Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 139 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 139 Week
» 17475 Month
» 295271 Year
» 1179652 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LYR/LMS Aspinall "5" Class 2-4-2T


LYR LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
1008 10621 50621 02/1899 09/1954 Manningham 55.58 Prs Preserved
1009 10622 50622 03/1899 08/1952 Holbeck (MR) 53.42
1010 10623 50623 03/1899 06/1952 Manningham 53.25
1012 10625 50625 03/1910 09/08/1952 Hellifield 42.42
1017 10630 50630 07/1899 10/1950 Manningham 51.25
1033 10631 50631 04/1890 20/11/1948 Manningham 58.58
1036 10633 50633 05/1890 06/1952 Manningham 62.08
1037 10634 50634 06/1890 10/1952 Manningham 62.33
1039 10636 50636 06/1890 07/1957 Manningham 67.08 67.21
1042 10639 50639 07/1890 05/1952 Preston 61.83
1043 10640 50640 07/1890 04/1952 Southport 61.75
1045 10642 50642 08/1890 03/1951 Fleetwood 60.58
1046 10643 50643 08/1890 10/1958 Warrington Dallam 68.17 68.79
1047 10644 50644 08/1890 10/1958 Warrington Dallam 68.17 69.30
1049 10646 50646 08/1890 11/1958 Coalville 68.25 68.96
1052 10647 50647 09/1890 02/1959 Bolton 68.42 69.21
1157 10648 50648 04/1892 11/1955 Rose Grove 63.58
1159 10650 50650 05/1892 10/1956 Wellingborough 64.42 64.55
1160 10651 50651 05/1892 12/1955 Rose Grove 63.58
1161 10652 50652 05/1892 13/10/1956 Rose Grove 64.42 64.55
1162 10653 50653 05/1892 02/1956 Rose Grove 63.75 63.79
1163 10654 50654 06/1892 04/1951 Rose Grove 58.83
1164 10655 50655 06/1892 08/1956 Rose Grove 64.17
1065 10656 50656 06/1892 03/1955 Bolton 62.75 62.87
1168 10660 50660 07/1892 03/1958 Bolton 65.67 65.79
323 10665 50665 07/1892 08/1949 Rhyl 57.08
337 10667 50667 08/1892 20/03/1948 Rhyl 55.58
1172 10670 50670 08/1892 04/1949 Rhyl 56.67
1173 10671 50671 08/1892 03/1952 Manningham 59.58
10675 50675 09/1892 31/12/1949 Rhyl 57.25
1178 10676 50676 09/1892 03/1950 Preston 57.5
16 10678 50678 09/1892 12/1953 Preston 61.25
340 10681 50681 10/1892 07/1952 Manningham 59.75
680 10686 50686 11/1892 08/1955 Manningham 62.75 62.79
46 10687 50687 09/1893 05/1953 Warrington Dallam 59.67
119 10689 50689 09/1893 08/1952 Manningham 58.92
206 10692 50692 10/1893 10/1949 Edge Hill 56
1210 10695 50695 10/1893 07/1952 Preston 58.75
1211 10696 50696 10/1893 02/1949 Rhyl 55.33
1212 10697 50697 11/1893 05/1952 Warrington Dallam 58.5
1218 10703 50703 12/1893 03/1953 Warrington Dallam 59.25
36 10705 50705 02/1895 10/1958 Warrington Dallam 63.67 64.28
1262 10711 50711 03/1895 06/1949 Upminster 54.25 54.45
1263 10712 50712 03/1895 03/1959 Bank Hall 64 65.38
1265 10714 50714 03/1895 08/1953 Manningham 58.42
1266 10715 50715 03/1895 02/1955 Sowerby Bridge 59.92
1271 10720 50720 05/1895 12/1951 Lostock Hall 56.58
1272 10721 50721 05/1895 01/1961 Bank Hall 65.67 65.80
24 10725 50725 03/1896 10/1958 Huddersfield Hillhouse 62.58 63.37
76 10728 50728 03/1896 07/08/1948 Upminster 52.42
97 10731 50731 04/1896 11/1955 Bolton 59.58
104 10732 50732 04/1896 06/1949 Dalry Road 53.17
129 10735 50735 04/1896 06/1952 Huddersfield Hillhouse 56.17
156 10736 50736 04/1896 12/1951 Low Moor 55.67
296 10738 50738 05/1896 16/07/1949 Bolton 53.17
415 10743 50743 06/1896 06/1950 Fleetwood 54
1313 10746 50746 06/1896 02/1961 Southport 64.67 64.79
1315 10748 50748 06/1896 09/1950 Blackpool Central 54.25
1316 10749 50749 06/1896 01/1952 Blackpool Central 55.58 55.70
10750 50750 06/1896 12/1949 Mirfield 53.5
1319 10752 50752 07/1896 08/1957 Sowerby Bridge 61.08 61.63
1322 10755 50755 08/1896 07/1950 Blackpool Central 53.92
1324 10757 50757 08/1896 11/1958 Low Moor 62.25 63.04
1329 10762 50762 09/1896 12/1953 Low Moor 57.25
1331 10764 50764 01/1897 07/1956 Low Moor 59.5
1332 10765 50765 01/1897 06/1954 Huddersfield Hillhouse 57.42
1333 10766 50766 01/1897 08/1951 Fleetwood 54.58
1344 10777 50777 03/1897 10/1958 Sowerby Bridge 61.58 62.37
1345 10778 50778 03/1897 03/1953 Sowerby Bridge 56
1348 10781 50781 04/1897 02/1960 Southport 62.83 63.21
1371 10788 50788 04/1898 08/1956 Low Moor 58.33
1377 10793 50793 05/1898 02/1950 Preston 51.75
1379 10795 50795 05/1898 11/1959 Manningham 61.5 62.13
1382 10798 50798 05/1898 07/1950 Rose Grove 52.17
1383 10799 50799 06/1898 08/1952 Huddersfield Hillhouse 54.17
1384 10800 50800 06/1898 07/08/1948 Wakefield 50.17
1385 10801 50801 06/1898 04/12/1948 Wakefield 50.5
1386 10802 50802 06/1898 07/1952 Fleetwood 54.08
1388 10804 50804 07/1898 02/1950 Huddersfield Hillhouse 51.58
1390 10806 50806 07/1898 02/1952 Southport 53.58
1391 10807 50807 07/1898 05/1955 Low Moor 56.83
703 10812 50812 08/1898 05/1952 Fleetwood 53.75
721 10813 50813 08/1898 05/1949 Wakefield 50.75
724 10815 50815 08/1898 02/1951 Bolton 52.5
730 10818 50818 09/1898 10/1958 Sowerby Bridge 60.08 60.87
34 10823 50823 10/1898 04/12/1948 Dalry Road 50.17
192 10829 50829 11/1898 04/1958 Bolton 59.42 59.45
314 10831 50831 11/1898 11/1958 Low Moor 60 60.70
646 10840 50840 06/1899 02/1952 Agecroft 52.67
658 10842 50842 07/1899 08/1951 Manningham 52.08
667 10844 50844 08/1899 09/1950 Blackpool Central 51.08
674 10849 50849 09/1899 02/1950 Motherwell 50.42
675 10850 50850 10/1899 11/1961 Southport 62.08 62.13
867 10875 50875 05/1905 22/05/1948 Dalry Road 43
1462 10880 50880 06/1905 10/1949 Manningham 44.33
1468 10886 50886 09/1905 12/1951 Low Moor 46.25
1470 10887 50887 10/1905 12/1957 Bolton 52.17 52.20
1527 10889 50889 01/1910 10/1949 Motherwell 39.75
1535 10892 50892 03/1910 05/1952 Low Moor 42.17
1541 10896 50896 03/1910 04/12/1948 Manningham 38.75
1544 10898 50898 04/1910 02/1952 Wakefield 41.83
1545 10899 50899 04/1910 23/10/1948 Bank Hall 38.5