Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 70 Today
» 1139 Yesterday
» 2343 Week
» 22076 Month
» 319090 Year
» 395677 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LSWR/SR Urie "S15" Class 4-6-0


SR (1931) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
496 30496 05/1921 06/1963 42.08 42.28
497 30497 03/1920 07/1963 43.33 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 03/1964 44.03
498 30498 04/1920 08/1963 43.33 43.36
499 30499 05/1920 01/1964 43.67 Prs Preserved
500 30500 05/1920 06/1963 43.08 43.45
501 30501 06/1920 06/1963 43 43.19
502 30502 07/1920 15/12/1962 42.42 42.69
503 30503 08/1920 06/1963 42.83 43.19
504 30504 09/1920 17/11/1962 42.17 42.36
505 30505 10/1920 17/11/1962 42.08 42.19
506 30506 10/1920 05/01/1964 Feltham 43.25 Prs Preserved
507 30507 11/1920 12/1963 43.08 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 03/1964 43.36
508 30508 12/1920 12/1963 43 43.11
509 30509 12/1920 07/1963 42.58 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 03/1964 43.28
510 30510 01/1921 06/1963 42.42 42.69
511 30511 01/1921 07/1963 42.5 43.03
512 30512 02/1921 03/1964 43.08 43.95
513 30513 03/1921 31/03/1963 42 42.28
514 30514 03/1921 07/1963 42.33 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 03/1964 43.03
515 30515 04/1921 07/1963 42.25 42.78
823 30823 03/1927 11/1964 37.67 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 02/1965 37.95
824 30824 03/1927 09/1965 38.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1965 38.78
825 30825 04/1927 01/1964 36.75 Prs Preserved
826 30826 05/1927 01/12/1962 35.58 36.70
827 30827 06/1927 01/1964 36.58 36.70
828 30828 07/1927 01/1964 36.5 Prs Preserved
829 30829 07/1927 11/1963 36.33 36.53
830 30830 08/1927 07/1964 36.92 Prs Preserved
831 30831 09/1927 11/1963 36.17 36.27
832 30832 10/1927 01/1964 36.25 36.36
833 30833 11/1927 05/1965 37.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1966 38.44
834 30834 11/1927 11/1964 37 37.36
835 30835 12/1927 11/1964 36.92 37.27
836 30836 12/1927 08/1964 36.67 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 10/1964 36.86
837 30837 01/1928 09/1965 37.67 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 09/1966 38.69
838 30838 05/1936 09/1965 29.33 30.02
839 30839 05/1936 09/1965 29.33 30.02
840 30840 08/1936 09/1964 28.08 28.27
841 30841 07/1936 01/1964 27.5 Prs Preserved
842 30842 08/1936 09/1965 29.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1965 29.27
843 30843 09/1936 09/1964 28 28.19
844 30844 10/1936 06/1964 27.67 28.27
845 30845 10/1936 07/1963 26.75 26.93
846 30846 11/1936 09/02/1963 26.25 26.27
847 30847 12/1936 01/1964 27.08 Prs Preserved