Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 71 Today
» 966 Yesterday
» 2110 Week
» 21436 Month
» 248197 Year
» 759299 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Stanier "Jubilee" Class 4-6-0


LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
5552 45552 01/12/1934 09/1964 Crewe North 29.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1965 30.39
5553 45553 29/05/1934 07/11/1964 Crewe North 30.5 30.90
5554 45554 05/06/1934 07/11/1964 Crewe North 30.42 31.05
5555 45555 18/06/1934 17/08/1963 Crewe South 29.17 29.26
5556 45556 22/06/1934 05/09/1964 Crewe North 30.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1965 30.59
5557 45557 29/06/1934 19/09/1964 Derby 30.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1964 30.48
5556 45558 06/07/1934 15/08/1964 Newton Heath 30.08 30.38
5559 45559 09/07/1934 20/10/1962 Blackpool Central 28.25 28.61
5560 45560 11/07/1934 11/1963 Crewe North 29.33 29.53
5561 45561 13/07/1934 19/09/1964 Derby 30.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1964 30.45
5562 45562 08/08/1934 11/1967 Holbeck (MR) 33.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1968 33.79
5563 45563 09/08/1934 27/11/1965 Warrington Dallam 31.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1966 31.62
5564 45564 18/08/1934 18/07/1964 Newton Heath 29.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1964 30.35
5565 45565 18/08/1934 01/1967 Low Moor 32.42 32.85
5566 45566 25/08/1934 12/11/1962 Holbeck (MR) 28.25 28.34
5567 45567 18/08/1934 30/01/1965 Crewe North 30.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1965 30.76
5568 45568 25/08/1934 25/04/1964 Newton Heath 29.67 30.41
5569 45569 25/08/1934 25/04/1964 Fleetwood 29.67 29.74
5570 45570 25/08/1934 29/12/1962 Sheffield Darnall 28.33 28.91
5571 45571 01/09/1934 16/05/1964 Speke Junction 29.67 30.14
5572 45572 01/09/1934 04/01/1964 Willesden 29.33 29.89
5573 45573 29/09/1934 09/1965 Holbeck (MR) 31 Cut Clayton and Davie (Dunston-on-Tyne) 01/1966 31.32
5574 45574 29/09/1934 03/1966 Holbeck (MR) 31.5 31.90
5575 45575 29/09/1934 15/06/1963 Burton 28.75 29.06
5576 45576 29/09/1934 29/12/1962 Sheffield Darnall 28.25 29.56
5577 45577 29/09/1934 05/09/1964 Kidderminster 30 30.40
5578 45578 29/09/1934 30/05/1964 Newton Heath 29.67 30.15
5579 45579 29/09/1934 15/08/1964 Derby 29.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1964 30.15
5580 45580 06/10/1934 12/12/1964 Newton Heath 30.17 30.55
5581 45581 06/10/1934 08/1966 Farnley Junction 31.83 32.21
5582 45582 24/11/1934 08/12/1962 Barrow in Furness 28.08 28.74
5583 45583 24/11/1934 24/10/1964 Warrington Dallam 29.92 30.66
5584 45584 01/12/1934 03/10/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 29.83 30.15
5585 45585 01/12/1934 09/05/1964 Derby 29.42 29.98
5586 45586 15/12/1934 23/01/1965 Crewe South 30.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1965 30.35
5587 45587 08/12/1934 15/12/1962 Barrow in Furness 28 28.79
5588 45588 15/12/1934 01/05/1965 Carlisle Kingmoor 30.42 30.69
5589 45589 15/12/1934 03/1965 Wakefield 30.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1966 31.27
5590 45590 22/12/1934 11/12/1965 Warrington Dallam 31 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1966 31.50
5591 45591 22/12/1934 26/10/1963 Crewe North 28.83 28.92
5592 45592 29/12/1934 26/09/1964 Newton Heath 29.75 30.48
5593 45593 12/1934 10/1967 Holbeck (MR) 32.83 Prs Preserved 28.68
5594 45594 12/01/1935 29/12/1962 Sheffield Darnall 27.92 28.61
5595 45595 05/01/1935 30/01/1965 Crewe North 30 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1965 30.38
5596 45596 12/01/1935 23/07/1966 Stockport Edgeley 31.5 Prs Preserved
5597 45597 12/01/1935 01/1965 Holbeck (MR) 30 30.28
5598 45598 02/02/1935 24/10/1964 Bank Hall 29.67 30.06
5599 45599 26/01/1935 15/08/1964 Oxley 29.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1964 29.82
5600 45600 02/02/1935 18/12/1965 Newton Heath 30.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1966 31.22
5601 45601 13/04/1935 26/09/1964 Newton Heath 29.42 30.19
5602 45602 06/04/1935 03/1965 Holbeck (MR) 29.92 30.30
5603 45603 17/05/1935 08/12/1962 Nuneaton 27.58 27.78
5604 45604 02/03/1935 17/07/1965 Newton Heath 30.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1965 30.64
5605 45605 06/04/1935 03/1964 Burton 28.92 28.96
5606 45606 13/04/1935 27/06/1964 Barrow in Furness 29.17 29.87
5607 45607 29/06/1934 01/12/1962 Newton Heath 28.5 28.90
5608 45608 13/07/1934 09/1965 Holbeck (MR) 31.17 Cut Clayton and Davie (Dunston-on-Tyne) 01/1966 31.53
5609 45609 17/07/1934 02/09/1960 Sheffield Millhouses 26.17 26.18
5610 45610 19/07/1934 11/01/1964 Derby 29.5 29.68
5611 45611 27/07/1934 19/09/1964 Derby 30.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1965 30.49
5612 45612 08/1934 28/03/1964 Derby 29.58 29.69
5613 45613 06/08/1934 12/09/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 30.08 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 04/1965 30.71
5614 45614 09/08/1934 11/01/1964 Derby 29.42 29.70
5615 45615 15/08/1934 08/12/1962 Burton 28.33 28.52
5616 45616 16/08/1934 21/01/1961 Leicester Midland 26.42 26.48
5617 45617 24/09/1934 07/11/1964 Crewe North 30.17 30.58
5618 45618 02/10/1934 03/1964 Burton 29.42 30.14
5619 45619 05/10/1934 19/08/1961 Holbeck (MR) 26.83 26.96
5620 45620 11/10/1934 12/09/1964 Burton 29.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1965 30.28
5621 45621 11/10/1934 29/12/1962 Corkerhill 28.17 29.12
5622 45622 17/10/1934 19/09/1964 Derby 29.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1964 30.18
5623 45623 19/10/1934 25/07/1964 Newton Heath 29.75 30.93
5624 45624 19/10/1934 23/11/1963 Oxley 29.08 29.51
5625 45625 24/10/1934 07/09/1963 Barrow in Furness 28.92 29.08
5626 45626 09/11/1934 11/1965 Holbeck (MR) 31 31.21
5627 45627 13/11/1934 17/09/1966 Bank Hall 31.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1967 32.28
5628 45628 13/11/1934 08/12/1962 Kentish Town 28.08 28.27
5629 45629 10/11/1934 01/05/1965 Carlisle Kingmoor 30.5 30.78
5630 45630 13/11/1934 18/11/1961 Crewe North 27 27.02
5631 45631 14/11/1934 22/08/1964 Crewe North 29.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1964 30.11
5632 45632 11/11/1934 09/10/1965 Newton Heath 30.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1966 31.53
5633 45633 21/11/1934 16/10/1965 Warrington Dallam 30.92 31.33
5634 45634 22/11/1934 11/05/1963 Crewe South 28.5 28.75
5635 45635 24/11/1934 12/09/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 29.83 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 01/1965 30.16
5636 45636 18/12/1934 08/12/1962 Burton 28 28.18
5637 45637 19/12/1934 13/12/1952 Edge Hill 18 18.11
5638 45638 19/12/1934 14/03/1964 Warrington Dallam 29.25 29.34
5639 45639 28/12/1934 10/1963 Holbeck (MR) 28.83 29.07
5640 45640 12/1934 07/03/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 29.25 30.11
5641 45641 12/1934 19/09/1964 Burton 29.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1965 30.11
5642 45642 10/05/1934 09/01/1965 Newton Heath 30.67 30.95
5643 45643 04/12/1934 01/1966 Holbeck (MR) 31.08 Cut Clayton and Davie (Dunston-on-Tyne) 05/1966 31.47
5644 45644 07/12/1934 23/11/1963 Crewe South 28.92 29.13
5645 45645 07/12/1934 19/10/1963 Barrow in Furness 28.83 28.96
5646 45646 14/12/1934 28/12/1963 Farnley Junction 29 29.27
5647 45647 04/01/1935 04/1967 Holbeck (MR) 32.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1967 32.72
5648 45648 10/01/1935 09/02/1963 Burton 28.08 28.21
5649 45649 10/01/1935 05/10/1963 Derby 28.75 28.78
5650 45650 14/01/1935 19/01/1963 Burton 28 28.47
5651 45651 16/01/1935 23/11/1962 Kidderminster 27.83 27.97
5652 45652 21/01/1935 16/01/1965 Warrington Dallam 30 30.42
5653 45653 22/01/1935 03/04/1965 Newton Heath 30.25 30.58
5654 45654 07/02/1935 25/06/1966 Newton Heath 31.33 31.71
5655 45655 13/12/1934 17/04/1965 Warrington Dallam 30.33 31.53
5656 45656 17/12/1934 29/12/1962 Sheffield Darnall 28 28.30
5657 45657 17/12/1934 26/09/1964 Trafford Park (LMS) 29.75 30.43
5658 45658 18/12/1934 10/1965 Holbeck (MR) 30.83 31.01
5659 45659 20/12/1934 25/05/1963 Holbeck (MR) 28.42 28.45
5660 45660 27/12/1934 06/1966 Holbeck (MR) 31.5 31.82
5661 45661 27/12/1934 05/1965 Holbeck (MR) 30.42 30.65
5662 45662 28/12/1934 23/11/1962 Kidderminster 27.92 28.04
5663 45663 01/01/1935 24/10/1964 Warrington Dallam 29.75 30.31
5664 45664 01/01/1935 05/1965 Warrington Dallam 30.33 30.56
5665 45665 18/11/1935 29/12/1962 Corkerhill 27.08 28.09
5666 45666 18/11/1935 17/04/1965 Warrington Dallam 29.42 29.76
5667 45667 25/11/1935 23/01/1965 Bank Hall 29.17 29.49
5668 45668 02/12/1935 21/12/1963 Burton 28 28.14
5669 45669 04/12/1935 01/06/1963 Nuneaton 27.5 27.63
5670 45670 17/12/1935 24/10/1964 Stockport Edgeley 28.83 29.19
5671 45671 06/12/1935 09/11/1963 Warrington Dallam 27.92 28.13
5672 45672 10/12/1935 07/11/1964 Crewe North 28.92 29.37
5673 45673 12/12/1935 29/12/1962 Corkerhill 27 28.03
5674 45674 16/12/1935 10/10/1964 Saltley 28.83 29.27
5675 45675 17/12/1935 06/1967 Holbeck (MR) 31.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1967 31.93
5676 45676 18/12/1935 26/09/1964 Crewe North 28.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1965 29.10
5677 45677 19/12/1935 29/12/1962 Corkerhill 27 28.01
5678 45678 24/12/1935 08/12/1962 Stockport Edgeley 27 28.08
5679 45679 24/12/1935 29/12/1962 Newton Heath 27 27.91
5680 45680 12/1935 12/01/1963 Carlisle Kingmoor 27.08 27.53
5681 45681 12/1935 19/09/1964 Blackpool Central 28.75 29.11
5682 45682 06/01/1936 06/1964 Bristol Barrow Road 28.42 28.63
5683 45683 16/01/1936 29/12/1962 Sheffield Darnall 26.92 28.18
5684 45684 06/02/1936 11/12/1965 Bank Hall 29.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1966 30.12
5685 45685 02/1936 04/1964 Bristol Barrow Road 28.17 28.94
5686 45686 05/02/1936 17/11/1962 Barrow in Furness 26.75 27.54
5687 45687 10/02/1936 29/12/1962 Corkerhill 26.83 27.86
5688 45688 24/02/1936 15/12/1962 Carlisle Kingmoor 26.83 27.32
5689 45689 28/02/1936 12/12/1964 Crewe North 28.83 29.23
5690 45690 09/03/1936 03/1964 Bristol Barrow Road 28 Prs Preserved
5691 45691 11/03/1936 29/12/1962 Blackpool Central 26.75 27.20
5692 45692 19/03/1936 29/12/1962 Corkerhill 26.75 27.76
5693 45693 19/03/1936 29/12/1962 Corkerhill 26.75 27.76
5694 45694 25/03/1936 01/1967 Wakefield 30.83 31.24
5695 45695 26/03/1936 02/1964 Farnley Junction 27.92 28.32
5696 45696 02/04/1936 18/07/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 28.25 28.81
5697 45697 07/04/1936 09/1967 Holbeck (MR) 31.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1968 32.13
5698 45698 08/04/1936 23/10/1965 Bank Hall 29.5 29.88
5699 45699 15/04/1936 21/11/1964 Kidderminster 28.58 Prs Preserved
5700 45700 20/04/1936 04/07/1964 Warrington Dallam 28.25 28.42
5701 45701 24/04/1936 23/02/1963 Newton Heath 26.83 27.12
5702 45702 05/05/1936 27/04/1963 Newton Heath 26.92 27.30
5703 45703 05/05/1936 21/11/1964 Warrington Dallam 28.5 28.96
5704 45704 11/05/1936 23/01/1965 Crewe North 28.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1965 28.95
5705 45705 21/05/1936 06/11/1965 Newton Heath 29.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1966 29.76
5706 45706 26/05/1936 28/09/1963 Newton Heath 27.33 27.41
5707 45707 27/05/1936 29/12/1962 Corkerhill 26.58 27.57
5708 45708 01/06/1936 03/1964 Farnley Junction 27.75 27.89
5709 45709 03/06/1936 23/11/1963 Saltley 27.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1964 28.22
5710 45710 08/06/1936 06/06/1964 Newton Heath 28 28.71
5711 45711 19/06/1936 29/12/1962 Corkerhill 26.5 27.51
5712 45712 24/06/1936 11/1963 Derby 27.42 27.58
5713 45713 29/06/1936 20/10/1962 Bank Hall 26.33 26.98
5714 45714 01/07/1936 20/07/1963 Barrow in Furness 27 27.14
5715 45715 03/07/1936 29/12/1962 Bank Hall 26.42 26.80
5716 45716 04/07/1936 12/09/1964 Wakefield 28.17 28.22
5717 45717 21/07/1936 26/10/1963 Bank Hall 27.25 27.59
5718 45718 30/07/1936 20/10/1962 Agecroft 26.25 27.39
5719 45719 03/08/1936 23/03/1963 Bank Hall 26.58 26.82
5720 45720 17/08/1936 29/12/1962 Corkerhill 26.33 27.35
5721 45721 26/08/1936 09/10/1965 Bank Hall 29.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1966 29.57
5722 45722 24/08/1936 01/12/1962 Rugby 26.33 26.91
5723 45723 26/08/1936 22/08/1964 Oxley 28 28.41
5724 45724 02/09/1936 03/11/1962 Nuneaton 26.17 26.80
5725 45725 25/09/1936 29/12/1962 Sheffield Darnall 26.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1964 27.49
5726 45726 09/10/1936 20/03/1965 Warrington Dallam 28.42 28.70
5727 45727 12/10/1936 29/12/1962 Corkerhill 26.17 27.19
5728 45728 07/10/1936 20/10/1962 Agecroft 26 27.12
5729 45729 13/10/1936 20/10/1962 Agecroft 26 26.94
5730 45730 16/10/1936 05/10/1963 Warrington Dallam 27 28.43
5731 45731 21/10/1936 20/10/1962 Blackpool Central 26 27.08
5732 45732 29/10/1936 03/1964 Stockport Edgeley 27.42 27.81
5733 45733 02/11/1936 19/09/1964 Willesden 27.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1965 28.22
5734 45734 11/11/1936 28/12/1963 Carlisle Kingmoor 27.08 27.44
5735 45735 16/11/1936 03/10/1964 Annesley 27.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1965 28.18
45736 25/11/1936 26/09/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 27.83 28.16
5737 45737 23/11/1936 30/05/1964 Newton Heath 27.5 28.00
5738 45738 12/1936 28/12/1963 Carlisle Kingmoor 27 27.19
5739 45739 10/12/1936 01/1967 Wakefield 30.08 30.53
5740 45740 19/12/1936 26/10/1963 Aston 26.83 27.01
5741 45741 29/12/1936 01/02/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 27.17 27.31
5742 45742 12/1936 01/05/1965 Carlisle Kingmoor 28.42 28.68