Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 119 Today
» 889 Yesterday
» 1876 Week
» 19637 Month
» 309029 Year
» 820131 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Johnson "2F" Class 0-6-0


LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
58188 01/01/1878 04/1957 Royston 79.25 79.34
58189 01/01/1878 09/1957 Rowsley 79.67
58190 01/01/1878 11/1959 Workington 81.83 82.59
58191 01/01/1878 10/1959 Royston 81.75 82.25
3037 58192 01/01/1878 12/1958 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 80.92 82.25
58193 01/01/1878 04/1956 Leicester Midland 78.25
58194 01/01/1878 02/1956 Shrewsbury 78.08
58195 03/1880 09/1954 Kettering 74.5
58196 03/1880 07/1958 Crewe South 78.33
58197 03/1880 11/1960 Royston 80.67
58198 03/1880 09/1959 Canklow 79.5
58199 03/1880 12/1959 Rugby 79.75
58200 03/1880 06/1954 Plaistow 74.25
58201 01/1880 08/1951 Nottingham 71.58
58202 01/1880 04/1950 Saltley 70.25
58203 01/1880 01/1958 Ryecroft (Walsall) 78
58204 03/1880 05/1959 Bushbury 79.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1961 81.47
58205 03/1880 19/06/1948 Bescot 68.25
58206 04/1880 08/1957 Gloucester Barnwood 77.33 77.30
58207 04/1880 09/1955 Shrewsbury 75.42 75.47
58208 05/1880 08/1949 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 69.25
3071 58209 06/1881 09/1960 Rowsley 79.25 79.30
58210 07/1881 12/06/1948 Nottingham 66.92
58211 07/1881 05/1953 Shrewsbury 71.83
58212 08/1881 03/1956 Royston 74.58
58213 12/1882 08/1959 Trafford Park (LMS) 76.67 76.80
58214 01/1883 10/02/1962 Rowsley 79.08
58215 01/1883 03/1961 Toton 78.17
58216 02/1883 05/1957 Royston 74.25
58217 12/1883 10/1959 Workington 75.83
58218 12/1883 07/07/1962 Toton 78.58
58219 12/1883 02/1960 Derby 76.17
58220 10/1883 10/1960 Monument Lane 77 77.14
58221 10/1883 03/1961 Rugby 77.42 77.63
58222 10/1883 04/1949 Burton 65.5
58223 11/1883 05/1949 Rowsley 65.5
58224 11/1883 03/11/1956 Rowsley 73
58225 10/1883 12/1958 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 75.17 77.14
58226 10/1883 01/1952 Rowsley 68.25
58227 11/1884 22/05/1948 Derby 63.5
58228 11/1884 24/03/1962 Toton 77.33
58249 01/01/1887 03/1953 Leicester Midland 66.17
58250 01/01/1887 14/08/1948 Aston 61.58
58251 01/01/1890 12/1951 Coalville 61.92
58252 01/01/1890 12/1951 Nottingham 61.92 62.08
58253 01/1890 12/1949 Kentish Town 59.92 59.95
58254 01/01/1891 03/1952 Rowsley 61.17
58255 01/01/1891 04/09/1948 Saltley 57.67
58256 01/01/1891 01/1949 Burton 58
58257 01/01/1891 11/1955 Barrow in Furness 64.83
58258 01/01/1892 12/1953 Shrewsbury 61.92
58259 01/01/1892 12/1952 Plaistow 60.92
58260 01/01/1892 11/1960 Royston 68.83
58261 01/01/1892 01/1960 Saltley 68
58262 01/01/1892 01/1951 Burton 59
58263 01/01/1893 17/04/1948 Burton 55.25
58264 01/01/1893 02/1954 Rowsley 61.08
58265 01/01/1893 01/1954 Royston 61
58266 01/01/1893 15/05/1948 Canklow 55.33
58267 01/01/1896 03/1950 Burton 54.17 54.24
58268 01/01/1880 10/1951 Toton 71.75 71.92
58269 01/01/1896 04/1956 Rugby 60.25
58270 01/01/1894 02/1948 Willesden 54.08
58271 01/01/1896 06/1961 Monument Lane 65.42
58272 01/01/1896 06/1954 Nuneaton 58.42
58273 01/01/1896 08/10/1955 Barrow in Furness 59.75
58274 01/01/1896 05/1951 Cricklewood East 55.33
58275 01/01/1896 06/1950 Nottingham 54.42 54.91
58276 01/01/1897 06/1956 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 59.42
58277 01/01/1897 11/1955 Bescot 58.83 58.99
58278 12/1897 09/1954 Coventry 56.75 56.79
58279 01/01/1897 06/1959 Patricroft 62.42
58280 01/01/1897 01/1953 Rugby 56
58281 01/01/1897 05/1959 Bushbury 62.33
58282 01/01/1897 05/1950 Heaton Mersey 53.33 53.40
3536 58283 01/01/1897 03/1961 Bescot 64.17
58284 01/01/1897 25/09/1948 Burton 51.67
58285 01/01/1897 06/1951 Bushbury 54.42
58286 01/01/1897 08/10/1955 Monument Lane 58.75
58287 01/01/1897 10/1960 Workington 63.75
58288 01/01/1897 10/1957 Aston 60.75
58289 01/01/1897 05/1951 Plaistow 54.33 54.48
58290 01/01/1897 10/1954 Rugby 57.75 57.82
58291 01/01/1897 02/1961 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 64.08
58292 01/01/1897 24/04/1948 Manningham 51.25
58293 01/01/1897 01/1961 Workington 64 64.75
58294 09/1899 02/1949 Saltley 49.42
58295 11/1900 12/11/1960 Bushbury 60 60.04
58296 01/01/1899 07/1951 Toton 52.5
58297 01/01/1899 28/08/1948 Burton 49.58
58298 01/01/1900 12/11/1960 Rowsley 60.83 60.99
58299 01/01/1900 02/1957 Barrow in Furness 57.08
58300 04/1901 04/1955 Leicester Midland 54 54.04
58301 04/1901 17/04/1948 Nuneaton 47
58302 04/1901 07/1951 Ryecroft (Walsall) 50.25
58303 05/1901 11/1953 Barrow in Furness 52.5
3703 58304 06/1901 02/1952 Burton 50.67
3707 58305 01/01/1901 06/1961 Rowsley 60.42
3725 58306 01/01/1901 02/1957 Monument Lane 56.08
3726 58307 01/01/1901 11/1950 Monument Lane 49.83
3738 58308 01/01/1901 04/1959 Rugby 58.25
3739 58309 01/01/1901 02/1956 Barrow in Furness 55.08
3764 58310 01/01/1902 11/1956 Tilbury 54.83