Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 549 Today
» 1189 Yesterday
» 4011 Week
» 23744 Month
» 320758 Year
» 397345 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

MR/LMS Johnson "1357" Class 0-6-0


LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
58229 09/1892 11/1953 Kentish Town 61.17
58230 10/1892 11/1955 Saltley 63.08 63.21
58231 11/1885 09/1952 Saltley 66.83
58232 11/1885 06/1954 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 68.58 70.63
58233 02/1885 06/1956 Canklow 71.33 71.38
58234 01/01/1885 07/1954 Cricklewood East 69.5
58235 01/01/1885 01/1955 Cricklewood East 70
58236 01/01/1885 11/1955 Burton 70.83
58237 01/01/1885 07/1951 Royston 66.5
58238 01/01/1885 11/1957 Canklow 72.83
58239 01/01/1886 05/1950 Bedford 64.33 64.41
58240 01/01/1886 05/1953 Nuneaton 67.33
58241 01/01/1886 06/1955 Shrewsbury 69.42 70.00
58242 01/01/1886 11/12/1954 Leicester Midland 68.92
3168 58243 01/01/1887 18/06/1949 Aston 62.42
58244 01/01/1887 06/1954 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 67.42
58245 01/01/1887 05/1950 Stourton 63.33 63.41
58246 01/01/1887 13/06/1959 Rowsley 72.42
58247 01/01/1887 01/1958 Rowsley 71
58248 01/01/1887 07/1951 Nottingham 64.5