Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 265 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 5843 Week
» 25576 Month
» 322590 Year
» 399177 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LSWR/SR Adams "Jubilee" Class 0-4-2


Class Types
SR Class A12

General
Designer Adams
Introduced 1887
Pre-Grouping London and South Western Railway
Big Four Southern Railway
Wheels 0-4-2
Number Built as A12 90
Number Scrapped 90
First in Service 05/1887
Last in Service 12/1948
Manufacturers
ManufacturerTotal
Neilson, Reid & Co. 40
Nine Elms Works 50
Orders
BuilderOrder #DateSize
Nine Elms Works A12 30/06/1886 10
Nine Elms Works E1 30/06/1886 10
Nine Elms Works M2 30/06/1888 10
Nine Elms Works O4 11/03/1891 10
Neilson, Reid & Co. n/a 15/04/1892 40
Nine Elms Works K6 22/11/1893 10

Power

Wheels

Dimensions

Boiler & Firebox