Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 140 Today
» 1139 Yesterday
» 2413 Week
» 22146 Month
» 319160 Year
» 395747 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Churchward "42xx" Class 2-8-0T


GWR GWR (Rblds) Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Rebuilt To Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
4200 02/1923 03/1959 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 36.08 36.77
4201 12/1910 10/1959 Newport Pill 48.83 49.28
4202 7242 02/1912 06/1964 09/1937
to 7200
Llanelly 52.33 52.87
4203 02/1912 01/1961 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 48.92 49.62
4204 7243 02/1912 07/1964 01/1938
to 7200
Neath (Court Sart) 52.42 52.87
4205 7245 02/1912 09/1964 05/1938
to 7200
Cardiff East Dock 52.58 52.79
4206 02/1912 12/1959 St Blazey 47.83 48.07
4207 02/1912 10/1961 Hereford 49.67 50.28
4208 02/1912 11/1959 Llantrisant 47.75 47.95
4209 7249 02/1912 06/1965 11/1938
to 7200
Llanelly 53.33 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 05/1966 54.28
4210 7252 03/1912 06/1965 04/1939
to 7200
Severn Tunnel Junction 53.25 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 05/1966 54.20
4211 03/1912 08/1959 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 47.42 47.78
4212 08/1912 06/1959 Shrewsbury 46.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 28/02/1960 47.57
4213 09/1912 01/1964 Aberbeeg 51.33 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 06/1964 51.78
4214 09/1912 05/1964 Cardiff Canton 51.67 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 08/1964 51.95
4215 09/1912 10/1959 Severn Tunnel Junction 47.08 47.48
4216 7244 11/1912 02/1965 03/1938
to 7200
Llanelly 52.25 52.36
4217 11/1912 07/1959 Severn Tunnel Junction 46.67 47.36
4218 11/1912 05/10/1962 Aberbeeg 49.92 51.03
4219 7250 12/1912 09/1964 02/1939
to 7200
Cardiff East Dock 51.75 51.95
4220 7241 12/1912 26/11/1962 09/1937
to 7200
Pontypool Road 49.92 50.03
4221 12/1912 09/1959 Neath (Court Sart) 46.75 47.24
4222 11/1913 10/1964 Pontypool Road 50.92 51.29
4223 11/1913 08/1959 Llanelly 45.75 46.03
4224 11/1913 02/1959 Tondu 45.25 45.44
4225 11/1913 09/02/1963 Llanelly 49.25 49.87
4226 11/1913 03/1959 Cardiff Canton 45.33 46.03
4227 11/1913 02/1965 Cardiff Canton 51.25 51.70
4228 11/1913 12/1963 Aberbeeg 50.08 50.36
4229 11/1913 03/1961 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 47.33 47.45
4230 11/1913 09/1962 Llanelly 48.83 49.87
4231 11/1913 12/1959 Cardiff Canton 46.08 46.20
4232 08/1914 10/1963 Swansea East Dock 49.17 49.54
4233 08/1914 10/1964 Cardiff Canton 50.17 50.54
4234 7246 09/1914 09/1963 07/1938
to 7200
Pontypool Road 49 49.70
4235 09/1914 08/1962 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 47.92 48.12
4236 10/1914 09/1962 Aberdare 47.92 49.28
4237 10/1914 04/1964 Aberdare 49.5 49.78
4238 10/1914 12/1963 Cardiff Canton 49.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1964 50.20
4239 7240 10/1914 09/1964 08/1937
to 7200
Pontypool Road 49.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/1965 50.29
4240 7251 10/1914 01/1964 03/1939
to 7200
Aberdare 49.25 49.53
4241 10/1914 04/1964 Cardiff Canton 49.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1964 50.20
4242 02/1916 03/1964 Radyr 48.08 48.53
4243 02/1916 05/1964 Pontypool Road 48.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 08/1964 48.53
4244 7247 02/1916 03/1963 09/1938
to 7200
Aberdare 47.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1964 48.87
4245 7253 03/1916 04/1965 12/1939
to 7200
Severn Tunnel Junction 49.08 49.45
4246 03/1916 13/11/1962 Aberbeeg 46.67 47.78
4247 03/1916 04/1964 Aberbeeg 48.08 Prs Preserved
4248 04/1916 05/1963 Severn Tunnel Junction 47.08 Prs Preserved
4249 7248 04/1916 06/1965 10/1938
to 7200
Llanelly 49.17 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 05/1966 50.12
4250 04/1916 09/1962 Llanelly 46.42 47.45
4251 05/1916 06/1963 Aberbeeg 47.08 47.79
4252 03/1917 09/1963 Neath (Court Sart) 46.5 47.28
4253 03/1917 04/1963 Newport Pill 46.08 Prs Preserved
4254 03/1917 04/1965 Cardiff Canton 48.08 48.45
4255 04/1917 04/1964 Cardiff Canton 47 47.79
4256 04/1917 01/1964 Duffryn Yard 46.75 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 07/1964 47.28
4257 04/1917 10/1963 Aberdare 46.5 47.12
4258 05/1917 04/1965 Severn Tunnel Junction 47.92 48.37
4259 05/1917 03/1964 Cardiff Canton 46.83 47.87
4260 05/1917 06/1959 Llanelly 42.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 28/02/1960 42.82
4261 05/1917 03/1959 Llantrisant 41.83 42.53
4262 09/1919 04/1964 Aberbeeg 44.58 44.95
4263 10/1919 02/1964 Aberbeeg 44.33 44.70
4264 10/1919 07/1963 Swansea East Dock 43.75 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 01/1964 44.28
4265 11/1919 06/1963 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 43.58 43.95
4266 11/1919 08/1962 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 42.75 43.28
4267 11/1919 23/10/1962 Llantrisant 42.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 06/1963 43.61
4268 11/1919 08/1965 Cardiff Canton 45.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1965 46.12
4269 12/1919 19/11/1962 Aberbeeg 42.92 44.53
4270 12/1919 09/1962 Radyr 42.75 Prs Preserved
4271 02/1920 12/1963 Cardiff Canton 43.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1964 44.19
4272 28/02/1920 10/1963 Radyr 43.67 44.41
4273 03/1920 10/1964 Barry 44.58 44.95
4274 03/1920 06/1962 Aberbeeg 42.25 42.61
4275 03/1920 01/1964 Neath (Court Sart) 43.83 44.28
4276 04/1920 13/11/1962 Newport Pill 42.58 44.45
4277 04/1920 06/1964 Aberbeeg 44.17 Prs Preserved
4278 04/1920 07/1964 Aberdare 44.25 44.70
4279 05/1920 01/1964 Aberdare 43.67 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 05/1964 44.03
4280 05/1920 09/02/1963 Newport Pill 42.75 43.45
4281 05/1920 12/1960 Neath (Court Sart) 40.58 40.78
4282 06/1920 09/1963 Neath (Court Sart) 43.25 44.11
4283 06/1920 10/1964 Barry 44.33 44.78
4284 08/1920 09/1964 Neath (Court Sart) 44.08 44.20
4285 08/1920 04/1965 Pontypool Road 44.67 45.12
4286 08/1921 09/1964 Neath (Court Sart) 43.08 43.20
4287 08/1921 01/1961 Aberbeeg 39.42 39.69
4288 09/1921 29/11/1960 Duffryn Yard 39.17 39.28
4289 09/1921 05/10/1962 Aberdare 41.08 42.36
4290 09/1921 09/02/1963 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 41.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1963 41.86
4291 09/1921 09/1962 Aberbeeg 41 41.19
4292 10/1921 10/1964 Neath (Court Sart) 43 43.20
4293 10/1921 08/1962 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 40.83 41.03
4294 11/1921 09/1964 Llanelly 42.83 42.95
4295 11/1921 12/1964 Pontypool Road 43.08 43.36
4296 08/1922 12/1963 Llanelly 41.33 41.86
4297 08/1922 02/1965 Cardiff Canton 42.5 42.61
4298 10/1922 06/1963 Llanelly 40.67 41.03
4299 10/1922 12/1963 Cardiff Canton 41.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1964 41.53
5200 12/1922 03/1965 Cardiff Canton 42.25 42.61
5201 12/1922 06/1963 Llanelly 40.5 41.03
5202 12/1922 06/1965 Radyr 42.5 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 06/1966 43.53
5203 02/1923 12/1963 Aberbeeg 40.83 41.53
5204 02/1923 19/11/1962 Neath (Court Sart) 39.75 40.78
5205 06/1923 12/1963 Worcester 40.5 40.86
5206 06/1923 05/1965 Pontypool Road 41.92 42.20
5207 07/1923 01/1961 Hereford 37.5 37.86
5208 08/1923 06/1965 Radyr 41.83 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 05/1966 42.78
5209 08/1923 07/1965 Cardiff Canton 41.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 10/1965 42.20
5210 09/1923 09/1964 Aberdare 41 41.28
5211 09/1923 05/1964 Aberdare 40.67 40.95
5212 10/1923 05/1962 Severn Tunnel Junction 38.58 38.95
5213 10/1923 10/1964 Neath (Court Sart) 41 41.28
5214 11/1923 09/1964 Aberbeeg 40.83 41.03
5215 03/1924 07/1964 Llanelly 40.33 40.53
5216 04/1924 10/1963 Neath (Court Sart) 39.5 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 01/1964 39.78
5217 04/1924 05/1963 Radyr 39.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1964 39.94
5218 04/1924 09/1964 Aberbeeg 40.42 40.70
5219 04/1924 06/12/1962 Llanelly 38.67 39.53
5220 05/1924 12/1963 Radyr 39.58 39.86
5221 05/1924 10/1963 Neath (Court Sart) 39.42 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 01/1964 39.70
5222 05/1924 05/1964 Radyr 40 40.19
5223 05/1924 03/1965 Cardiff Canton 40.83 41.19
5224 05/1924 04/1963 Radyr 38.92 Prs Preserved
5225 05/1924 08/1963 Radyr 39.25 39.95
5226 05/1924 03/1965 Severn Tunnel Junction 40.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1965 41.19
5227 06/1924 09/02/1963 Radyr 38.67
5228 06/1924 04/1964 Llantrisant 39.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1964 40.11
5229 06/1924 05/1963 Radyr 38.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1964 39.78
5230 06/1924 07/1964 Aberdare 40.08 40.53
5231 06/1924 04/1964 Radyr 39.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1964 40.11
5232 07/1924 09/02/1963 Duffryn Yard 38.58 39.36
5233 07/1924 08/1963 Radyr 39.08 39.86
5234 07/1924 06/1963 Radyr 38.92 39.86
5235 07/1924 09/1965 Severn Tunnel Junction 41.17 41.45
5236 08/1924 10/1963 Cardiff Canton 39.17 39.78
5237 08/1924 09/1964 Aberdare 40.08 40.28
5238 08/1924 01/1964 Neath (Court Sart) 39.42 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 07/1964 39.94
5239 08/1924 04/1963 Neath (Court Sart) 38.67 Prs Preserved
5240 08/1924 02/1964 Aberdare 39.5 39.78
5241 08/1924 06/1965 Cardiff Canton 40.83 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 05/1966 41.78
5242 08/1924 12/1964 Aberdare 40.33 40.69
5243 08/1924 11/1964 Severn Tunnel Junction 40.25 40.53
5244 09/1924 05/1964 Cardiff Canton 39.67 39.86
5245 11/1925 10/1964 Neath (Court Sart) 38.92 39.11
5246 12/1925 12/1963 Duffryn Yard 38 38.19
5247 12/1925 03/1963 Llanelly 37.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1964 39.03
5248 12/1925 10/1963 Llantrisant 37.83 38.44
5249 12/1925 10/1963 Aberdare 37.83 38.44
5250 12/1925 12/1963 Cardiff Canton 38 39.03
5251 12/1925 01/1964 Cardiff Canton 38.08 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 03/1964 38.27
5252 12/1925 05/1965 Cardiff Canton 39.42 39.69
5253 12/1925 04/1963 Severn Tunnel Junction 37.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1964 39.03
5254 12/1925 07/1964 Neath (Court Sart) 38.58 39.03
5255 7220 12/1925 09/1964 09/1935
to 7200
Pontypool Road 38.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/1965 39.11
5256 7221 12/1925 11/1964 09/1935
to 7200
Truro 38.92 39.36
5257 7222 12/1925 01/1965 10/1935
to 7200
Aberdare 39.08 39.53
5258 7223 01/1926 11/1964 10/1935
to 7200
Llanelly 38.83 39.03
5259 7224 01/1926 06/12/1962 11/1935
to 7200
Ebbw Junction (Newport) 36.92 38.02
5260 7225 03/1926 05/1964 10/1935
to 7200
Severn Tunnel Junction 38.17 38.36
5261 7226 03/1926 11/1964 11/1935
to 7200
Aberdare 38.67 39.03
5262 7227 03/1926 06/1963 11/1935
to 7200
Pontypool Road 37.25 38.19
5263 7228 03/1926 07/1963 12/1935
to 7200
Barry 37.33 38.03
5264 7229 03/1926 08/1964 08/1935
to 7200
Cardiff Canton 38.42 Prs Preserved
5265 7230 03/1926 07/1964 12/1935
to 7200
Pontypool Road 38.33 38.78
5266 7231 03/1926 10/1964 12/1935
to 7200
Llanelly 38.58 38.95
5267 7232 03/1926 05/1965 08/1935
to 7200
Llanelly 39.17 39.45
5268 7233 03/1926 09/1964 09/1935
to 7200
Pontypool Road 38.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/1965 38.87
5269 7234 03/1926 10/1963 09/1935
to 7200
Aberdare 37.58 38.19
5270 7235 04/1926 04/1964 01/1936
to 7200
Llanelly 38 38.61
5271 7236 04/1926 11/1963 01/1936
to 7200
Truro 37.58 38.19
5272 7237 04/1926 06/1963 01/1936
to 7200
Llanelly 37.17 37.36
5273 7238 04/1926 04/1964 02/1936
to 7200
Barry 38 38.78
5274 7239 04/1926 10/1963 02/1936
to 7200
Llanelly 37.5 38.19
5275 7200 07/1926 07/1963 08/1934
to 7200
Llanelly 37 Prs Preserved
5276 7201 08/1926 04/1965 08/1934
to 7200
Llanelly 38.67 39.03
5277 7202 08/1926 06/1964 09/1934
to 7200
Radyr 37.83 Prs Preserved
5278 7203 08/1926 12/1963 09/1934
to 7200
Severn Tunnel Junction 37.33 37.69
5279 7204 08/1926 02/1964 09/1934
to 7200
Duffryn Yard 37.5 37.86
5280 7205 08/1926 06/1965 10/1934
to 7200
Severn Tunnel Junction 38.83 39.28
5281 7206 08/1926 07/1964 10/1934
to 7200
Cardiff Canton 37.92 38.36
5282 7207 08/1926 11/1964 10/1934
to 7200
Truro 38.25 38.45
5283 7208 09/1926 04/1964 10/1934
to 7200
Barry 37.58 38.11
5284 7209 09/1926 07/1964 11/1934
to 7200
Barry 37.83 38.28
5285 7210 09/1926 04/1965 11/1934
to 7200
Pontypool Road 38.58 39.03
5286 7211 09/1926 05/1964 11/1934
to 7200
Severn Tunnel Junction 37.67 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 08/1964 37.94
5287 7212 09/1926 02/1964 09/1934
to 7200
Aberdare 37.42 37.86
5288 7213 09/1926 09/1964 09/1934
to 7200
Llanelly 38 38.11
5289 7214 10/1926 12/1963 09/1934
to 7200
Aberdare 37.17 37.44
5290 7215 10/1926 06/1963 11/1934
to 7200
Swansea East Dock 36.67 36.86
5291 7216 10/1926 10/1963 11/1934
to 7200
Duffryn Yard 37 37.28
5292 7217 10/1926 07/1964 09/1934
to 7200
Aberbeeg 37.75 38.19
5293 7218 10/1926 09/1964 11/1934
to 7200
Truro 37.92 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 11/1964 38.11
5294 7219 10/1926 01/1964 10/1934
to 7200
Cardiff East Dock 37.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1964 37.44
5255 01/1940 05/1963 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 23.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1964 24.27
5256 28/02/1940 03/1965 Cardiff Canton 25.08 25.31
5257 28/02/1940 10/1964 Neath (Court Sart) 24.67 24.81
5258 28/02/1940 19/12/1962 Aberdare 22.83 24.31
5259 20/02/1940 03/1964 Cardiff Canton 24.08 25.25
5260 23/02/1940 03/1963 Aberbeeg 23.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1964 24.07
5261 23/02/1940 03/1965 Radyr 25.08 25.49
5262 01/03/1940 08/1963 Llanelly 23.42 24.31
5263 07/03/1940 12/1963 Aberdare 23.75 23.87
5264 03/1940 09/1964 Neath (Court Sart) 24.5 24.85