Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 66 Today
» 1139 Yesterday
» 2339 Week
» 22072 Month
» 319086 Year
» 395673 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

MR/LMS Johnson "1F" Class 0-6-0T


LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
1660 41660 05/1878 05/1953 Canklow 75
1661 41661 06/1878 07/1959 Goole 81.08 82.39
1664 41664 07/1878 11/1953 Kentish Town 75.33
1666 41666 07/1878 06/1953 Skipton 74.92
1668 41668 07/1878 02/1948 Kentish Town 69.58
1671 41671 10/1878 14/02/1948 Kentish Town 69.33
1672 41672 11/1878 12/1955 St Albans 77.08
1674 41674 11/1878 29/05/1948 Kentish Town 69.5
1676 41676 12/1878 03/1949 70.25
1682 41682 02/1879 01/1955 Nottingham 75.92
1686 41686 02/1879 09/1956 Nottingham 77.58
1690 41690 10/1879 05/1951 Belle Vue 71.58
1695 41695 12/1879 04/1953 Cricklewood East 73.33
1699 41699 12/1879 02/1957 Burton 77.17 77.22
1702 41702 06/1880 30/06/1962 Gorton 82 82.72
1706 41706 06/1880 04/1957 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 76.83 77.13
1708 41708 06/1880 12/1966 Shirebrook 86.5 Prs Preserved
1710 41710 04/1882 07/1957 Derby 75.25 75.30
1711 41711 05/1882 10/1954 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 72.42 72.47
1712 41712 05/1882 10/1964 Derby 82.42 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 12/1964 82.64
1713 41713 05/1882 08/1955 Kentish Town 73.25 73.30
1714 41714 05/1882 15/05/1948 Birkenhead Mollington Street 66
1718 41718 06/1882 21/08/1948 Burton 66.17
1720 41720 04/1883 11/1956 Gloucester Barnwood 73.58 73.64
1724 41724 06/1883 06/1958 Derby 75 76.22
1725 41725 06/1883 08/1955 Shrewsbury 72.17 72.21
1726 41726 06/1883 07/1959 Derby 76.08 77.22
1727 41727 06/1883 03/1952 Gloucester Barnwood 68.75
1734 41734 10/1884 12/1966 Shirebrook 82.17 82.55
1739 41739 11/1884 06/1963 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 78.58 78.63
1745 41745 12/1884 04/1951 Holbeck (MR) 66.33
1747 41747 12/1884 11/12/1954 Derby 70 70.04
1748 41748 12/1884 09/1957 Gloucester Barnwood 72.75 72.88
1749 41749 12/1884 06/1955 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 70.5
1752 41752 12/1884 01/1958 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 73.08 73.13
1753 41753 12/1884 02/1957 Birkenhead Mollington Street 72.17 72.22
1754 41754 12/1884 12/1959 Derby 75 75.13
1756 41756 01/1885 05/1949 Devons Road (Bow) 64.33
1759 41759 01/1885 24/01/1948 Stourton 63
1762 41762 12/1889 09/1948 Nottingham 58.75
1763 41763 12/1889 12/1966 Shirebrook 77 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 04/1967 77.38
1767 41767 03/1890 09/1951 Skipton 61.5 61.54
1768 41768 03/1890 31/12/1949 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 59.75 59.88
1769 41769 03/1890 28/02/1962 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 71.92 72.05
1770 41770 04/1890 07/1953 Burton 63.25 63.29
1773 41773 04/1890 07/1960 Derby 70.25 70.30
1777 41777 06/1890 03/1956 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 65.75
1779 41779 05/1890 07/1957 Doncaster 67.17 67.30
1780 41780 07/1890 02/1953 Birkenhead Mollington Street 62.58 62.71
1781 41781 07/1890 07/1951 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 61
1788 41788 07/1890 04/1949 Derby 58.75
1793 41793 10/1890 10/1951 Normanton 61
1794 41794 10/1890 05/1952 Stourton 61.58 61.62
1795 41795 10/1890 05/1959 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 68.58 69.63
1797 41797 10/1890 09/1959 Goole 68.92 69.79
1803 41803 12/1890 11/1957 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 66.92 66.96
1804 41804 12/1890 12/1966 Colwick 76 76.38
1805 41805 09/1891 04/1956 Canklow 64.58
1811 41811 10/1891 09/1954 Stourton 62.92 62.96
1813 41813 10/1891 05/1954 Hasland 62.58
1814 41814 10/1891 03/1956 Belle Vue 64.42
1818 41818 11/1891 26/06/1948 Birkenhead Mollington Street 56.58
1820 41820 12/1891 08/1952 Skipton 60.67
1824 41824 12/1891 02/1951 Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 59.17 59.21
1826 41826 07/1892 06/1956 Cricklewood East 63.92 63.96
1829 41829 09/1892 01/1952 Hasland 59.33
1833 41833 10/1892 12/1953 Derby 61.17
1835 41835 10/1892 12/1966 Colwick 74.17 74.55
1838 41838 10/1892 05/1956 Stourton 63.58
1839 41839 11/1892 06/1956 Burton 63.58
1842 41842 11/1892 29/05/1948 Stourton 55.5
1844 41844 12/1892 05/1964 Derby 71.42 71.96
1846 41846 03/1895 10/1953 Hasland 58.58
1847 41847 04/1895 03/1960 Derby 64.92 65.04
1852 41852 08/1895 04/1951 Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 55.67
1853 41853 07/1895 10/1954 Birkenhead Mollington Street 59.25
1854 41854 07/1895 04/1951 St Albans 55.75
1855 41855 04/1895 05/1960 Goole 65.08 65.21
1856 41856 04/1895 06/1951 Saltley 56.17 56.28
1857 41857 04/1895 05/1959 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 64.08 65.63
1859 41859 05/1895 12/1955 Stourton 60.58 60.62
1860 41860 05/1899 03/1957 Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 57.83 57.87
1865 41865 06/1899 06/1955 Burton 56
1869 41869 07/1899 01/1953 Stourton 53.5
1870 41870 07/1899 10/04/1948 Gloucester Barnwood 48.75
1873 41873 08/1899 01/1950 Hasland 50.42
1874 41874 08/1899 02/1949 Bristol Barrow Road 49.5
1875 41875 08/1899 07/1963 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 63.92 63.96
1878 41878 09/1899 05/1959 Burton 59.67
1879 41879 09/1899 03/1960 Bristol Barrow Road 60.5 60.70
1885 41885 10/1899 20/10/1956 Mansfield 57 57.04
1889 41889 11/1899 04/1955 Derby 55.42 55.45
1890 41890 11/1899 03/1952 Stourton 52.33 52.45
1893 41893 12/1899 04/09/1948 48.75
1895 41895 12/1899 03/1950 Nottingham 50.25 50.28