Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 117 Today
» 994 Yesterday
» 6258 Week
» 18427 Month
» 245188 Year
» 756290 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

CR/LMS Pickersgill "4P" Class 4-6-0


LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
14630 54630 07/1925 01/1951 Motherwell 25.5
14631 54631 11/1925 22/05/1948 22.5 22.60
14634 54634 05/1926 11/1952 Motherwell 26.5
14635 54635 06/1926 01/1952 Hamilton (West) 25.58
14636 54636 06/1926 02/1953 Motherwell 26.67 26.77
14637 54637 07/1926 13/03/1948 21.67
14638 54638 07/1926 05/1951 Hamilton (West) 24.83
14639 54639 08/1926 12/1953 Hamilton (West) 27.33
14640 54640 08/1926 10/1952 Motherwell 26.17
14641 54641 09/1926 13/11/1948 22.17 22.44
14642 54642 09/1926 10/1949 Motherwell 23.08
14643 54643 10/1926 07/02/1948 21.33
14644 54644 10/1926 24/04/1948 21.5 21.76
14645 54645 11/1926 07/1950 Motherwell 23.67
14646 54646 11/1926 03/1949 Motherwell 22.33
14647 54647 11/1926 03/1951 Motherwell 24.33
14648 54648 11/1926 11/1951 Hamilton (West) 25
14649 54649 11/1926 09/1951 Motherwell 24.83