Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 725 Today
» 962 Yesterday
» 1687 Week
» 18487 Month
» 334718 Year
» 845820 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Maunsell "Lord Nelson" Class 4-6-0


SR (1931) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
850 30850 08/1926 Stewarts Lane 18/08/1962 Eastleigh 36 Prs Preserved
851 30851 06/1928 23/12/1961 33.5 33.94
852 30852 07/1928 17/02/1962 33.58 33.69
853 30853 09/1928 03/03/1962 33.5 33.60
854 30854 10/1928 09/1961 32.92 33.02
855 30855 11/1928 09/1961 32.83 33.27
856 30856 11/1928 22/09/1962 33.83 34.02
857 30857 12/1928 22/09/1962 33.75 33.85
858 30858 01/1929 08/1961 32.58 32.85
859 30859 03/1929 09/12/1961 32.75 32.78
860 30860 04/1929 08/1962 33.33 33.36
861 30861 09/1929 06/10/1962 33.08 33.19
862 30862 10/1929 06/10/1962 33 33.11
863 30863 10/1929 10/02/1962 32.33 32.44
864 30864 11/1929 27/01/1962 32.17 32.35
865 30865 11/1929 05/1961 31.5 31.77