Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 128 Today
» 966 Yesterday
» 2167 Week
» 21493 Month
» 248254 Year
» 759356 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Marsh "Large Vulcans" Class 0-6-0


SR (1931) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
2434 32434 03/1893 03/1957 Brighton 64 64.04
2437 32437 04/1893 06/1959 Feltham 66.17 66.21
2438 32438 04/1893 30/12/1961 Three Bridges 68.67 68.80
2440 32440 05/1893 10/1958 Norwood Junction 65.42 65.46
2441 32441 05/1893 10/1961 Three Bridges 68.42 68.55
2442 32442 05/1893 03/1960 Bricklayers Arms 66.83 66.88
2443 32443 06/1893 09/1960 Norwood Junction 67.25 67.38
2444 32444 06/1893 03/1960 Norwood Junction 66.75 66.88
2445 32445 07/1894 11/1961 Norwood Junction 67.33 67.38
2446 32446 07/1894 22/10/1960 Bricklayers Arms 66.25 66.46
2447 32447 08/1894 02/1960 Norwood Junction 65.5 65.62
2448 32448 08/1894 10/1961 Norwood Junction 67.17 67.21
2449 32449 10/1894 06/1961 Three Bridges 66.67 66.71
2450 32450 10/1894 10/1961 Norwood Junction 67 67.13
2451 32451 10/1894 11/1961 Norwood Junction 67.08 67.13
2521 32521 08/1900 09/12/1961 Norwood Junction 61.33 61.38
2522 32522 08/1900 10/1961 Three Bridges 61.17 61.29
2523 32523 08/1900 10/02/1962 Three Bridges 61.5 61.55
2524 32524 09/1900 02/1958 Bricklayers Arms 57.42 57.46
2525 32525 09/1900 03/02/1962 Three Bridges 61.42 61.46
2526 32526 09/1900 02/1960 Three Bridges 59.42 59.54
2527 32527 09/1900 05/11/1960 Three Bridges 60.17 60.29
2528 32528 11/1900 03/1961 Three Bridges 60.33 60.37
2529 32529 10/1900 10/1959 Three Bridges 59 59.21
2532 32532 10/1900 06/1960 Three Bridges 59.67 59.71
2534 32534 10/1900 10/1961 Three Bridges 61 61.04
2535 32535 11/1900 10/02/1962 Three Bridges 61.25 61.29
2536 32536 11/1900 03/1961 Three Bridges 60.33 60.37
2537 32537 11/1900 04/1957 Bricklayers Arms 56.42 56.53
2538 32538 11/1900 16/12/1961 Norwood Junction 61.08 61.21
2539 32539 11/1900 11/1961 Norwood Junction 61 61.12
2540 32540 11/1900 03/1958 Brighton 57.33 57.45
2541 32541 12/1901 02/1961 Norwood Junction 59.17 59.21
2543 32543 12/1901 09/1960 Norwood Junction 58.75 59.21
2544 32544 12/1901 11/1961 Norwood Junction 59.92 60.13
2545 32545 12/1901 09/12/1961 Norwood Junction 60 60.13
2546 32546 01/1902 04/1961 Norwood Junction 59.25 59.45
2547 32547 01/1902 11/1961 Norwood Junction 59.83 59.87
2548 32548 01/1902 11/1961 Norwood Junction 59.83 59.87
2549 32549 01/1902 09/12/1961 Norwood Junction 59.92 60.04
2550 32550 01/1902 09/12/1961 Norwood Junction 59.92 60.04
2551 32551 02/1902 02/1960 Bricklayers Arms 58 58.04
2552 32552 02/1902 06/1961 Norwood Junction 59.33 59.45
2553 32553 02/1902 08/1961 Three Bridges 59.5 60.62
2554 32554 02/1902 02/1960 Bricklayers Arms 58 58.12