Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 830 Today
» 1236 Yesterday
» 5801 Week
» 20378 Month
» 383623 Year
» 460210 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNWR/LMS Webb "1P" Class 2-4-2T


LNWR LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
910 6601 46601 09/1890 12/1953 Rugby 63.25
214 6602 02/1891 03/1936 45.08
459 6603 46603 02/1891 07/1951 Warrington Dallam 60.42
465 6604 46604 01/1891 08/1955 Warwick 64.58
466 6605 46605 01/1891 22/05/1948 Crewe North 57.33 57.45
655 6606 01/1891 07/1931 40.5
133 6607 04/1891 06/1946 55.17
199 6608 04/1891 03/1928 36.92
546 6609 01/1891 06/1930 39.42
608 6610 03/1891 07/1931 40.33
613 6611 03/1891 04/1936 45.08
657 6612 01/1891 09/1924 33.67
658 6613 01/1891 08/1930 39.58
660 6614 02/1891 08/1927 36.5
661 6615 02/1891 05/1924 33.25
662 6616 46616 03/1891 09/1955 Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 64.5 64.55
897 6617 03/1891 09/1932 41.5
900 6618 03/1891 09/1928 37.5
921 6619 04/1891 05/1947 56.08
922 6620 46620 04/1891 02/1953 Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 61.83 61.96
2536 6621 11/1891 1932 40.08
1750 6622 12/1891 1932 40
1751 6623 12/1891 03/1930 38.25
1752 6624 12/1891 1932 40
1753 6625 12/1891 03/1937 45.25
1754 6626 12/1891 1932 40
1755 6627 12/1891 09/1947 55.75
1756 6628 46628 12/1891 07/1951 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 59.58
1757 6629 12/1891 05/1932 40.42
1758 6630 12/1891 08/1925 33.67
1759 6631 12/1891 11/1932 40.92
1760 6632 46632 01/1892 06/1950 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 58.42
1761 6633 01/1892 05/1934 42.33
1762 6634 01/1892 05/1925 33.33
1763 6635 46635 01/1892 04/1950 Dumfries 58.25 58.28
1764 01/1892 01/1907 15
1765 6636 01/1892 12/1947 55.92
1766 6637 46637 01/1892 09/1949 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 57.67
1767 6638 01/1892 12/1930 38.92
1768 6639 46639 01/1892 06/1949 Beattock 57.42 57.45
338 6640 12/1892 1931 38
408 6641 04/1894 10/1946 52.5
409 6642 12/1892 09/1932 39.75
1154 12/1892 1921 28
431 6643 46643 12/1892 01/1953 Rhyl 60.08
481 6644 12/1892 07/1928 35.58
1144 6645 12/1892 10/1946 53.83
1152 6646 12/1892 05/1947 54.42
1165 6647 12/1892 11/1932 39.92
1169 6648 12/1892 1931 38
2125 6649 05/1893 1932 38.58
2126 6650 05/1893 07/1947 54.17
2127 6651 05/1893 1931 37.58
2128 6652 05/1893 08/1946 53.25
2129 6653 09/1893 06/1947 53.75
2130 6654 46654 09/1893 09/1953 Warwick 60
2131 6655 09/1893 01/1935 41.33
2132 6656 46656 09/1893 02/1952 Beattock 58.42 58.62
2133 6657 09/1893 02/1946 52.42
2134 6658 46658 09/1893 12/1950 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 57.25
406 6659 12/1892 09/1945 52.75
413 6660 06/1893 09/1947 54.25
425 6661 46661 06/1893 06/1948 Ryecroft (Walsall) 55
718 6662 06/1893 07/1935 42.08
779 6663 46663 06/1893 16/07/1949 Warrington Dallam 56.08 56.04
1150 6664 06/1893 02/1936 42.67
1174 6665 06/1893 04/1936 42.83
2146 6666 46666 06/1893 06/1954 Northampton 61
2148 6667 06/1893 03/1946 52.75
2149 6668 06/1893 03/1936 42.75
202 6669 46669 02/1894 09/1949 Warrington Dallam 55.58
204 6670 02/1894 05/1930 36.25
886 6671 01/1894 03/1936 42.17
1157 6672 08/1893 11/1934 41.25
1197 6673 46673 08/1893 24/04/1948 Northampton 54.67 54.78
2135 6674 07/1893 12/1947 54.42
2136 6675 07/1893 07/1930 37
2137 6676 46676 07/1893 12/1949 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 56.42
2138 6677 07/1893 1931 37.42
2139 6678 07/1893 10/1927 34.25
2140 6679 46679 07/1893 02/1948 Ryecroft (Walsall) 54.58 55.04
2141 6680 46680 07/1893 01/1953 Crewe North 59.5
2142 6681 46681 07/1893 12/06/1948 Crewe North 54.92 52.54
2143 6682 46682 07/1893 12/1947 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 54.42 54.79
2144 6683 46683 07/1893 02/1953 Warwick 59.58 59.70
2215 6684 09/1893 10/1927 34.08
2216 6685 09/1893 08/1947 53.92
2217 6686 46686 09/1893 22/05/1948 Watford 54.67 54.87
2218 6687 46687 09/1893 12/1949 Llandudno Junction 56.25
2219 6688 46688 09/1893 04/1951 Warrington Dallam 57.58
427 6689 04/1894 11/1947 53.58
697 6690 04/1894 04/1947 53
1143 6691 46691 04/1894 27/03/1948 Bangor 53.92 54.45
1145 6692 46692 04/1894 20/03/1948 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 53.92 52.28
1147 6693 04/1894 02/1934 39.83
1148 6694 04/1894 04/1936 42
1149 6695 04/1894 10/1936 42.5
1155 6696 04/1894 10/1925 31.5
2145 6697 04/1894 08/1935 41.33
31 6698 06/1894 09/1928 34.25
50 6699 06/1894 11/1945 51.42
290 6700 06/1894 10/1946 52.33
342 6701 46701 06/1894 02/1953 Warrington Dallam 58.67
620 6702 06/1894 07/1931 37.08
649 6703 06/1894 08/1947 53.17
923 6704 06/1894 09/1947 53.25
960 6705 06/1894 03/1937 42.75
1018 6706 06/1894 09/1930 36.25
2232 6707 06/1894 01/1936 41.58
255 6708 02/1895 02/1937 42
426 6709 02/1895 1935 39.83
626 6710 46710 02/1895 09/1949 Crewe North 54.58
680 6711 46711 02/1895 05/1949 Northampton 54.25
847 6712 46712 02/1895 08/1954 Warwick 59.5
1180 6713 02/1895 09/1946 51.58
70 6714 04/1895 10/1932 37.5
144 6715 03/1895 1928 32.75
151 6716 03/1895 07/1928 33.33
187 6717 03/1895 07/1928 33.33
340 6718 46718 03/1895 24/01/1948 Warrington Dallam 52.83
341 6719 03/1895 1932 36.75
344 04/1895 05/1922 27.08
371 6720 04/1895 1935 39.67
402 6721 06/1893 10/1935 42.33
853 6722 03/1895 12/1946 51.75
1156 6723 04/1895 05/1947 52.08
516 6724 05/1895 03/1930 34.83
1151 6725 05/1895 12/1947 52.58
2259 6726 04/1895 01/1934 38.75
2260 6727 46727 04/1895 12/1952 Barrow in Furness 57.67 57.79
2261 6728 04/1895 06/1947 52.17
2262 6729 05/1895 11/1947 52.5
2263 6730 05/1895 07/1928 33.17
2264 6731 05/1895 07/1928 33.17
2265 6732 05/1895 07/1928 33.17
2266 6733 05/1895 07/1928 33.17
2267 6734 05/1895 03/1946 50.83
1153 6735 08/1895 07/1932 36.92
838 6736 08/1895 1931 35.33
2147 6737 11/1895 09/1935 39.83
1367 6738 46738 05/1897 08/05/1948 Rowsley 51 51.03
1374 6739 04/1897 05/1947 50.08
1383 6740 46740 04/1897 08/05/1948 51.08 51.12
1386 6741 04/1897 05/1946 49.08
1398 6742 46742 04/1897 12/1949 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 52.67
1402 6743 04/1897 1944 46.67
1409 6744 04/1897 09/1930 33.42
1410 6745 05/1897 05/1930 33
1423 6746 05/1897 10/1946 49.42
1425 6747 46747 05/1897 07/02/1948 Llandudno Junction 50.75 51.20
1378 6748 05/1897 09/1947 50.33
1381 6749 46749 05/1897 02/1952 Warwick 54.75
1389 6750 05/1897 11/1934 37.5
1391 6751 05/1897 04/1928 30.92
1392 6752 06/1897 03/1930 32.75
1393 6753 05/1897 02/1936 38.75
1451 6754 05/1897 12/1947 50.58
1458 6755 05/1897 06/1946 49.08
1463 6756 06/1897 03/1936 38.75
1468 6757 46757 07/1897 02/1953 Warwick 55.58 55.70