GWR Collett "6000" Class 4-6-0
GWR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
6000 | 06/1927 | 04/12/1962 | 35.5 | Prs | Preserved | ||||
6001 | 07/1927 | 06/09/1962 | 35.17 | Cut | Cox and Danks (Oldbury) | ||||
6002 | 07/1927 | 21/09/1962 | 35.17 | Cut | Cox and Danks (Oldbury) | ||||
6003 | 07/1927 | 19/06/1962 | 34.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 08/09/1962 | 35.18 | ||
6004 | 07/1927 | 19/06/1962 | 34.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/11/1962 | 35.33 | ||
6005 | 07/1927 | 20/11/1962 | 35.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | ||||
6006 | 02/1928 | 15/02/1962 | 34 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 21/04/1962 | 34.20 | ||
6007 | 03/1928 | 05/03/1936 | 8 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/1936 | 8.01 | ||
6008 | 03/1928 | 19/06/1962 | 34.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 26/01/1963 | 34.89 | ||
6009 | 03/1928 | 21/09/1962 | 34.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | ||||
6010 | 04/1928 | 22/06/1962 | 34.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 09/1965 | 37.44 | ||
6011 | 04/1928 | 18/12/1962 | 34.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 25/01/1964 | 35.80 | ||
6012 | 04/1928 | 21/09/1962 | 34.42 | Cut | Cox and Danks (Oldbury) | ||||
6013 | 05/1928 | 19/06/1962 | 34.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 29/12/1962 | 34.65 | ||
6014 | 05/1928 | 21/09/1962 | 34.33 | Cut | Cox and Danks (Oldbury) | ||||
6015 | 06/1928 | 21/09/1962 | 34.25 | Cut | Cox and Danks (Oldbury) | ||||
6016 | 06/1928 | 13/09/1962 | 34.25 | Cut | Cox and Danks (Oldbury) | ||||
6017 | 06/1928 | 24/07/1962 | 34.08 | Cut | Cox and Danks (Oldbury) | ||||
6018 | 06/1928 | 18/12/1962 | 34.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 05/10/1963 | 35.33 | ||
6019 | 07/1928 | 21/09/1962 | 34.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | ||||
6020 | 05/1930 | 24/07/1962 | 32.17 | Cut | Cox and Danks (Oldbury) | ||||
6021 | 06/1930 | 21/09/1962 | 32.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | ||||
6022 | 06/1930 | 21/09/1962 | 32.25 | Cut | Cox and Danks (Oldbury) | ||||
6023 | 06/1930 | 19/06/1962 | 32 | Prs | Preserved | ||||
6024 | 06/1930 | 19/06/1962 | 32 | Prs | Preserved | ||||
6025 | 07/1930 | 18/12/1962 | 32.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 16/05/1964 | 33.86 | ||
6026 | 07/1930 | 12/09/1962 | 32.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 28/12/1963 | 33.48 | ||
6027 | 07/1930 | 21/09/1962 | 32.17 | Cut | Cox and Danks (Oldbury) | ||||
6028 | 07/1930 | 20/11/1962 | 32.33 | Cut | Birds (Risca) | ||||
6029 | 08/1930 | 24/07/1962 | 31.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | ||||
6007 | 24/03/1936 | 21/07/1962 | Stafford Road | 26.33 | Cut | Cox and Danks (Oldbury) |