Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 66 Today
» 1139 Yesterday
» 2339 Week
» 22072 Month
» 319086 Year
» 395673 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

MR/LMS Johnson "1262" Class 0-4-4T


MR MR (1907) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
1262 1236 11/1875 01/12/1934 59.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1263 1237 11/1875 29/11/1930 55 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1264 1238 11/1875 02/11/1935 60 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1265 1239 58030 11/1875 21/05/1949 Wellingborough 73.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1266 1240 11/1875 24/03/1945 69.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1267 1241 11/1875 03/12/1932 57.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1268 1242 12/1875 29/11/1930 54.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1269 1243 12/1875 06/11/1927 51.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1270 1244 12/1875 01/1929 53.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1271 1245 12/1875 09/1920 44.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1272 1246 58031 12/1875 18/06/1949 73.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1273 1247 58032 01/1876 31/12/1949 73.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1274 1248 01/1876 14/06/1925 49.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1280 1254 03/1876 31/01/1926 49.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1281 1255 58036 03/1876 15/07/1950 74.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1252 1256 04/1876 01/12/1928 52.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1253 1257 04/1876 26/12/1931 55.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1254 1258 04/1876 27/02/1937 60.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1255 1259 04/1876 08/09/1934 58.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1256 1260 58037 04/1876 15/05/1948 72.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1257 1261 58038 05/1876 19/06/1954 78.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Stratford)
1258 1262 05/1876 29/11/1930 54.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1259 1263 05/1876 18/04/1936 59.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1260 1264 05/1876 04/12/1927 51.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1261 1265 05/1876 18/05/1929 53 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1275 1249 58033 01/1876 09/09/1950 74.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1276 1250 02/1876 26/03/1932 56.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1277 1251 58034 03/1876 07/10/1950 74.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1278 1252 58035 03/1876 28/01/1950 73.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1279 1253 03/1876 07/09/1946 70.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)