Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 988 Today
» 1189 Yesterday
» 4450 Week
» 24183 Month
» 321197 Year
» 397784 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LSWR/SR Adams "Radial Tanks" Class 4-4-2T


Class Types
LSWR Class 415

General
Designer Adams
Introduced 1882
Pre-Grouping London and South Western Railway
Big Four Southern Railway
Wheels 4-4-2T
Number Built as 415 71
First in Service 08/1882
Last in Service 07/1961
Manufacturers
ManufacturerTotal
Beyer Peacock Ltd. 12
Dübs & Co 20
Neilson, Reid & Co. 11
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd 28
Orders
BuilderOrder #DateSize
Beyer Peacock Ltd. n/a 09/11/1881 12
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd n/a 19/07/1882 18
Dübs & Co n/a 15/07/1883 10
Neilson, Reid & Co. n/a 04/08/1883 11
Dübs & Co n/a 11/07/1884 10
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd n/a 11/07/1884 10

Illustration
Copyright: Gerald Robinson
Power
415 415 Ex 1 415 Ex 2
Variant Introduced 1883 1884 1885
Miscellaneous Differences   Extended side tanks and deeper firebox. Extended firebox and side tanks
Outside Cylinders 17.5" x 24" (2 off)
As 415
As 415

Wheels
415 415 Ex 1 415 Ex 2
Pony 3'
As 415
As 415
Drivers 5' 7"
As 415
As 415
Truck 3'
As 415
As 415
Total Wheelbase 29' 5"
As 415
As 415
Descriptive Wheelbase 7' 0" + 6' 5" + 8' 6" + 7' 6" = 29' 5"
As 415
As 415

Dimensions
415 415 Ex 1 415 Ex 2
Weight (in running order) 54t 17cwt 58t 0cwt 58t 7cwt
Maximum Axle Load 16t 8cwt 17t 1cwt 17t 3cwt
Water Capacity 1,000gal 1,170gal 1,250gal
Coal Capacity 2t 0cwt
As 415
As 415

Boiler & Firebox
415 415 Ex 1 415 Ex 2
Boiler Max Diameter 4' 2" 4' 2"
As 415 Ex 1
Boiler Barrel Length 10' 10'
As 415 Ex 1
Boiler Pressure 160lbs 160lbs
As 415 Ex 1
Firebox Length 6' 2" 6' 2"
As 415 Ex 1
Firebox Grate Area 18.25ft2 18ft2
As 415 Ex 1
Firebox Heating Surface 104ft2 111ft2
As 415 Ex 1
Tube Number 201
As 415
As 415
Tube Diameter 134"
As 415
As 415
Tube Area 949ft2 945ft2
As 415 Ex 1
Total Evaporative Area 1053ft2 1056ft2
As 415 Ex 1
Total Heating Area 1053ft2 1056ft2
As 415 Ex 1