Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 66 Today
» 1210 Yesterday
» 7332 Week
» 21909 Month
» 385154 Year
» 461741 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Collett "5101" Class 2-6-2T


GWR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
4100 08/1935 10/1965 Gloucester Horton Road 30.17 30.53
4101 08/1935 06/1964 Truro 28.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1964 29.11
4102 08/1935 09/1962 St Philips Marsh 27.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1964 28.77
4103 08/1935 09/1964 Bristol Barrow Road 29.08 29.36
4104 08/1935 05/1964 Gloucester Horton Road 28.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1964 28.94
4105 09/1935 02/1964 Truro 28.42 29.02
4106 09/1935 09/1962 Gloucester Horton Road 27 28.02
4107 09/1935 06/1965 Severn Tunnel Junction 29.75 30.10
4108 09/1935 10/1964 Neath (Court Sart) 29.08 29.44
4109 09/1935 04/1964 Gloucester Horton Road 28.58 28.85
4110 10/1936 06/1965 Severn Tunnel Junction 28.67 Prs Preserved
4111 10/1936 09/1965 Wadebridge 28.92 29.36
4112 10/1936 08/1962 Banbury 25.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1963 27.18
4113 10/1936 18/11/1965 Worcester 29.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1966 29.77
4114 10/1936 11/1963 Bromsgrove 27.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1964 27.43
4115 10/1936 06/1965 Severn Tunnel Junction 28.67
4116 11/1936 09/1962 Gloucester Horton Road 25.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 09/1963 26.85
4117 11/1936 09/1961 Taunton 24.83 24.93
4118 11/1936 09/1962 Leamington 25.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1963 27.02
4119 11/1936 09/1963 Severn Tunnel Junction 26.83 28.77
4120 12/1937 11/1964 Penzance 26.92 27.02
4121 12/1937 06/1965 Severn Tunnel Junction 27.5 Prs Preserved
4122 01/1938 06/1964 Aberdare 26.42 26.93
4123 01/1938 11/1961 Gloucester Horton Road 23.83 24.43
4124 01/1938 08/1964 Worcester 26.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1964 26.93
4125 05/1938 06/1965 Wadebridge 27.08 27.52
4126 05/1938 01/1962 Tyseley 23.67 23.93
4127 05/1938 09/02/1963 Severn Tunnel Junction 24.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1963 25.02
4128 05/1938 06/1964 Severn Tunnel Junction 26.08 26.61
4129 05/1938 09/1962 Bromsgrove 24.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1963 25.52
4130 10/1939 07/1964 Severn Tunnel Junction 24.75 25.19
4131 10/1939 09/1964 Bristol Barrow Road 24.92 25.19
4132 10/1939 07/1964 Cardiff East Dock 24.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1964 25.19
4133 10/1939 10/1964 Penzance 25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1965 25.27
4134 10/1939 05/1963 Neath (Court Sart) 23.58 24.10
4135 10/1939 06/1964 Radyr 24.67 25.19
4136 11/1939 06/1964 Aberdare 24.58 25.10
4137 11/1939 10/1964 Severn Tunnel Junction 24.92 25.19
4138 11/1939 07/1958 Pontypool Road 18.67 18.76
4139 12/1939 07/1958 Gloucester Horton Road 18.58 18.85
4140 21/08/1946 11/1963 Stourbridge Junction 17.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1964 17.50
4141 28/08/1946 03/1963 Gloucester Horton Road 16.58 Prs Preserved
4142 31/08/1946 12/1963 Neath (Court Sart) 17.33 17.80
4143 05/09/1946 06/1964 Cardiff East Dock 17.75 18.21
4144 10/09/1946 06/1965 Severn Tunnel Junction 18.75 Prs Preserved
4145 17/09/1946 18/12/1962 Severn Tunnel Junction 16.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 02/1963 16.42
4146 21/09/1946 08/1962 Severn Tunnel Junction 15.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 02/1963 16.41
4147 30/09/1946 10/1965 Wadebridge 19.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1965 19.22
4148 05/10/1946 09/1965 St Blazey 18.92 19.38
4149 10/1946 02/03/1963 Banbury 16.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1963 16.51
4150 05/06/1947 06/1965 Severn Tunnel Junction 18 Prs Preserved
4151 12/06/1947 04/1965 Truro 17.83 18.27
4152 21/06/1947 09/1962 Severn Tunnel Junction 15.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 02/1963 15.67
4153 26/06/1947 11/1964 Stourbridge Junction 17.42 18.15
4154 05/07/1947 10/1965 St Blazey 18.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1966 18.55
4155 02/08/1947 09/1965 Wadebridge 18.08 18.55
4156 13/08/1947 06/1965 Severn Tunnel Junction 17.83 32.95
4157 18/08/1947 06/1965 Severn Tunnel Junction 17.83 18.17
4158 25/08/1947 06/1965 Wadebridge 17.83 18.49
4159 10/09/1947 06/1964 Severn Tunnel Junction 16.75 17.11
4160 06/09/1948 06/1965 Severn Tunnel Junction 16.75 Prs Preserved
4161 14/09/1948 18/11/1965 Worcester 17.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1966 17.84
4162 20/09/1948 07/1960 Leamington 11.83 11.99
4163 24/09/1948 30/10/1962 Gloucester Horton Road 14.08 14.98
4164 30/09/1948 01/1960 Severn Tunnel Junction 11.33 12.22
4165 08/10/1948 10/1965 St Blazey 17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1966 17.28
4166 18/10/1948 Tyseley 06/1964 Cardiff East Dock 15.67 16.17
4167 22/10/1948 Newton Abbot 05/1964 Wadebridge 15.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1964 15.82
4168 01/11/1948 Swindon 10/1965 Wadebridge 16.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1966 17.30
4169 16/11/1948 Swindon 05/1965 Cardiff East Dock 16.5 16.59
4170 07/10/1949 09/1960 Tyseley 10.92 11.53
4171 14/10/1949 10/1964 Penzance 15 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1965 15.27
4172 24/10/1949 01/1965 Stourbridge Junction 15.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1965 15.48
4173 28/10/1949 Stourbridge Junction 12/1964 Stourbridge Junction 15.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1965 15.47
4174 02/11/1949 Cheltenham Malvern Road 06/1964 Pontypool Road 14.58 15.05
4175 07/11/1949 10/1965 Truro 15.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1966 16.20
4176 14/11/1949 10/1965 St Blazey 15.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1967 17.43
4177 22/11/1949 Treherbert 05/1965 Cardiff East Dock 15.5 15.74
4178 29/11/1949 Neasden 09/1965 St Blazey 15.83 16.39
4179 02/12/1949 02/1965 Wadebridge 15.17 Cut Cohens (Kingsbury) 10/1965 15.88
5101 11/1929 06/1963 Leamington 33.58 33.85
5102 11/1929 03/1960 Neath (Court Sart) 30.33 30.60
5103 11/1929 12/1960 Pontypool Road 31.08 31.85
5104 11/1929 09/11/1960 St Philips Marsh 31 31.44
5105 11/1929 10/1958 Gloucester Horton Road 28.92 29.19
5106 11/1929 03/1960 Laira 30.33 30.60
5107 12/1929 30/07/1957 Stourbridge Junction 27.58 27.60
5108 12/1929 07/1958 Newton Abbot 28.58 28.68
5109 12/1929 06/1957 Tyseley 27.5 27.94
5110 12/1929 12/1960 Severn Tunnel Junction 31 31.77
5150 02/1930 08/1960 Newton Abbot 30.5 30.85
5151 02/1930 08/1962 Bromsgrove 32.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1963 33.77
5152 02/1930 11/1963 Worcester 33.75 34.19
5153 03/1930 11/1964 Penzance 34.67 35.28
5154 02/1930 08/1963 Gloucester Barnwood 33.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1964 34.19
5155 03/1930 01/1960 Stourbridge Junction 29.83 30.86
5156 03/1930 09/1958 Hereford 28.5 28.69
5157 03/1930 07/1958 Gloucester Horton Road 28.33 28.52
5158 03/1930 04/1961 Newton Abbot 31.08 31.36
5159 03/1930 04/1956 Treherbert 26.08
5160 10/1930 11/1958 Hereford 28.08 29.60
5161 11/1930 04/1957 Leamington 26.42 26.93
5162 11/1930 07/1958 Gloucester Horton Road 27.67 28.02
5163 11/1930 11/1959 Tyseley 29 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 28/02/1960 29.31
5164 11/1930 04/1963 Pontypool Road 32.42 Prs Preserved
5165 11/1930 02/1958 Gloucester Horton Road 27.25 27.35
5166 11/1930 05/1961 Severn Tunnel Junction 30.5 30.77
5167 12/1930 01/1962 Banbury 31.08 31.44
5168 12/1930 08/1958 Newton Abbot 27.67 27.85
5169 12/1930 09/1960 Severn Tunnel Junction 29.75 30.19
5170 12/1930 12/1959 Banbury 29 29.44
5171 12/1930 07/1958 Tondu 27.58 27.68
5172 12/1930 10/1958 Taunton 27.83 27.94
5173 12/1930 08/1962 Gloucester Horton Road 31.67 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 09/1963 32.77
5174 12/1930 11/1961 Tyseley 30.92 31.11
5175 01/1931 04/1961 Exeter 30.25 30.44
5176 01/1931 01/1961 Stourbridge Junction 30 30.69
5177 01/1931 05/1961 Leamington 30.33 30.69
5178 01/1931 03/1960 Newton Abbot 29.17 29.60
5179 02/1931 07/1960 Worcester 29.42 29.77
5180 02/1931 07/1962 Westbury 31.42 31.94
5181 03/1931 08/1962 Severn Tunnel Junction 31.42 31.69
5182 03/1931 05/1962 Gloucester Horton Road 31.17 33.36
5183 03/1931 05/1962 Stafford Road 31.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1962 31.53
5184 03/1931 10/1964 Gloucester Horton Road 33.58 34.11
5185 03/1931 03/1960 Taunton 29 29.27
5186 03/1931 08/1959 Bristol Bath Road 28.42 28.77
5187 04/1931 05/1962 Stourbridge Junction 31.08 31.52
5188 04/1931 07/1962 Severn Tunnel Junction 31.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1962 31.61
5189 04/1931 08/1959 Stourbridge Junction 28.33 28.44
5190 10/1934 09/1962 Exeter 27.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 10/1963 29.02
5191 10/1934 06/1964 Severn Tunnel Junction 29.67 30.02
5192 10/1934 06/1963 Stourbridge Junction 28.67 28.94
5193 10/1934 06/1962 Severn Tunnel Junction 27.67 Prs Preserved
5194 10/1934 04/1961 Leamington 26.5 26.68
5195 10/1934 06/1961 Newton Abbot 26.67 26.94
5196 10/1934 12/1959 Newton Abbot 25.17 25.52
5197 10/1934 07/1960 Newton Abbot 25.75 26.10
5198 11/1934 06/1961 Taunton 26.58 27.02
5199 11/1934 03/1963 Gloucester Horton Road 28.33 Prs Preserved