Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 70 Today
» 1139 Yesterday
» 2343 Week
» 22076 Month
» 319090 Year
» 395677 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LSWR/SR Drummond "Motor Tanks" Class 0-4-4T


SR (1931) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
21 30021 01/1904 03/1964 Salisbury 60.17 60.54
22 30022 01/1899 05/1958 Fratton 59.33 59.37
23 30023 01/1899 07/10/1961 Barnstaple Junction 62.75 62.87
24 30024 01/1899 03/03/1963 Bournemouth 64.17 64.37
25 30025 02/1899 05/1964 Salisbury 65.25 65.71
26 30026 02/1899 04/1959 Guildford 60.17 60.45
27 30027 01/1904 11/1959 Exmouth Junction 55.83 55.95
28 30028 01/1904 29/09/1962 Eastleigh 58.67 58.79
29 30029 02/1904 05/1964 Bournemouth 60.25 60.71
30 30030 02/1904 10/1959 Eastleigh 55.67 55.79
31 30031 03/1898 01/1960 Bournemouth 61.83 62.96
32 30032 03/1898 07/1963 Eastleigh 65.33 66.30
33 30033 04/1898 22/12/1962 Salisbury 64.67 65.04
34 30034 04/1898 17/02/1963 Salisbury 64.83 65.12
35 30035 04/1898 17/02/1963 Feltham 64.83 66.21
36 30036 05/1898 01/1964 Bournemouth 65.67 66.30
37 30037 05/1898 05/1958 Plymouth Friary 60 60.12
38 30038 05/1898 02/1958 Feltham 59.75 59.87
39 30039 05/1898 09/02/1963 Nine Elms 64.75 65.04
40 30040 06/1898 06/1961 Bournemouth 63 63.04
41 30041 03/1899 08/1957 Feltham 58.42 58.54
42 30042 03/1899 06/1957 Feltham 58.25 58.29
43 30043 03/1899 05/1961 Feltham 62.17 62.38
44 30044 03/1899 09/1961 Exmouth Junction 62.5 62.63
45 30045 05/1905 08/12/1962 Exmouth Junction 57.58 57.87
46 30046 05/1905 02/1959 Exmouth Junction 53.75 53.95
47 30047 05/1905 02/1960 Brighton 54.75 54.79
48 30048 05/1905 01/1964 Bournemouth 58.67 59.21
49 30049 05/1905 02/06/1962 Guildford 57.08 57.12
50 30050 06/1905 27/01/1962 Bournemouth 56.58 56.71
51 30051 11/1905 29/09/1962 Nine Elms 56.83 57.04
52 30052 12/1905 05/1964 Bournemouth 58.42 58.87
53 30053 12/1905 05/1964 Bournemouth 58.42 Prs Preserved
54 30054 12/1905 01/1959 Brighton 53.08 53.21
55 30055 12/1905 09/1963 Three Bridges 57.75 58.21
56 30056 01/1906 12/1963 Three Bridges 57.92 57.95
57 30057 01/1906 06/1963 Bournemouth 57.42 57.53
58 30058 03/1906 09/1960 Bournemouth 54.5 54.62
59 30059 03/1906 02/1961 Bournemouth 54.92 56.21
60 30060 03/1906 07/1961 Bournemouth 55.33 55.54
104 30104 03/1905 05/1961 Bournemouth 56.17 56.29
105 30105 03/1905 05/1963 Bournemouth 58.17 58.29
106 30106 03/1905 19/11/1960 Bournemouth 55.67 59.63
107 30107 04/1905 05/1964 Bournemouth 59.08 59.54
108 30108 03/1904 05/1964 Bournemouth 60.17 60.63
109 30109 03/1904 06/1961 Three Bridges 57.25 57.46
110 30110 03/1904 05/1963 Bournemouth 59.17 59.21
111 30111 03/1904 01/1964 Bournemouth 59.83 60.63
112 30112 07/1900 09/02/1963 Guildford 62.58 62.79
123 30123 02/1903 06/1959 Eastleigh 56.33 56.53
124 30124 02/1903 05/1961 Guildford 58.25 58.37
125 30125 06/1911 30/12/1962 Exmouth Junction 51.5 52.71
127 30127 10/1911 11/1963 Bournemouth 52.08 52.12
128 30128 11/1911 01/1960 Bournemouth 48.17 51.53
129 30129 11/1911 11/1963 Bournemouth 52 52.12
130 30130 02/1903 12/1959 Eastleigh 56.83 56.87
131 30131 11/1911 01/12/1962 Yeovil Town 51.08 51.12
132 30132 03/1903 27/10/1962 Guildford 59.58 59.79
133 30133 03/1903 03/1964 Bournemouth 61 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1965 62.72
241 30241 05/1899 07/1963 Eastleigh 64.17 64.46
242 30242 03/1897 08/1958 Nine Elms 61.42 61.46
243 30243 03/1897 09/1958 Feltham 61.5 61.54
244 30244 03/1897 10/1957 Nine Elms 60.58 60.71
245 30245 04/1897 17/11/1962 Nine Elms 65.58 Prs Preserved
246 30246 04/1897 10/1961 Guildford 64.5 64.63
247 30247 04/1897 10/1961 Barnstaple Junction 64.5 64.63
248 30248 05/1897 07/1961 Nine Elms 64.17 64.29
249 30249 05/1897 07/1963 Eastleigh 66.17 66.96
250 30250 05/1897 08/1957 Barnstaple Junction 60.25 60.71
251 30251 06/1897 07/1963 Eastleigh 66.08 66.21
252 30252 08/1897 02/1959 Barnstaple Junction 61.5 61.62
253 30253 08/1897 10/1961 Barnstaple Junction 64.17 70.38
254 30254 08/1897 05/1964 Bournemouth 66.75 67.21
255 30255 08/1897 09/1960 Barnstaple Junction 63.08 63.21
256 30256 08/1897 05/1959 Barnstaple Junction 61.75 61.95
318 30318 08/1900 12/1959 Bournemouth 59.33 59.46
319 30319 08/1900 01/1960 Nine Elms 59.42 59.54
320 30320 08/1900 09/02/1963 Nine Elms 62.5 63.71
321 30321 08/1900 09/1962 Plymouth Friary 62.08 62.29
322 30322 08/1900 11/1958 Nine Elms 58.25 58.37
323 30323 10/1900 12/1959 Exmouth Junction 59.17 59.21
324 30324 10/1900 09/1959 Bournemouth 58.92 59.04
328 30328 11/1911 03/03/1963 Tunbridge Wells West 51.33 51.62
356 30356 10/1900 12/1958 Fratton 58.17 58.21
357 30357 10/1900 04/1961 Eastleigh 60.5 60.71
374 30374 04/1903 10/1959 Exmouth Junction 56.5 56.54
375 30375 05/1903 09/1962 Plymouth Friary 59.33 59.46
376 30376 05/1903 01/1959 Eastleigh 55.67 55.87
377 30377 05/1903 08/1962 Eastleigh 59.25 59.38
378 30378 05/1903 30/12/1962 Bournemouth 59.58 59.96
379 30379 06/1904 10/1963 Three Bridges 59.33 59.46
479 30479 11/1911 04/1961 Three Bridges 49.42 49.53
480 30480 11/1911 05/1964 Eastleigh 52.5 52.95
481 30481 11/1911 05/1959 Eastleigh 47.5 47.61
667 30667 09/1897 02/1961 63.42 63.46
668 30668 09/1897 09/1961 64 64.29
669 30669 09/1897 07/1961 63.83 64.04
670 30670 10/1897 09/02/1963 65.33 65.62
671 30671 10/1897 07/1959 61.75 61.87
672 30672 10/1897 05/1948 50.58 50.61
673 30673 11/1897 08/1960 62.75 62.37
674 30674 11/1897 08/1961 63.75 63.96
675 30675 11/1897 03/1958 60.33 60.37
676 30676 11/1897 07/1961 Exmouth Junction 63.67 63.79