Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 1177 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 7233 Week
» 21810 Month
» 385055 Year
» 461642 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

MR/LMS Johnson "1142" Class 0-6-0


MR MR (1907) LMS (Dup.) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
1142 2900 22900 58114 02/1875 14/07/1957 Canklow 82.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1957
1143 2901 22901 58115 03/1875 24/03/1961 Barrow in Furness 86 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1961
1144 2902 22902 58116 03/1875 28/01/1960 Barrow in Furness 84.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1960
1145 2903 03/1875 21/04/1929 54.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1929
1146 2904 22904 58117 03/1875 24/03/1956 Monument Lane 81 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1956
1147 2905 03/1875 19/05/1930 55.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1930
1148 2906 04/1875 03/11/1927 52.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1927
1149 2907 22907 58118 04/1875 28/01/1960 Bushbury 84.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1960
1150 2908 04/1875 31/12/1933 58.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1933
1151 2909 04/1875 30/11/1933 58.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1933
1152 2910 06/1875 14/07/1928 53.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1928
1153 2911 22911 58119 06/1875 19/05/1959 Bushbury 83.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1959
1154 2912 22912 58120 06/1875 17/11/1962 Barrow in Furness 87.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1962
1155 2913 22913 58121 06/1875 19/05/1957 Barrow in Furness 81.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1957
1156 2914 07/1875 25/02/1931 55.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1931
1157 2915 22915 58122 08/1875 08/09/1961 Bescot 86.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1962 86.48
1158 2916 22916 08/1875 31/12/1946 Northampton 71.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 08/1947 72.05
1159 2917 08/1875 25/02/1930 54.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1930
1160 2918 22918 58123 09/1875 07/07/1962 Bescot 86.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1962
1161 2919 22919 09/1875 11/08/1935 59.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1935
381 2920 22920 58124 12/1875 07/07/1962 Bescot 86.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1962 86.89
382 2921 22921 58125 01/1876 30/11/1955 Ryecroft (Walsall) 79.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 12/1955 79.97
383 2922 22922 01/1876 14/07/1940 64.5
384 2923 01/1876 30/11/1933 57.83
385 2924 22924 58126 01/1876 16/06/1956 Bournville 80.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 06/1956 80.47
400 2925 02/1876 30/11/1933 57.75
401 2926 22926 58127 02/1876 30/11/1955 Canklow 79.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 12/1955 79.88
402 2927 22927 02/1876 06/10/1946 70.67
403 2928 22928 02/1876 14/07/1946 70.42
404 2929 22929 58128 02/1876 13/10/1962 Toton 86.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1962
1162 2930 22930 04/1875 31/12/1946 71.67
1163 2931 22931 58129 04/1875 25/02/1955 Plaistow 79.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1955
1164 2932 22932 58130 04/1875 19/05/1959 Burton 84.08 Cut Albert Looms (Spondon) 1959
1165 2933 22933 58131 04/1875 25/02/1961 Kentish Town 85.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1961
1166 2934 22934 58132 04/1875 19/05/1959 Derby 84.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1959
1167 2935 22935 58133 04/1875 31/12/1955 Nottingham 80.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1956
1168 2936 05/1875 30/11/1928 53.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1928
1169 2937 05/1875 30/11/1933 Warwick 58.5
1170 2938 05/1875 08/09/1927 Warwick 52.33
1171 2939 22939 05/1875 06/10/1934 Warwick 59.42
1172 2940 22940 58134 05/1875 25/02/1950 Royston 74.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 03/1950 74.88
1173 2941 22941 05/1875 06/10/1946 Nottingham 71.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1946
1174 2942 05/1875 11/08/1927 Warwick 52.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1927
1175 2943 22943 05/1875 31/12/1946 Derby 71.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 01/1947 71.72
1176 2944 22944 58135 05/1875 06/10/1961 Monument Lane 86.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1961
1177 2945 22945 58136 05/1875 06/10/1957 Stourton 82.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Horwich) 1957
1178 2946 22946 58137 06/1875 06/10/1961 Coalville 86.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1961
1179 2947 22947 58138 06/1875 22/12/1962 Coalville 87.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 03/1963 87.81
1180 2948 06/1875 24/03/1930 54.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1930
1181 2949 06/1875 19/05/1931 55.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1931
1182 2950 22950 58139 06/1875 30/11/1956 Barrow in Furness 81.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1956
1183 2951 22951 58140 06/1875 14/07/1957 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 82.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1957
1184 2952 06/1875 08/09/1925 50.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1925
1185 2953 22953 58141 06/1875 08/09/1948 Bournville 73.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1948
1186 2954 22954 58142 06/1875 28/01/1957 Leicester Midland 81.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1957
1187 2955 22955 58143 06/1875 30/11/1963 Coalville 88.42 Cut Albert Looms (Spondon) 10/1964 89.39
1188 2956 07/1875 19/05/1928 52.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1928
1189 2957 07/1875 14/07/1934 59 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1934
1190 2958 22958 58144 07/1875 19/05/1960 Derby 84.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 09/1960 85.23
1191 2959 22959 58145 07/1875 08/09/1953 Burton 78.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1953
1192 2960 02/1876 19/05/1928 52.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1928
1193 2961 22961 02/1876 03/11/1935 59.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1935
1194 2962 02/1876 24/03/1932 56.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1932
1195 2963 22963 58146 03/1876 28/01/1960 Canklow 83.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 03/1960 84.05
1196 2964 03/1876 30/11/1933 57.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1933
1197 2965 22965 58147 03/1876 31/12/1952 Canklow 76.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1953
1198 2966 03/1876 08/09/1930 54.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1930
1199 2967 22967 58148 03/1876 31/12/1963 Coalville 87.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1963
1200 2968 22968 58149 03/1876 08/09/1952 Coalville 76.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1952
1201 2969 22969 58150 03/1876 08/09/1948 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 72.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1948
1202 2970 22970 58151 03/1876 21/04/1951 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 75.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1948
1203 2971 22971 58152 04/1876 30/11/1955 Bushbury 79.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 12/1955 79.72
1204 2972 04/1876 03/11/1934 58.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1934
1205 2973 04/1876 30/11/1933 57.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1933
1206 2974 22974 58153 04/1876 11/08/1960 Toton 84.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton) 08/1960 84.39
1207 2975 22975 58154 04/1876 16/06/1956 Royston 80.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1956
1208 2976 22976 58155 04/1876 24/03/1950 Manningham 73.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 03/1950 73.96
1209 2977 22977 58156 04/1876 24/03/1957 Barrow in Furness 80.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1957
1210 2978 22978 58157 04/1876 03/11/1958 Rugby 82.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 11/1960 84.64
1211 2979 22979 04/1876 16/06/1946 Burton 70.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1946
1212 2980 12/1876 16/06/1926 49.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1926
1213 2981 22981 12/1876 06/10/1935 58.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1935
1214 2982 22982 58158 12/1876 19/05/1960 Derby 83.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton) 10/1960 83.89
1215 2983 22983 58159 12/1876 24/03/1956 Toton 79.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1956
1216 2984 22984 58160 12/1876 08/09/1962 Barrow in Furness 85.75 Cut P.W. McLellan (Coatbridge) 03/1963 86.30
1217 2985 12/1876 11/08/1936 59.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1936
1218 2986 12/1876 08/09/1934 57.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1934
1219 2987 58161 12/1876 25/02/1953 Cricklewood East 76.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1953
1220 2988 58162 12/1876 06/10/1955 Shrewsbury 78.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1955
1221 2989 58163 12/1876 03/11/1961 Rowsley 84.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1961
1222 2990 58164 05/1876 21/04/1955 Leicester Midland 78.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 05/1955 79.05
1223 2991 05/1876 30/11/1933 57.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1933
1224 2992 58165 05/1876 08/09/1960 Burton 84.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton) 09/1960 84.39
1225 2993 58166 06/1876 24/03/1962 Coalville 85.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1962
1226 2994 58167 06/1876 11/08/1959 Bournville 83.17 Cut Albert Looms (Spondon) 09/1960 84.31
1227 2995 58168 06/1876 14/07/1960 Saltley 84.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton) 07/1960 84.14
1228 2996 58169 06/1876 25/02/1961 Bescot 84.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 02/1961 84.73
1229 2997 58170 06/1876 06/10/1960 Canklow 84.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1960
1230 2998 58171 06/1876 08/09/1959 Rugby 83.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1959
1231 2999 58172 06/1876 19/05/1954 Kettering 77.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1954
1232 3000 23000 58173 07/1876 16/06/1960 Toton 83.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton) 07/1960 84.05
1233 3001 23001 58174 07/1876 09/12/1961 Bescot 85.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 02/1962 85.64
1234 3002 23002 58175 07/1876 16/12/1961 Toton 85.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 02/1962 85.64
1235 3003 23003 58176 07/1876 14/07/1956 Toton 80 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1956
1236 3004 10/1876 14/07/1935 58.75
1237 3005 23005 58177 10/1876 29/09/1962 Barrow in Furness 85.92 Cut P.W. McLellan (Coatbridge) 03/1963 86.47
1238 3006 23006 58178 10/1876 19/05/1959 Monument Lane 82.58 Cut Albert Looms (Spondon) 09/1960 83.97
1239 3007 23007 58179 10/1876 21/04/1956 Monument Lane 79.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1956
1240 3008 23008 58180 10/1876 03/11/1953 Aston 77.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1953
1241 3009 23009 58181 11/1876 14/07/1961 Barrow in Furness 84.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1961
1242 3010 23010 58182 11/1876 28/01/1964 Coalville 87.17 Cut Albert Looms (Spondon) 10/1964 87.97
1243 3011 23011 58183 11/1876 28/01/1960 Bushbury 83.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1960
1244 3012 23012 58184 12/1876 30/11/1956 Plaistow 79.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 11/1957 80.97
1245 3013 23013 58185 12/1876 07/07/1962 Bescot 85.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1962 85.89
1246 3014 23014 58186 12/1876 25/02/1961 Burton 84.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 1961
1247 3015 12/1876 31/12/1927 51
1248 3016 23016 12/1876 24/03/1948 71.25
1249 3017 12/1876 08/09/1929 52.75
1250 3018 23018 58187 12/1876 14/07/1957 Barrow in Furness 80.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby) 07/1957 80.63
1251 3019 12/1876 16/06/1926 49.5