Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 608 Today
» 1259 Yesterday
» 1867 Week
» 24848 Month
» 388093 Year
» 464680 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LSWR/SR Adams "T1" Class 0-4-4T


Class Types
LSWR Class T1

General
Designer Adams
Introduced 1888
Pre-Grouping London and South Western Railway
Big Four Southern Railway
Wheels 0-4-4T
Number Built as T1 50
Number Scrapped 50
Number Preserved 0
First in Service 06/1888
Last in Service 05/1951
Manufacturers
ManufacturerTotal
Nine Elms Works 50
Orders
BuilderOrder #DateSize
Nine Elms Works T1 23/11/1887 20
Nine Elms Works F6 29/03/1893 10
Nine Elms Works S6 21/02/1894 10
Nine Elms Works A7 13/06/1894 10

Illustration
Copyright: Ben Brooksbank
Power
T1/a T1/b
Variant Introduced 1888 1893
Miscellaneous Differences Steam chest below cylinders. Steam chest between cylinders, Adams one-piece cast stove pipe chimney, reduced side tank (1,000) offset by 200g well tank under bunker.
Tractive Effort 17,099lbs
As T1/a
Inside Cylinders 18" x 26" (2 off)
As T1/a

Wheels
T1/a T1/b
Drivers 5' 7"
As T1/a
Truck 3'
As T1/a
Total Wheelbase 23'
As T1/a
Descriptive Wheelbase 8' 0" + 10' 0" + 5' 0" = 23' 0"
As T1/a

Dimensions
T1/a T1/b
Length (over buffers) 35' 112"
As T1/a
Weight (in running order) 53t 0cwt 55t 2cwt
Adhesive Weight 35t 0cwt 34t 9cwt
Maximum Axle Load 18t 0cwt 20t 10cwt
Water Capacity 1,200gal
As T1/a
Coal Capacity 2t 0cwt
As T1/a

Boiler & Firebox
T1/a T1/b
Boiler Max Diameter 4' 4"
As T1/a
Boiler Barrel Length 11'
As T1/a
Boiler Pressure 160lbs
As T1/a
Firebox Length 6'
As T1/a
Firebox Grate Area 17ft2
As T1/a
Firebox Heating Surface 110ft2
As T1/a
Tube Number 216
As T1/a
Tube Diameter 134"
As T1/a
Tube Area 1121ft2
As T1/a
Total Evaporative Area 1231ft2
As T1/a
Total Heating Area 1231ft2
As T1/a