Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 70 Today
» 1139 Yesterday
» 2343 Week
» 22076 Month
» 319090 Year
» 395677 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LSWR/SR Drummond "Black Motors" Class 0-6-0


SR (1931) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
306 30306 05/1901 21/04/1962 Eastleigh 60.92 61.04
308 30308 05/1897 09/1961 Guildford 64.33 64.46
309 30309 05/1901 23/12/1962 Salisbury 61.58 62.21
315 30315 05/1897 23/12/1962 Salisbury 65.58 66.21
316 30316 08/1897 23/12/1962 Eastleigh 65.33 65.79
317 30317 05/1897 07/1961 Exmouth Junction 64.17 64.29
325 30325 06/1897 23/12/1962 Guildford 65.5 65.79
326 30326 06/1897 10/02/1962 Guildford 64.67 64.71
327 30327 06/1897 05/1961 Exmouth Junction 63.92 64.04
339 30339 06/1897 19/05/1962 Feltham 64.92 64.96
346 30346 08/1897 17/11/1962 Feltham 65.25 66.21
350 30350 08/1897 24/03/1962 Guildford 64.58 64.62
352 30352 08/1897 06/1959 Feltham 61.83 61.95
355 30355 08/1897 02/1961 Feltham 63.5 63.71
368 30368 08/1897 23/12/1962 Basingstoke 65.33 66.38
687 30687 03/1897 09/1960 63.5 63.63
688 30688 03/1897 09/1957 Feltham 60.5 60.62
689 30689 03/1897 17/11/1962 65.67 66.96
690 30690 03/1897 23/12/1962 65.75 65.96
691 30691 03/1897 07/1961 64.33 64.55
692 30692 03/1897 03/02/1962 64.92 65.04
693 30693 03/1897 07/1961 64.33 64.38
694 30694 03/1897 06/1961 64.25 64.38
695 30695 03/1897 23/12/1962 65.75 66.21
696 30696 03/1897 08/1961 64.42 64.55
697 30697 04/1897 17/11/1962 65.58 66.96
698 30698 04/1897 19/05/1962 65.08 65.12
699 30699 05/1897 07/1961 64.17 64.63
700 30700 05/1897 17/11/1962 65.5 66.96
701 30701 05/1897 07/1961 Nine Elms 64.17 64.46