Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 66 Today
» 1139 Yesterday
» 2339 Week
» 22072 Month
» 319086 Year
» 395673 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LYR/LMS Aspinall "23" Class 0-6-0ST


LYR LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
534 11307 51307 03/1877 11/1957 Newton Heath 80.67 80.89
538 11313 51313 07/1877 27/10/1956 Edge Hill 79.25 79.39
531 11316 51316 03/1877 01/1959 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 81.83 83.56
535 11318 51318 04/1877 02/1949 Speke Junction 71.83
561 11319 51319 09/1877 11/1959 Gorton 82.17 82.30
566 11320 51320 11/1877 10/04/1948 Mirfield 70.42
537 11321 51321 07/1877 02/1958 Fleetwood 80.58 80.64
564 11323 51323 10/1877 05/1956 Goole 78.58
559 11325 51325 08/1877 03/1949 71.58 71.71
551 11336 51336 07/1877 05/11/1960 Fleetwood 83.33 83.39
562 11338 51338 10/1877 07/1957 Newton Heath 79.75 79.88
249 11342 51342 10/1893 18/09/1948 Speke Junction 54.92
544 11343 51343 02/1878 01/1960 Newton Heath 81.92 82.05
236 11345 51345 12/1893 10/1956 Lostock Hall 62.83 62.96
165 11348 51348 10/1878 09/1953 Sowerby Bridge 74.92
122 11353 51353 10/1878 07/1957 Edge Hill 78.75 78.88
549 11358 51358 02/1878 10/1959 Mirfield 81.67 81.80
547 11361 51361 02/1878 27/10/1956 Goole 78.67 78.88
164 11371 51371 10/1878 03/1961 Newton Heath 82.42 82.55
137 11375 51375 01/1880 09/1954 Bank Hall 74.67
181 11376 51376 09/1880 04/1955 Bolton 74.58
136 11379 51379 12/1879 04/1955 Goole 75.33
138 11381 51381 01/1880 11/1957 Newton Heath 77.83 77.97
783 11390 51390 03/1895 07/1956 Newton Heath 61.33
762 11396 51396 05/1895 02/1956 Bank Hall 60.75 60.87
574 11397 51397 09/1895 03/1959 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 63.5 64.21
799 11404 51404 07/1895 03/1959 Mirfield 63.67 65.21
197 11405 51405 09/1880 11/12/1948 Speke Junction 68.25
140 11408 51408 02/1880 17/02/1962 Agecroft 82 82.64
144 11410 51410 09/1895 04/1954 Accrington 58.58
598 11412 51412 09/1895 09/1962 67 67.13
747 11413 51413 09/1895 08/1961 Agecroft 65.92 66.21
284 11415 51415 09/1895 10/1958 Newton Heath 63.08 64.87
166 11419 51419 05/1880 09/1961 Fleetwood 81.33 81.64
583 11423 51423 10/1895 12/1958 Lostock Hall 63.17 64.79
584 11424 51424 10/1895 10/1958 Mirfield 63 63.87
175 11425 51425 11/1895 07/1956 Bank Hall 60.67
571 11427 51427 11/1895 20/11/1948 Speke Junction 53
778 11429 51429 11/1895 05/1961 65.5 65.54
597 11432 51432 12/1895 08/1957 Goole 61.67 61.71
767 11436 51436 12/1895 03/1955 Newton Heath 59.25 59.37
196 11438 51438 09/1880 04/1949 Newton Heath 68.58
793 11439 51439 01/1896 06/1956 Speke Junction 60.42
798 11441 51441 01/1896 03/1961 Edge Hill 65.17 65.29
773 11443 51443 02/1896 05/1949 Goole 53.25
322 11444 51444 02/1896 09/1961 65.58 65.62
588 11445 51445 02/1896 06/1960 Edge Hill 64.33 64.54
596 11446 51446 03/1896 10/03/1962 66 66.04
748 11447 51447 03/1896 01/1957 Newton Heath 60.83 61.71
801 11453 51453 05/1896 09/1958 Mirfield 62.33 63.38
782 11457 51457 02/1896 03/1959 Newton Heath 63.08 64.54
292 11458 51458 04/1896 05/1959 Newton Heath 63.08 65.46
589 11460 51460 05/1896 10/1954 Aintree 58.42
580 11462 51462 05/1896 27/10/1956 Aintree 60.42 60.54
763 11464 51464 06/1896 10/1956 Accrington 60.33 60.46
774 11467 51467 04/1896 13/11/1948 Lower Darwen 52.58
756 11468 51468 04/1896 01/1949 Wakefield 52.75
765 11469 51469 07/1896 05/1949 Speke Junction 52.83
592 11470 51470 05/1896 08/10/1955 Newton Heath 59.42 59.62
576 11471 51471 07/1896 10/1954 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 58.25 58.37
587 11472 51472 05/1896 04/1955 Newton Heath 58.92
194 11474 51474 09/1880 06/1957 Accrington 76.75 76.96
803 11475 51475 08/1896 11/1949 Greenock Ladyburn 53.25
847 11477 51477 03/1885 08/1955 Fleetwood 70.42 70.46
855 11479 51479 04/1885 10/1956 Goole 71.5 71.63
254 11481 51481 04/1898 10/1957 Newton Heath 59.5 59.62
843 11482 51482 03/1885 10/1949 Sowerby Bridge 64.58
788 11484 51484 03/1898 06/1959 Gorton 61.25 61.46
585 11486 51486 05/1898 09/1960 Bolton 62.33 62.46
797 11487 51487 12/1898 23/10/1948 Bury 49.83
845 11488 51488 03/1885 03/1956 Newton Heath 71 71.13
663 11489 51489 07/1898 02/1954 Bury 55.58
812 11490 51490 07/1898 08/1953 Southport 55.08
852 11491 51491 04/1885 03/1957 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 71.92 72.13
772 11492 51492 07/1898 07/1949 Rose Grove 51
760 11495 51495 09/1881 05/1949 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 67.67
846 11496 51496 03/1885 03/1961 Agecroft 76 76.13
586 11497 51497 04/1881 05/1959 Newton Heath 78.08 80.47
851 11498 51498 04/1885 26/11/1960 Bolton 75.58 75.80
764 11499 51499 10/1881 06/1957 Agecroft 75.67 75.88
579 11500 51500 10/1880 02/1957 Agecroft 76.33 76.39
787 11503 51503 03/1882 11/04/1957 Goole 75.08 75.22
859 11504 51504 05/1885 08/1956 Gorton 71.25
848 11506 51506 04/1885 05/1957 Lower Darwen 72.08 72.13
810 11510 51510 04/1883 10/1955 Belle Vue 72.5
305 11511 51511 09/1881 01/10/1955 Bolton 74.08 74.21
781 11512 51512 02/1882 07/1958 Gorton 76.42 78.63
751 11513 51513 05/1881 05/1956 Bolton 75
809 11514 51514 04/1883 11/1953 Accrington 70.58
860 11516 51516 05/1885 20/10/1956 Goole 71.42 71.55
844 11519 51519 03/1885 09/1954 Bolton 69.5
568 11521 51521 08/1880 20/10/1956 Goole 76.17
802 11524 51524 02/1883 09/1960 Fleetwood 77.58 77.97
761 11526 51526 09/1881 09/1957 Lostock Hall 76 76.13
595 11530 51530 03/1881 11/1955 Aintree 74.67