Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 889 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 889 Week
» 23870 Month
» 387115 Year
» 463702 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNWR/LMS Beames "7F" Class 0-8-4T


LNWR LMS LMS (Dup) LMS (Correction) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
380 7930 47930 02/1923 07/08/1948 Edge Hill 25.5
782 7931 47931 02/1923 12/1951 28.83 28.93
1189 7932 47932 02/1923 09/1949 26.58
1677 7933 47933 02/1923 17/06/1950 Edge Hill 27.33 27.43
1976 7934 03/1923 05/1946 23.17
256 7935 03/1923 09/1946 23.5
731 7936 47936 04/1923 06/1949 26.17 26.19
739 7937 47937 04/1923 10/1950 27.5
1908 7938 47938 04/1923 21/02/1948 Edge Hill 24.83 25.19
1956 7939 47939 04/1923 12/1950 27.67 27.69
468 7940 06/1923 01/1946 22.58
792 7941 06/1923 12/1946 23.5
793 7942 06/1923 11/1944 21.42
1904 7943 27943 06/1923 02/1947 23.67
609 7944 06/1923 11/1947 24.42
7945 08/1923 09/1946 23.08
7946 08/1923 12/1946 23.33
7947 08/1923 08/1944 21
7948 47948 09/1923 03/07/1948 24.83 24.93
7949 09/1923 10/1946 23.08
7950 10/1923 06/1946 22.67
7951 47951 10/1923 01/1949 25.25
7952 10/1923 08/1945 21.83
7953 10/1923 05/1945 21.58
7954 47954 10/1923 10/1948 Buxton (LNWR) 25 25.02
7955 10/1923 08/1946 22.83
7956 47956 11/1923 27/11/1948 Edge Hill 25
7957 27957 7957 11/1923 12/1945 22.08
7958 47958 11/1923 04/12/1948 Edge Hill 25.08
7959 47959 01/1924 06/1948 Edge Hill 24.42 24.60