Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 81 Today
» 1210 Yesterday
» 7347 Week
» 21924 Month
» 385169 Year
» 461756 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNWR/LMS Webb "Coal Engines" Class 0-6-0


LNWR LNWR (2nd) LNWR (Dup) ROD LNWR (Ex-ROD) LMS (1923) LMS (Dup) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
944 3289 8091 28091 58321 02/1873 08/1953 80.5
188 03/1873 03/1902 29 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
495 03/1873 03/1902 29 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
496 03/1873 1907 33.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
497 03/1873 05/1910 37.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
500 03/1873 10/1903 30.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
501 03/1873 1906 32.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
502 03/1873 06/1911 38.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
929 03/1873 1908 34.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
931 3176 8089 03/1873 11/1930 57.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
932 3286 8090 03/1873 10/1934 61.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
933 03/1873 1908 34.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
936 3519 8096 03/1873 05/1924 51.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
937 03/1873 1907 33.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
939 03/1873 1908 34.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
940 03/1873 1908 34.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
433 04/1873 1906 32.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1130 04/1873 05/1902 29.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
745 04/1873 08/1915 42.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1205 3489 8094 04/1873 1932 58.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1290 1873 1907 34 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1291 3412 2697 1873
1292 1873 1908 35 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1293 1873 1908 35 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1294 1873 11/1910 37.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1295 1873 1906 33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1296 1873 1908 35 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1297 1873 1907 34 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1298 1873 08/1901 28.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1299 1873 10/1903 30.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1300 1873 01/1904 31.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2071 3680 7459 05/1873 08/1928 55.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2072 3502 8095 28095 05/1873 31/01/1948 74.67
2073 05/1873 1908 34.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2074 05/1873 05/1902 29 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2075 3394 8092 05/1873 05/1927 54 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2076 05/1873 1908 34.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2077 05/1873 1909 35.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2078 05/1873 1907 33.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2079 3681 7460 05/1873 11/1930 57.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2080 05/1873 01/1903 29.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2081 05/1873 06/1911 38.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2082 3561 8097 28097 05/1873 21/02/1948 74.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2083 05/1873 08/1910 37.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2084 05/1873 1908 34.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2085 ? 8088 28088 58320 05/1873 24/07/1948 75.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2086 05/1873 04/1913 39.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2087 05/1873 1907 33.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2088 3458 8093 28093 58322 06/1873 01/1952 78.58
2089 06/1873 08/1911 38.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
107 01/1874 06/1913 39.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
113 01/1874 1908 33.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
734 3354 8103 01/1874 1932 57.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
976 01/1874 1907 32.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
982 01/1874 03/1916 42.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
983 01/1874 06/1902 28.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
984 01/1874 10/1914 40.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
985 3063 8099 28099 01/1874 02/1939 65.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
986 3443 8106 28106 58326 01/1874 05/1953 79.33
987 01/1874 06/1901 27.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
988 02/1874 1906 31.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
601 02/1874 05/1910 36.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
606 02/1874 02/1905 31 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
616 02/1874 07/1906 32.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
688 02/1874 1905 30.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
695 02/1874 1903 28.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
741 02/1874 03/1902 28.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
778 ? 03/1874
784 03/1874 1906 31.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
811 03/1874 1905 30.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1019 3433 8105 28105 58325 03/1874 07/08/1948 74.42
1021 3317 8101 03/1874 12/1937 63.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
316 3404 2700 2437 8098 03/1874 11/1930 56.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
405 03/1874 05/1902 28.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
412 03/1874 1904 29.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2110 03/1874 1908 33.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2111 03/1874 1907 32.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2112 03/1874 1907 32.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2113 03/1874 03/1902 28 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2114 03/1874 05/1902 28.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2115 03/1874 1905 30.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2116 03/1874 1905 30.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2117 3367 8104 28104 58324 03/1874 28/08/1948 74.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2118 03/1874 09/1903 29.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2119 3198 8100 28100 58323 04/1874 25/04/1953 79
2120 04/1874 1905 30.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2121 04/1874 08/1901 27.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2122 3448 2716 04/1874
2123 04/1874 1908 33.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2124 04/1874 02/1913 38.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2160 12/1874 1909 34 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2161 12/1874 1907 32 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2162 3318 8102 12/1874 08/1926 51.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2163 3490 8107 28107 58327 12/1874 06/1952 77.5
2164 12/1874 04/1904 29.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2165 12/1874 1906 31 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2166 12/1874 1905 30 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2167 3563 8108 12/1874
2168 12/1874 01/1911 36.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2169 12/1874 08/1904 29.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
653 01/1875 1906 30.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
684 01/1875 05/1902 27.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
716 3271 2696 01/1875
807 01/1875 1907 31.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1121 3559 8132 01/1875 04/1924 49.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1122 01/1875 04/1904 29.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1123 01/1875 1908 32.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1124 01/1875 02/1915 40.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1125 01/1875 1907 31.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1126 01/1875 1908 32.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1127 3356 2693 01/1875
1128 3357 8119 01/1875 07/1926 51.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1129 01/1875 1906 30.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1131 01/1875 02/1905 30.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1133 3189 7461 01/1875 06/1925 50.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1134 3390 8121 05/1875 08/1930 55.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1135 05/1875 1906 30.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1136 05/1875 1907 31.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1137 05/1875 01/1905 29.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
122 05/1875 10/1915 40.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
170 05/1875 1903 27.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
172 05/1875 05/1910 35 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
175 3092 2707 2214 8110 05/1875 03/1928 52.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
964 3037 8112 05/1875 12/1930 55.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1196 05/1875 1907 31.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2170 3503 8129 28129 05/1875 02/1946 70.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2171 ? 05/1875
2172 3564 8133 28133 58331 05/1875 16/10/1948 73.42
2173 05/1875 1907 31.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2174 3282 8117 28117 05/1875 03/1947 71.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
181 06/1875 1906 30.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
203 3159 8115 28115 58328 06/1875 03/1953 77.75
37 3004 8111 06/1875 08/1936 61.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
41 06/1875 1903 27.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
46 06/1875 03/1902 26.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
55 06/1875 03/1902 26.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
58 06/1875 12/1914 39.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
78 06/1875 03/1902 26.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
82 06/1875 01/1913 37.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
83 3555 8131 06/1875 1933 57.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
89 07/1875 03/1913 37.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
100 07/1875 04/1902 26.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
101 3481 8127 07/1875 04/1924 48.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
105 07/1875 03/1902 26.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
106 07/1875 10/1904 29.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
108 3075 8113 07/1875 12/1930 55.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
112 3452 8126 07/1875 1932 56.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
171 3442 8125 07/1875 05/1927 51.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
174 07/1875 05/1902 26.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
877 3094 07/1875
2195 3368 2684 2163 8109 08/1875 1932 56.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2196 08/1875 1907 31.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2197 08/1875 04/1913 37.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2198 3396 8122 08/1875 08/1930 55 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2199 08/1875 1908 32.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2200 08/1875 04/1914 38.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2201 3360 8120 08/1875 1932 56.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2202 08/1875 1905 29.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2203 08/1875 06/1915 39.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2204 3284 8118 09/1875 12/1930 55.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2205 3397 8123 09/1875 12/1930 55.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2206 09/1875 03/1901 25.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2207 3491 8128 28128 58330 09/1875 02/1953 77.42
2208 09/1875 11/1903 28.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2209 09/1875 1907 31.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2210 09/1875 07/1906 30.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2211 09/1875 03/1902 26.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2212 09/1875 06/1911 35.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2213 3398 8124 09/1875 03/1928 52.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2214 3523 8130 09/1875 03/1936 60.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2220 1875 08/1911 36.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2221 3291 2675 993 8134 11/1875 1933 57.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2222 3339 2715 11/1875
2223 11/1875 02/1909 33.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2224 3187 2673 137 8135 11/1875 06/1930 54.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2225 3319 8136 02/1876 04/1928 52.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2226 3479 8138 28138 02/1876 1945 68.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2227 02/1876 08/1901 25.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2228 02/1876 02/1909 33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2229 02/1876 11/1906 30.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2230 3392 8137 02/1876 11/1936 60.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2231 1876 09/1906 30.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
62 3114 8139 28139 03/1876 05/1947 71.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
225 03/1876 06/1901 25.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1114 03/1876 08/1905 29.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1119 03/1876 07/1908 32.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
775 03/1876 06/1902 26.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
650 3346 2686 2207 8140 03/1876 04/1936 60.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1161 03/1876 05/1913 37.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1195 04/1876 10/1910 34.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
370 11/1876 08/1908 31.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
856 11/1876 09/1914 37.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
884 11/1876 12/1908 32.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
918 11/1876 02/1904 27.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
962 3292 11/1876 03/1920 43.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1006 3297 8143 11/1876 09/1925 48.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1110 11/1876 04/1904 27.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1142 3104 2708 2346 8141 28141 58332 11/1876 10/1953 76.92
1179 ? 11/1876
12 3345 7462 27462 11/1876 09/1937 60.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
18 11/1876 05/1902 25.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
40 11/1876 03/1905 28.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
920 11/1876 02/1909 32.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
924 11/1876 05/1906 29.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2253 11/1876 10/1907 30.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2254 3200 8142 11/1876 12/1930 54.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2255 ? 11/1876
2256 3459 8145 28145 11/1876 08/11/1947 71 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2257 11/1876 07/1905 28.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2258 3370 8144 11/1876 03/1928 51.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
873 ? 8146 06/1877 10/1930 53.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
874 06/1877 08/1906 29.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
875 06/1877 01/1907 29.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
876 3518 8148 06/1877 05/1934 56.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
878 3406 2678 1172 8147 06/1876 11/1934 58.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
879 06/1877 05/1902 24.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
880 07/1877 08/1909 32.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
881 ? 8150 1877 07/1926 49.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
882 1877 06/1911 34.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
911 1877 08/1905 28.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2268 1877 08/1910 33.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2269 1877 09/1906 29.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2270 1877 10/1907 30.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2271 1877 10/1910 33.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2272 1877 10/1903 26.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2273 3409 2671 45 8149 03/1877 10/1929 52.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2274 3463 8152 28152 58333 03/1877 01/1952 74.83
2275 3100 8151 03/1877 1933 55.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2276 3194 8116 28116 58329 03/1877 01/1950 72.83
2277 03/1877 01/1915 37.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2289 3320 2718 01/1898
2290 3460 8165 01/1878 05/1930 52.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2291 01/1878 06/1911 33.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2292 3411 2683 2107 8154 01/1878 12/1930 52.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2293 3088 01/1878 05/1919 41.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2294 3421 2709 01/1878
2295 3213 8157 01/1878 06/1924 46.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2296 3462 8159 01/1878 11/1937 59.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2297 3571 8160 01/1878 09/1930 52.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2298 3412 2681 2072 8153 28153 01/1878 14/02/1948 70.08
2299 ? 8155 02/1878 10/1934 56.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2300 02/1878 03/1915 37.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2301 3322 8158 28158 58334 02/1878 10/1949 71.67
2302 ? 8156 02/1878 11/1924 46.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1172 3506 8162 02/1878 07/1932 54.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1186 1878 03/1911 33.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
915 3276 8161 02/1878 1932 53.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
916 1878 10/1903 25.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1138 1878 03/1910 32.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1140 1878 06/1902 24.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
968 3244 2672 101 8278 28278 01/1879 05/1947 68.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
614 3521 8166 28166 58335 01/1879 03/1952 73.17
2336 3105 2713 1879
2337 3209 2706 1879
2338 3305 8164 02/1879 1933 53.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2339 02/1879 09/1904 25.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2340 3229 8163 02/1879 06/1927 48.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2341 3422 2699 02/1879
2342 02/1879 05/1902 23.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2343 3572 8167 02/1879 02/1935 56 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2344 1879 05/1902 23.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2345 3210 8168 03/1879 10/1929 50.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
713 3330 8169 03/1879 08/1926 47.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
670 3353 2687 03/1879
1158 1879 1909 30 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1159 1879 06/1913 34.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2346 3535 8172 28172 58336 04/1879 08/1953 74.33
2347 ? 8170 04/1879 04/1927 48 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2348 3423 2701 04/1879
2349 3214 8171 04/1879
849 3141 8175 10/1879 12/1930 51.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
17 ? 10/1879
21 3343 8176 10/1879 12/1930 51.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
24 3415 2688 10/1879
27 3406 8173 10/1879 1933 53.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
138 11/1879 07/1913 33.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
72 3119 2677 11/1879
116 3438 8177 11/1879 12/1934 55.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
126 3120 8174 12/1879 01/1936 56.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
137 3492 8178 12/1879 03/1934 54.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
143 12/1879 04/1902 22.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
146 3024 8181 12/1879 01/1928 48.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
153 ? 12/1879
154 3023 8180 12/1879 09/1930 50.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
155 3045 8182 12/1878 07/1950 71.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
159 3439 8186 28186 12/1879 10/1946 66.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
160 3078 8183 12/1879 04/1927 47.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
162 3138 8184 12/1879 03/1928 48.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
163 3345 2703 936 8179 01/1880 08/1929 49.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
176 3150 8185 01/1880 05/1927 47.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2366 3435 8188 06/1880 06/1929 49 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2367 3486 8190 06/1880 06/1930 50 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2368 3449 8189 06/1880 12/1937 57.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2369 06/1880 05/1902 21.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2370 3269 8187 28187 06/1880 1945 64.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2371 ? 06/1880
2372 3541 06/1880 10/1919 39.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2373 3395 8192 07/1880 1932 51.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2374 3325 2691 07/1880
2375 3511 8193 07/1880 11/1935 55.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2376 3573 8194 07/1880 07/1926 46 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2377 07/1880 02/1914 33.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2378 07/1880 08/1913 33.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2379 3109 2714 07/1880
2380 3329 8191 28191 58337 07/1880 05/06/1948 67.92
2381 ? 07/1880
2382 1880 06/1902 22.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
226 3236 8195 08/1880 1933 52.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
352 08/1880 05/1902 21.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
354 ? 08/1880
360 3455 8197 08/1880 10/1935 55.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
362 3384 8196 08/1880 12/1930 50.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
375 3231 2694 08/1880
376 3235 08/1880 03/1913 32.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2383 ? 08/1880
2384 3413 2704 1330 8199 28199 58338 08/1880 05/1950 69.75
2385 3221 2680 1332 8200 08/1880 10/1929 49.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2386 3512 8206 08/1880 1933 52.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2387 08/1880 12/1915 35.33
2388 08/1880 07/1901 20.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2389 3689 7502 08/1880 12/1930 50.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2390 3372 8205 28205 58340 12/1880 03/1952 71.25
2391 3424 2685 2170 8201 12/1880 05/1924 43.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2392 12/1880 05/1915 34.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2393 3228 8204 28204 12/1880 09/1947 66.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2394 3690 7463 27463 12/1880 10/1940 59.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2395 3308 2674 961 8198 12/1880 11/1936 55.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2396 3107 8203 12/1880 12/1928 48 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2397 ? 8202 28202 58339 12/1880 29/05/1948 67.42
2398 3546 8207 12/1880 04/1928 47.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2399 3547 8213 12/1880 04/1928 47.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2400 3691 7464 12/1880 04/1930 49.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2401 3233 8210 12/1880 1933 52 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2402 3692 7465 12/1880 11/1931 50.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
233 3124 8209 28209 12/1880 03/1946 65.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
700 ? 8208 12/1880 08/1935 54.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
720 3556 8214 12/1880 09/1929 48.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
993 3507 8212 12/1880 1933 52 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
845 01/1881 04/1913 32.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1010 01/1881 05/1902 21.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1103 3446 8263 28263 58334 01/1881 03/1953 72.17
43 3362 8219 01/1881 10/1929 48.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
45 3487 8220 01/1881 09/1936 55.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
48 3112 8217 01/1881 07/1929 48.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
53 3522 8221 28221 58342 01/1881 01/1949 68
704 3294 8218 01/1881 12/1930 49.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
714 3417 2698 2375 8216 28216 58341 01/1881 04/1950 69.25
961 3498 01/1881 01/1919 38 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
851 3456 8211 01/1881 11/1935 54.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
750 3557 8215 01/1881 1933 51.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2403 ? 8223 05/1881 12/1930 49.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2404 3693 7466 05/1881 11/1928 47.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2405 3332 8227 28227 58343 05/1881 03/10/1953 72.42
2406 3694 7467 27467 05/1881 12/1937 56.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2407 3695 7468 05/1881 10/1928 47.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2408 3129 8226 28226 05/1881 05/1946 65 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2409 ? 8224 05/1881 08/1926 45.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2410 3574 8235 05/1881 03/1930 48.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2411 3399 8228 05/1881 06/1924 43.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2412 3566 8234 28234 58345 05/1881 24/04/1948 66.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2413 3696 7469 27469 05/1881 04/1939 57.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2414 3550 8233 28233 58344 05/1881 03/1949 67.83
2415 3483 8231 05/1881 1933 51.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2416 3450 8230 28230 05/1881 24/01/1948 66.67
2417 3080 8225 05/1881 1932 50.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2418 3414 2692 05/1881
2419 3504 8232 06/1881 02/1935 53.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2420 3425 8229 06/1881 08/1927 46.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2421 3334 2702 876 8222 06/1881 1932 50.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2422 3575 8236 06/1881 07/1950 69.08
2423 3476 8241 06/1881 03/1930 48.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2424 06/1881 1907 25.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2425 ? 8237 06/1881 08/1929 48.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2426 3451 8240 28240 06/1881
2427 ? 06/1881 04/1918 36.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2428 06/1881 05/1913 31.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2429 3553 8242 06/1881 06/1927 46 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2430 3554 8243 06/1881 04/1924 42.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2431 3427 8239 28239 58346 06/1881 03/1952 70.75
2432 ? 8238 06/1881 10/1935 54.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2433 3477 8252 07/1882 1932 49.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2434 ? 8246 28246 58348 07/1882 03/1950 67.67
2435 3495 8253 28253 58351 07/1882 01/1950 67.5
2436 ? 07/1882
2437 3515 8257 07/1882 1933 50.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2438 3496 8254 07/1882 03/1936 53.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2439 3697 7470 27470 07/1882 09/1937 55.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2440 3505 8256 28256 58352 07/1882 04/1951 68.75
2441 3576 8258 07/1882 1933 50.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2442 3102 8248 07/1882 1932 49.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2443 3099 8247 28247 58349 07/1882 01/1951 68.5
2444 3698 7471 27471 07/1882 10/1939 57.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2445 3431 8250 07/1882 1924 41.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2446 07/1882 1907 24.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2447 3699 7472 07/1882 12/1930 48.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2448 ? 07/1882
2449 3497 8255 07/1882 1932 49.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2450 3432 8251 28251 58350 11/1882 05/1952 69.5
2451 3700 7473 11/1882 12/1934 52.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2452 3383 8249 11/1882 08/1932 49.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1081 3386 8245 28245 58347 10/1889 03/1953 63.42
1082 3488 8264 10/1889 1932 42.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1083 3493 8265 10/1889 04/1936 46.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1084 3071 8260 10/1889 10/1934 45 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1085 3444 8262 28262 58353 10/1889 09/10/1948 59 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1086 3264 8261 28261 10/1889 05/1947 57.58
1087 ? 8259 10/1889 1933 43.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1089 3387 2711 10/1889
1090 10/1889 12/1914 25.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1092 3177 7474 10/1889 12/1930 41.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1093 3272 8266 11/1889 07/1928 38.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1095 11/1889 11/1906 17
1096 3179 7496 11/1889 12/1930 41.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1097 3187 7477 27477 11/1889 10/1939 49.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1098 ? 8267 11/1889 1932 42.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1099 ? 11/1889
1100 3170 8270 11/1889 06/1927 37.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
808 3088 7475 27475 09/1889 03/1938 48.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
809 3405 2690 2419 8268 10/1889 1933 43.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
810 3038 8269 10/1889 06/1927 37.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1313 3560 8277 12/1890 12/1937 47 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1314 3365 8274 12/1890 12/1930 40 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1315 3671 7478 12/1890
1316 ? 12/1890
1317 3672 7479 12/1890 10/1929 38.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1319 3341 2710 2398 8271 28271 58335 12/1890 18/12/1948 58
1320 3508 8275 12/1890 12/1933 43 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1321 3081 8272 12/1890 12/1930 40 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1323 3548 8276 12/1890 05/1934 43.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1324 3171 8273 12/1890
1326 3197 7480 27480 58870 02/1891 12/1948 57.83
1327 3342 8280 02/1891 1932 40.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1330 3520 8284 02/1891 1932 40.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1331 3419 2695 02/1891
1332 3500 8283 02/1891 10/1930 39.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1333 3095 8279 02/1891 03/1936 45.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1334 3385 8281 02/1891 12/1930 39.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1335 3434 8282 02/1891 1932 40.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1336 3673 7481 02/1891 12/1930 39.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1337 3674 7482 02/1891 12/1930 39.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1339 ? 09/1891
1340 ? 8285 09/1891 1932 40.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1343 3366 8287 09/1891 10/1928 37.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1344 3549 8288 28288 09/1891 11/1947 56.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1345 3279 2676 1082 8244 09/1891 1933 41.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1346 3076 8266 09/1891 10/1928 37.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1347 3675 7483 09/1891 1931 39.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1348 3676 7484 27484 09/1891 01/1946 54.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1349 ? 10/1891
2049 ? 8290 10/1891 12/1934 43.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2050 ? 10/1891
2454 2039 3677 7485 10/1891 12/1930 39.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2040 3391 8293 10/1891 1933 41.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2526 2041 3678 7486 10/1891 11/1930 39.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2527 2042 3388 8292 10/1891 1924 32.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2528 2043 3510 8294 10/1891 05/1930 38.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2529 2045 ? 8289 28289 10/1891 03/1946 54.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2530 2046 3348 8291 10/1891 05/1936 44.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2531 2047 ? 10/1891
2532 2048 3679 7487 27487 10/1891 09/1937 45.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
499 3042 7488 05/1892 1931 38.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
85 3413 7458 05/1892 05/1924 32 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
86 3023 05/1892 09/1914 22.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
91 3230 8300 05/1892 1933 40.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
92 3416 2689 2415 8296 28296 58357 05/1892 03/07/1948 56.17
93 3350 8302 05/1892 1932 39.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
94 3454 8303 28303 05/1892 06/1946 54.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
95 3115 8298 05/1892 1933 40.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
96 3401 2679 1205 8295 28295 58356 05/1892 13/11/1948 56.5
98 3666 7489 05/1892 12/1932 40.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
99 3147 8299 05/1892 1932 39.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
185 3089 8297 05/1892 12/1937 45.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
943 3558 8304 05/1892 02/1935 42.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
103 3667 7490 05/1892 12/1928 36.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
104 3235 8301 05/1892 09/1928 36.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
88 3053 2712 05/1892
186 3151 2717 05/1892
197 3516 8305 07/1892 07/1930 38 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
198 ? 07/1892
201 3668 7491 07/1892 11/1931 39.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2090 3275 7492 27492 10/1892 06/1939 46.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2091 3333 8311 10/1892 08/1935 42.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2092 3183 8308 28308 58358 10/1892 12/06/1948 55.67
2093 3682 7495 10/1892 04/1928 35.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2094 3180 8307 10/1892 12/1930 38.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2095 3314 7493 10/1892 06/1932 39.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2096 3408 2682 2098 8306 10/1892 03/1930 37.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2097 3389 8312 28312 58360 10/1892 04/1952 59.5
2098 3478 8313 28313 58361 10/1892 25/09/1948 55.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2099 3683 7496 27496 10/1892 09/1939 46.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2100 3684 7497 10/1892 10/1929 37 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2101 3328 7494 10/1892 11/1930 38.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2102 3685 7498 10/1892 11/1930 38.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2103 3686 7499 10/1892 12/1930 38.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2104 3195 8309 28309 58359 10/1892 18/09/1948 55.92
2105 3420 2705 10/1892
2106 3268 8310 10/1892 06/1924 31.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2107 3485 8314 10/1892 05/1927 34.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2108 3687 7500 10/1892 11/1931 39.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2109 3688 7501 10/1892 08/1929 36.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)