Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 975 Today
» 1189 Yesterday
» 4437 Week
» 24170 Month
» 321184 Year
» 397771 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

MR/LMS Johnson "1142" Class 0-6-0


Class Types
MR Class 1142
MR Class 28
MR Class B

General
Designer Johnson
Introduced 1875
Pre-Grouping Midland Railway
Big Four London, Midland & Scottish Railway
Wheels 0-6-0
Number Built as 1142 120
Number Scrapped 120
Number Preserved 0
First in Service 02/1875
Last in Service 28/01/1964
Manufacturers
ManufacturerTotal
Beyer Peacock Ltd. 30
Dübs & Co 30
Kitson 30
Neilson, Reid & Co. 30
Orders
BuilderOrder #DateSize
Kitson M7943/a 19/05/1874 20
Dübs & Co M7943/b 19/05/1874 30
Beyer Peacock Ltd. M8238/a 04/05/1875 20
Neilson, Reid & Co. M8238/b 04/05/1875 20
Kitson M8275/a 01/06/1875 10
Beyer Peacock Ltd. M8275/b 01/06/1875 10
Neilson, Reid & Co. M8275/c 01/06/1875 10

Illustration
Copyright: Gerald Robinson
Power
Variant Introduced 1875
Tractive Effort 14,400lbs
Inside Cylinders 17.5" x 26" (2 off)

Wheels
Drivers 4' 1012"
Locomotive Wheelbase 16' 6"
Tender Wheelbase 13'
Total Wheelbase 37' 812"
Descriptive Wheelbase 8' 0" + 8' 6" + 8' 2½" + 6' 6" + 6' 6" = 37' 8½"

Dimensions
Length (over buffers) 50' 038"
Weight (in running order) 69t 11cwt
Weight (loco only) 37t 12cwt
Maximum Axle Load 14t 0cwt

Boiler & Firebox