford Park (LMS) 28.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1967 28.93
2645 42645 02/12/1938 11/09/1965 Southport 26.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1965 26.97
2646 42646 09/12/1938 29/09/1962 Agecroft 23.75 24.27
2647 42647 14/12/1938 13/05/1967 Croes Newydd 28.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1967 28.94
2648 42648 17/12/1938 07/10/1961 Hellifield 22.83 23.80
2649 42649 22/12/1938 06/02/1965 Derby 26.17 26.83
2650 42650 30/12/1938 06/1967 Wakefield 28.5 29.06
2651 42651 12/1938 19/09/1964 Newton Heath 25.75 25.85
2652 42652 05/01/1939 25/06/1964 Bolton 25.42 25.46
2653 42653 12/1940 29/09/1962 Bolton 21.75 22.25
2654 42654 20/01/1941 21/11/1964 Bolton 23.83 24.50
2655 42655 02/1941 12/01/1963 Bolton 21.92 22.18
2656 42656 03/02/1941 06/05/1967 Trafford Park (LMS) 26.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1967 26.80
2657 42657 07/02/1941 07/11/1964 Workington 23.75 23.87
2658 42658 19/02/1941 29/09/1962 Birkenhead Mollington Street 21.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/03/1963 22.07
2659 42659 12/03/1941 06/04/1963 Bushbury 22.08 22.19
2660 42660 11/04/1941 17/04/1965 Lostock Hall 24 24.19
2661 42661 10/05/1941 29/09/1962 Lostock Hall 21.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/03/1963 21.85
2662 42662 10/06/1941 12/12/1964 Southport 23.5 24.03
2663 42663 20/06/1942 18/03/1967 Croes Newydd 24.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1967 25.34
2664 42664 08/07/1942 12/1966 Wakefield 24.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1967 24.70
2665 42665 01/08/1942 06/1967 Low Moor 24.83 25.47
2666 42666 19/08/1942 29/09/1962 Workington 20.08 20.57
2667 42667 03/10/1942 13/02/1965 Stoke 22.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1965 22.63
2668 42668 23/11/1942 17/08/1963 Stoke 20.75 20.99
2669 42669 07/12/1942 07/10/1961 Rugby 18.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1962 19.37
2670 42670 28/12/1942 05/12/1964 Carnforth 22 22.90
2671 42671 23/01/1943 08/12/1962 Stockport Edgeley 19.92 20.07
2672 42672 13/02/1943 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 19.33 19.90