Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 406 Today
» 1018 Yesterday
» 406 Week
» 9148 Month
» 353327 Year
» 864429 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Stanier "4P" Class 2-6-4T


LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
2500 42500 28/03/1934 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 28.25 Prs Preserved
2501 42501 04/04/1934 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 28.17 28.99
2502 42502 09/04/1934 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 28.17 28.61
2503 42503 16/04/1934 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 28.17 28.49
2504 42504 27/04/1934 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 28.17 28.85
2505 42505 29/04/1934 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 28.17 28.46
2506 42506 06/1934 26/08/1961 Shoeburyness 27.17 27.35
2507 42507 06/03/1934 20/05/1961 Shoeburyness 27.17 27.46
2508 42508 12/06/1934 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 28 28.72
2509 42509 15/06/1934 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 28 28.68
2510 42510 21/06/1934 26/08/1961 Shoeburyness 27.17 27.50
2511 42511 28/06/1934 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 28 28.16
2512 42512 04/07/1934 26/11/1960 Shoeburyness 26.33 26.49
2513 42513 11/07/1934 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 27.92 28.12
2514 42514 25/07/1934 11/04/1962 Shoeburyness 27.75 27.74
2515 42515 02/08/1934 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 27.83 28.06
2516 42516 09/08/1934 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 27.83 28.56
2517 42517 15/08/1934 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 27.83 28.24
2518 42518 21/08/1934 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 27.83 28.68
2519 42519 27/08/1934 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 27.83 28.05
2520 42520 09/1934 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 27.75 28.00
2521 42521 06/09/1934 03/11/1961 Shoeburyness 27.17 27.38
2522 42522 12/09/1934 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 27.75 28.44
2523 42523 14/09/1934 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 27.75 28.08
2524 42524 25/09/1934 09/1961 Shoeburyness 27 27.24
2525 42525 28/09/1934 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 27.75 28.48
2526 42526 05/10/1934 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 27.67 28.56
2527 42527 12/10/1934 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 27.67 28.08
2528 42528 18/10/1934 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 27.67 27.85
2529 42529 23/10/1934 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 27.67 28.05
2530 42530 26/10/1934 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 27.67 28.57
2531 42531 02/11/1934 09/1961 Shoeburyness 26.83 26.97
2532 42532 07/11/1934 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 27.58 28.28
2533 42533 09/11/1934 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 27.58 28.29
2534 42534 15/11/1934 01/12/1961 Shoeburyness 27.08 27.10
2535 42535 22/11/1934 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 27.58 28.43
2536 42536 05/12/1934 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 27.5 28.39