Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 725 Today
» 962 Yesterday
» 1687 Week
» 18487 Month
» 334718 Year
» 845820 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Fowler "Patriot" Class 4-6-0


LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
5500 45500 08/11/1930 11/03/1961 Barrow in Furness 30.33 30.41
5501 45501 13/11/1930 26/08/1961 Barrow in Furness 30.75 30.86
5502 45502 01/07/1932 03/09/1960 Carlisle Kingmoor 28.17 28.31
5503 45503 14/07/1932 12/08/1961 Carlisle Kingmoor 29.08 29.19
5504 45504 18/07/1932 17/03/1962 Bristol Barrow Road 29.67 29.70
5505 45505 26/07/1932 02/06/1962 Lancaster Green Ayre 29.92 30.10
5506 45506 01/08/1932 17/03/1962 Bristol Barrow Road 29.58 29.66
5507 45507 12/08/1932 20/10/1962 Lancaster Green Ayre 30.17 30.63
5508 45508 09/08/1932 03/12/1960 Carlisle Kingmoor 28.33 28.35
5509 45509 19/08/1932 12/08/1961 Newton Heath 29 29.09
5510 45510 24/08/1932 09/06/1962 Lancaster Green Ayre 29.83 30.04
5511 45511 09/1932 11/02/1961 Carlisle Kingmoor 28.42 28.50
5512 45512 14/09/1932 27/03/1965 Carlisle Kingmoor 32.5 32.85
5513 45513 19/09/1932 15/09/1962 Edge Hill 30 30.12
5514 45514 21/09/1932 27/05/1961 Derby 28.67 28.75
5515 45515 27/09/1932 09/06/1962 Newton Heath 29.75 29.93
5516 45516 10/10/1932 22/07/1961 Warrington Dallam 28.75 28.95
5517 45517 06/02/1933 09/06/1962 Bank Hall 29.33 29.45
5518 45518 20/02/1933 20/10/1962 Lancaster Green Ayre 29.67 30.10
5519 45519 25/02/1933 17/03/1962 Bristol Barrow Road 29.08 29.10
5520 45520 17/02/1933 19/05/1962 Edge Hill 29.25 29.34
5521 45521 04/03/1933 28/09/1963 Carnforth 30.5 30.72
5522 45522 03/03/1933 19/09/1964 Longsight 31.5 32.31
5523 45523 08/03/1933 25/01/1964 Willesden 30.83 31.04
5524 45524 14/03/1933 15/09/1962 Edge Hill 29.5 29.64
5525 45525 22/03/1933 11/05/1963 Llandudno Junction 30.17 30.22
5526 45526 22/03/1933 24/10/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 31.58 31.93
5527 45527 27/03/1933 05/12/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 31.75 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 04/1965 32.07
5528 45528 04/04/1933 19/01/1963 Willesden 29.75 29.98
5529 45529 06/04/1933 22/02/1964 Annesley 30.83 30.88
5530 45530 03/04/1933 01/01/1965 Carlisle Kingmoor 31.75 33.30
5531 45531 07/04/1933 30/10/1965 Carlisle Kingmoor 32.5 32.96
5532 45532 11/04/1933 01/02/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 30.83 31.79
5533 45533 10/04/1933 15/09/1962 Edge Hill 29.42 29.58
5534 45534 25/04/1933 09/05/1964 Crewe North 31.08 31.16
5535 45535 04/05/1933 26/10/1963 Carlisle Kingmoor 30.42 31.39
5536 45536 04/05/1933 29/12/1962 Sheffield Darnall 29.58 30.88
5537 45537 19/07/1933 09/06/1962 Nuneaton 28.92 29.17
5538 45538 21/07/1933 22/09/1962 Nuneaton 29.17 29.34
5539 45539 27/07/1933 16/09/1961 Newton Heath 28.17 28.24
5540 45540 07/08/1933 06/04/1963 Carlisle Kingmoor 29.67 29.96
5541 45541 15/08/1933 09/06/1962 Nuneaton 28.83 29.10
5542 45542 13/03/1934 09/06/1962 Nuneaton 28.25 28.54
5543 45543 16/03/1934 17/11/1962 Barrow in Furness 28.67 29.52
5544 45544 22/03/1934 09/12/1961 Warrington Dallam 27.75 28.00
5545 45545 27/03/1934 30/05/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 30.17 30.66
5546 45546 29/03/1934 09/06/1962 Warrington Dallam 28.25 28.42
5547 45547 09/04/1934 15/09/1962 Edge Hill 28.42 28.60
5548 45548 27/04/1934 09/06/1962 Nuneaton 28.17 28.42
5549 45549 27/04/1934 16/06/1962 Warrington Dallam 28.17 28.36
5550 45550 01/05/1934 01/12/1962 Barrow in Furness 28.58 29.31
5551 45551 02/05/1934 16/06/1962 Edge Hill 28.08 28.48