Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 119 Today
» 889 Yesterday
» 1876 Week
» 19637 Month
» 309029 Year
» 820131 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LYR/LMS "25" Class 0-6-0


LYR LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
929 12016 52016 08/1887 20/10/1956 Patricroft 69.17 69.30
932 12019 52019 09/1887 09/1949 Patricroft 62
934 12021 52021 09/1887 08/1955 Springs Branch (Wigan) 67.92 67.96
935 12022 52022 09/1887 09/1950 Patricroft 63
936 12023 52023 10/1887 04/1950 Springs Branch (Wigan) 62.5
937 12024 52024 10/1887 05/1954 Patricroft 66.58
943 12030 52030 11/1887 10/1952 Patricroft 64.92
944 12031 52031 11/1887 12/1954 Patricroft 67.08
945 12032 52032 11/1887 10/01/1948 Springs Branch (Wigan) 60.17
947 12034 52034 12/1887 08/1951 Patricroft 63.67
949 12036 52036 07/1887 13/11/1948 Patricroft 61.33
950 12037 52037 07/1887 08/1952 Wakefield 65.08
954 12041 52041 08/1887 10/1950 Newton Heath 63.17
956 12043 52043 08/1887 08/1953 Wakefield 66
957 12044 52044 08/1887 07/1959 Wakefield 71.92 Prs Preserved
958 12045 52045 08/1887 08/1955 Patricroft 68 68.04
959 12046 52046 08/1887 07/02/1948 Wakefield 60.5
960 12047 52047 08/1887 01/1950 Wakefield 62.42
964 12051 52051 09/1887 02/1956 Springs Branch (Wigan) 68.42 68.54
966 12053 52053 10/1887 07/03/1955 Wakefield 67.42 67.46
969 12056 52056 10/1887 08/1951 Wakefield 63.83
972 12059 52059 11/1887 05/1951 Patricroft 63.5
976 12063 52063 12/1887 04/09/1948 Springs Branch (Wigan) 60.75
977 12064 52064 12/1887 12/1950 Patricroft 63