Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 555 Today
» 1189 Yesterday
» 4017 Week
» 23750 Month
» 320764 Year
» 397351 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LSWR/SR Adams "O2" Class 0-4-4T


Class Types
LSWR Class O2

General
Designer Adams
Introduced 1889
Pre-Grouping London and South Western Railway
Big Four Southern Railway
Wheels 0-4-4T
Number Built as O2 60
Number Scrapped 59
Number Preserved 1
First in Service 12/1889
Last in Service 03/1967
Manufacturers
ManufacturerTotal
Nine Elms Works 60
Orders
BuilderOrder #DateSize
Nine Elms Works O2 30/01/1889 10
Nine Elms Works B3 27/02/1889 10
Nine Elms Works K3 29/01/1890 10
Nine Elms Works D4 06/08/1890 20
Nine Elms Works R6 13/06/1893 10

Illustration
Copyright: Gerald Robinson
Power
Variant Introduced 1889
Tractive Effort 17,235lbs
Inside Cylinders 17" x 24" (2 off)

Wheels
Drivers 4' 10"
Truck 3'
Total Wheelbase 20' 4"
Descriptive Wheelbase 6' 10" + 8' 6" + 5' 0" = 20' 4"

Dimensions
Length (over buffers) 30' 812"
Weight (in running order) 46t 18cwt
Maximum Axle Load 16t 8cwt
Water Capacity 800gal
Coal Capacity 1t 10cwt

Boiler & Firebox
Boiler Max Diameter 4' 2"
Boiler Barrel Length 9' 5"
Boiler Pressure 160lbs
Firebox Length 5'
Firebox Grate Area 13.83ft2
Firebox Heating Surface 89ft2
Tube Number 201
Tube Diameter 134"
Tube Area 898ft2
Total Evaporative Area 987ft2
Total Heating Area 987ft2