Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 96 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 5674 Week
» 25407 Month
» 322421 Year
» 399008 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNWR/LMS Webb "Coal Tank" Class 0-6-2T


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
58880 08/1882 04/1954 Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 71.67
58881 06/1881 09/1950 Plodder Lane 69.25 69.30
58882 05/1887 10/1949 Rhyl 62.42
58883 10/1881 31/12/1949 Edge Hill 68.17 68.21
58884 10/1881 13/11/1948 Rhyl 67.08 67.21
58885 11/1881 18/09/1948 66.83
58886 12/1881 01/1949 67.08
58887 12/1881 04/1955 Bletchley 73.33
58888 08/1882 09/1954 Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 72.08 72.30
58889 09/1882 08/1953 Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 70.92
58890 01/1883 11/1949 Speke Junction 66.83 66.96
58891 01/1883 08/1955 Tredegar 72.58 73.72
58892 02/1883 05/1952 Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 69.25
58893 01/1883 16/10/1948 Plodder Lane 65.75 65.88
58894 03/1883 03/1949 66
58895 07/1883 10/1951 Abergavenny 68.25
58896 08/1883 01/1949 65.42
58897 11/1883 10/1950 Bletchley 66.92 67.04
58898 12/1883 02/10/1948 Edge Hill 64.83 64.88
58899 04/1884 08/1954 Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 70.33
58900 09/1884 10/1954 Shrewsbury 70.08
58901 10/1884 07/1948 Springs Branch (Wigan) 63.75 64.04
58902 12/1884 12/1954 Tredegar 70
58903 01/1885 06/1954 Monument Lane 69.42
58904 01/1885 09/1955 Shrewsbury 70.67 70.71
58905 01/1885 28/08/1948 63.58 63.79
58906 04/1886 13/11/1948 62.58
58907 04/1886 02/10/1948 62.5 62.54
58908 07/1886 11/1951 Bletchley 65.33
58909 07/1886 12/06/1948 Monument Lane 61.92 62.04
58910 07/1886 07/1952 Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 66
58911 08/1886 03/1954 Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 67.58
58912 08/1886 12/1950 Abergavenny 64.33 64.46
58913 08/1886 06/1952 Abergavenny 65.83
58914 08/1886 28/08/1948 Plodder Lane 62 62.13
58915 08/1886 09/1954 Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 68.08 68.30
58916 12/1886 10/1950 Abergavenny 63.83
58917 02/1887 02/1950 Rhyl 63
58918 02/1887 24/04/1948 Plodder Lane 61.17
58919 02/1887 12/1952 Abergavenny 65.83 66.29
58920 05/1887 14/08/1948 61.25
58921 01/1886 21/08/1954 Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 68.58
58922 05/1887 07/1948 Edge Hill 61.17 61.38
58923 06/1887 01/1950 62.58
58924 06/1887 09/1954 Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 67.25 67.38
58925 06/1887 09/1955 Tredegar 68.25 68.30
58926 09/1888 10/1958 Shrewsbury 70.08 Prs Preserved
58927 09/1888 10/1949 Monument Lane 61.08
58928 09/1888 27/01/1951 Monument Lane 62.33 62.37
58929 12/1888 03/1950 Abergavenny 61.25
58930 07/1892 18/09/1948 56.17 56.21
58931 07/1892 27/03/1948 55.67 55.87
58932 07/1892 06/1952 Monument Lane 59.92
58933 10/1896 12/1951 Abergavenny 55.17
58934 10/1896 10/1949 Shrewsbury 53 53.12
58935 02/1897 10/1951 Abergavenny 54.67
58936 02/1897 22/05/1948 51.25
58937 02/1897 24/04/1948 51.17 51.61