Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 33 Online
» 2365 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15771 Week
» 68787 Month
» 188314 Year
» 3215167 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
LMS "2F" Class 0-6-0T
LMS |
BR |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
7505
|
58850
|
12/1899 |
|
10/09/1960 |
|
60.75 |
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
7509
|
58851
|
11/1907 |
|
19/02/1955 |
|
47.25 |
|
|
|
47.28 |
7510
|
58852
|
06/1879 |
|
18/06/1955 |
|
76 |
|
|
|
76.05 |
7512
|
58853
|
09/1881 |
|
06/11/1954 |
|
73.17 |
|
|
|
73.21 |
|
58854
|
11/1891 |
|
10/11/1956 |
|
65 |
|
|
|
65.04 |
7514
|
58855
|
12/1882 |
|
07/07/1956 |
|
73.58 |
|
|
|
73.63 |
7515
|
58856
|
03/1896 |
|
19/10/1957 |
|
61.58 |
|
|
|
|
|
58857
|
07/1887 |
|
19/04/1958 |
|
70.75 |
|
|
|
70.88 |
|
58858
|
10/1888 |
|
05/1953 |
|
64.58 |
|
|
|
|
7522
|
58859
|
10/1889 |
|
26/10/1957 |
|
68 |
|
|
|
|
7527
|
58860
|
07/1892 |
|
04/05/1957 |
|
64.83 |
|
|
|
65.63 |
7528
|
58861
|
07/1882 |
|
18/04/1953 |
|
70.75 |
|
|
|
|
7530
|
58862
|
10/1879 |
|
10/03/1956 |
|
76.42 |
|
|
|
76.39 |
7532
|
58863
|
10/1879 |
|
01/1953 |
|
73.25 |
|
|
|
|