Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 96 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 5674 Week
» 25407 Month
» 322421 Year
» 399008 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNWR/LMS Beames "G2" Class 0-8-0


LNWR LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
485 9395 49395 11/1921 11/1959 38 Prs Preserved
742 9396 49396 11/1921 11/1959 38
215 9397 49397 11/1921 11/1959 38
216 9398 49398 11/1921 11/1959 38
220 9399 49399 11/1921 10/1961 39.92
221 9400 49400 11/1921 11/1959 38
253 9401 49401 11/1921 10/1961 39.92
434 9402 49402 11/1921 01/12/1962 41.08
1154 9403 49403 11/1921 02/06/1962 40.58
223 9404 49404 11/1921 28/04/1962 40.42
367 9405 49405 01/1922 10/1961 39.75
369 9406 49406 01/1922 06/1963 41.42
373 9407 49407 01/1922 11/1964 42.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
382 9408 49408 02/1922 01/12/1962 40.83
396 9409 49409 02/1922 06/1959 37.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
407 9410 49410 01/1922 11/1959 37.83
411 9411 49411 01/1922 10/1961 39.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
417 9412 49412 01/1922 10/1961 39.75
429 9413 49413 01/1922 10/1961 39.75
1530 9414 49414 01/1922 10/1961 39.75
567 9415 49415 01/1922 01/12/1962 40.92
568 9416 49416 03/1922 09/1962 40.5
569 9417 49417 03/1922 11/1959 37.67
570 9418 49418 03/1922 11/1959 37.67
571 9419 49419 03/1922 11/1959 37.67
572 9420 49420 03/1922 11/1959 37.67
573 9421 49421 03/1922 10/1961 39.58
574 9422 49422 03/1922 09/1961 39.5
575 9423 49423 03/1922 11/11/1961 39.67
576 9424 49424 03/1922 11/1959 37.67
134 9425 49425 07/1922 15/09/1962 40.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
869 9426 49426 07/1922 22/09/1962 40.17
2047 9427 49427 07/1922 11/1959 37.33
2050 9428 49428 07/1922 08/12/1962 40.42
2171 9429 49429 07/1922 11/1959 37.33
2226 9430 49430 07/1922 12/1964 42.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
2255 9431 49431 07/1922 01/12/1962 40.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
2367 9432 49432 07/1922 01/12/1962 40.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
2371 9433 49433 07/1922 10/1961 39.25
344 9434 49434 08/1922 20/10/1962 40.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
872 9435 49435 08/1922 11/1959 37.25
895 9436 49436 08/1922 05/1959 36.75
2182 9437 49437 08/1922 09/1962 40.08
2372 9438 49438 07/1922 01/12/1962 40.42
36 9439 49439 09/1922 08/12/1962 40.25
994 9440 49440 08/1922 24/03/1962 39.58
2381 9441 49441 09/1922 10/1961 39.08
758 9442 49442 10/1922 11/1959 37.08
2383 9443 49443 09/1922 10/1961 39.08
2386 9444 49444 09/1922 10/1961 39.08
2399 9445 49445 09/1922 11/1959 37.17
1012 9446 49446 10/1922 09/04/1964 41.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
2414 9447 49447 10/1922 01/12/1962 40.17
2429 9448 49448 10/1922 06/1963 40.67
2517 9449 49449 10/1922 08/12/1962 40.17
13 9450 49450 10/1922 11/1959 37.08
231 9451 49451 10/1922 01/12/1962 40.17
308 9452 49452 10/1922 08/12/1962 40.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
403 9453 49453 10/1922 10/1961 39
2178 9454 49454 10/1922 06/1963 40.67