Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 109 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6955 Week
» 18502 Month
» 418184 Year
» 494771 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Stanier "Coronation (Semi)" Class 4-6-2


LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
6220 46220 06/1937 20/04/1963 Carlisle Kingmoor 25.83 25.93
6221 46221 06/1937 05/1963 Carlisle Kingmoor 25.92 26.10
6222 46222 06/1937 10/1963 Polmadie 26.33 26.44
6223 46223 07/1937 10/1963 Polmadie 26.25 26.27
6224 46224 07/1937 10/1963 Polmadie 26.25 26.27
6225 46225 05/1938 10/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 26.42 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 12/1964 26.61
6226 46226 05/1938 10/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 26.42 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 02/1965 26.78
6227 46227 06/1938 29/12/1962 Polmadie 24.5 25.44
6228 46228 06/1938 10/1964 Crewe North 26.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1964 26.52
6229 46229 09/1938 02/1964 Edge Hill 25.42 Prs Preserved
6230 46230 07/1938 11/1963 Polmadie 25.33 25.44
6231 46231 07/1938 29/12/1962 Polmadie 24.42 25.35
6232 46232 07/1938 29/12/1962 Polmadie 24.42 25.35
6233 46233 07/1938 02/1964 Edge Hill 25.58 Prs Preserved
6234 46234 08/1938 26/01/1963 Carlisle Kingmoor 24.42 24.85
6235 46235 07/1939 10/1964 Crewe North 25.25 Prs Preserved
6236 46236 07/1939 14/03/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 24.67 24.77
6237 46237 08/1939 10/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 25.17 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 12/1964 25.35
6238 46238 09/1939 10/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 25.08 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 12/1964 25.27
6239 46239 09/1939 10/1964 Crewe North 25.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1964 25.27
6240 46240 03/1940 10/1964 Crewe North 24.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1964 24.77
6241 46241 04/1940 09/1964 Edge Hill 24.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1965 24.85
6242 46242 05/1940 10/1963 Polmadie 23.42 23.52
6243 46243 06/1940 10/1964 Edge Hill 24.33 25.18
6244 46244 07/1940 10/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 24.25 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 12/1964 24.44
6245 46245 06/1943 10/1964 Crewe North 21.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1964 21.52
6246 46246 08/1943 26/01/1963 Camden 19.42 19.76
6247 46247 09/1943 06/1963 Carlisle Kingmoor 19.75 19.84
6248 46248 10/1943 09/1964 Crewe North 20.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1964 21.10
6249 46249 04/1944 11/1963 Polmadie 19.58 19.68
6250 46250 05/1944 10/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 20.42 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 12/1964 20.60
6251 46251 06/1944 10/1964 Crewe North 20.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1964 20.52
6252 46252 06/1944 06/1963 Camden 19 19.26
6253 46253 09/1946 26/01/1963 Crewe North 16.33 16.76
6254 46254 09/1946 10/1964 Crewe North 18.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1964 18.26
6255 46255 10/1946 10/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 18 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 12/1964 18.18
6256 46256 12/1947 10/1964 Crewe North 16.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1964 17.01
46257 22/05/1948 10/1964 Carlisle Kingmoor 16.42 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 01/1965 16.66