Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1208 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14614 Week
» 67630 Month
» 187157 Year
» 3214010 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
LSWR/SR Drummond "L12" Class 4-4-0
SR (1931) |
BR |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
415
|
30415
|
06/1904 |
|
02/1953 |
|
48.67 |
|
|
|
48.70 |
416
|
30416
|
06/1904 |
|
27/06/1951 |
|
47 |
|
|
|
47.11 |
417
|
30417
|
06/1904 |
|
12/1951 |
|
47.5 |
|
|
|
|
418
|
30418
|
07/1904 |
|
27/06/1951 |
|
46.92 |
|
|
|
47.03 |
419
|
30419
|
07/1904 |
|
12/1951 |
|
47.42 |
|
|
|
|
420
|
30420
|
09/1904 |
|
01/09/1951 |
|
47 |
|
|
|
47.03 |
421
|
30421
|
09/1904 |
|
01/09/1951 |
|
47 |
|
|
|
47.03 |
422
|
30422
|
10/1904 |
|
09/1951 |
|
46.92 |
|
|
|
46.95 |
423
|
30423
|
10/1904 |
|
07/07/1951 |
|
46.75 |
|
|
|
46.86 |
424
|
30424
|
11/1904 |
|
21/07/1951 |
|
46.67 |
|
|
|
46.78 |
425
|
30425
|
11/1904 |
|
09/1951 |
|
46.83 |
|
|
|
46.86 |
426
|
30426
|
12/1904 |
|
11/1951 |
|
46.92 |
|
|
|
46.95 |
427
|
30427
|
12/1904 |
|
03/11/1951 |
|
46.92 |
|
|
|
46.95 |
428
|
30428
|
01/1905 |
|
07/04/1951 |
|
46.25 |
|
|
|
|
429
|
30429
|
01/1905 |
|
10/1951 |
|
46.75 |
|
|
|
46.78 |
430
|
30430
|
02/1905 |
|
03/1951 |
|
46.08 |
|
|
|
46.19 |
431
|
30431
|
02/1905 |
|
10/1951 |
|
46.67 |
|
|
|
46.69 |
432
|
30432
|
02/1905 |
|
10/1951 |
|
46.67 |
|
|
|
46.69 |
433
|
30433
|
03/1905 |
|
12/1951 |
|
46.75 |
|
|
|
46.78 |
434
|
30434
|
03/1905 |
|
03/1955 |
|
50 |
|
|
|
50.45 |