Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 798 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1664 Week
» 26326 Month
» 285185 Year
» 796287 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Fairburn "4P" Class 2-6-4T


LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
42050 07/09/1950 Bournville 24/04/1965 Trafford Park (LMS) 14.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1965 15.03
42051 14/09/1950 Kentish Town 24/07/1965 Trafford Park (LMS) 14.83 15.26
42052 27/09/1950 Manningham 05/1967 Holbeck (MR) 16.67 17.06
42053 06/10/1950 Saltley 12/06/1965 Trafford Park (LMS) 14.67 15.04
42054 16/10/1950 Saltley 04/07/1964 Newton Heath 13.75 13.76
42055 31/10/1950 Polmadie 07/1967 Low Moor 16.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1967 17.05
42056 30/11/1950 Polmadie 10/1964 Carstairs 13.92 14.14
42057 30/11/1950 Polmadie 07/1964 Polmadie 13.67 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 11/1964 13.97
42058 30/11/1950 Polmadie 08/1966 Carstairs 15.75 16.05
42059 30/11/1950 Polmadie 06/1964 Polmadie 13.58 13.80
42060 31/12/1950 Polmadie 04/1965 Beattock 14.33 14.55
42061 08/12/1950 Stoke 25/09/1965 Southport 14.75 15.03
42062 15/12/1950 Stoke 22/05/1965 Aston 14.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1965 14.76
42063 20/12/1950 Stoke 26/10/1963 Lancaster Green Ayre 12.83 12.99
42064 21/12/1950 Stoke 12/06/1965 Trafford Park (LMS) 14.5 14.83
42065 29/12/1950 Stoke 24/07/1965 Trafford Park (LMS) 14.58 15.06
42066 10/10/1950 Ramsgate 09/1967 Low Moor 16.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 28/02/1968 17.40
42067 13/10/1950 Ramsgate 23/02/1963 Carlisle Canal 12.33 12.68
42068 20/10/1950 Ramsgate 14/12/1963 Bushbury 13.17 13.25
42069 26/10/1950 Ramsgate 19/11/1966 Trafford Park (LMS) 16.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1967 16.65
42070 02/11/1950 Stewarts Lane 26/06/1965 Stoke 14.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1965 14.88
42071 06/11/1950 Stewarts Lane 18/03/1967 Trafford Park (LMS) 16.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1967 16.87
42072 12/11/1950 Stewarts Lane 10/1967 Low Moor 16.92 17.35
42073 17/11/1950 Stewarts Lane 10/1967 Normanton 16.92 Prs Preserved
42074 24/11/1950 Stewarts Lane 09/1966 Low Moor 15.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1966 16.07
42075 30/11/1950 Dover Marine 22/05/1965 Bangor 14.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1965 14.80
42076 07/12/1950 Dover Marine 18/03/1967 Trafford Park (LMS) 16.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1967 16.95
42077 14/12/1950 Dover Marine 27/06/1964 Bolton 13.5 14.35
42078 21/12/1950 Dover Marine 18/06/1966 Bank Hall 15.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1966 15.75
42079 04/01/1951 Dover Marine 06/05/1967 Trafford Park (LMS) 16.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1967 16.79
42080 12/01/1951 Stewarts Lane 14/01/1967 Trafford Park (LMS) 16 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1967 16.35
42081 24/01/1951 Stewarts Lane 06/05/1967 Trafford Park (LMS) 16.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1967 16.82
42082 01/02/1951 Stewarts Lane 19/06/1965 Woodford Halse 14.33 14.63
42083 09/02/1951 Stewarts Lane 10/1967 Normanton 16.67 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 11/1967 16.78
42084 19/02/1951 Stewarts Lane 05/12/1964 Carnforth 13.83 14.41
42085 27/02/1951 Brighton 10/1967 Normanton 16.67 Prs Preserved
42086 10/03/1951 Brighton 01/04/1967 Croes Newydd 16.08 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 10/1967 16.61
42087 17/03/1951 Brighton 08/10/1966 Croes Newydd 15.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1967 15.84
42088 30/03/1951 Brighton 03/11/1962 Gorton 11.67 11.66
42089 06/04/1951 Brighton 24/10/1964 Derby 13.5 13.62
42090 15/04/1951 Brighton 13/06/1964 Cricklewood East 13.17 13.35
42091 25/04/1951 Brighton 19/10/1963 Toton 12.5 12.48
42092 03/05/1951 Brighton 25/07/1964 Cricklewood East 13.17 13.38
42093 22/05/1951 Brighton 10/1967 Normanton 16.42 16.91
42094 01/06/1951 Ramsgate 16/11/1962 Sowerby Bridge 11.42 12.30
42095 09/06/1951 Tunbridge Wells West 04/06/1966 Tebay 15 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1966 15.19
42096 15/07/1950 Tunbridge Wells West 24/12/1966 Lostock Hall 16.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1967 16.84
42097 21/07/1950 Tunbridge Wells West 08/12/1962 Watford 12.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1963 12.58
42098 28/07/1950 Tunbridge Wells West 23/02/1963 Carlisle Canal 12.58 12.81
42099 18/08/1950 Tunbridge Wells West 05/12/1964 Watford 14.33 14.42
42100 25/08/1950 Tunbridge Wells West 02/03/1963 Watford 12.58 12.76
42101 01/09/1950 Tunbridge Wells West 09/02/1963 Willesden 12.42 12.58
42102 08/09/1950 Tunbridge Wells West 17/12/1966 Carnforth 16.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 06/1967 16.78
42103 14/09/1950 Tunbridge Wells West 22/05/1965 Woodford Halse 14.67 15.10
42104 20/09/1950 Tunbridge Wells West 02/10/1965 Croes Newydd 15.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1966 15.33
42105 27/09/1950 Tunbridge Wells West 17/12/1966 Lostock Hall 16.25 16.56
42106 03/10/1950 Ramsgate 08/05/1965 Willesden 14.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1965 15.04
42107 22/03/1949 27/02/1966 Low Moor 16.92 17.24
42108 25/03/1949 12/1966 Wakefield 17.75 17.98
42109 20/04/1949 Low Moor 26/06/1965 Chester (MR) 16.17 16.42
42110 09/05/1949 11/06/1966 Tebay 17.08 17.45
42111 02/06/1949 08/12/1962 Trafford Park (LMS) 13.5 14.02
42112 10/06/1949 24/07/1965 Trafford Park (LMS) 16.08 16.53
42113 16/07/1949 Stoke 24/07/1965 Trafford Park (LMS) 16 16.43
42114 16/07/1949 Stoke 19/06/1965 Willesden 15.92 16.26
42115 16/07/1949 Stoke 12/11/1966 Tebay 17.33 17.84
42116 16/07/1949 Stoke 06/1967 Low Moor 17.92 18.68
42117 02/08/1949 29/12/1962 Willesden 13.33 13.79
42118 09/08/1949 25/09/1965 Barrow in Furness 16.08 16.36
42119 23/08/1949 21/08/1965 Workington 16 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 02/1966 16.49
42120 31/08/1949 28/09/1963 Workington 14.08 Cut Arnott Young (Dudley Hill) 12/1963 14.30
42121 15/09/1949 09/07/1966 Croes Newydd 16.83 17.09
42122 09/1949 29/12/1962 Ayr 13.25 14.01
42123 10/1949 28/02/1964 Hull Dairycoates 14.33 14.35
42124 10/1949 01/1964 Ardrossan 14.25 14.35
42125 10/1949 12/1966 Carstairs 17.17 17.51
42126 11/1949 10/1964 Carstairs 14.92 15.26
42127 11/1949 10/1964 Carstairs 14.92 15.18
42128 03/12/1949 Hamilton (West) 11/1966 St Margarets 16.92 17.21
42129 03/12/1949 Hamilton (West) 09/1965 Beattock 15.75 16.13
42130 03/12/1949 Hamilton (West) 29/12/1962 Beattock 13 13.96
42131 24/12/1949 08/1965 Polmadie 15.67 15.82
42132 28/12/1949 St Albans 18/06/1966 Bank Hall 16.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1966 16.73
42133 11/01/1950 Kentish Town 01/04/1967 Croes Newydd 17.25 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 10/1967 17.77
42134 17/01/1950 01/04/1967 Tebay 17.25 17.92
42135 27/01/1950 22/02/1964 Wigan Central (L&Y) 14.08 14.39
42136 09/02/1950 12/01/1963 Lancaster Green Ayre 12.92 13.14
42137 27/02/1950 25/01/1964 Uttoxeter 13.92 14.05
42138 09/03/1950 09/1967 Normanton 17.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1968 18.20
42139 15/03/1950 27/12/1965 Holbeck (MR) 15.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1966 16.01
42140 16/04/1950 29/06/1963 Nottingham 13.17 13.25
42141 18/04/1950 10/1967 Low Moor 17.5 17.88
42142 31/12/1949 St Albans 26/06/1966 Low Moor 16.5 16.80
42143 05/1950 10/1964 Polmadie 14.42 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 01/1965 14.68
42144 06/1950 29/12/1962 Polmadie 12.5 13.76
42145 06/1950 09/1967 Low Moor 17.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 28/02/1968 17.72
42146 29/08/1950 03/11/1962 Derby 12.25 12.32
42147 23/04/1948 01/05/1965 Barrow in Furness 17.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1965 17.32
42148 03/05/1948 19/12/1964 Workington 16.58 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 04/1968 19.96
42149 07/05/1948 07/1967 Normanton 19.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1967 19.54
42150 15/05/1948 12/1966 Wakefield 18.58 18.84
42151 24/05/1948 07/09/1963 Low Moor 15.33 15.32
42152 05/06/1948 10/1967 Low Moor 19.33 19.79
42153 05/06/1948 08/08/1964 Blackpool Central 16.17 16.62
42154 10/06/1948 14/01/1967 Tebay 18.58 19.02
42155 16/06/1948 15/05/1965 Bolton 16.92 17.18
42156 22/06/1948 05/02/1966 Croes Newydd 17.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1966 17.91
42157 29/06/1948 20/07/1963 Woodford Halse 15.08 15.39
42158 02/07/1948 24/04/1965 Lostock Hall 16.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1965 17.13
42159 07/07/1948 25/06/1966 Bolton 17.92 18.28
42160 09/07/1948 22/05/1965 Stoke 16.83 17.11
42161 06/08/1948 12/1966 Holbeck (MR) 18.33 18.62
42162 08/1948 29/12/1962 Carstairs 14.33 15.09
42163 08/1948 06/1964 St Margarets 15.83 16.10
42164 06/1948 29/12/1962 Motherwell 14.5 15.51
42165 09/1948 06/02/1965 Derby 16.42 17.76
42166 09/1948 10/1963 Polmadie 15.08 15.51
42167 09/1948 06/1964 Greenock Ladyburn 15.75 16.01
42168 09/1948 03/1964 Dalry Road 15.5 15.84
42169 09/1948 02/1966 Carstairs 17.42
42170 10/1948 10/1965 Greenock Ladyburn 17 17.35
42171 10/1948 06/1964 Polmadie 15.67 15.93
42172 10/1948 29/12/1962 Dalry Road 14.17 14.93
42173 10/1948 29/12/1962 Carstairs 14.17 14.93
42174 30/10/1948 07/08/1965 Carnforth 16.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1966 17.72
42175 11/1948 29/12/1962 Greenock Ladyburn 14.08 15.34
42176 11/1948 06/1966 Greenock Ladyburn 17.58 17.84
42177 11/1948 12/1966 Low Moor 18.08 18.34
42178 26/11/1948 Lostock Hall 29/06/1963 Woodford Halse 14.58 14.81
42179 01/12/1948 Wigan Central (L&Y) 06/03/1965 Workington 16.25 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 11/1966 17.97
42180 07/12/1948 Wigan Central (L&Y) 11/1963 Wigan Central (L&Y) 14.92 15.20
42181 14/12/1948 10/1966 Wakefield 17.83 18.35
42182 24/12/1948 06/04/1963 Willesden 14.33 14.40
42183 11/01/1949 01/10/1966 Bolton 17.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1967 18.11
42184 24/01/1949 12/1966 Low Moor 17.92 18.23
42185 11/02/1949 02/05/1964 Toton 15.25 15.35
42186 28/02/1949 06/06/1964 Stafford 15.33 15.56
2187 42187 17/12/1947 15/03/1967 Lostock Hall 19.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1967 19.76
2188 42188 22/12/1947 18/05/1963 Manningham 15.42 15.51
2189 42189 24/12/1947 09/1967 Normanton 19.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1968 20.41
2190 42190 17/01/1948 08/1964 Ardrossan 16.58 16.67
2191 42191 24/01/1948 29/12/1962 Ardrossan 14.92 15.65
2192 42192 31/01/1948 05/1964 Beattock 16.33 16.64
2193 42193 31/01/1948 29/12/1962 Ardrossan 14.92 15.63
2194 42194 07/02/1948 23/08/1965 Darlington 17.5 17.70
2195 42195 21/02/1948 04/1966 Polmadie 18.17 18.58
2196 42196 28/02/1948 05/1967 Low Moor 19.25 19.64
2197 42197 06/03/1948 05/1966 Greenock Ladyburn 18.17 18.54
2198 42198 13/03/1948 08/05/1965 Barrow in Furness 17.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1965 17.35
2199 42199 07/04/1948 09/1965 Polmadie 17.42 17.79
2200 42200 10/1945 06/1964 Motherwell 18.67 18.93
2201 42201 11/1945 07/1964 Dawsholm 18.67 19.01
2202 42202 06/11/1945 22/05/1965 Chester (MR) 19.5 19.70
2203 42203 11/1945 21/12/1962 Stranraer 17.08 17.84
2204 42204 11/1945 12/1966 Wakefield 21.08 21.43
2205 42205 11/1945 29/12/1962 Beattock 17.08 18.01
2206 42206 22/11/1945 20/04/1963 Blackpool Central 17.42 17.53
2207 42207 27/11/1945 08/12/1962 Bolton 17.08 17.05
2208 42208 12/1945 07/1964 Motherwell 18.58 18.93
2209 42209 04/12/1945 06/02/1965 Bangor 19.17 19.88
2210 42210 07/12/1945 06/05/1967 Tebay 21.42 22.04
2211 42211 11/12/1945 08/12/1962 Bangor 17 17.50
2212 42212 14/12/1945 21/08/1965 Trafford Park (LMS) 19.67 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1965 20.02
2213 42213 19/12/1945 09/01/1966 Huddersfield Hillhouse 20.08 20.33
2214 42214 12/1945 02/1965 Beattock 19.17 19.43
2215 42215 12/1945 29/12/1962 Beattock 17 17.93
2216 42216 12/1945 07/1966 Greenock Ladyburn 20.58 21.01
2217 42217 29/12/1945 10/1961 Carlisle Kingmoor 15.83 15.97
2218 42218 22/01/1946 24/10/1964 Derby 18.75 18.83
2219 42219 01/1946 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 16.42 16.81
2220 42220 09/02/1946 04/12/1961 Shoeburyness 15.83 15.94
2221 42221 25/02/1946 12/09/1964 Derby 18.58 18.73
2222 42222 12/03/1946 08/05/1965 Willesden 19.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1965 19.61
2223 42223 06/04/1946 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 16.17 16.38
2224 42224 16/04/1946 21/01/1967 Lostock Hall 20.75 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 09/1967 21.43
2225 42225 24/04/1946 18/06/1966 Tebay 20.17 20.49
2226 42226 02/05/1946 27/06/1964 Stoke 18.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1964 18.39
2227 42227 08/05/1946 20/10/1962 Bletchley 16.42 16.84
2228 42228 16/05/1946 14/09/1963 Rowsley 17.33 17.43
2229 42229 22/05/1946 18/01/1964 Chester (MR) 17.67 17.75
2230 42230 05/06/1946 Southport 07/08/1965 Trafford Park (LMS) 19.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1966 19.87
2231 42231 05/06/1946 Southport 22/06/1963 Mansfield 17 17.29
2232 42232 12/06/1946 Southport 29/01/1966 Tebay 19.58 19.94
2233 42233 25/06/1946 05/1967 Low Moor 20.92 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 10/1967 21.32
2234 42234 02/07/1946 15/02/1964 Willesden 17.58 18.39
2235 42235 10/07/1946 07/1967 Low Moor 21 21.70
2236 42236 15/08/1946 05/1967 Low Moor 20.75 21.18
2237 42237 23/08/1946 08/12/1962 Rowsley 16.33 16.41
2238 42238 29/08/1946 12/10/1963 Barrow in Furness 17.17 17.14
2239 42239 09/1946 06/1964 St Margarets 17.75 17.93
2240 42240 07/09/1946 16/04/1966 Bolton 19.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1966 19.87
2241 42241 09/1946 09/11/1965 Greenock Ladyburn 19.17 19.43
2242 42242 09/1946 07/1964 Greenock Ladyburn 17.83 18.18
2243 42243 09/1946 08/1965 Polmadie 18.92 19.18
2244 42244 09/1946 06/1964 Polmadie 17.75 18.01
2245 42245 10/1946 10/1964 Greenock Ladyburn 18 18.18
2246 42246 10/1946 06/1964 Polmadie 17.67 17.93
2247 42247 11/10/1946 14/08/1965 Barrow in Furness 18.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1966 19.77
2248 42248 16/10/1946 15/12/1962 Gorton 16.17 16.32
2249 42249 18/10/1946 16/07/1966 Bolton 19.75 20.09
2250 42250 24/10/1946 12/12/1964 Woodford Halse 18.17 18.49
2251 42251 30/10/1946 10/1967 Low Moor 21 21.47
2252 42252 02/11/1946 10/1967 Normanton 20.92 21.47
2253 42253 08/11/1946 22/06/1963 Woodford Halse 16.58 16.78
2254 42254 13/11/1946 18/06/1962 Tilbury 15.58 15.98
2255 42255 16/11/1946 18/06/1962 Tilbury 15.58 15.98
2256 42256 21/11/1946 20/06/1964 Gorton 17.58 17.91
2257 42257 27/11/1946 18/06/1962 Tilbury 15.58 15.79
2258 42258 11/1946 29/12/1962 Greenock Ladyburn 16.08 16.84
2259 42259 04/12/1946 10/1965 Greenock Ladyburn 18.83 19.21
2260 42260 07/12/1946 05/1966 Beattock 19.42 19.79
2261 42261 12/12/1946 28/02/1964 Greenock Ladyburn 17.17 17.19
2262 42262 18/12/1946 10/1964 Greenock Ladyburn 17.83 18.01
2263 42263 20/12/1946 07/1964 Greenock Ladyburn 17.58 17.92
2264 42264 27/12/1946 07/1966 Greenock Ladyburn 19.58 19.81
2265 42265 03/01/1947 10/1965 Greenock Ladyburn 18.75 19.21
2266 42266 15/01/1947 03/1966 Greenock Ladyburn 19.17 19.43
2267 42267 21/01/1947 05/1967 Wakefield 20.33 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 04/1968 21.25
2268 42268 01/1947 29/12/1962 Polmadie 15.92 17.18
2269 42269 02/1947 07/1967 Wakefield 20.42 20.93
2270 42270 12/02/1947 26/01/1963 Chester (MR) 15.92 16.19
2271 42271 02/1947 12/1966 Holbeck (MR) 19.83 20.09
2272 42272 03/1947 29/12/1962 Dalry Road 15.75 16.52
2273 42273 05/1947 09/1966 St Margarets 19.33 19.68
2274 42274 06/1947 05/1967 Motherwell 19.92 20.27
2275 42275 06/1947 06/1964 Polmadie 17 17.27
2276 42276 07/1947 29/12/1962 Polmadie 15.42 16.68
2277 42277 07/1947 08/1966 Polmadie 19.08 19.43
2278 42278 12/07/1947 25/04/1964 Fleetwood 16.75 16.94
2279 42279 05/08/1947 13/07/1963 Leicester Midland 15.92 16.21
2280 42280 12/08/1947 07/03/1964 Newton Heath 16.58 17.69
2281 42281 19/08/1947 27/04/1963 Woodford Halse 15.67 15.92
2282 42282 25/08/1947 19/09/1964 Bangor 17.08 17.24
2283 42283 01/09/1947 09/1967 Low Moor 20 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 28/02/1968 20.51
2284 42284 08/09/1947 26/12/1964 Derby 17.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1965 17.86
2285 42285 13/09/1947 30/08/1965 Low Moor 17.92 18.10
2286 42286 24/09/1947 26/12/1964 Lostock Hall 17.25 17.90
2287 42287 01/10/1947 07/1967 Wakefield 19.75 20.30
2288 42288 08/10/1947 28/09/1963 Newton Heath 15.92 16.12
2289 42289 14/10/1947 08/05/1965 Willesden 17.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1965 18.02
2290 42290 21/10/1947 29/09/1962 Southport 14.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/03/1963 15.40
2291 42291 28/10/1947 26/12/1964 Derby 17.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1965 17.73
2292 42292 03/11/1947 16/05/1964 Southport 16.5 16.71
2293 42293 07/11/1947 06/04/1963 Southport 15.42 15.65
2294 42294 13/11/1947 18/05/1963 Blackpool Central 15.5 15.60
2295 42295 19/11/1947 16/10/1965 Lostock Hall 17.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1966 18.17
2296 42296 24/11/1947 07/1965 Lostock Hall 17.67 17.99
2297 42297 01/12/1947 06/05/1967 Lostock Hall 19.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1967 19.80
2298 42298 05/12/1947 17/11/1962 Lostock Hall 14.92 15.25
2299 42299 11/12/1947 20/03/1965 Barrow in Furness 17.25 17.61
2673 42673 28/03/1945 14/08/1965 Workington 20.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1966 20.90
2674 42674 04/04/1945 17/11/1962 Stoke 17.58 17.76
2675 42675 17/04/1945 18/09/1965 Southport 20.42 20.92
2676 42676 27/04/1945 25/08/1966 Newton Heath 21.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1966 21.32
2677 42677 03/05/1945 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 17.08 17.30
2678 42678 14/05/1945 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 17.08 17.27
2679 42679 23/05/1945 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 17.08 17.92
2680 42680 05/1945 27/03/1965 Barrow in Furness 19.83 20.27
2681 42681 09/06/1945 29/06/1963 Chester (MR) 18 18.28
2682 42682 18/06/1945 25/07/1964 Southport 19.08 19.26
2683 42683 23/06/1945 07/10/1961 Trafford Park (LMS) 16.33 16.41
2684 42684 06/1945 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 17 17.24
2685 42685 09/07/1945 29/09/1962 Rowsley 17.17 17.50
2686 42686 13/07/1945 16/05/1964 Newton Heath 18.83 19.10
2687 42687 28/07/1945 18/06/1962 Shoeburyness 16.92 17.36
2688 42688 08/1945 05/1965 Beattock 19.75 19.93
2689 42689 08/1945 10/1967 Low Moor 22.17 22.43
2690 42690 08/1945 12/1966 Polmadie 21.33 21.76
2691 42691 08/1945 09/1966 St Margarets 21.08 21.35
2692 42692 09/1945 29/12/1962 Greenock Ladyburn 17.25 18.51
2693 42693 09/1945 10/1966 Beattock 21.08 21.35
2694 42694 09/1945 12/1966 Carstairs 21.25 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 04/1967 21.59
2695 42695 10/1945 06/1964 Polmadie 18.67 18.93
2696 42696 11/10/1945 15/08/1964 Newton Heath 18.83 19.52
2697 42697 16/10/1945 14/01/1967 Trafford Park (LMS) 21.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1967 21.59
2698 42698 10/1945 10/1963 Newton Heath 18 23.18
2699 42699 10/1945 05/1967 Holbeck (MR) 21.58 22.01