Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 102 Today
» 922 Yesterday
» 1024 Week
» 17222 Month
» 182122 Year
» 693224 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LYR/LMS Hughes "28" Class 0-6-0


LYR LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
625 12528 52528 09/1909 27/11/1948 Bolton 39.17
907 12541 52541 04/1912 16/07/1949 Lostock Hall 37.25
917 12542 52542 04/1912 03/1950 Motherwell 37.92
1364 12545 52545 05/1912 13/11/1948 Lees (Oldham) 36.5
239 12549 52549 06/1912 06/11/1954 Bacup 42.42
20 12551 52551 06/1912 03/1957 Springs Branch (Wigan) 44.75
237 12554 52554 08/1912 10/1952 Wigan Central (L&Y) 40.17
1 12557 52557 09/1896 09/1951 Aintree 55
1123 12558 52558 11/1891 06/1954 Sowerby Bridge 62.58
374 12559 52559 03/1901 01/1953 Newton Heath 51.83
1053 12561 52561 09/1890 02/1955 Low Moor 64.42
893 12568 52568 11/1909 13/03/1948 Wakefield 38.33
483 12569 52569 07/1897 04/1955 Lees (Oldham) 57.75
376 12572 52572 03/1901 08/1953 Mirfield 52.42
195 12574 52574 03/1900 30/10/1948 Sowerby Bridge 48.58
1307 12575 52575 02/1896 12/1955 Bolton 59.83 60.04
890 12576 52576 07/1906 02/1957 Mirfield 50.58
1073 12578 52578 01/1891 08/1949 Newton Heath 58.58
342 12579 52579 11/1896 10/1952 Rose Grove 55.92
367 12580 52580 10/1889 02/1954 Rose Grove 64.33
327 12581 52581 07/1893 04/1953 Bury 59.75
624 12582 52582 08/1893 06/1955 Southport 61.83
205 12583 52583 06/1895 08/1951 Newton Heath 56.17
1028 12586 52586 01/1890 04/1949 Lees (Oldham) 59.25
453 12587 52587 10/1900 11/1952 Sowerby Bridge 52.08
252 12588 52588 10/1889 09/1952 Aintree 62.92
513 12590 52590 10/1900 06/1951 Low Moor 50.67
446 12592 52592 12/1889 08/1954 Mirfield 64.67
923 12598 52598 09/1917 08/1952 Springs Branch (Wigan) 34.92
863 12602 52602 05/1909 13/11/1948 39.5
41 12607 52607 03/1906 09/1949 Lees (Oldham) 43.5
382 12608 52608 03/1900 02/1955 Rhyl 54.92
12609 52609 06/1897 11/1949 Bolton 52.42
320 12615 52615 12/1894 06/1953 Lees (Oldham) 58.5
871 12616 52616 09/1906 11/1953 Sowerby Bridge 47.17
1132 12618 52618 01/1892 15/05/1948 Preston 56.33
887 12619 52619 08/1909 12/1953 Rhyl 44.33