Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 423 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14466 Week
» 79420 Month
» 282084 Year
» 3308937 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
LSWR/SR Urie "N15" Class 4-6-0
SR (1931) |
BR |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
448
|
30448
|
05/1925 |
|
27/08/1960 |
|
35.25 |
|
|
|
35.36 |
449
|
30449
|
06/1925 |
|
19/12/1959 |
|
34.5 |
|
|
|
34.52 |
450
|
30450
|
06/1925 |
|
03/09/1960 |
|
35.25 |
|
|
|
35.28 |
451
|
30451
|
06/1925 |
|
16/06/1962 |
|
37 |
|
|
|
37.02 |
452
|
30452
|
07/1925 |
|
22/08/1959 |
|
34.08 |
|
|
|
34.27 |
453
|
30453
|
02/1925 |
|
08/07/1961 |
|
36.42 |
|
|
|
36.69 |
454
|
30454
|
03/1925 |
|
18/10/1958 |
|
33.58 |
|
|
|
33.69 |
455
|
30455
|
03/1925 |
|
18/04/1959 |
|
34.08 |
|
|
|
34.19 |
456
|
30456
|
04/1925 |
|
14/05/1960 |
|
35.08 |
|
|
|
35.11 |
457
|
30457
|
04/1925 |
|
20/05/1961 |
|
36.08 |
|
|
|
36.27 |
736
|
30736
|
09/1918 |
|
10/1956 |
|
38.08 |
|
|
|
|
737
|
30737
|
10/1918 |
|
08/1956 |
|
37.83 |
|
|
|
37.86 |
738
|
30738
|
12/1919 |
|
08/03/1958 |
|
38.25 |
|
|
|
38.27 |
739
|
30739
|
02/1919 |
|
04/05/1957 |
|
38.25 |
|
|
|
38.27 |
740
|
30740
|
04/1919 |
|
10/12/1955 |
|
36.67 |
|
|
|
37.11 |
741
|
30741
|
05/1919 |
|
04/02/1956 |
|
36.75 |
|
|
|
36.78 |
742
|
30742
|
06/1919 |
|
09/02/1957 |
|
37.67 |
|
|
|
37.70 |
743
|
30743
|
08/1919 |
|
15/10/1955 |
|
36.17 |
|
|
|
36.28 |
744
|
30744
|
09/1919 |
|
07/01/1956 |
|
36.33 |
|
|
|
36.36 |
745
|
30745
|
11/1919 |
|
11/02/1956 |
|
36.25 |
|
|
|
36.28 |
746
|
30746
|
06/1922 |
|
11/1955 |
|
33.42 |
|
|
|
33.44 |
747
|
30747
|
07/1922 |
|
10/1956 |
|
34.25 |
|
|
|
34.61 |
748
|
30748
|
08/1922 |
|
07/09/1957 |
|
35.08 |
|
|
|
35.19 |
749
|
30749
|
09/1922 |
|
22/06/1957 |
|
34.75 |
|
|
|
34.85 |
750
|
30750
|
10/1922 |
|
06/07/1957 |
|
34.75 |
|
|
|
34.86 |
751
|
30751
|
11/1922 |
|
15/06/1957 |
|
34.58 |
|
|
|
34.69 |
752
|
30752
|
12/1922 |
|
17/12/1955 |
|
33 |
|
|
|
33.11 |
753
|
30753
|
01/1923 |
|
16/03/1957 |
|
34.17 |
|
|
|
34.19 |
754
|
30754
|
02/1923 |
|
02/1953 |
|
30 |
|
|
|
30.02 |
755
|
30755
|
03/1923 |
|
11/05/1957 |
|
34.17 |
|
|
|
34.19 |
763
|
30763
|
05/1925 |
|
09/1960 |
|
35.33 |
|
|
|
35.44 |
764
|
30764
|
05/1925 |
|
22/07/1961 |
|
36.17 |
|
|
|
36.28 |
765
|
30765
|
05/1925 |
|
29/09/1962 |
|
37.33 |
|
|
|
37.53 |
766
|
30766
|
05/1925 |
|
27/12/1958 |
|
33.58 |
|
|
|
33.69 |
767
|
30767
|
06/1925 |
|
27/06/1959 |
|
34 |
|
|
|
34.27 |
768
|
30768
|
06/1925 |
|
10/1961 |
|
36.33 |
|
|
|
36.61 |
769
|
30769
|
06/1925 |
|
27/02/1960 |
|
34.67 |
|
|
|
34.69 |
770
|
30770
|
06/1925 |
|
24/11/1962 |
|
37.42 |
|
|
|
37.70 |
771
|
30771
|
06/1925 |
|
03/1961 |
|
35.75 |
|
|
|
35.94 |
772
|
30772
|
06/1925 |
|
30/09/1961 |
|
36.25 |
|
|
|
36.53 |
773
|
30773
|
06/1925 |
|
10/02/1962 |
|
36.67 |
|
|
|
36.86 |
774
|
30774
|
06/1925 |
|
09/01/1960 |
|
34.58 |
|
|
|
34.61 |
775
|
30775
|
06/1925 |
|
27/02/1960 |
|
34.67 |
|
|
|
34.69 |
776
|
30776
|
06/1925 |
|
24/01/1959 |
|
33.58 |
|
|
|
33.69 |
777
|
30777
|
06/1925 |
|
21/10/1961 |
|
36.33 |
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
778
|
30778
|
06/1925 |
|
23/05/1959 |
|
33.92 |
|
|
|
34.27 |
779
|
30779
|
07/1925 |
|
11/07/1959 |
|
34 |
|
|
|
34.19 |
780
|
30780
|
07/1925 |
|
11/07/1959 |
|
34 |
|
|
|
34.19 |
781
|
30781
|
07/1925 |
|
12/05/1962 |
|
36.83 |
|
|
|
36.86 |
782
|
30782
|
07/1925 |
|
15/09/1962 |
|
37.17 |
|
|
|
37.19 |
783
|
30783
|
08/1925 |
|
02/1961 |
|
35.5 |
|
|
|
35.86 |
784
|
30784
|
08/1925 |
|
17/10/1959 |
|
34.17 |
|
|
|
34.27 |
785
|
30785
|
08/1925 |
|
17/10/1959 |
|
34.17 |
|
|
|
34.27 |
786
|
30786
|
08/1925 |
|
29/08/1959 |
|
34 |
|
|
|
34.19 |
787
|
30787
|
09/1925 |
|
28/02/1959 |
|
33.42 |
|
|
|
33.68 |
788
|
30788
|
09/1925 |
|
10/02/1962 |
|
36.42 |
|
|
|
36.44 |
789
|
30789
|
09/1925 |
|
26/12/1959 |
|
34.25 |
|
|
|
34.36 |
790
|
30790
|
09/1925 |
|
10/1961 |
|
36.08 |
|
|
|
36.36 |
791
|
30791
|
09/1925 |
|
21/05/1960 |
|
34.67 |
|
|
|
34.69 |
792
|
30792
|
10/1925 |
|
14/02/1959 |
|
33.33 |
|
|
|
33.44 |
793
|
30793
|
03/1926 |
|
08/1962 |
|
36.42 |
|
|
|
36.53 |
794
|
30794
|
03/1926 |
|
20/08/1960 |
|
34.42 |
|
|
|
34.53 |
795
|
30795
|
04/1926 |
|
04/08/1962 |
|
36.33 |
|
|
|
36.36 |
796
|
30796
|
05/1926 |
|
03/03/1962 |
|
35.83 |
|
|
|
35.94 |
797
|
30797
|
08/1926 |
|
08/1959 |
|
33 |
|
|
|
32.85 |
798
|
30798
|
06/1926 |
|
16/06/1962 |
|
36 |
|
|
|
36.11 |
799
|
30799
|
07/1926 |
|
25/02/1961 |
|
34.58 |
|
|
|
34.78 |
800
|
30800
|
09/1926 |
|
08/1961 |
|
34.92 |
|
|
|
35.02 |
801
|
30801
|
10/1926 |
|
11/04/1959 |
|
32.5 |
|
|
|
32.69 |
802
|
30802
|
10/1926 |
|
08/07/1961 |
|
34.75 |
|
|
|
34.86 |
803
|
30803
|
11/1926 |
|
08/1961 |
|
34.75 |
|
|
|
34.86 |
804
|
30804
|
12/1926 |
|
17/02/1962 |
|
35.17 |
|
|
|
35.27 |
805
|
30805
|
01/1927 |
|
28/11/1959 |
|
32.83 |
|
|
|
32.94 |
806
|
30806
|
01/1927 |
|
29/04/1961 |
|
34.25 |
|
|
|
34.44 |