Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 920 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 3059 Week
» 13229 Month
» 291025 Year
» 1175406 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LYR/LMS Hughes "6" Class 2-4-2T


LYR LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
371 10835 50835 12/1898 07/08/1948 Sowerby Bridge 49.67
1531 10891 50891 02/1910 03/1950 Sowerby Bridge 40.08
1537 10893 50893 03/1910 04/1950 Sowerby Bridge 40.08
70 10901 50901 03/1911 20/03/1948 Normanton 37
112 10903 50903 03/1911 14/02/1948 Manningham 36.92
224 10909 50909 05/1911 03/1951 Sowerby Bridge 39.83
1536 10925 50925 03/1910 08/1952 Low Moor 42.42
1533 10934 50934 02/1910 14/08/1948 Sowerby Bridge 38.5
719 10943 50943 12/1910 18/12/1948 Lower Darwen 38
1543 10945 50945 04/1910 01/1949 Lower Darwen 38.75
356 10950 50950 12/1898 21/08/1948 Lower Darwen 49.67
670 10951 50951 08/1899 01/1950 Lower Darwen 50.42
332 10952 50952 11/1898 19/06/1948 Low Moor 49.58
120 10953 50953 10/1898 04/1950 Sowerby Bridge 51.5