Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 128 Today
» 966 Yesterday
» 2167 Week
» 21493 Month
» 248254 Year
» 759356 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LYR/LMS Aspinall "27" Class 0-6-0


LYR LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
1023 12088 52088 11/1889 07/1951 Patricroft 61.67
1024 12089 52089 12/1889 11/1960 Mirfield 70.92
1027 12091 52091 01/1890 07/1953 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 63.5
1029 12092 52092 01/1890 02/1951 Low Moor 61.08
1030 12093 52093 02/1890 09/1962 72.58 72.63
1031 12094 52094 02/1890 05/1957 Bury 67.25 67.29
1032 12095 52095 02/1890 11/1959 Rose Grove 69.75 70.12
1057 12098 52098 10/1890 10/1953 Springs Branch (Wigan) 63 63.21
1058 12099 52099 10/1890 01/1956 Belle Vue 65.25 65.38
1059 12100 52100 10/1890 09/1951 Speke Junction 60.92 61.38
1061 12102 52102 11/1890 01/1953 Newton Heath 62.17
1062 12103 52103 11/1890 05/1949 58.5
1063 12104 52104 11/1890 03/1956 Mirfield 65.33 65.37
1064 12105 52105 11/1890 04/1953 Edge Hill 62.42
1066 12107 52107 12/1890 03/1953 Springs Branch (Wigan) 62.25
1067 12108 52108 12/1890 10/1959 Newton Heath 68.83 69.04
1069 12110 52110 12/1890 05/1950 Moor Row 59.42
1070 12111 52111 12/1890 03/1951 Edge Hill 60.25
1071 12112 52112 01/1891 09/1951 Aintree 60.67
1078 12118 52118 04/1891 09/1954 Springs Branch (Wigan) 63.42
1079 12119 52119 04/1891 13/10/1962 Rhyl 71.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1963 72.13
1080 12120 52120 04/1891 07/1958 Mirfield 67.25 68.13
1081 12121 52121 05/1891 08/12/1962 Sowerby Bridge 71.58 71.63
1083 12123 52123 05/1891 09/1957 Southport 66.33 66.46
1084 12124 52124 05/1891 01/1954 Agecroft 62.67
1085 12125 52125 05/1891 11/1957 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 66.5 66.80
1086 12126 52126 06/1891 05/1951 Springs Branch (Wigan) 59.92
1087 12127 52127 06/1891 19/06/1948 Low Moor 57
1089 12129 52129 06/1891 09/1961 Bury 70.25 70.38
1113 12132 52132 10/1891 03/1957 Bolton 65.42 65.62
1114 12133 52133 10/1891 01/1961 Sowerby Bridge 69.25 69.38
1117 12135 52135 10/1891 11/1959 Aintree 68.08 68.30
1118 12136 52136 10/1891 08/1957 Aintree 65.83 65.96
1119 12137 52137 10/1891 06/1954 Newton Heath 62.67
1120 12138 52138 11/1891 03/1954 Rose Grove 62.33
1121 12139 52139 11/1891 02/1960 Mirfield 68.25 69.30
1122 12140 52140 11/1891 07/1960 Newton Heath 68.67 68.79
1124 12141 52141 01/1891 05/1960 Newton Heath 69.33 69.46
1126 12143 52143 12/1891 10/1957 Springs Branch (Wigan) 65.83 66.38
1134 12150 52150 01/1892 03/1955 Low Moor 63.17 63.20
1137 12152 52152 02/1892 06/03/1948 56.08
1141 12154 52154 02/1892 11/1960 Goole 68.75 68.96
1143 12156 52156 03/1892 03/1953 Newton Heath 61
1144 12157 52157 03/1892 04/1953 Blackpool Central 61.08
1146 12159 52159 03/1892 06/1958 Newton Heath 66.25 66.38
1147 12160 52160 03/1892 07/1957 Aintree 65.33 65.46
1148 12161 52161 04/1892 10/1960 Newton Heath 68.5 68.55
1149 12162 52162 04/1892 04/1960 Rhyl 68 68.13
1150 12163 52163 04/1892 09/1957 Speke Junction 65.42 65.88
1151 12164 52164 04/1892 06/1955 Bury 63.17
1152 12165 52165 04/1892 04/1957 Newton Heath 65 65.12
1180 12166 52166 11/1892 27/10/1956 Low Moor 63.92 64.04
1181 12167 52167 11/1892 03/1956 Rhyl 63.33
1183 12169 52169 11/1892 12/1952 Wigan Central (L&Y) 60.08
1184 12170 52170 11/1892 18/09/1948 Edge Hill 55.83
1185 12171 52171 12/1892 05/1961 Aintree 68.42 68.54
1186 12172 52172 12/1892 10/1957 Rhyl 64.83 65.04
1188 12174 52174 12/1892 09/1954 Lostock Hall 61.75 61.87
1189 12175 52175 12/1892 10/1957 Speke Junction 64.83 64.96
1190 12176 52176 12/1892 10/1951 Bangor 58.83
1191 12177 52177 01/1893 12/1956 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 63.92
1193 12179 52179 01/1893 08/1960 Rose Grove 67.58 68.13
1195 12181 52181 01/1893 18/06/1949 Wakefield 56.42
1196 12182 52182 01/1893 05/1961 Bolton 68.33 68.46
1197 12183 52183 02/1893 11/1959 Patricroft 66.75 68.71
12184 52184 02/1893 12/1949 Moor Row 56.83
1200 12186 52186 03/1893 08/1957 Wakefield 64.42 64.46
1204 12189 52189 03/1893 21/08/1954 Mirfield 61.42
1206 12191 52191 03/1893 12/1951 Goole 58.75
12192 52192 03/1893 11/1949 Mirfield 56.67
1209 12194 52194 03/1893 08/1955 Lower Darwen 62.42 62.46
184 12196 52196 04/1893 01/1957 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 63.75 63.96
186 12197 52197 04/1893 09/1956 Wigan Central (L&Y) 63.42 63.54
437 12201 52201 05/1893 02/1961 Bury 67.75 67.88
521 12203 52203 05/1893 03/1957 Lostock Hall 63.83 63.96
50 12207 52207 06/1893 05/1961 Patricroft 67.92 67.96
78 12208 52208 06/1893 10/1950 Birkenhead Mollington Street 57.33
106 12212 52212 06/1893 09/1958 Crewe South 65.25 65.79
335 12215 52215 07/1893 03/1955 Blackpool Central 61.67 61.70
341 12216 52216 07/1893 12/1958 Lostock Hall 65.42 66.38
438 12217 52217 08/1893 07/1957 Sowerby Bridge 63.92 64.04
607 12218 52218 08/1893 28/04/1962 68.67 68.88
608 12219 52219 08/1893 04/1951 Agecroft 57.67
53 12220 52220 04/1894 02/1955 Lower Darwen 60.83 60.95
315 12225 52225 05/1894 12/1960 Warrington Dallam 66.58 66.63
1234 12229 52229 06/1894 16/07/1949 Newton Heath 55.08 55.20
1235 12230 52230 06/1894 04/1961 Newton Heath 66.83 66.88
1236 12231 52231 06/1894 11/1952 Bolton 58.42 58.62
1237 12232 52232 06/1894 09/1959 Speke Junction 65.25 65.38
1238 12233 52233 06/1894 11/1951 Birkenhead Mollington Street 57.42
1240 12235 52235 07/1894 08/1957 Low Moor 63.08 63.13
1241 12236 52236 07/1894 09/1957 Mirfield 63.17 63.63
1242 12237 52237 07/1894 03/1959 Bolton 64.67 65.38
445 12238 52238 07/1894 07/1951 Lostock Hall 57
469 12239 52239 07/1894 02/1956 Bury 61.58 61.71
1243 12240 52240 07/1894 04/1961 Patricroft 66.75 66.96
1246 12243 52243 08/1894 05/1953 Wakefield 58.75
1248 12244 52244 08/1894 11/1960 Goole 66.25 66.62
1249 12245 52245 08/1894 20/11/1954 Bury 60.25
1250 12246 52246 08/1894 03/1953 Bury 58.58
1252 12248 52248 09/1894 17/03/1962 Patricroft 67.5 68.21
1254 12250 52250 09/1894 10/1951 Springs Branch (Wigan) 57.08
1256 12252 52252 09/1894 11/1960 Goole 66.17 66.38
1257 12253 52253 09/1894 26/06/1948 Lower Darwen 53.75
161 12255 52255 10/1894 08/1953 Wigan Central (L&Y) 58.83
212 12256 52256 10/1894 21/02/1948 Upminster 53.33
410 12258 52258 10/1894 08/1954 Aintree 59.83
57 12260 52260 11/1894 04/1961 Aintree 66.42 66.62
66 12262 52262 11/1894 02/1953 Wigan Central (L&Y) 58.25
158 12266 52266 11/1894 12/1952 Newton Heath 58.08 58.21
198 12268 52268 12/1894 03/1959 Bury 64.25 64.96
231 12269 52269 12/1894 11/1959 Patricroft 64.92 66.88
232 12270 52270 12/1894 01/1961 Newton Heath 66.08 66.29
270 12271 52271 12/1894 08/1961 Patricroft 66.67 66.96
333 12272 52272 01/1895 04/1955 Lostock Hall 60.25
343 12273 52273 01/1895 27/10/1956 Goole 61.75 61.87
422 12275 52275 01/1895 13/10/1962 Patricroft 67.75 68.37
40 12278 52278 06/1895 08/1959 Newton Heath 64.17 64.21
51 12279 52279 06/1895 03/1953 Agecroft 57.75
100 12280 52280 06/1895 03/1951 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 55.75
228 12284 52284 07/1895 09/1951 Wakefield 56.17
1276 12285 52285 07/1895 12/1952 Moor Row 57.42 56.70
1279 12288 52288 07/1895 10/1951 Wigan Central (L&Y) 56.25
1280 12289 52289 07/1895 10/1959 Bury 64.25 64.38
1281 12290 52290 07/1895 19/11/1960 Rose Grove 65.33 65.38
1284 12293 52293 08/1895 09/1957 Belle Vue 62.08 62.21
269 12294 52294 08/1895 08/1949 Bletchley 54
3481 12296 52296 08/1895 06/1951 Lostock Hall 55.83
365 12299 52299 09/1895 09/1954 Aintree 59
372 12300 52300 09/1895 01/1956 Newton Heath 60.33 60.46
444 12304 52304 09/1895 01/1953 Newton Heath 57.33
449 12305 52305 10/1895 11/1960 Goole 65.08 65.30
475 12309 52309 10/1895 01/1954 Goole 58.25
478 12311 52311 11/1895 03/03/1962 Aintree 66.33 66.37
482 12312 52312 11/1895 09/1962 66.83 66.96
1295 12317 52317 12/1895 06/1955 Newton Heath 59.5
1297 12319 52319 12/1895 11/1960 Goole 64.92 65.04
1299 12321 52321 01/1896 02/1954 Edge Hill 58.08
1300 12322 52322 01/1896 08/1960 Patricroft 64.58 Prs Preserved
1300 12326 52326 01/1896 31/12/1949 Bury 53.92
1308 12328 52328 02/1896 11/1957 Newton Heath 61.75 61.96
1310 12330 52330 02/1896 12/1951 Edge Hill 55.83
4 12331 52331 09/1896 08/1955 Goole 58.92
27 12333 52333 09/1896 04/1953 Bolton 56.58
118 12334 52334 10/1896 01/1955 Newton Heath 58.25
199 12336 52336 10/1896 03/1957 Mirfield 60.42 60.62
211 12337 52337 10/1896 20/03/1948 Greenock Ladyburn 51.42
273 12338 52338 10/1896 06/1957 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 60.67 60.87
350 12341 52341 11/1896 19/11/1960 Newton Heath 64 64.04
357 12343 52343 11/1896 08/1956 Low Moor 59.75
360 12345 52345 11/1896 22/09/1962 Bolton 65.83 66.54
370 12348 52348 12/1896 08/1959 Bolton 62.67 62.87
414 12349 52349 05/1897 09/1954 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 57.33 57.45
4181 12350 52350 05/1897 12/1958 Bolton 61.58 61.71
419 12351 52351 05/1897 08/1960 Sowerby Bridge 63.25 63.38
439 12353 52353 05/1897 12/1951 Wakefield 54.58
451 12355 52355 05/1897 02/1961 Sowerby Bridge 63.75 63.87
456 12356 52356 05/1897 04/1958 Rhyl 60.92 61.04
457 12357 52357 06/1897 08/1952 Wigan Central (L&Y) 55.17
458 12358 52358 06/1897 12/1956 Newton Heath 59.5
465 12360 52360 06/1897 11/1958 Bolton 61.42 61.95
479 12362 52362 07/1897 11/1952 Aintree 55.33
486 12363 52363 07/1897 10/1951 Lower Darwen 54.25
489 12365 52365 08/1897 02/1954 Lees (Oldham) 56.5
491 12366 52366 08/1897 04/1958 Newton Heath 60.67 60.70
509 12368 52368 01/1898 08/1957 Lostock Hall 59.58 59.62
510 12369 52369 01/1898 06/1956 Rose Grove 58.42
620 12374 52374 01/1898 18/09/1948 50.67
650 12376 52376 01/1898 04/1957 Wakefield 59.25 59.70
677 12378 52378 02/1898 11/1960 Aintree 62.75 62.79
682 12379 52379 02/1898 04/1957 Aintree 59.17 59.28
684 12381 52381 02/1898 02/1956 Aintree 58 58.12
685 12382 52382 03/1898 05/1953 Bury 55.17
152 12386 52386 11/1899 12/1952 Wakefield 53.08
393 12387 52387 11/1899 05/1958 Bury 58.5 59.62
397 12388 52388 11/1899 03/1958 Patricroft 58.33 58.45
409 12389 52389 11/1899 11/1959 Bolton 60 61.87
416 12390 52390 12/1899 08/1956 Newton Heath 56.67
468 12393 52393 12/1899 06/1961 Bolton 61.5 61.54
492 12397 52397 01/1900 06/1955 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 55.42 55.62
526 12399 52399 02/1900 03/1958 Sowerby Bridge 58.08 59.37
610 12400 52400 02/1900 11/1960 Sowerby Bridge 60.75 60.87
681 12401 52401 02/1900 24/01/1948 Greenock Ladyburn 47.92
12403 52403 02/1900 12/1949 Low Moor 49.83
135 12404 52404 02/1900 04/1953 Bolton 53.17
193 12405 52405 03/1900 12/1956 Bury 56.75
330 12407 52407 03/1900 01/1951 Bangor 50.83
375 12408 52408 03/1900 08/1955 Sowerby Bridge 55.42 55.45
391 12410 52410 04/1900 01/1960 Patricroft 59.75 59.79
398 12411 52411 04/1900 11/1960 Sowerby Bridge 60.58 60.79
401 12412 52412 09/1900 03/1957 Aintree 56.5 56.70
424 12413 52413 09/1900 08/12/1962 Sowerby Bridge 62.25 62.29
428 12414 52414 09/1900 12/1951 Banbury 51.25
432 12415 52415 09/1900 03/1961 Bolton 60.5 60.62
435 12416 52416 10/1900 07/1955 Aintree 54.75 54.87
442 12417 52417 10/1900 14/02/1948 Chester (MR) 47.33
81 12418 52418 02/1901 01/1957 Workington 55.92 56.04
274 12422 52422 03/1901 06/03/1948 Low Moor 47
400 12427 52427 04/1901 06/1958 Patricroft 57.17 58.12
431 12428 52428 04/1901 09/1951 Hereford 50.42
452 12429 52429 04/1901 10/1960 Lostock Hall 59.5 59.63
497 12430 52430 05/1901 12/1951 Blackpool Central 50.58
605 12431 52431 05/1901 11/1959 Newton Heath 58.5 60.87
647 12432 52432 05/1901 11/1958 Rhyl 57.5 58.04
652 12433 52433 05/1901 09/1951 Wakefield 50.33
727 12435 52435 05/1901 07/1954 Wakefield 53.17
115 12437 52437 05/1906 05/1956 Blackpool Central 50
123 12438 52438 05/1906 14/04/1962 Rhyl 55.92 56.12
246 12439 52439 06/1906 08/1949 Dalry Road 43.17
247 12440 52440 06/1906 02/1953 Bacup 46.67
255 12441 52441 07/1906 09/1962 56.17 56.29
824 12442 52442 07/1906 09/1949 Bacup 43.17
891 12443 52443 07/1906 11/1959 Bury 53.33 55.12
80 12444 52444 07/1906 03/1951 Lower Darwen 44.67
99 12445 52445 08/1906 26/11/1960 Rose Grove 54.25 54.46
261 12446 52446 08/1906 07/1951 Bolton 44.92
604 12447 52447 08/1906 12/1955 Lower Darwen 49.33
834 12448 52448 09/1906 11/1951 Goole 45.17
838 12449 52449 09/1906 10/1957 Springs Branch (Wigan) 51.08 51.28
864 12450 52450 05/1909 03/1956 Wigan Central (L&Y) 46.83
874 12452 52452 06/1909 06/1960 Sowerby Bridge 51 51.71
885 12453 52453 08/1909 01/1956 Rhyl 46.42
888 12454 52454 08/1909 08/1949 Wakefield 40
873 12455 52455 09/1909 11/1959 Newton Heath 50.17 51.62
892 12456 52456 10/1909 13/10/1962 Patricroft 53 53.62
895 12457 52457 11/1909 08/05/1948 38.5
896 12458 52458 11/1909 08/1959 Lostock Hall 49.75 49.95
897 12459 52459 11/1909 23/12/1961 52.08 52.20
899 12460 52460 12/1909 06/1951 Lower Darwen 41.5
919 12461 52461 07/1917 12/11/1962 Sowerby Bridge 45.33 45.45
926 12464 52464 10/1917 04/1961 43.5 43.70
1600 12465 52465 09/1918 07/1955 Nuneaton 36.83
1602 12466 52466 10/1918 10/1960 Patricroft 42 42.12
1603 12467 52467 10/1918 22/05/1948 Lostock Hall 29.58
898 12515 52515 11/1906 12/12/1962 Sowerby Bridge 56.08 56.53
85 12517 52517 04/1909 05/1958 49.08 50.20
89 12518 52518 04/1909 02/1949 Newton Heath 39.83 40.03
109 12521 52521 05/1909 05/1957 Low Moor 48 48.28
634 12522 52522 06/1909 03/1955 Lower Darwen 45.75 45.86
636 12523 52523 07/1909 22/09/1962 Bolton 53.17 53.87
642 12524 52524 07/1909 08/1954 Lostock Hall 45.08
815 12525 52525 07/1909 04/1953 Birkenhead Mollington Street 43.75
826 12526 52526 07/1909 03/1961 Bury 51.67 51.95
61 12527 52527 08/1909 08/1959 Bury 50 50.20
633 12529 52529 09/1909 03/1957 Rose Grove 47.5 48.20